Doe et al v. Anoka-Hennepin School District No. 11 et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:11-cv-01999-JNE-SER

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2017 at 2:19 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo B.G., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin S Chester +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 martin.chester@FaegreBD.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher H Dolan +1 612 766 8849 +1 612 766 1700 cdolan@faegre.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Allen Ponto +1 612 766 7420 +1 612 766 1600 michael.ponto@faegrebd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary L. Stephenson +1 800 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 zack.stephenson@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary C. Bauer - PHV +1 334 956 8200 +1 334 956 8481 mary.bauer@splcenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by National Center for Lesbian Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Francis Stoll +1 415 392 6257 +1 415 392 8442 cstoll@nclrights.org
TERMINATED: 12/30/2011, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ilona Margaret Turner +1 415 392 6257 iturner@nclrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Poverty Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine P Sun +1 213 977 9500 christine.sun@splcenter.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Eugene Wolfe +1 334 956 8200 +1 334 956 8481 sam.wolfe@splcenter.org
No Logo D.F., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin S Chester +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 martin.chester@FaegreBD.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher H Dolan +1 612 766 8849 +1 612 766 1700 cdolan@faegre.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Allen Ponto +1 612 766 7420 +1 612 766 1600 michael.ponto@faegrebd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary L. Stephenson +1 800 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 zack.stephenson@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary C. Bauer - PHV +1 334 956 8200 +1 334 956 8481 mary.bauer@splcenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by National Center for Lesbian Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Francis Stoll +1 415 392 6257 +1 415 392 8442 cstoll@nclrights.org
TERMINATED: 12/30/2011, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ilona Margaret Turner +1 415 392 6257 iturner@nclrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Poverty Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine P Sun +1 213 977 9500 christine.sun@splcenter.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Eugene Wolfe +1 334 956 8200 +1 334 956 8481 sam.wolfe@splcenter.org
No Logo D.M.-B., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin S Chester +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 martin.chester@FaegreBD.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher H Dolan +1 612 766 8849 +1 612 766 1700 cdolan@faegre.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Allen Ponto +1 612 766 7420 +1 612 766 1600 michael.ponto@faegrebd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary L. Stephenson +1 800 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 zack.stephenson@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary C. Bauer - PHV +1 334 956 8200 +1 334 956 8481 mary.bauer@splcenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by National Center for Lesbian Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Francis Stoll +1 415 392 6257 +1 415 392 8442 cstoll@nclrights.org
TERMINATED: 12/30/2011, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ilona Margaret Turner +1 415 392 6257 iturner@nclrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Poverty Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine P Sun +1 213 977 9500 christine.sun@splcenter.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Eugene Wolfe +1 334 956 8200 +1 334 956 8481 sam.wolfe@splcenter.org
No Logo Jane Doe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin S Chester +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 martin.chester@FaegreBD.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher H Dolan +1 612 766 8849 +1 612 766 1700 cdolan@faegre.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Allen Ponto +1 612 766 7420 +1 612 766 1600 michael.ponto@faegrebd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary L. Stephenson +1 800 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 zack.stephenson@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary C. Bauer - PHV +1 334 956 8200 +1 334 956 8481 mary.bauer@splcenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by National Center for Lesbian Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Francis Stoll +1 415 392 6257 +1 415 392 8442 cstoll@nclrights.org
TERMINATED: 12/30/2011, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ilona Margaret Turner +1 415 392 6257 iturner@nclrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Poverty Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine P Sun +1 213 977 9500 christine.sun@splcenter.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Eugene Wolfe +1 334 956 8200 +1 334 956 8481 sam.wolfe@splcenter.org
No Logo K.R., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin S Chester +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 martin.chester@FaegreBD.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher H Dolan +1 612 766 8849 +1 612 766 1700 cdolan@faegre.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colton D. Long +1 612 336 6862 +1 622 339 0061 colton.long@ogletreedeakins.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Allen Ponto +1 612 766 7420 +1 612 766 1600 michael.ponto@faegrebd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary L. Stephenson +1 800 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 zack.stephenson@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary C. Bauer - PHV +1 334 956 8200 +1 334 956 8481 mary.bauer@splcenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by National Center for Lesbian Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Francis Stoll +1 415 392 6257 +1 415 392 8442 cstoll@nclrights.org
TERMINATED: 12/30/2011, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ilona Margaret Turner +1 415 392 6257 iturner@nclrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Poverty Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine P Sun +1 213 977 9500 christine.sun@splcenter.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Eugene Wolfe +1 334 956 8200 +1 334 956 8481 sam.wolfe@splcenter.org
v.
