Execware LLC v. Homer TLC Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00382
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 5, 2016 at 5:25 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Execware, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Bayard, PA

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/01/2012, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D Kuyper +1 213 891 8001 +1 213 891 8763 bruce.kuyper@lw.com

Represented by Russ August & Kabat

The Home Depot, Inc. The Home Depot, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Home Depot Inc."
Home Depot USA, Inc. Home Depot USA, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Homer Tlc, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
The Home Depot, Inc. The Home Depot, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Home Depot Inc."
Home Depot USA, Inc. Home Depot USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Homer Tlc, Inc., Defendant

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Heaney +1 302 658 9200 jhefiling@mnat.com
No Logo Execware, LLC, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,216,139. (ntl) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Execware LLC, Home Depot Inc., Home Depot USA Inc., Homer TLC Inc.. (Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Core Technical Documents pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the District of Delaware's Default Standard for Discovery by Home Depot Inc., Home Depot USA Inc., Homer TLC Inc..(Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
          Joint PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order by Execware LLC, Kmart Corporation, Kmart.com LLC, Sears Brands LLC, Sears, Roebuck and Co., CVS Caremark Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Overstock.com Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA LLC, Dillard's Inc., Home Depot Inc., Home Depot USA Inc., Homer TLC Inc., Staples Inc., Hyatt Corporation, Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Target Brands Inc., Target Corporation, Williams-Sonoma Inc.. (Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above captioned case is referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon to hear and resolve all pretrial matters, up to and including the resolution of case-dispositive motions, subject to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and any further Order of the Court; all subsequent filings in this action shall include the initials LPS-SRF after the case number. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/17/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00380-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit proposed Protective Order to January 24, 2013 - filed by Execware LLC, Kmart Corporation, Kmart.com LLC, Sears Brands LLC, Sears, Roebuck and Co., CVS Caremark Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Overstock.com Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA LLC, Dillard's Inc., Home Depot Inc., Home Depot USA Inc., Homer TLC Inc., Staples Inc., Hyatt Corporation, Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Target Brands Inc., Target Corporation, Williams-Sonoma Inc.. (Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Defendants Homer TLC, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. and The Home Depot, Inc. by Home Depot Inc., Home Depot USA Inc., Homer TLC Inc..(Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Defendants to serve their Initial Disclosures to January 4, 2013 - filed by Hyatt Corporation, Hyatt Hotels Corporation, CVS Caremark Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Target Brands Inc., Target Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Williams-Sonoma Inc., Dillard's Inc., Home Depot Inc., Home Depot USA Inc., Homer TLC Inc.. (Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF EXECWARE, LLCS INITIAL DISCLOSURES; (2) EXECWARE, LLCS DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO SECTION 4(a) OF THE DELAWARE DEFAULT STANDARD FOR DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION; and (3) this NOTICE OF SERVICE by Execware LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for parties to submit a proposed Protective Order to January 10, 2013 - filed by Execware LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER Counsel shall provide an email to Judge Thynge on or before 12/13/12 as discussed during the 12/6/12 teleconference. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/6/2012. (cak) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiff Execware, LLC's First Set of Requests For Production to Defendants Homer TLC, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., and The Home Depot, Inc., and (2) Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiff Execware, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories by Home Depot Inc., Home Depot USA Inc., Homer TLC Inc..(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for Execware to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 12/6/2012 at 10:30 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/26/2012. (cak) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 5/21/2013. Amended Pleadings due by 5/21/2013. Discovery due by 1/15/2014. Status Report due by 9/11/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 8/28/2014. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 7/31/2013. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 9/4/2013. A Markman Hearing is set for 10/3/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark.. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/21/2012. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-00836-LPS-SRF et al.(rpg) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                PROPOSED ORDER /Final Scheduling Order by Execware LLC. (Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Rule 16 scheduling teleconference has been scheduled for November 14, 2012 at 9:45 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. No further submissions are needed. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/7/12. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-00836-LPS-SRF et al.(ntl) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                    PROPOSED ORDER /[Proposesd] Scheduling Order by Execware LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF EXECWARE, LLC'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT HOMER TLC, INC.; (2) PLAINTIFF EXECWARE, LLC'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.; (3) PLAINTIFF EXECWARE, LLC'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT THE HOME DEPOT, INC.; (4) PLAINTIFF EXECWARE, LLC'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT HOMER TLC, INC.; (5) PLAINTIFF EXECWARE, LLC'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.; (6) PLAINTIFF EXECWARE, LLC'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT THE HOME DEPOT, INC.; and (7) this NOTICE OF SERVICE by Execware LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                        Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Rule 16 Scheduling Order to October 31, 2012 - filed by Execware LLC, Kmart Corporation, Kmart.com LLC, Sears Brands LLC, Sears, Roebuck and Co., CVS Caremark Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Overstock.com Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA LLC, Dillard's Inc., Home Depot Inc., Home Depot USA Inc., Homer TLC Inc., Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Staples Inc., Hyatt Corporation, Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Target Brands Inc., Target Corporation, Williams-Sonoma Inc.