McRo Inc. v. Sucker Punch Productions LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-01515
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 2:06 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Farnan LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent Filardo +1 212 612 3265 +1 212 612 3297 Vincent.Filardo@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
v.
No Logo Sucker Punch Productions, L.l.c., Defendant

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert F Harris, III +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 afharris@shb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lynn C. Herndon lherndon@shb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beth A Larigan +1 816 559 2459 blarigan@shb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Basil Trent Webb +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan N. Zerger +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 IPlitigation@shb.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
Remark : Acknowledgment of receipt of transfer case. (rwc) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting (20) Motion to Transfer Case in case 1:12-cv-01514-LPS-CJB; granting (20) Motion to Transfer Case in case 1:12-cv-01515-LPS-CJB. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/30/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01514-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01515-LPS-CJB(rpg) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Transfer by McRo Inc. re 26 Answering Brief in Opposition (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
        Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark and The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Brian E. Farnan regarding Motions to Transfer. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above captioned case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pretrial matters, up to and including the resolution of case-dispositive motions, subject to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and any further Order of the Court; all subsequent filings in this action shall include the initials LPS-CJB after the case number. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/31/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01508-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
              DECLARATION re 30 Reply Brief -- Declaration of Lynn C. Herndon -- by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                REPLY BRIEF re 23 MOTION to Stay re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                  REPLY BRIEF re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                      ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Stay re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/23/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                        DECLARATION re 26 Answering Brief in Opposition of Eric Berger by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                          ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/23/2013. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                            DECLARATION re 23 MOTION to Stay re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California of Sally Buchanan by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                              OPENING BRIEF in Support re 23 MOTION to Stay re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/13/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 and 2)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Stay re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California - filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                  DECLARATION re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California of Lynn C. Herndon by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 through 13)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                    OPENING BRIEF in Support re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/13/2013. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                      MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California - filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                        REPLY BRIEF re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                          ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/15/2013. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lynn C. Herndon of SHOOK, HARDY & BACON LLP - filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                              OPENING BRIEF in Support re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/4/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                  REPLY BRIEF re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                    First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sucker Punch Productions LLC- filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                      ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/4/2013. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC for Sucker Punch Productions LLC.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                          OPENING BRIEF in Support re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/22/2013. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney B. Trent Webb, Jonathan N. Zerger, Beth A. Larigan and Albert F. Harris - filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 2/4/2013 - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vincent Filardo, Jr. and Mark Raskin - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to Respond to Complaint to January 28, 2013 - filed by McRo Inc., Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by McRo Inc.. Sucker Punch Productions LLC served on 11/27/2012, answer due 12/18/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,307,576 B1; US 6,611,278 B2;. (dzb, ) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzb, ) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Sucker Punch Productions LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1177521.) - filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dzb, ) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Space Space

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 106 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?