McRo Inc. v. Activision Blizzard Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-01508
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 2:50 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Farnan LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent Filardo +1 212 612 3265 +1 212 612 3297 Vincent.Filardo@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
v.
No Logo Activision Blizzard, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan N. Budaj +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 evan.budaj@weil.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Morteza Lee +1 650 802 3211 +1 650 802 3100 justin.m.lee@weil.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonal N. Mehta sonal.mehta@weil.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
Remark : Acknowledgment of receipt of transfer case. (rwc) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 36 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/30/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01508-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01511-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01512-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01518-LPS-CJB(rpg)
      LREF
      Blank 36 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/30/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01508-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01511-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01512-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01518-LPS-CJB(rpg) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
        Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark and The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Brian E. Farnan regarding Motions to Transfer. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 34 Filed: 12/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending GRANTING D.I. (23 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Activision Blizzard Inc., (23 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS-CJ B) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc., (23 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Co urt for the Central District of California filed by Infinity Ward Inc., (23 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company L LC. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No furth er briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 12/30/2013. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/13/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01508-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01511-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01512-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01518-LPS-CJB(mlc)
            LREF
            Blank 34 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending GRANTING D.I. (23 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Activision Blizzard Inc., (23 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc., (23 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Infinity Ward Inc., (23 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 12/30/2013. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/13/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01508-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01511-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01512-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01518-LPS-CJB(mlc) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
              DECLARATION re (32 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS-CJB) Reply Brief, (32 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS-CJB) Reply Brief, (32 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS-CJB) Reply Brief, (32 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS-CJB) Reply Brief by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A and B)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                REPLY BRIEF re 23 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Activision Blizzard Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                  DECLARATION re 30 Answering Brief in Opposition of Eric Berger by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                    ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/26/2013. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above captioned case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pretrial matters, up to and including the resolution of case-dispositive motions, subject to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and any further Order of the Court; all subsequent filings in this action shall include the initials LPS-CJB after the case number. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/31/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01508-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                        DECLARATION re (23 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California -- Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta -- by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., McRo Inc., Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B (part 1), # 2 Exhibit B (part 2), # 3 Exhibit C - G, # 4 Exhibit H & J, # 5 Exhibit K & O (part 1), # 6 Exhibit O (part 2), # 7 Exhibit O (part 2) & P)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION re (23 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California -- Declaration of Douglas L. Reilly -- by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                            DECLARATION re (23 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California -- Declaration of Omer Salik -- by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                              DECLARATION re (23 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California -- Declaration of Wayne M. Smith -- by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                OPENING BRIEF in Support re 23 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Activision Blizzard Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2013. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Main Document 24 replaced on 8/1/2013) (ntl). (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California - filed by Activision Blizzard Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                      DECLARATION re 20 Reply Brief Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta by Activision Blizzard Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                        REPLY BRIEF re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint, 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Activision Blizzard Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                          ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/15/2013. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                            DECLARATION re (16 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint, (16 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint, (16 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint, (16 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint of Sonal N. Mehta by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A through C)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                              OPENING BRIEF in Support re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint filed by Activision Blizzard Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/4/2013. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint - filed by Activision Blizzard Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                  REPLY BRIEF re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Activision Blizzard Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                    First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Activision Blizzard Inc.- filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                      ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/4/2013. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                        DECLARATION re (10 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (10 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (10 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (10 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta -- by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                          OPENING BRIEF in Support re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Activision Blizzard Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/22/2013. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Activision Blizzard Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Activision Blizzard Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Activision Blizzard Inc... (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward R. Reines, Sonal N. Mehta, Justin M. Lee and Evan N. Budaj - filed by Activision Blizzard Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 4, 2013 - filed by Activision Blizzard Inc., McRo Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vincent Filardo, Jr. and Mark Raskin - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to January 28, 2013 - filed by Activision Blizzard Inc., McRo Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,307,576 B1; US 6,611,278 B2;. (dzb, ) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzb, ) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Activision Blizzard Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1177481.) - filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dzb, ) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 95 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?