USA v. Tokhtakhounov et al

Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cr-00268
District Judge Jesse M. Furman, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Jesse M. Furman
Last Updated September 12, 2016 at 9:42 AM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Alexander Katchaloff, Defendant

Represented by Andrew J. Frisch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
also known asSealed Defendant 15 
also known asMurushka Andrew J. Frisch +1 212 784 2413 +1 646 304 0352 afrisch@andrewfrisch.com

Represented by Law Offices of Andrew J. Frisch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Andrew J. Frisch +1 212 784 2413 +1 646 304 0352 afrisch@andrewfrisch.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 939 Filed: None, Entered: None
LREF
Blank 261 Filed: None, Entered: None
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Alimzhan Tokhtakhounov, et al: At the initial appearance on April 19, 2013, the Court temporarily continued the bail conditions set for those defendants arrested out of this District to allow the parties to confer with respect to the bail conditions to be set in this District. Although the Court has set bail conditions on consent with respect to two defendants, there are several defendants for whom bail has not yet been set in this District. To ensure that the bail conditions currently in place for those defendants are on the record in this District, the Government is hereby ordered to submit a letter to the Court, no later than April 29, 2013, at noon, identifying any defendant in that situation and the bail conditions that were set for that defendant in another District. Absent any objection from a defendant, the Court will so order the Government's letter, thereby adopting those bail conditions in this District without prejudice to an application, on consent or otherwise, for modification of those conditions. If any defendant objects to this procedure, he or she must advise the Court by letter no later than April 29, 2013, at noon. In the event of such an objection, the objecting defendant and the Government shall appear for a bail hearing on Tuesday, April 30, 2013, at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 1105 in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007. In the absence of an objection, there is no need to appear on that date. (Bond Hearing set for 4/30/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/26/2013) (ab) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: As to Alimzhan Tokhtakhounov, Vadim Trincher, Anatoly Golubchik, Michael Sall, Stan Greenberg, Illya Trincher, Hillel Nahmad, John Hanson, Noah Siegel, Jonathan Hirsch, Arthur Azen, Donald McCalmont, Dmitry Druzhinsky, Alexander Zaverukha, Alexander Katchaloff, Anatoly Shteyngrob, Ilya Rozenfeld, Peter Skyllas, Ronald Uy, Nicholas Hirsch, Bryan Zuriff, Moshe Oratz, Kirill Rapoport, David Aaron, Justin Smith, Abraham Mosseri, William Edler, Peter Feldman, Eugene Trincher, Edwin Ting, Molly Bloom, William Barbalat, Yugeshwar Rajkumar, Joseph Mancuso. As discussed at the pretrial conference held on April 19, 2013, the following schedule will govern the conduct of proceedings in this case: The Government shall produce all Rule 16 material currently in its possession, except for computer hard drives, no later than May 20,2013 (and earlier if possible). The Government shall produce all computer hard drives no later than June 19, 2013. All defense motions (except for severance motions based solely on the number of defendants, which shall be deferred until closer to trial) shall be filed no later than December 2, 2013. The Government's opposition, if any, is due no later than December 16, 2013. Any reply is due one week thereafter. December 2, 2013, is merely an outside deadline; should counsel wish to bring an earlier motion, he or she should submit a letter to the Court with a proposed briefing schedule. The Court will hold a pretrial conference on March 13, 2014, at 3 p.m. Trial will begin on June 9, 2014. This is FIRM date. Counsel should familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Criminal Cases, available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Furman. Unless otherwise noted on the docket, all proceedings will take place in Courtroom 1105 in the Thurgood MarshallCourthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/22/2013)(dnd) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
