Lennon Image Technologies, LLC v. Lumondi Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00238
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 1, 2016 at 9:32 AM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Buether Joe & Carpenter

No Logo Lumondi, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Lumondi, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Philllip Samansky +1 617 517 5550 +1 888 325 6566 asamansky@eapdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter C. Schechter +1 212 912 2934 pschechter@eapdlaw.com
No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Stipulation of Dismissal. Dft Lumondi Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/20/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney - Peter C Schechter. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/10/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Peter C Schechter terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
        UNOPPOSED MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Lumondi Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (Entered: 02/07/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE by Lumondi Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Schechter, Peter) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 24 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER denying 18 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/6/2014. (sm, ) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
              REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION to Stay Defendant Luminox's Motion for Immediate Stay Pending Inter Partes Review at the USPTO, and Memorandum in Support filed by Lumondi Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schechter, Peter) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                RESPONSE to Motion re 18 MOTION to Stay Defendant Luminox's Motion for Immediate Stay Pending Inter Partes Review at the USPTO, and Memorandum in Support filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 14 Text of Proposed Order Proposed ORDER denying Motion for Immediate Stay)(Buether, Eric) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER - cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the first-filed action, Cause No. 2:13-cv- 235. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the first- filed case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/31/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC re 19 Order, Set Hearings Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER, ( Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2013 04:15 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/22/13. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                        MOTION to Stay Defendant Luminox's Motion for Immediate Stay Pending Inter Partes Review at the USPTO, and Memorandum in Support by Lumondi Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10)(Schechter, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2013: # 12 REVISED ORDER (no lines)) (sm, ). (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                          ANSWER to 10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC.(Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 15 Motion to Withdraw 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prudential Standing for Failure to to Join Necessary Party, Docket #12 deemed withdrawn. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/22/13. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prudential Standing for Failure to to Join Necessary Party by Lumondi Inc.. (Samansky, Adam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by Lumondi Inc. re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prudential Standing for Failure to to Join Necessary Party to Withdraw Motion Due to Mootness (Samansky, Adam) Modified on 5/20/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prudential Standing for Failure to to Join Necessary Party filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed ORDER)(Buether, Eric) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                    MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prudential Standing for Failure to to Join Necessary Party by Lumondi Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Peter Schechter, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Samansky, Adam) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lumondi Inc. (Samansky, Adam) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Lennon Image Technologies, LLC by Lumondi Inc..(Samansky, Adam) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Phillip Samansky on behalf of Lumondi Inc. (Samansky, Adam) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Peter C Schechter on behalf of Lumondi Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4112942. (Schechter, Peter) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. Lumondi Inc. served on 4/8/2013, answer due 4/29/2013. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                SUMMONS Issued as to Lumondi Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Niknaz Forughi Bukovcan on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies, LLC (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric William Buether on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies, LLC (Buether, Eric) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                      Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                          COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4066600.), filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 150 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?