Execware LLC v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00384
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 14, 2016 at 12:30 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Execware, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Bayard, PA

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/01/2012, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D Kuyper +1 213 891 8001 +1 213 891 8763 bruce.kuyper@lw.com

Represented by Russ August & Kabat

v.
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Green Dot Corp

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,216,139. (ntl) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 40 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Execware LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA LLC. (Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Service of Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s and Wal-Mart.com USA LLC's Core Technical Documents on February 19, 2013 by Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA LLC (Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher P. Broderick and Karen G. Johnson-McKewan - filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA LLC. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Heaney on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA LLC (Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
            Joint PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order by Execware LLC, Kmart Corporation, Kmart.com LLC, Sears Brands LLC, Sears, Roebuck and Co., CVS Caremark Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Overstock.com Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA LLC, Dillard's Inc., Home Depot Inc., Home Depot USA Inc., Homer TLC Inc., Staples Inc., Hyatt Corporation, Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Target Brands Inc., Target Corporation, Williams-Sonoma Inc.. (Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above captioned case is referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon to hear and resolve all pretrial matters, up to and including the resolution of case-dispositive motions, subject to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and any further Order of the Court; all subsequent filings in this action shall include the initials LPS-SRF after the case number. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/17/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00380-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit proposed Protective Order to January 24, 2013 - filed by Execware LLC, Kmart Corporation, Kmart.com LLC, Sears Brands LLC, Sears, Roebuck and Co., CVS Caremark Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Overstock.com Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA LLC, Dillard's Inc., Home Depot Inc., Home Depot USA Inc., Homer TLC Inc., Staples Inc., Hyatt Corporation, Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Target Brands Inc., Target Corporation, Williams-Sonoma Inc.. (Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA LLC (Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC to Serve Initial Disclosures Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) to 1/4/2013 - filed by Execware LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA LLC. (Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF EXECWARE, LLCS INITIAL DISCLOSURES; (2) EXECWARE, LLCS DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO SECTION 4(a) OF THE DELAWARE DEFAULT STANDARD FOR DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION; and (3) this NOTICE OF SERVICE by Execware LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for parties to submit a proposed Protective Order to January 10, 2013 - filed by Execware LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER Counsel shall provide an email to Judge Thynge on or before 12/13/12 as discussed during the 12/6/12 teleconference. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/6/2012. (cak) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for Execware to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 12/6/2012 at 10:30 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/26/2012. (cak) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 5/21/2013. Amended Pleadings due by 5/21/2013. Discovery due by 1/15/2014. Status Report due by 9/11/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 8/28/2014. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 7/31/2013. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 9/4/2013. A Markman Hearing is set for 10/3/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark.. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/21/2012. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-00836-LPS-SRF et al.(rpg) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                PROPOSED ORDER /Final Scheduling Order by Execware LLC. (Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Rule 16 scheduling teleconference has been scheduled for November 14, 2012 at 9:45 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. No further submissions are needed. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/7/12. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-00836-LPS-SRF et al.(ntl) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                    PROPOSED ORDER /[Proposesd] Scheduling Order by Execware LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF EXECWARE, LLC'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT WAL-MART STORES, INC.; (2) PLAINTIFF EXECWARE, LLC'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT WAL-MART.COM USA LLC; (3) PLAINTIFF EXECWARE, LLC'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS WAL-MART STORES, INC.; (4) PLAINTIFF EXECWARE, LLC'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS WAL-MART.COM USA LLC; and (5) this NOTICE OF SERVICE by Execware LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                        Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Rule 16 Scheduling Order to October 31, 2012 - filed by Execware LLC, Kmart Corporation, Kmart.com LLC, Sears Brands LLC, Sears, Roebuck and Co., CVS Caremark Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Overstock.com Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA LLC, Dillard's Inc., Home Depot Inc., Home Depot USA Inc., Homer TLC Inc., Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Staples Inc., Hyatt Corporation, Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Target Brands Inc., Target Corporation, Williams-Sonoma Inc.