Unknown
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00322
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 12:33 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Robert Lamb +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 wrlamb@gillamsmithlaw.com
Space Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com
v.
No Logo ALH Properties No One Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoover Slovacek LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dylan Benjamen Russell +1 713 977 8686 +1 713 977 5395 russell@hooverslovacek.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dylan Benjamen Russell +1 713 977 8686 +1 713 977 5395 russell@hooverslovacek.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss. All claims or causes of action in this matter are hereby dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/7/13. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
    MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline is 7/19/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/30/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, 6 Summons Returned Executed by ALH Properties No One Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Dylan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2013: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (sm, ). (Entered: 05/29/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. ALH Properties No One Inc served on 5/7/2013, answer due 5/28/2013. (No date of service was on green card, answer deadline calulated as of today) (ch, ) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
            SUMMONS Issued as to ALH Properties No One Inc. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None Jury Demand
              DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Lamb, William) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Lamb, William) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC (Lamb, William) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                    COMPLAINT against ALH PROPERTIES NO. ONE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4108549.), filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lamb, William) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 107 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?