McRo Inc. v. LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-01512
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 2:52 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Farnan LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent Filardo +1 212 612 3265 +1 212 612 3297 Vincent.Filardo@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
v.
No Logo LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Defendant

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan N. Budaj +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 evan.budaj@weil.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Morteza Lee +1 650 802 3211 +1 650 802 3100 justin.m.lee@weil.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonal N. Mehta sonal.mehta@weil.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
Remark : acknowledgement of receipt of transfer case. (rwc) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/30/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01508-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01511-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01512-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01518-LPS-CJB(rpg) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
      Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark and The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Brian E. Farnan regarding Motions to Transfer. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending GRANTING D.I. (23 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Activision Blizzard Inc., (23 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc., (23 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Infinity Ward Inc., (23 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 12/30/2013. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/13/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01508-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01511-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01512-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01518-LPS-CJB(mlc) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
          DECLARATION re (32 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS-CJB) Reply Brief, (32 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS-CJB) Reply Brief, (32 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS-CJB) Reply Brief, (32 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS-CJB) Reply Brief by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A and B)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
            REPLY BRIEF re 23 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
              DECLARATION re 30 Answering Brief in Opposition of Eric Berger by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/26/2013. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above captioned case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pretrial matters, up to and including the resolution of case-dispositive motions, subject to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and any further Order of the Court; all subsequent filings in this action shall include the initials LPS-CJB after the case number. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/31/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01508-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                    DECLARATION re (23 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California -- Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta -- by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., McRo Inc., Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B (part 1), # 2 Exhibit B (part 2), # 3 Exhibit C - G, # 4 Exhibit H & J, # 5 Exhibit K & O (part 1), # 6 Exhibit O (part 2), # 7 Exhibit O (part 2) & P)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                      DECLARATION re (23 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California -- Declaration of Douglas L. Reilly -- by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                        DECLARATION re (23 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California -- Declaration of Omer Salik -- by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION re (23 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California -- Declaration of Wayne M. Smith -- by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                            OPENING BRIEF in Support re 23 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2013. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Main Document 24 replaced on 8/1/2013) (ntl). (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                              MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California - filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                  DECLARATION re 20 Reply Brief Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                    REPLY BRIEF re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                      ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/15/2013. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                        DECLARATION re (16 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint, (16 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint, (16 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint, (16 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint of Sonal N. Mehta by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A through C)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                          OPENING BRIEF in Support re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/4/2013. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint - filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                              REPLY BRIEF re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                First AMENDED COMPLAINT against LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC- filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                  ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/4/2013. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                    DECLARATION re (10 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (10 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (10 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (10 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta -- by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                      OPENING BRIEF in Support re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/22/2013. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lucasfilm Entertainment Company Ltd. LLC for LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward R. Reines, Sonal N. Mehta, Justin M. Lee and Evan N. Budaj - filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 4, 2013 - filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, McRo Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vincent Filardo, Jr. and Mark Raskin - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT to JANUARY 28, 2013 - filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, McRo Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by McRo Inc.. LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC served on 11/27/2012, answer due 12/18/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,307,576 B1; US 6,611,278 B2;. (dzb, ) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzb, ) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1177510.) - filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dzb, ) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 89 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?