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearances of Denise S. Kraft, Aleine M. Porterfield, Brian A. Biggs, Nicholas G. Papastavros, and Melissa G. Reinckens by Home Depot Inc., Home Depot USA Inc., Homer TLC Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letters regarding scheduling (see, e.g., C.A. No. 11-836-LPS-SRF D.I. 111, 112, 113), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Order previously entered in C.A. No. 11-836-LPS-SRF is VACATED and all deadlines in it are CANCELLED. "Good cause" to modify the current schedule is established by Plaintiff's subsequent filing of multiple related cases alleging infringement of the same patent-in-suit. To the extent there is any prejudice to Plaintiff, it is substantially outweighed by the efficiencies to be achieved -- for the Court and the parties -- by entry of a coordinated schedule, which will include a single Markman hearing in which all Defendants may participate in a coordinated fashion. The parties in all of the related cases shall meet and confer and submit a proposed, coordinated Scheduling Order to the Court no later than October 24, 2012. The Court will determine thereafter whether to conduct a teleconference to further address the details of the coordinated Scheduling Order. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/10/12. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-00836-LPS-SRF et al. (ntl) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
                                              Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard D. Kirk, Esq. regarding Claim Construction Briefing schedule. (Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Julia Heaney regarding Case Management - re (16 in 1:12-cv-00561-LPS, 19 in 1:12-cv-00380-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-00384-LPS, 18 in 1:12-cv-00558-LPS, 17 in 1:12-cv-00556-LPS, 13 in 1:12-cv-00559-LPS, 14 in 1:12-cv-00562-LPS, 20 in 1:12-cv-00383-LPS, 21 in 1:12-cv-00382-LPS, 112 in 1:11-cv-00836-LPS-SRF, 17 in 1:12-cv-00557-LPS) Letter, (16 in 1:12-cv-00556-LPS, 18 in 1:12-cv-00380-LPS, 19 in 1:12-cv-00383-LPS, 20 in 1:12-cv-00382-LPS, 12 in 1:12-cv-00559-LPS, 111 in 1:11-cv-00836-LPS-SRF, 17 in 1:12-cv-00558-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-00561-LPS, 13 in 1:12-cv-00562-LPS, 16 in 1:12-cv-00557-LPS) Letter, (14 in 1:12-cv-00384-LPS) Letter. (Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                  Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stephen B. Brauerman, Esquire regarding the Court's September 21, 2012 Order Regarding Case Management - re (19 in 1:12-cv-00382-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-00556-LPS, 18 in 1:12-cv-00383-LPS, 109 in 1:11-cv-00836-LPS-SRF, 16 in 1:12-cv-00558-LPS, 12 in 1:12-cv-00562-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-00557-LPS, 11 in 1:12-cv-00559-LPS, 17 in 1:12-cv-00380-LPS, 14 in 1:12-cv-00561-LPS, 13 in 1:12-cv-00384-LPS) Order,,,,. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                    Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Julia Heaney regarding Regarding the Court's September 21, 2012 Oral Order - re (12 in 1:12-cv-00562-LPS) Order,,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORAL ORDER by Judge Leonard P. Stark: Having reviewed the joint status report filed at D.I. 103 in C.A. No. 11-836-LPS-SRF, as well as the September 11, 2012 letter from Defendants in that action (D.I. 106) and from Defendants in related C.A. Nos. 12-380-LPS, 12-382-LPS, 12-383-LPS, 12-556-LPS, and 12-557-LPS, the Court has determined that it will likely either vacate the scheduling order entered in C.A. No. 11-836-LPS-SRF and enter a revised scheduling order to permit all of these related actions to proceed according to the same schedule, or retain the current schedule in C.A. No. 11-836-LPS-SRF and stay the remaining related cases until after the Court enters its claim construction ruling. All parties are directed to submit to the Court, no later than September 28, 2012, letters advising the Court as to their preference as to how these cases should proceed. Thereafter, if necessary, the Court will schedule a teleconference to discuss these issue with counsel. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-00836-LPS-SRF et al.(rpg) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Julia Heaney regarding Alignment of Execware Cases. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Status Report)(Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Broderick, Karen Johnson-McKewan and Christina Von der Ahe - filed by Home Depot Inc., Home Depot USA Inc., Homer TLC Inc.. (Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Heaney on behalf of Home Depot Inc., Home Depot USA Inc., Homer TLC Inc. (Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Bruce D. Kuyper as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. (Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Biggs on behalf of Home Depot Inc., Home Depot USA Inc., Homer TLC Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Biggs, Brian) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  ANSWER to 10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim /Plaintiff Execware, LLC's Answer to Defendants Homer TLC, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. and The Home Depot, Inc.'s Counterclaims by Execware LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nick Papastavros and Melissa A. Reinckens - filed by Home Depot Inc., Home Depot USA Inc., Homer TLC Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Nick Papastavros, # 2 Certification of Melissa A. Reinckens, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Home Depot Inc., Home Depot USA Inc., Homer TLC Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand ,Additional Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Execware LLC by Home Depot USA Inc., Home Depot Inc., Homer TLC Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Aleine Michelle Porterfield on behalf of Home Depot Inc., Home Depot USA Inc., Homer TLC Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Porterfield, Aleine) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to May 17, 2012 - filed by Home Depot Inc., Home Depot USA Inc., Homer TLC Inc.. (Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Execware LLC. Home Depot USA Inc. served on 3/27/2012, answer due 4/17/2012. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Execware LLC. Homer TLC Inc. served on 3/27/2012, answer due 4/17/2012. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Execware LLC. Home Depot Inc. served on 3/27/2012, answer due 4/17/2012. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc A. Fenster, Bruce D. Kuyper, and Fredricka Ung of Russ, August & Kabat - filed by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Marc A. Fenster, # 2 Certification of Bruce D. Kuyper, # 3 Certification of Fredricka Ung)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,216,139;. (Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (lih) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Home Depot Inc., Home Depot USA Inc., Homer TLC Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1045566.) - filed by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lih) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 143 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?