Lennon Image Technologies, LLC v. Ditto Technologies, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00236
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 3:38 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Buether Joe & Carpenter

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ditto Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) Modified on 9/24/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 09/24/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James A Fussell, III on behalf of Ditto Technologies, Inc. (Fussell, James) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Spangler on behalf of Ditto Technologies, Inc. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER - cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the first-filed action, Cause No. 2:13-cv- 235. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the first- filed case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/31/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC re 13 Order, Set Hearings Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER, ( Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2013 04:15 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/22/13. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
              DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ditto Technologies, Inc.. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ditto Technologies, Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Ditto Technologies, Inc..(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                    Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ditto Technologies, Inc..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ditto Technologies, Inc..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. Ditto Technologies, Inc. served on 4/9/2013, answer due 4/30/2013. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                          SUMMONS Issued as to Ditto Technologies, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Niknaz Forughi Bukovcan on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies, LLC (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric William Buether on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies, LLC (Buether, Eric) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4066584.), filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 225 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?