Lennon Image Technologies, LLC v. Macys, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00235
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 27, 2016 at 8:45 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Buether Joe & Carpenter

No Logo Bloomingdale's Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Luxottica Retail North America Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Luxottica USA, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Macy's, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Amster Rothstein & Ebenstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony F. Locicero +1 212 336 8000 +3368 336 336 8001 alocicero@arelaw.com
No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Counter-Defendant
No Logo David Keyzer, Technical Advisor
No Logo Ditto Technologies, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spangler, Andrew Wesley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo Luxottica Usa LLC, Consol Defendant
No Logo Safilo America, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Cannon Low +1 713 654 7632 +1 713 787 1440 jlow@mwe.com
No Logo Safilo Group SpA, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven G Spears +1 713 653 1700 +1 713 739 7592 sspears@mwe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J Thad Heartfield +1 409 866 3318 +1 409 866 5789 thad@jth-law.com
No Logo Safilo Usa, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Consol Counter Defendant
No Logo Lumondi, Inc., Consol Counter Defendant
No Logo Mike Patterson, Mediator
No Logo Tacori Enterprises, Consol Counter Claimant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (118) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Scheduling Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Report of Mediation
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Stay
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Reconsideration
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Markman Hearing
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE by Luxottica Retail North America Inc, Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Luxottica USA LLC, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. re 85 Response to Non-Motion,, Notice of Additional Authority Supporting Defendants' Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Non-Final Office Action in Ex Parte Reexamination, Control No. 90/012,669, # 2 Exhibit B - Patent Owner Preliminary Response to Petition for IPR of U.S. Patent No. 6,624,843)(Mandaro, Richard) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 88 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debra Elaine Gunter terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/15/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                          Joint Patent Rule 4-5(d) Claim Construction Chart by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Buether, Eric) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE by Luxottica Retail North America Inc, Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Luxottica USA LLC, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. re 58 MOTION to Stay of the Actions Pending Inter Partes Review of the Patent-In-Suit Defendants' Second Notice of Additional Authority Supporting Motion for Immediate Stay (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Non Final Office Action in Ex Parte Reexamination, Control No. 90/012,669)(Mandaro, Richard) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (UNOPPOSED) Debby E. Gunter by Luxottica Retail North America Inc, Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Luxottica USA, Luxottica USA LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Debby E. Gunter by Luxottica Retail North America Inc, Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Luxottica USA, Luxottica USA LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  REPLY to 78 Claim Construction Brief, PLAINTIFF LENNON IMAGE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC'S REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Buether, Eric) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    RESPONSE to 78 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Luxottica Retail North America Inc, Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Luxottica USA LLC, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard S. Mandaro, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Mandaro Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Mandaro Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Mandaro Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Mandaro Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Mandaro Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Mandaro Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Mandaro Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Mandaro Declaration)(Mandaro, Richard) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      ANSWER to 75 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff Lennon Image Technologies, LLC's Answer to Defendants Luxottica Retail North America Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., and Luxottica USA LLC's Counterclaims by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.(Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR - The Court hereby appoints David Keyzer as the Courts technical advisor in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/23/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE by Lennon Image Technologies LLC re 58 MOTION to Stay of the Actions Pending Inter Partes Review of the Patent-In-Suit Plaintiff's Notice of Additional Authority Opposing Defendants' Motion for Immediate Stay of the Actions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE by Luxottica Retail North America Inc, Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Luxottica USA, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. re 30 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Notice of Compliance Relative to Privilege Logs (Mandaro, Richard) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE by Lennon Image Technologies LLC re 30 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Notice of Compliance re Technical Tutorial (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE by Lennon Image Technologies LLC re 30 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Notice of Compliance re Privilege Log (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 76 MOTION for Hearing re 58 MOTION to Stay of the Actions Pending Inter Partes Review of the Patent-In-Suit filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION for Hearing re 58 MOTION to Stay of the Actions Pending Inter Partes Review of the Patent-In-Suit by Luxottica Retail North America Inc, Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Luxottica USA, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc.. (Mandaro, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2014: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        Defendants' ANSWER to 63 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Lennon Image Technologies LLC by Luxottica Retail North America Inc, Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Luxottica USA.(Mandaro, Richard) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants, Luxottica Retail North America Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp. and Luxottica USA LLCsdeadline is 6/10/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/6/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE by Luxottica Retail North America Inc, Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Luxottica USA LLC, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. re 58 MOTION to Stay of the Actions Pending Inter Partes Review of the Patent-In-Suit Notice of Additional Authority Supporting Motion to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order Granting Motion to Stay in Employment Law Compliance, Inc. v. Compli, Inc. et al.)