Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP v. Samsung Electronics Co. LTD., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00213
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 28, 2018 at 1:40 PM DT (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP, Plaintiff

Represented by Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Anaipakos, PC

Represented by Heim, Payne & Chorush, L.L.P.

Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

v.
Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Defendant
Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Kirk Sherwood +1 202 420 3601 +1 202 420 2201 sherwoodj@dicksteinshapiro.com
Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co LTD"
No Logo Sansung Telecommunications America LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (412) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Report of Mediation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 7/15/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None USCA Judgment
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Judgment
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Notice of Intent to Request Redaction
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 9/7/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 9/7/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 8/23/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Bill of Costs
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Bill of Costs
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Judgment as a Matter of Law
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 7/3/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Report of Mediation
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Jury Trial - Completed
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial completed on 2/13/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Jury Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 2/12/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Jury Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 2/11/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Jury Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 2/10/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Jury Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Selection held on 2/9/2015, Jury Trial held on 2/9/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Sealed Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Sealed Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Sealed Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Jury Verdict
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Jury Notes
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Final
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Final Pretrial Conference held on 2/2/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, ) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 2/8/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 2/8/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 2/8/2015, Entered: None Agreement for Jury Verdict
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 2/8/2015, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 2/8/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 2/7/2015, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Blackberry's Motion to Seal the Courtroom at Trial During Discussion of Rembrandt's Computed Effective Royalty Rate of the Rembrandt/Blackberry Settlement by BlackBerry Corp., Blackberry, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hung, Richard) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion to Compel as per party agreement and in accordance with the rulings set forth during the May 16, 2014 hearing on the same. See 105 Minute Entry from May 16, 2014 Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/06/2015. (No document attached.) (rsp1, ) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER finding as moot 122 Motion to Sever/Separate Trial in view of 172 Order Granting Stipulation of Dismissal as to Blackberry Defendant.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/06/2015. (No document attached.) (rsp1, ) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER finding as moot 194 Sealed Motion in Limine in view of 204 Amended Defendants' Motions in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/06/2015. (No document attached.) (rsp1, ) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 262 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Damages Prior to the Filing Date of the Complaint for Failure to Mark filed by Sansung Telecommunications America LLC, Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Electronics America Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/5/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Report of Mediation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD Defendants' Deposition Designations (Hermes, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit List Defendants' Tenth Amended Trial Exhibit List by Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD.. (Hermes, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP Rembrandt's Deposition Designations (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit List Eleventh Amended Trial Exhibit List by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP.. (Alavi, Amir) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 235 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Dft's Reply in Support of their Motion in Limine No. 11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/3/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REGARDING JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND VERDICT FORMS - Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/3/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 244 Motion to Seal The Courtroom at Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/3/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 230 Motion in Limine Regarding Use of Dr. Paul Schecks's Testimony. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/3/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Jury Instructions by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Preliminary Jury Instructions)(Alavi, Amir) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 2/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 1/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REGARDING MOTION IN LIMINE - granting in part and denying in part 197 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 204 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/30/15. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Frank C. Cimino, Jr. by Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Haddad, Gerard) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 1/24/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Interim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP Joint Notice of Proposed Jury Instructions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Alavi, Amir) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 205 Affidavit in Support of Motion: Exhibit 1, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 8, # 8 Exhibit 10, # 9 Exhibit 22)(Haddad, Gerard) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Support re 204 Amended SEALED MOTION - Defendants' Motions in Limine **Amended** Declaration of Gerrard A. Haddad in Support of Defendants' Motions in Limine filed by Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22)(Haddad, Gerard) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended SEALED MOTION - Defendants' Motions in Limine by Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motions in Limine)(Haddad, Gerard) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 203 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 202 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, - Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Gerard A. Haddad in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of the Invalidity Report of Dr. David Goodman. (Haddad, Gerard) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 165 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Invalidity Report of Dr. David Goodman filed by Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit /Declaration of Gerard A. Haddad in Support of Defendants' Sur-Reply in Opposition to Rembrandt's Motion to Strike Portions of the Invalidity Report of Dr. David Goodman, # 2 Exhibit 20, # 3 Exhibit 21 - Filed Under Seal)(Haddad, Gerard) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/26/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Order on Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Sever
