Latorraca, et al v. Centennial Technologies Inc., et al
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. Unknown

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 18, 2016 at 2:30 AM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo All Plaintiffs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Abigail R. Romeo +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 aromeo@bermandevalerio.com
No Logo David Finkelstein, Plaintiff
No Logo Ronald Schwartz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Abraham, Fruchter & Twersky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack W. Fruchter +1 212 279 5050 +1 212 279 3655 jfruchter@aftlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John P. Gustafson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy F. Gans +1 781 235 2246 +1 781 239 0353 nlfgans@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pintar, Theodore J

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Bershad +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 dbershad@milberg.com
v.
No Logo Cabot Heritage Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Centennial Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Coopers & Lybrand, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas James Dougherty +1 617 573 4820 +1 617 573 4822 dougherty@skadden.com
Space Dennis M. Kelleher +1 617 573 4800 +1 617 573 4822
No Logo Donald R. Peck, Defendant
No Logo Emanuel Pinez, Defendant
No Logo J.P. Luc Beaubien, Defendant
No Logo James M. Murphy, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of John F. Cullen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John F. Cullen +1 617 242 4860 +1 617 242 7026
No Logo John J. McDonald, Defendant
No Logo John J. Shields, Defendant
No Logo Lawrence J. Ramaekers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence G. Campbell +1 313 223 3500 lcampbell@dickinsonwright.com
Space Thomas G. McNeil +1 313 223 3500

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith & Duggan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher A. Duggan +1 617 248 1900 +1 617 248 9320 Chris.Duggan@SmithDuggan.com
Space Matthew J. Walko +1 617 248 1900 +1 617 248 9320 MJWalko@SmithDuggan.com
No Logo Needham & Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Needham & Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Michael Saparoff +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 pmsaparoff@mintz.com
No Logo Robert Silva, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Kinch, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Collora LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Collora +1 617 371 1002 +1 617 371 1037 mcollora@dwyercollora.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John P. Gustafson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M. Osborne +1 781 462 1770 davidosbornelaw@gmail.com
No Logo William J. Shea, Defendant
No Logo William M. Kinch, Defendant
No Logo A. Uri Levy, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Bond D. Fletcher, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kagan Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Kagan +1 781 289 3417

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen F. Murray +1 781 289 3417 +1 781 289 3449 sfmurrayesq@hotmail.com
No Logo Jay Alix and Associates, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James M. Wodarski +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 JWodarski@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherin & Lodgen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Brown +1 617 646 2000 +1 617 646 2222 dabrown@sherin.com
Space Robert J. Muldoon, Jr. +1 617 646 2000 +1 617 646 2222 rjmuldoon@sherin.com
Lehman Brothers, Inc. Lehman Brothers, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
Unknown Role, Lehman Abs Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Boston University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Crystal D. Talley +1 617 353 2326 +1 617 353 5529 ctalley@bu.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Donovan, Jr. +1 617 951 7566 +1 617 951 7050 jdonovan@ropesgray.com
Space Mark P. Szpak +1 617 951 7606 +1 617 235 0215 Mark.Szpak@ropesgray.com
No Logo Media Jet, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Mediajet, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Presage Corp./BBC Computers, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuinn Hillsman & Palefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Albert F. Cullen, Jr. +1 617 268 2240 +1 617 268 2242 afcullen@aol.com
No Logo Suncrest Ltd., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Albert Shapiro, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Anatole Geiche, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Redlich +1 617 720 0900 +1 617 720 0987 general@redlichlaw.net
No Logo Anthony Kalioros, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Arnold Korelitz, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Barbara Ann Korns, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Barbara Strunk, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman Berman +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 nberman@bermanesq.com
No Logo Bill Tifft, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Carl Chaikin, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Charles Ferris, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Charles Philips, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Case Lombardi & Pettit

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew E Miller +2 025 875 0586 +1 202 789 1813 mmiller@cuneolaw.com
No Logo Charles Smith, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Christine Campanelli, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Clark Lagow, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Cliff Associates, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Craig Seger, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Curt Shuey, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo David E. Hill, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo David Komet, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo David M. Kerr, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo David Mann, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo David Waikus, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Dawn Luber, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Deborah Gruen, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Devereux Green Hill, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Don L. McGinnis, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Douglas W. Stone, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Dr. Elliot Cohen, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Dr. Larry L. Likover, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Dr. Patrick Peavy, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Dr. Robert Blashka, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Dr. Robert Boorstein, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Dr. Thomas Conrad, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Earl L. Mitchell, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Edward Campanelli, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle H. Blauner +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 mblauner@shulaw.com
No Logo Edward Meece, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Emerson Marsh, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Eugene Shapiro, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Felix Smolensky, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Freeman Family Partnership, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Gene Griffin, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Geoffrey Smith, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Glenn Falkowski, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Glenn, Scott, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Gordon Sokich, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Gordon Wong, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Harry Curry, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Henry W. Tooke, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Hermann Fasel, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Howard P. Schwartz, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Ines De Almeida, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Irving Gurak, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo James Aboud, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo James Meeker, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Janet Gustafson, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo JCT Design Enterprises, Inc., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Peter A Lagorio