(Mandaro, Richard) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 58 MOTION to Stay of the Actions Pending Inter Partes Review of the Patent-In-Suit filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Luxottica Retail North America Inc, Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Luxottica USA LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gunter, Debra) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR WRONG CASE. PLEASE IGNORE.***ORDER - on 5/29/2014 the Federal Circuit entered an order temporarily staying the proceedings in consideration of Nintendo of America Inc. The Court ORDERS that the above-captioned actions are stayed and all deadlines suspended. The parties are further ORDERED to file a motion to lift this stay, together with a status report, within five (5) days of a decision by the Federal Circuit. The parties shall include in such motion and status report any proposed amendments to the courts Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/3/2014. (ch, ) Modified on 6/3/2014 (ch, ). (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 58 MOTION to Stay of the Actions Pending Inter Partes Review of the Patent-In-Suit Replies due by 6/3/2014.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/3/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 66 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Luxottica Retail North America Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp. and Luxottica USA LLCs Deadline is 6/3/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/3/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 58 MOTION to Stay of the Actions Pending Inter Partes Review of the Patent-In-Suit by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by Luxottica Retail North America Inc, Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Luxottica USA LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gunter, Debra) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Elaine Gunter on behalf of Luxottica Retail North America Inc, Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Luxottica USA LLC (Gunter, Debra) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 58 MOTION to Stay of the Actions Pending Inter Partes Review of the Patent-In-Suit filed by Luxottica Retail North America Inc, Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Luxottica USA LLC, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard S. Mandaro, # 2 Exhibit 5 - AIA Progress Statistics April 10, 2014, # 3 Exhibit 6 - Sidley Austin LLP's Trial Blog, # 4 Exhibit 7 - Stay Order Granted in Canatelo v. Axis Comms. AB, # 5 Exhibit 8- Order Granting Mot. to Stay in Icon Health & Fitness v. Polar Electro Oy, # 6 Exhibit 9 - Mem. Opinion and Order Issued in Radio Sys. Corp. v. Bluekube Tech.)(Mandaro, Richard) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against Luxottica Retail North America Inc, Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Luxottica USA, Luxottica USA LLC, filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 6,624,843 Patent)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Additional Attachments to Main Document: 61 Response in Opposition to Motion,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 7, # 4 Exhibit 8, # 5 Exhibit 9, # 6 Exhibit 10, # 7 Exhibit 11, # 8 Exhibit 12, # 9 Exhibit 13, # 10 Exhibit 14, # 11 Exhibit 15)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 58 MOTION to Stay of the Actions Pending Inter Partes Review of the Patent-In-Suit filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Constructions Of Disputed Terms, # 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Identification Of Intrinsic & Extrinsic Evidence, # 3 Exhibit C - Defendants' Identification Of Intrinsic & Extrinsic Evidence)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne the Claim Construction hearing. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/25/14. (mrm, ) Modified on 6/6/2014 (ch, ). (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay of the Actions Pending Inter Partes Review of the Patent-In-Suit by Luxottica Retail North America Inc, Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Luxottica USA LLC, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard S. Mandaro, # 2 Exhibit 1-Petition for Inter Partes Review filed by Luminox with the PTAB on July 10, 2013 (Case IPR2013-00432), # 3 Exhibit 2 PTAB's January 14, 2014 Decision granting the Luminox IPR Petition, # 4 Exhibit 3 Luxottica and Macy's Joint Petition for Inter Partes Review of the '843 Patent filed on April 8, 2014 (Case IPR2014-00593), # 5 Exhibit 3(a) U.S. Patent No. 6,624,843 which is Ex. 1001 to Defs.' Joint Petition, # 6 Exhibit 3(b) U.S. Patent No. 4,731,743 which is Ex. 1002 to Defs.' Joint Petition, # 7 Exhibit 3(c) U.S. Patent No. 4,539,585 which is Ex. 1003 to Defs.' Joint Petition, # 8 Exhibit 3(d) Claims as originally filed in U.S. Patent App. Serial No. 09/733,197 which is 1004 to Defs.' Joint Petition, # 9 Exhibit 3(e) Office Action mailed Feb. 27, 2003 relating to the prosecution of the '843 Patent which is Ex. 1005 to Defs.' Joint Petition, # 10 Exhibit 3(f) U.S. Patent No. 4,467,349 which is Ex. 1006 to Defs.' Joint Petition, # 11 Exhibit 3(g) Pl.'s Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions from Luxottica Action (Case No.2:13-cv-00239) which is Ex. 1007 to Defs' Joint Petition, # 12 Exhibit 3(h) Pl.'s Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contention in the Macy's Action (Case No. 2:13-cv-00235) which is Ex. 1008 to Defs.' Joint Petition, # 13 Exhibit 3(i) Luminox IPR Decision dated Jan. 14, 2014 which is Ex. 1009 to Defs.' Joint Petition, # 14 Exhibit 3(j) Prosecution History for '843 Patent which is Ex. 1010 to Defs.' Joint Petition, # 15 Exhibit 4 PTAB's Notice of Filing Date to Defs.' Joint Petition date April 14, 2014, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Mandaro, Richard) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Luxottica Retail North America Inc, Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Luxottica USA LLC re 30 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Luxottica Defendants' Notice of Compliance re P.R. 4-2 Disclosures (Mandaro, Richard) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. re 30 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Macy's Notice of Compliance re P.R. 4-2 Disclosures (Mandaro, Richard) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Lennon Image Technologies LLC re 30 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Notice of Compliance re P.R. 4-2 Disclosures (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Luxottica Retail North America Inc, Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Luxottica USA re 30 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, The Luxottica Defendants Notice of Compliance re P.R. 4-1 Disclosures (Mandaro, Richard) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. re 30 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Macy's Notice of Compliance re P.R. 4-1 Disclosures (Mandaro, Richard) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Lennon Image Technologies LLC re 30 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Notice of Compliance re P.R. 4-1 Disclosures (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 50 Stipulation of Dismissal. Dft Lumondi Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/20/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal re Lumondi Inc. by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 48 Motion to Effectuate Service by Alternative Means. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/14/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Effectuate Service by Alternative Means by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 46 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Peter C Schechter as counsel for Lumondi Inc... Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Lumondi Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schechter, Peter) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER SUPPLEMENTING THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER -. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/7/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Lumondi Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Schechter, Peter) Modified on 2/7/2014 (ch, ). (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting 42 MOTION to Dismiss Tacori Enterprises with Prejudice (C.A. No. 2:13-cv-241) filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC., Tacori Enterprises now terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/15/2014. (sm, ) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Tacori Enterprises with Prejudice (C.A. No. 2:13-cv-241) by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER DENYING Luminox Watch Company's Motion for immediate stay (motion filed in 2:13cv238 before consolidation order was entered). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/6/2014. (sm, ) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Ditto Technologies, Inc. of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M Stein on behalf of Tacori Enterprises (Stein, David) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Lennon Image Technologies LLC re 35 MOTION for Protective Order Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order Regarding the 30(b)(6) Deposition Noticed by Defendant Ditto Technologies, Inc. (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Stipulation of Dismissal. Dft Ditto Technologies Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/11/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal re Ditto Technologies, Inc. by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order Regarding the 30(b)(6) Deposition Noticed by Defendant Ditto Technologies, Inc. by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Buether, Eric) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 33 Motion to Withdraw. Michael E Jones is terminated as counsel for Ditto Technologies Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/25/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel by Ditto Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Ditto Technologies, Inc. regarding Compliance with Paragraph 1 & 3 Disclosures (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Spangler on behalf of Ditto Technologies, Inc. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  AGREED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 5/13/2014., Joinder of Parties due by 8/29/2013., Markman Hearing set for 7/29/2014 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/9/2015., Jury Selection set for 3/2/2015 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2015 03:00 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Mediation deadline is 8/26/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/29/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/29/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/29/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Joint Motion for Entry of Amended Agreed Docket Control Order, Discovery Order and Agreed Protective Order, MOTION for Discovery, MOTION for Protective Order by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Agreed Docket Control Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Discovery Order, # 3 Exhibit C - Protective Order)(Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 24 Motion to Substitute Party. Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. added. Macys Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/16/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, James W. Knowles and Robert Faulkner, filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. Joint Notice of Agreed Mediators (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Substitute Party re Macys, Inc. by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Tacori Enterprises (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Lumondi, Inc.'s Motion for Immediate Stay (Dkt. 18 - C.A, No. 2:13-cv-238)Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Lumondi, Inc.'s Motion for Immediate Stay (Dkt. 18 - C.A, No. 2:13-cv-238) [NOTE TO CLERK - SYSTEM-GENERATED DOCKET TEXT IS INCORRECT; THIS REPLY IS ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET #18 IN CONSOLIDATED -00238 ACTION] filed by Lumondi Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schechter, Peter) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Immediate Stay (Dkt. 18 in 2:13-cv-238) filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 13 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Buether, Eric) Modified on 8/6/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig William Weinlein on behalf of All Defendants (Weinlein, Craig) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 8/5/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/2/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Lumondi, Inc.'s Motion for Immediate Stay (Dkt. 18 - C.A, No. 2:13-cv-238) by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the first-filed action, Cause No. 2:13-cv- 235. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the first- filed case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/31/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Lennon Image Technologies LLC re 15 Order, Set Hearings Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 8/8/2013 04:15 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/22/13. (bas, ) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim LENNON IMAGE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIMS TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.(Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.(Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Anthony F Lo Cicero on behalf of Bloomingdales Inc, Macys Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4140690. (Lo Cicero, Anthony) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Richard S Mandaro on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4118881. (Mandaro, Richard) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Macys Inc (Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bloomingdales Inc identifying Corporate Parent Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. for Bloomingdales Inc. (Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendants' ANSWER to 1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement against Lennon Image Technologies LLC by Macys Inc, Bloomingdales Inc.(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. Bloomingdales Inc served on 4/9/2013, answer due 4/30/2013; Macys Inc served on 4/9/2013, answer due 4/30/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Macy's)(ehs, ) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Issued as to Bloomingdales Inc, (Attachments: # 1 Macy's Inc)(ch, ) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Niknaz Forughi Bukovcan on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies LLC (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric William Buether on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies LLC (Buether, Eric) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4066572.), filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 223 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?