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 112 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC. (Sherwood, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORT of Mediation by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. Mediation result: impasse(Enger, Eric) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT of Mediation by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. Mediation result: impasse(Enger, Eric) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - the court has received Mr. Keyzer's invoice for services through 6/4/2014, the court orders payment to be promptly made as follows herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/11/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/10/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 112 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric Enger, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Enger, Eric) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION OF JENNIFER BIANROSA IN SUPPORT OF SAMSUNGS OPPOSED MOTION TO STAY PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Claim Construction Hearing held on 5/30/2014 before Judge Roy S. Payne. Court Reporter: Tonya Jackson, Telephone number: 409.654.2833. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2014. (tj, ) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP for proceedings held on 5/30/2014 - Markman Hearing before Judge Payne. (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd for proceedings held on 05/30/14 Markman Hearing before Judge Payne. (Carter, Edgar) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Markman Hearing held on 5/30/2014. (Court Reporter Tonya Jackson.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, ) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP for proceedings held on May 16, 2014 Motion Hearing before Judge Roy Payne. (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/16/14 (ECRO - Motion Hearing) before Judge Roy Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/16/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2014. (sholmes, ) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Motion Hearing held on 5/16/2014 re 88 MOTION to Compel and Motion to Enforce and/or Modify the Discovery Order filed by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. (Court Reporter Becky Andrews - ECRO.) (bga, ) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LPR 4-5(d) Joint Claim Construction Chart by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to 97 Claim Construction Brief,, filed by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 28, # 2 Exhibit 29, # 3 Exhibit 30, # 4 Exhibit 31, # 5 Exhibit 32, # 6 Exhibit 33, # 7 Exhibit 34, # 8 Exhibit 35, # 9 Exhibit 36, # 10 Exhibit 37, # 11 Exhibit 38, # 12 Exhibit 39, # 13 Exhibit 40)(Enger, Eric) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendants' Joint Claims Construction Brief in RESPONSE to 97 Claim Construction Brief,, filed by Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC, Blackberry Corp, Blackberry LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17)(Sherwood, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER - Court hereby appoints David Keyzer as the Courts technical advisor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/30/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 88 MOTION to Compel and Motion to Enforce and/or Modify the Discovery Order filed by Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Haddad, Gerard) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP of Compliance Regarding Technology Tutorial (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd, Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC Of Compliance Regarding Technical Tutorial (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27)(Enger, Eric) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Additional Attachments to Main Document: 95 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13, # 2 Exhibit 14)(Enger, Eric) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 95 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 88 MOTION to Compel and Motion to Enforce and/or Modify the Discovery Order filed by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 15)(Enger, Eric) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 90 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP.(Enger, Eric) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 89 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP.(Enger, Eric) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 88 MOTION to Compel and Motion to Enforce and/or Modify the Discovery Order filed by Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Daniel Cardy, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Text of Proposed Order)(Haddad, Gerard) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer BianRosa on behalf of Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4595407. (BianRosa, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Samsung Defendants' ANSWER to 84 Amended Complaint (Third) of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP, COUNTERCLAIM against Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP by Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC.(Haddad, Gerard) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEFENDANTS BLACKBERRY CORP.S AND BLACKBERRY LTD.S ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT ANSWER to 84 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Research in Motion Ltd, Research In Motion Corporation.(Hung, Richard) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel and Motion to Enforce and/or Modify the Discovery Order by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11)(Enger, Eric) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 83 Motion to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/14/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR NON-PARTIES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/14/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 77 Motion to Supplement Its Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/14/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP's Third Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against All Defendants, filed by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP.(Enger, Eric) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants' Invalidity Contentions by Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Amend Invalidity Contentions)(Haddad, Gerard) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order Supplemental for Non-Parties by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Enger, Eric) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 77 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions to Samsung filed by Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Rembrandt Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions)(Haddad, Gerard) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 75 Motion to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/29/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER finding as moot 67 Motion for Temporary Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/29/2014. (rsp3) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions to Samsung by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Enger, Eric) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd, Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC (PR 4-1 Disclosures) (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct its Infringement Contentions to Research In Motion by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Eric Enger, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Enger, Eric) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP of Compliance with Patent Rule 4-1 (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyril Vladimir Talanov on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP (Talanov, Kyril) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blaine Andrew Larson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Larson, Blaine) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by James Ryan Gilfoil on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4476910. (Gilfoil, James) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 69 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Francis C Ho terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/4/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Francis