PRB Bond Entered as to Alexander Katchaloff in amount of $ 150,000; TO BE COSIGNED BY ONE FINANCIALLY RESPONSIBLE PERSON; SECURED BY PROPERTY LOCATED AT 2685 E. 23RD ST, APT #3, BK; TRAVEL LIMITED TO SDNY/EDNY; SURRENDER TRAVEL DOCUMENTS AND NO NEW APPLICATIONS; REGULAR PRETRIAL SUPERVISION; 1 DRUG TEST; DEFT TO BE RELEASED ON OWN SIGNATURE; REMAINING CONDITIONS TO BE MET BY 4/26/13. (Advice of Penalties and Sanctions attached.) (jbo) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Harris Fischman appearing for USA. (Fischman, Harris) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Joshua Arditi Naftalis appearing for USA. (Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew James Frisch appearing for (13-Cr-268-15) Alexander Katchaloff. (bw) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Alimzhan Tokhtakhounov, Vadim Trincher, Anatoly Golubchik, Michael Sall, Stan Greenberg, Illya Trincher, Hillel Nahmad, John Hanson, Noah Siegel, Jonathan Hirsch, Arthur Azen, Donald McCalmont, Dmitry Druzhinsky, Alexander Zaverukha, Alexander Katchaloff, Anatoly Shteyngrob, Ilya Rozenfeld, Peter Skyllas, Ronald Uy, Nicholas Hirsch, Bryan Zuriff, Moshe Oratz, Kirill Rapoport, David Aaron, Justin Smith, Abraham Mosseri, William Edler, Peter Feldman, Eugene Trincher, Edwin Ting, Molly Bloom, William Barbalat, Yugeshwar Rajkumar, Joseph Mancuso: The arraignment and initial appearance for all defendants in this matter will take place on April 19, 2013, at 1 p.m. in Courtroom 23A of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. (The Court will begin the conference promptly at 1 p.m., so all parties should be in the Courtroom before that time.) At that conference, the Court intends to set a trial date. Accordingly, counsel should confer in advance of the conference to determine what month or months they are available to try the case, leaving enough time to resolve any motions and for trial preparation. (Arraignment set for 4/19/2013 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 23A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/17/2013)(jw) Modified on 4/18/2013 (ab). (Entered: 04/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Order to Unseal Indictment as to Sealed Defendant 1, Sealed Defendant 2, Sealed Defendant 3, Sealed Defendant 4, Sealed Defendant 5, Sealed Defendant 6, Sealed Defendant 7, Sealed Defendant 8, Sealed Defendant 9, Sealed Defendant 10, Sealed Defendant 11, Sealed Defendant 12, Sealed Defendant 13, Sealed Defendant 14, Sealed Defendant 15, Sealed Defendant 16, Sealed Defendant 17, Sealed Defendant 18, Sealed Defendant 19, Sealed Defendant 20, Sealed Defendant 21, Sealed Defendant 22, Sealed Defendant 23, Sealed Defendant 24, Sealed Defendant 25, Sealed Defendant 26, Sealed Defendant 27, Sealed Defendant 28, Sealed Defendant 29, Sealed Defendant 30, Sealed Defendant 31, Sealed Defendant 32, Sealed Defendant 33, Sealed Defendant 34. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 4/16/13)(jm) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1, 2, 5, 6, 7, 8, Sealed Defendant 2 (2) count(s) 1, 2, 5, 6, 7, 8, Sealed Defendant 3 (3) count(s) 1, 2, 5, 6, 7, 8, 18, Sealed Defendant 4 (4) count(s) 1, 7, Sealed Defendant 5 (5) count(s) 1, 7, Sealed Defendant 6 (6) count(s) 3, 4, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, Sealed Defendant 7 (7) count(s) 3, 4, 9, 10, 12, 15, Sealed Defendant 8 (8) count(s) 3, 4, 9, 10, 11, 12, 14, Sealed Defendant 9 (9) count(s) 3, 4, 9, 10, 11, 12, Sealed Defendant 10 (10) count(s) 3, 9, 10, 11, Sealed Defendant 11 (11) count(s) 3, 4, 12, 14, 16, 17, 19, 20, 23, Sealed Defendant 12 (12) count(s) 3, 4, 12, 14, Sealed Defendant 13 (13) count(s) 16, 17, 18, Sealed Defendant 14 (14) count(s) 16, 17, Sealed Defendant 15 (15) count(s) 16, 17, Sealed Defendant 16 (16) count(s) 18, Sealed Defendant 17 (17) count(s) 18, Sealed Defendant 18 (18) count(s) 12, Sealed Defendant 19 (19) count(s) 12, 13, Sealed Defendant 20 (20) count(s) 15, Sealed Defendant 21 (21) count(s) 9, 11, Sealed Defendant 22 (22) count(s) 9, 11, 19, Sealed Defendant 23 (23) count(s) 19, Sealed Defendant 24 (24) count(s) 9, 11, Sealed Defendant 25 (25) count(s) 9, 11, Sealed Defendant 26 (26) count(s) 9, 11, Sealed Defendant 27 (27) count(s) 9, 11, Sealed Defendant 28 (28) count(s) 9, 11, Sealed Defendant 29 (29) count(s) 12, 20, 21, Sealed Defendant 30 (30) count(s) 12, 20, 22, Sealed Defendant 31 (31) count(s) 20, 27, Sealed Defendant 32 (32) count(s) 20, 25, Sealed Defendant 33 (33) count(s) 20, 26, Sealed Defendant 34 (34) count(s) 20, 24. (Attachments: # 1 indictment part 2) (jm) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 135 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?