McRo Inc. v. Harmonix Music Systems Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-01510
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 12:26 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Farnan LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent Filardo +1 212 612 3265 +1 212 612 3297 Vincent.Filardo@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
v.
No Logo Harmonix Music Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick J. Coyne +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 patrick.coyne@finnegan.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher S. Schultz +1 617 452 1623 +1 617 452 1666 christopher.schultz@finnegan.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda Jean Thayer +1 650 849 6621 +1 650 849 6666 linda.thayer@finnegan.com

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (67) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORAL ORDER: Due to the stay in these cases, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the pretrial conference and jury trial are CANCELLED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/23/15. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01509-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01510-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB (ntl) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    Official Transcript of Status Conference held on November 10, 2014 before Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke. Court Reporter Ellie Corbett Hannum, Telephone (302) 571-0510. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/15/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Petrsoric - filed by McRo Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
        STIPULATION to Stay by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
          Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Brian E. Farnan regarding Case Status. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None
            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Joint Claim Construction Chart to October 16, 2014 - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for parties to submit a Joint Claim Construction Chart to October 2, 2014 - filed by 2K Games Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software Inc., Rockstar Games Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Bethesda Softworks LLC. (Biggs, Brian) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 5-21) to McRo, Inc., d.b.a. Planet Blue filed by Harmonix Music Systems Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the Deadline for Joinder of other Parties and Amendment of the Pleadings to 9/17/2014 - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on August 6, 2014 before Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/15/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/25/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2014.((bpg) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None
                      STIPULATION Setting Briefing Schedule for Summary Judgment Motion by 2K Games Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software Inc., Rockstar Games Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Bethesda Softworks LLC. (Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production to Defendants Bethesda and Harmonix filed by Harmonix Music Systems Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric Berger - filed by McRo Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None
                            Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to Defendants' August 1, 2014 Letter - re (53 in 1:12-cv-01510-LPS-CJB) Letter, (65 in 1:12-cv-01509-LPS-CJB) Letter. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None
                              Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Rodger D. Smith II regarding discovery issues. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for substantial completion of document production to August 13, 2014 - filed by 2K Games Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software Inc., Rockstar Games Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Bethesda Softworks LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                  Joint STATUS REPORT by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Harmonix Music Systems Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit the Interim Status Report to 7/28/2014 - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER: (a) The Court will permit Defendants to file the proposed motion prior to the current case dispositive motion deadline, but the Court will hear argument on the motion at the same time as the Markman hearing scheduled in these cases, that is, at the hearing scheduled for 8:30a.m. on December 5,2014. (D.I. 30 at § 12)(b) The parties shall, by joint letter and/or stipulation filed no later than August 11, 2014, propose a briefing schedule regarding the proposed motion--one that will permit the motion to be argued at the December 5, 2014 hearing date referenced above. Briefing on the motion should be completed by no later than November 14, 2014. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/18/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01509-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01510-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB(dlk) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                          Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Rodger D. Smith II regarding joinder by Harmonix in counsel's request for oral argument on defendants' request for leave to file an early case dispositive motion - re 44 Letter. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production to Defendants Bethesda and Harmonix filed by McRo Inc..(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                              Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to Defendants' Request for Leave to File an Early Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity under Section 101 - re (44 in 1:12-cv-01510-LPS-CJB) Letter, (57 in 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB) Letter, (55 in 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB) Letter, (54 in 1:12-cv-01509-LPS-CJB) Letter, (56 in 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB) Letter. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Meghan Dougherty regarding Defendants' request for leave to file an early motion for summary judgment of invalidity under Section 101. (Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Pretrial Conference is hereby re-scheduled for August 7, 2015 beginning at 9:00 a.m. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/23/14. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01509-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01510-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB (ntl) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendants Bethesda and Harmonix filed by Harmonix Music Systems Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Denial of Petitions for Inter Partes Review by McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiff Planet Blue's Objections and Response to Defendant Harmonix Music Systems, Inc. First Set of Interrogatories Nos. 1-4 and (ii) Plaintiff Planet Blue's Objections and Responses to Defendant Harmonix Music Systems, Inc. First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things Nos. 1-46 filed by McRo Inc..(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants Bethesda and Harmonix; and (2) Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production to Defendants Bethesda and Harmonix filed by Harmonix Music Systems Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendants Bethesda and Harmonix filed by McRo Inc..(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING (23 in 1:12-cv-01509-LPS-CJB and related cases) MOTION to Stay in View of Inter Partes Review and California Cases filed by 2K Games Inc., Rockstar Games Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Bethesda Softworks LLC, Take-Two Interactive Software Inc.. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/1/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01509-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01510-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB(dlk) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to OC3 Entertainment filed by McRo Inc..(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) First Set of Interrogatories to McRo, Inc. d.b.a. Planet Blue (Nos. 1-4); and (2) First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to McRo, Inc. d.b.a. Planet Blue (Nos. 1-46) filed by Harmonix Music Systems Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production to Defendants Bethesda and Harmonix and (ii) Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants Bethesda and Harmonix filed by McRo Inc..(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Core Technical Documents Pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Harmonix Music Systems Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 4/14/2014 at 11:45 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/6/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01509-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01510-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB(dlk) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          STATEMENT re (40 in 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB, 29 in 1:12-cv-01510-LPS-CJB, 37 in 1:12-cv-01509-LPS-CJB, 39 in 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB, 38 in 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB) Notice (Other) -- Defendants' Statement in Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Subsequent Proceedings in Support of its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay in View of Inter Partes Review and California Cases -- by 2K Games Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software Inc., Rockstar Games Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Bethesda Softworks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Harmonix Music Systems, Inc.'s First Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures; and (2) Harmonix Music Systems, Inc.'s Identification of Custodians, Non-Custodial Data Sources and Other Discovery Issues filed by Harmonix Music Systems Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Subsequent Proceedings in California Cases by McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                REPLY BRIEF re 15 MOTION to Stay in View of Inter Partes Review and California Cases filed by Harmonix Music Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 4-10)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Protective Order by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Statement filed by McRo Inc..(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Harmonix Music Systems, Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Harmonix Music Systems Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on January 24, 2014 before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Court Reporter Taneha Carroll of Hawkins Reporting, Telephone (302) 658-6697. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/25/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2014. (bpg) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          DECLARATION re (33 in 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB) Answering Brief in Opposition, of Eric Berger by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Stay in View of Inter Partes Review and California Cases filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/13/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the deadline to submit proposed Protective Order to 2/10/2014 - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER, Setting Scheduling Order Deadlines Status Report due by 7/24/2014. Joinder of Parties due by 8/28/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 8/28/2014. Discovery due by 11/20/2014. Tutorial on the technology due by 10/16/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 4/2/2015. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 10/16/2014. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 11/5/2014. A Markman Hearing is set for 12/5/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke. A Pretrial Conference is set for 8/7/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/23/2015. A Jury Trial is set for 8/17/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 01/24/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01509-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01510-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB(mlc) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Meghan Dougherty regarding Defendants' positions on parties' scheduling order disputes. (Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Brian E. Farnan regarding Proposed Scheduling Order. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        OPENING BRIEF in Support re 15 MOTION to Stay in View of Inter Partes Review and California Cases filed by Harmonix Music Systems Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 through 3)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay in View of Inter Partes Review and California Cases - filed by 2K Games Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software Inc., Rockstar Games Inc., Bethesda Softworks LLC, Harmonix Music Systems Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on October 7, 2013 before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/12/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/22/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2014. (bpg) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Joint Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Denise S. Kraft regarding Court's Order Regarding Draft Scheduling Orders - re Order Setting Scheduling Conference,,,,. (Kraft, Denise) (Main Document 13 replaced on 10/3/2013) (cla, ). (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Brian E. Farnan regarding Plaintiff's Position on Proposed Scheduling Order - re (11 in 1:12-cv-01510-LPS-CJB) Proposed Order. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Joint PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above captioned case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pretrial matters, up to and including the resolution of case-dispositive motions, subject to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and any further Order of the Court; all subsequent filings in this action shall include the initials LPS-CJB after the case number. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/31/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01508-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Harmonix Music Systems Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Harmonix Music Systems Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick J. Coyne, Linda J. Thayer and Christopher S. Schultz - filed by Harmonix Music Systems Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vincent Filardo, Jr. and Mark Raskin - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 28, 2013 - filed by Harmonix Music Systems Inc., McRo Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by McRo Inc.. Harmonix Music Systems Inc. served on 11/27/2012, answer due 12/18/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,307,576 B1; US 6,611,278 B2;. (dzb, ) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzb, ) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Harmonix Music Systems Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1177498.) - filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dzb, ) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                        Space Space

                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 113 times.

                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?