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter A. Lagorio +1 617 367 4200 +1 617 227 3384 plagorio@conversent.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Sirota & Sirota, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Saul Roffe +1 609 791 7007 +1 609 896 9060 saul@sirotalaw.com
No Logo Jean Williams, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Jeffrey Bruno, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Jennifer L. Ellis, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Jessie B. Carnevale, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Jim Korth, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Jim Wahl, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Joan Firestone, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo John Cassetti, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo John Downward, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo John G. Lowe, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo John Landis, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo John M. Babington, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward F. Haber +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 ehaber@shulaw.com
Space THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
No Logo Jonathan Boms, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Joseph E. Rizk, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Judith A. Romano, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Kantial R. Patel, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Miller Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Murray Miller +1 602 266 8440
No Logo Karin Kerns, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Karl Bauknight, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Ken Kamins, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Laveta Marsh Revocable Trust, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Leon North, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Leon Troll, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Leslie Gelman, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Lori L. Sanders, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gretchen M. Van Ness +1 617 723 5060 +1 617 723 6546 gretchenvanness@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Schubert & Reed LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert S. Schubert +1 415 788 4220 +7880 788 788 0161
No Logo Lorri Hirsch, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo M.D. Randi Warren, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Manuel De Almeida, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Mark Susnow, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Marsha J. Taylor, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Marty Burstein, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Samuel Kornhauser

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel Kornhauser +1 415 981 6281 +1 415 981 7616 skornhauser@earthlink.net
No Logo Max Bruysschaard, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo MBR Produce Corp. Retirement Plan, Douglas Freeman, Trustee, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Melvin Selznick, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Radigan, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Sorkin, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Miriam Thurm, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Mitchell Hirsch, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Morris Weinstein, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Moshe Ariel, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Muriel Cohen, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Myer Shapiro, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Pat V. Caputi, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Patricia Newcombe, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Paul E. Romano, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Paul Vignale, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Pentz Revocable Living Trust, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Phillip Crary, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Prasad Srinivasan, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Prem Kumar, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Rachanee Clovis, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Rakesh Parikh, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Ralph Clock, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Ranjan K. Patel, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Richard Baum, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Richard Strunk, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Robert, Bernard, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Boone, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Burke, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Robert H. Wittemeyer, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Robert J. Suarez, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Newcombe, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Robinson, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Weiss, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Ronald A. Remick, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Ronald Falk, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Ronald Rees, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Rosen & Yampolsky Partnership, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Sal Latorraca, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Glenn DeValerio +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 gdevalerio@bermandevalerio.com
Space Patrick Thomas Egan +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 pegan@bermandevalerio.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Block & Leviton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Craig Block +1 617 398 5600 +1 617 507 6020 jeff@blockleviton.com
No Logo Sheeba Cherian, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Sherril Eapen, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Shirley L. Boone, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Stanley Egelberg, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Stanley H. Bigelow, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Stanton L. Triester, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Stephan Eggly, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Stephen Campbell, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Steve Molis, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Steven Goldman, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Steven S. Siegelaub, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Susan Chaikin, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Tom Herson, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Townsville Trading, LTD., Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Urmila Bhargava, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Victor Vizitei, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo WHU Enterprises, Inc, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo William Dukes, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo William J Walton, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo William Karges, Jr., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Finkelstein & Krinsk LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard David Finkelstein +1 619 238 1333 +1 619 238 5425 hdf@classactionlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moulton & Gans, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Moulton +1 617 369 7979

Toggle Switch Represented by Shalov Stone & Bonner LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ralph M. Stone +1 212 239 4310
No Logo William Ryan, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Yaakov Glatter, Consolidated Plaintiff
H&R Block Financial Advisors, Inc. H&R Block Financial Advisors, Inc., Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christina N. Davilas +1 617 951 8890 +1 617 428 6414 christina.davilas@bingham.com
No Logo Taniki Financial Corporation, Unknown

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor, Carnathan and Mack LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph P. Calandrelli +1 781 359 9034 +1 781 359 9001 jcalandrelli@ocmlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Prince, Lobel, Glovsky & Tye LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph D. Steinfield +1 617 456 8015 +1 617 456 8100 jsteinfield@plgt.com
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Emanuel Pinez. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 12/08/2005)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
    TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on November 4, 2005 before Judge Gorton. Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/951-4555 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 11/21/2005)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 403 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: None
      TRUSTEE WRIT issued. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 11/08/2005)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: None
        MOTION to Appoint Special Process Server filed by plaintiffs.(Folan, Karen) (Entered: 11/08/2005)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: None
          AFFIDAVIT of Kathleen Donovan-Maher re 399 EX PARTE MOTION for approval of Trustee Process attachment and other relief. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 11/08/2005)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: None
            MEMORANDUM of law in Support re 399 Ex parte MOTION for approval of Trustee Process attachment and other relief filed by class plaintiffs. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 11/08/2005)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 399 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: None
              EX PARTE MOTION for approval of Trustee Process attachment and other relief, filed by class plaintiffs.(Folan, Karen) (Entered: 11/08/2005)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: None
                AFFIDAVIT of Kathleen Donovan-Maher re 396 EX PARTE MOTION for Order. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 11/07/2005)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: None
                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 396 EX PARTE MOTION for Order filed by class plaintiffs. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 11/07/2005)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: None
                    Ex Parte MOTION for Order filed by class plaintiffs .(Folan, Karen) (Entered: 11/07/2005)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 135 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?