Abarta LLC v. Sensics Inc

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00233
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 7:00 PM EST (8.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Abarta LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Spangler & Fussell PC

v.
No Logo Sensics Inc., Defendant

Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erik B Milch +1 703 456 8573 +1 703 456 8100 emilch@cooley.com
Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by Abarta LLC of Change of Firm Name (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Abarta LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sensics Inc.( Milch, Erik) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abarta LLC. Sensics Inc served on 4/1/2013, answer due 4/22/2013. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
SUMMONS Issued as to Sensics Inc. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne pretrial purposes. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/26/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James A Fussell, III on behalf of Abarta LLC (Fussell, James) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Abarta LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Sensics Inc ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4062962.), filed by Abarta LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 123 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?