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Deepali Brahmbhatt - filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letters regarding scheduling (see, e.g., C.A. No. 11-836-LPS-SRF D.I. 111, 112, 113), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Order previously entered in C.A. No. 11-836-LPS-SRF is VACATED and all deadlines in it are CANCELLED. "Good cause" to modify the current schedule is established by Plaintiff's subsequent filing of multiple related cases alleging infringement of the same patent-in-suit. To the extent there is any prejudice to Plaintiff, it is substantially outweighed by the efficiencies to be achieved -- for the Court and the parties -- by entry of a coordinated schedule, which will include a single Markman hearing in which all Defendants may participate in a coordinated fashion. The parties in all of the related cases shall meet and confer and submit a proposed, coordinated Scheduling Order to the Court no later than October 24, 2012. The Court will determine thereafter whether to conduct a teleconference to further address the details of the coordinated Scheduling Order. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/10/12. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-00836-LPS-SRF et al. (ntl) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
                                              Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard D. Kirk, Esq. regarding Claim Construction Briefing schedule. (Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Julia Heaney regarding Case Management - re (16 in 1:12-cv-00561-LPS, 19 in 1:12-cv-00380-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-00384-LPS, 18 in 1:12-cv-00558-LPS, 17 in 1:12-cv-00556-LPS, 13 in 1:12-cv-00559-LPS, 14 in 1:12-cv-00562-LPS, 20 in 1:12-cv-00383-LPS, 21 in 1:12-cv-00382-LPS, 112 in 1:11-cv-00836-LPS-SRF, 17 in 1:12-cv-00557-LPS) Letter, (16 in 1:12-cv-00556-LPS, 18 in 1:12-cv-00380-LPS, 19 in 1:12-cv-00383-LPS, 20 in 1:12-cv-00382-LPS, 12 in 1:12-cv-00559-LPS, 111 in 1:11-cv-00836-LPS-SRF, 17 in 1:12-cv-00558-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-00561-LPS, 13 in 1:12-cv-00562-LPS, 16 in 1:12-cv-00557-LPS) Letter, (14 in 1:12-cv-00384-LPS) Letter. (Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Victor de Gyarfas as co-counsel. Reason for request: Change of Firm Affiliation of Laura L. Chapman. (Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Affiliation and Address for Co-Counsel Laura L. Chapman by Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA LLC (Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                      Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stephen B. Brauerman, Esquire regarding the Court's September 21, 2012 Order Regarding Case Management - re (19 in 1:12-cv-00382-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-00556-LPS, 18 in 1:12-cv-00383-LPS, 109 in 1:11-cv-00836-LPS-SRF, 16 in 1:12-cv-00558-LPS, 12 in 1:12-cv-00562-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-00557-LPS, 11 in 1:12-cv-00559-LPS, 17 in 1:12-cv-00380-LPS, 14 in 1:12-cv-00561-LPS, 13 in 1:12-cv-00384-LPS) Order,,,,. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Gregory B. Williams regarding Walmart's Preference as to Scheduling as per Court's Order of September 21, 2012. (Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORAL ORDER by Judge Leonard P. Stark: Having reviewed the joint status report filed at D.I. 103 in C.A. No. 11-836-LPS-SRF, as well as the September 11, 2012 letter from Defendants in that action (D.I. 106) and from Defendants in related C.A. Nos. 12-380-LPS, 12-382-LPS, 12-383-LPS, 12-556-LPS, and 12-557-LPS, the Court has determined that it will likely either vacate the scheduling order entered in C.A. No. 11-836-LPS-SRF and enter a revised scheduling order to permit all of these related actions to proceed according to the same schedule, or retain the current schedule in C.A. No. 11-836-LPS-SRF and stay the remaining related cases until after the Court enters its claim construction ruling. All parties are directed to submit to the Court, no later than September 28, 2012, letters advising the Court as to their preference as to how these cases should proceed. Thereafter, if necessary, the Court will schedule a teleconference to discuss these issue with counsel. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-00836-LPS-SRF et al.(rpg) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Bruce D. Kuyper as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. (Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Wal-Mart.com USA LLC. (Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA LLC.(Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura L. Chapman and Attorney Victor de Gyarfas - filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint - filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA LLC. (Williams, Gregory) Modified on 4/18/2012 (rbe). (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Execware LLC. Wal-Mart Stores Inc. served on 3/27/2012, answer due 4/17/2012. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Execware LLC. Wal-Mart.com USA LLC served on 3/27/2012, answer due 4/17/2012. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc A. Fenster, Bruce D. Kuyper, and Fredricka Ung of Russ, August, & Kabat - filed by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Marc A. Fenster, # 2 Certification of Bruce D. Kuyper, # 3 Certification of Fredricka Ung)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,216,139;. (Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (lih) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1045569.) - filed by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lih) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 130 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?