C. Ho by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torkelson, John) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/27/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order Temporary by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Enger, Eric) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd, Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC (PR 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures) (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd Additional Disclosures (Torkelson, John) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC (Additional Disclosures) (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 61 Unopposed Motion to Modify Caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/16/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Modify Caption and Notice of Change of Name of Parties by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hung, Richard) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd Initial Disclosures (Torkelson, John) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP Initial Disclosures (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC (Initial Disclosures) (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Eric James Enger (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Protective Order Entry by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP, Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd, Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Samsung's Version of Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Rembrandt's Version of Protective Order)(Alavi, Amir) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/29/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/29/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 3/13/2014., Joinder of Parties due by 8/29/2013., Markman Hearing set for 5/29/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions due by 12/31/2014., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/12/2015., Jury Selection set for 2/2/2015 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 1/20/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Mediation deadline is 7/14/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/29/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION Seeking Entry of Docket Control Order, Discovery Order and E-Discovery Order re 43 Order, Set Hearings by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Enger, Eric) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Paul R. Michel, 6307 Broad Branch Road, Chevy Chase, Maryland 20815, telephone number (301) 229-3045 and email prmichel@mindspring.com, is hereby appointed as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/20/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Judge Paul Michel, filed by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP, Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd, Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC. (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: 8/1/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: 7/31/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: 7/31/2013 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: 7/31/2013 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: 7/25/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: 7/22/2013 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: 7/15/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: 7/9/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Research In Motion Corp and Research In Motion Ltd is 7/10/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/1/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank C Cimino, Jr on behalf of Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC (Cimino, Frank) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Gerard Haddad on behalf of Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4204241. (Haddad, Gerard) Modified on 7/2/2013 (pkb, ). (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel G Cardy on behalf of Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4204231. (Cardy, Daniel) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hung, Richard) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard S J Hung on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd (Hung, Richard) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, and Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC. Deadline is 7/10/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/26/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Charles Smith on behalf of Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 24 Amended Complaint by Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Defendants, filed by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 580 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B - 228 Patent)(Enger, Eric) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Kirk Sherwood on behalf of Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC (Sherwood, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Kirk Sherwood on behalf of Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC (Sherwood, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. Research In Motion Corporation served on 3/25/2013, answer due 7/3/2013; Research in Motion Ltd served on 3/21/2013, answer due 7/3/2013; Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC served on 3/20/2013, answer due 7/3/2013; Samsung Electronics America Inc served on 3/27/2013, answer due 7/3/2013; Sansung Telecommunications America LLC served on 3/25/2013, answer due 7/3/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Research In Motion Corp, # 2 Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, # 3 Samsung Electronics Am LLC, # 4 Samsung Telecommunications America)(ehs, ) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. and the Domestic Samsung Defendants (i.e., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, and Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC) to answer the Complaint is extended to July 3, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/15/13. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Research in Motion Corp. and Research in Motion Ltd. to answer is extended up to July 3, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/15/13. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. Samsung Electronics Co LTD waiver sent on 4/10/2013, answer due 6/10/2013. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd, Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC, filed by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jones, Miranda) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Miranda) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Miranda) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Research in Motion Ltd WAIVER OF THE SERVICE OF SUMMONS TO MIRANDA JONES (Hung, Richard) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Ervin Simmons on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP (Simmons, Brian) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Demetrios Anaipakos on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amir H. Alavi on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP (Alavi, Amir) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Issued as to Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd, Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America LLC, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Samsung Telecommunication Am LLC, # 2 Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, # 3 Samsung Electronics Am LLC, # 4 Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, # 5 Research in Motion ltd)(ehs, ) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael F Heim on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP (Heim, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Allan Bullwinkel on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP (Bullwinkel, Robert) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric James Enger on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne for pretrial purposes. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/18/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4047368.), filed by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - '580 Patent)(Jones, Miranda) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2013: # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ch, ). (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 826 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?