McRo Inc. v. Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-01514
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 2:06 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Farnan LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent Filardo +1 212 612 3265 +1 212 612 3297 Vincent.Filardo@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
v.
No Logo SCE Santa Monica Studio Inc., Defendant
Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Defendant

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert F Harris, III +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 afharris@shb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lynn C. Herndon lherndon@shb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beth A Larigan +1 816 559 2459 blarigan@shb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Basil Trent Webb +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan N. Zerger +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 IPlitigation@shb.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
Remark : acknowledgement of receipt of transfer case. (rwc) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting (20) Motion to Transfer Case in case 1:12-cv-01514-LPS-CJB; granting (20) Motion to Transfer Case in case 1:12-cv-01515-LPS-CJB. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/30/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01514-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01515-LPS-CJB(rpg) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Transfer by McRo Inc. re 26 Answering Brief in Opposition (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
        Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark and The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Brian E. Farnan regarding Motions to Transfer. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above captioned case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pretrial matters, up to and including the resolution of case-dispositive motions, subject to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and any further Order of the Court; all subsequent filings in this action shall include the initials LPS-CJB after the case number. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/31/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01508-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
              DECLARATION re 30 Reply Brief -- Declaration of Lynn C. Herndon -- by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                REPLY BRIEF re 24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Its Motion to Transfer filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                  REPLY BRIEF re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                      ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Its Motion to Transfer filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/23/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                        DECLARATION re 26 Answering Brief in Opposition of Eric Berger by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                          ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/23/2013. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                            OPENING BRIEF in Support re 24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Its Motion to Transfer filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/13/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                              MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Its Motion to Transfer - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                DECLARATION re 21 Opening Brief in Support, 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California -- Declaration of Lynn C. Herndon -- by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-12)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                  DECLARATION re 21 Opening Brief in Support, 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California -- Declaration of Sally Buchanan -- by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                    OPENING BRIEF in Support re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/13/2013. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                      MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                        REPLY BRIEF re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                          ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/15/2013. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lynn C. Herndon of SHOOK, HARDY & BACON LLP - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                              OPENING BRIEF in Support re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/4/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                  REPLY BRIEF re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                    First AMENDED COMPLAINT against SCE Santa Monica Studio Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC- filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                      ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/4/2013. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sony Corporation for Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                          OPENING BRIEF in Support re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/22/2013. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney B. Trent Webb, Jonathan N. Zerger, Beth A. Larigan and Albert F. Harris - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 2/4/2013 - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vincent Filardo, Jr. and Mark Raskin - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR THE DEFENDANTS TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT to JANUARY 28, 2013 - filed by McRo Inc., SCE Santa Monica Studio Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,307,576 B1; US 6,611,278 B2;. (dzb, ) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzb, ) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against SCE Santa Monica Studio Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1177518.) - filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dzb, ) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 147 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?