Lennon Image Technologies, LLC v. Luxottica Retail North America Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00239
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 2:32 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Buether Joe & Carpenter

No Logo Luxottica Retail North America Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Luxottica Group S.p.a., Defendant
No Logo Luxottica Retail North America Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
No Logo Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Defendant
No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER - cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for allpretrial issues (except venue) with the first-filed action, Cause No. 2:13-cv-235. All parties areinstructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the first-filed case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/31/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE by Lennon Image Technologies LLC re 25 Order, Set Hearings Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 8/8/2013 04:15 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/22/13. (bas, ) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
          Plaintiff's Answer to Defendants' Counterclaims ANSWER to 15 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.(Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Neil J McNabnay terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/20/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 14 Motion to Substitute Party. Luxottica Group SpA terminated and Luxottica USA LLC is added. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/18/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Luxottica Group SpA, Luxottica Retail North America Inc, Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Luxottica USA, Luxottica USA LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard S. Mandaro on behalf of all defendants. Filing Fee $100, paid. Receipt # 0540-4186099. (pkb, ) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Anthony F Lo Cicero on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4188308. (Lo Cicero, Anthony) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                      ***PLEASE IGNORE. FILED PRIOR TO APPROVAL***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Richard S Mandaro on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4186099. (Mandaro, Richard) Modified on 6/19/2013 (pkb, ). (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Luxottica USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Luxottica Group S.p.A. for Luxottica USA LLC. (Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Luxottica Retail North America Inc, Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Luxottica USA identifying Corporate Parent Luxottica Group S.p.A. for Luxottica Retail North America Inc, Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Luxottica USA. (Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Lennon Image Technologies LLC by Luxottica US Holdings Corp, Luxottica Retail North America Inc, Luxottica USA.(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                              Joint MOTION to Substitute Party Luxottica USA LLC in place of Luxottica Group S.p.A. by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Luxottica US Holdings Corp.( McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                  Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Luxottica Retail North America Inc.( McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                    Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Luxottica Group SpA.( McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Luxottica Retail North America Inc.( McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Luxottica Group SpA.( McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Luxottica US Holdings Corp.( McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. Luxottica Group SpA served on 4/8/2013, answer due 4/29/2013; Luxottica Retail North America Inc served on 4/9/2013, answer due 4/30/2013; Luxottica US Holdings Corp served on 4/9/2013, answer due 4/30/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Luxottica Group SPA, # 2 Luxottica US Holdings)(ehs, ) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                              SUMMONS Issued as to Luxottica Group SPA, (Attachments: # 1 Luxottica Retail North America Inc, # 2 Luxottica US Holdings Corporation)(ch, ) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Niknaz Forughi Bukovcan on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies LLC (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric William Buether on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies LLC (Buether, Eric) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                    Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                        COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4066604.), filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 129 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?