Lennon Image Technologies, LLC v. Fraimz LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00237
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 6:03 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Buether Joe & Carpenter

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL; granting 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/30/13. (mrm, ) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Joe, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 07/29/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
      SUMMONS Issued as to Fraimz LLC. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Niknaz Forughi Bukovcan on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies LLC (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric William Buether on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies LLC (Buether, Eric) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
            Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4066590.), filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 98 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?