Lennon Image Technologies, LLC v. Safilo America, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00240
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 8:30 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Buether Joe & Carpenter

v.
No Logo Safilo America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Cannon Low +1 713 654 7632 +1 713 787 1440 jlow@mwe.com
No Logo Safilo Group SpA, Defendant
No Logo Safilo Usa, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 21 Notice of Dismissal. Dfts Salfilo America Inc, Safilo USA Inc, and Safilo Group SpA is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/22/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Lennon Image Technologies LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed ORDER)(Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER - cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for allpretrial issues (except venue) with the first-filed action, Cause No. 2:13-cv-235. All parties areinstructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the first-filed case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/31/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE by Lennon Image Technologies LLC re 18 Order, Set Hearings Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER setting hearing ( Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2013 04:15 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/22/13. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Plaintiff Lennon Image Technologies, LLC's Sur-Reply in Support of its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Buether, Eric) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
              REPLY to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) as applied to Amended Complaint 14 by Agreement of the Parties filed by Safilo America Inc, Safilo Group SpA, Safilo USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Steven G. Spears ISO Defs' Motion, # 2 Exhibit A to Spears Decl.)(Spears, Steven) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Safilo America Inc, Safilo Group SpA, Safilo USA Inc (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                  AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF LENNON IMAGE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against All Defendants, filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.(Buether, Eric) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE to Motion re 10 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) PLAINTIFF LENNON IMAGE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed ORDER)(Buether, Eric) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                      ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTY DUPLICATE FILING PLEASE IGNORE.***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Safilo America Inc, Safilo Group SpA, Safilo USA Inc (Low, John) Modified on 6/13/2013 (ch, ). (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Safilo America Inc, Safilo Group SpA, Safilo USA Inc identifying Corporate Parent Safilo America, Inc. for Safilo USA Inc; Corporate Parent Safilo S.p.A. for Safilo America Inc; Corporate Parent Multibrands Italy B.V. for Safilo Group SpA. (Spears, Steven) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                          MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Safilo America Inc, Safilo Group SpA, Safilo USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John C. Low ISO Motion, # 2 Exhibit A to Low Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Low Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Low Decl., # 5 Exhibit D to Low Decl., # 6 Text of Proposed Order Granting Mot. to Dismiss Without Prejudice)(Spears, Steven) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Safilo America Inc, Safilo Group SpA, Safilo USA Inc. (Low, John) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. Safilo America Inc served on 4/9/2013, answer due 4/30/2013. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. Safilo Group SpA served on 4/9/2013, answer due 4/30/2013; Safilo USA Inc served on 4/9/2013, answer due 4/30/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Safilo USA)(ehs, ) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                  SUMMONS Issued as to Safilo Group SpA, (Attachments: # 1 Safilo USA Inc, # 2 Safilo America Inc)(ch, ) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Niknaz Forughi Bukovcan on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies LLC (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric William Buether on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies LLC (Buether, Eric) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                        Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4066609.), filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 116 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?