No Logo Anoka-Hennepin School Board, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Baker +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbaker@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sybil Louise Dunlop +1 612 373 8345 +1 612 373 0929 sdunlop@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark L Johnson +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 mjohnson@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen K Statler +1 612 373 8327 kstatler@greeneespel.com
No Logo Anoka-Hennepin School District No. 11, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Baker +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbaker@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sybil Louise Dunlop +1 612 373 8345 +1 612 373 0929 sdunlop@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark L Johnson +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 mjohnson@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen K Statler +1 612 373 8327 kstatler@greeneespel.com
No Logo Dennis Carlson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Baker +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbaker@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sybil Louise Dunlop +1 612 373 8345 +1 612 373 0929 sdunlop@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark L Johnson +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 mjohnson@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen K Statler +1 612 373 8327 kstatler@greeneespel.com
No Logo Jerri McGonigal, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Baker +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbaker@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sybil Louise Dunlop +1 612 373 8345 +1 612 373 0929 sdunlop@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark L Johnson +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 mjohnson@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen K Statler +1 612 373 8327 kstatler@greeneespel.com
No Logo Michael Farley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Baker +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbaker@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sybil Louise Dunlop +1 612 373 8345 +1 612 373 0929 sdunlop@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark L Johnson +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 mjohnson@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen K Statler +1 612 373 8327 kstatler@greeneespel.com
No Logo Tom Hagerty, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Baker +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbaker@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sybil Louise Dunlop +1 612 373 8345 +1 612 373 0929 sdunlop@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark L Johnson +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 mjohnson@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen K Statler +1 612 373 8327 kstatler@greeneespel.com
United States of America United States of America, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory G Brooker +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 greg.brooker@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Torey Brooks Cummings +1 202 305 4204 +1 202 514 8337 torey.cummings@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 07/24/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tamica Daniel +1 202 514 4092 +1 202 514 8337 Tamica.Daniel@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS E. PEREZ +1 202 514 2151 +1 202 514 1116 thomas.perez@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (105) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Daniel, Tamica) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by B.G., D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, K.R. re 102 Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney of Christine P. Sun and Mary Bauer (Dolan, Christopher) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney of Christine P. Sun and Mary Bauer (Dolan, Christopher) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 96 Motion to Withdraw/Disburse/Release Funds. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on May 17, 2013. (CBC) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by K.R. re 96 MOTION to Withdraw/Disburse/Release Funds Release of Minor Settlement Funds From the Settlement Account of Minor Plaintiff K.R. (Long, Colton) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
            Declaration of Rebecca and Jim Rooker in Support of 96 MOTION to Withdraw/Disburse/Release Funds Release of Minor Settlement Funds From the Settlement Account of Minor Plaintiff K.R. filed by K.R.. (Long, Colton) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM in Support re 96 MOTION to Withdraw/Disburse/Release Funds Release of Minor Settlement Funds From the Settlement Account of Minor Plaintiff K.R. filed by K.R.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Long, Colton) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 96 MOTION to Withdraw/Disburse/Release Funds Release of Minor Settlement Funds From the Settlement Account of Minor Plaintiff K.R. : at date and time to be determined. (Long, Colton) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Withdraw/Disburse/Release Funds Release of Minor Settlement Funds From the Settlement Account of Minor Plaintiff K.R. by K.R.. (Long, Colton) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 95 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER denying 93 MOTION to Seal Pleading/Motion/Other Document - forthcoming Modification Petition (Unopposed Motion) (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on May 6, 2013. (CBC) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by K.R. re 93 MOTION to Seal Pleading/Motion/Other Document - forthcoming Modification Petition (Unopposed Motion) (Long, Colton) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                        MOTION to Seal Pleading/Motion/Other Document - forthcoming Modification Petition (Unopposed Motion) by K.R.. (Long, Colton) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER approving 84 Petition to Approve Minor Settlement. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on March 20, 2012. (slf) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER approving 83 Petition to Approve Minor Settlement. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on March 20, 2012. (slf) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER approving 82 Petition to Approve Minor Settlement. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on March 20, 2012. (slf) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER approving 81 Petition to Approve Minor Settlement. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on March 20, 2012. (slf) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by B.G., D.F., D.M.-B., K.R. of the Proposed Order - Petition K.R., Proposed Order - Petition B.G.; Proposed Order - Petition D.F., Proposed Order - Petition D.M. (Dolan, Christopher) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service by B.G., D.F., D.M.-B., K.R. re 82 PETITION for Approval of Minor Settlement , 84 PETITION for Approval of Minor Settlement , 81 PETITION for Approval of Minor Settlement , 83 PETITION for Approval of Minor Settlement (Dolan, Christopher) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service by B.G., D.F., D.M.-B., K.R. re 82 PETITION for Approval of Minor Settlement , 84 PETITION for Approval of Minor Settlement , 81 PETITION for Approval of Minor Settlement , 83 PETITION for Approval of Minor Settlement (Dolan, Christopher) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Non-Resident Pro Hac Vice Admission for Tamica Daniel by United States of America. (Brooker, Gregory) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                          PETITION for Approval of Minor Settlement by K.R.. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 3/8/12. (Dolan, Christopher) Modified on 3/12/2012 (akl). (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                            PETITION for Approval of Minor Settlement by D.M.-B.. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 3/8/12. (Dolan, Christopher) Modified on 3/12/2012 (akl). (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                              PETITION for Approval of Minor Settlement by D.F.. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 3/8/12. (Dolan, Christopher) Modified on 3/12/2012 (akl). (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                PETITION for Approval of Minor Settlement by B.G.. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 3/8/12. (Dolan, Christopher) Modified on 3/12/2012 (akl). (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 71 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on March 7, 2012. (slf) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    CONSENT DECREE. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on March 6, 2012. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit(s), # 3 Exhibit(s), # 4 Exhibit(s), # 5 Exhibit(s), # 6 Exhibit(s), # 7 Exhibit(s)(slf) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                      Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by United States of America. (Brooker, Gregory) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER re 67 Stipulation, filed by D.M.-B., Jerri McGonigal, K.R., Jane Doe, Anoka-Hennepin School District No. 11, United States of America, Tom Hagerty, B.G., Dennis Carlson, D.F., Anoka-Hennepin School Board, Michael Farley. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on March 6, 2012. (slf) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by B.G., D.F., D.M.-B., K.R. re 71 MOTION to Seal Pleading/Motion/Other Document (Dolan, Christopher) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                            DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: MOTION for Non-Resident Pro Hac Vice Admission for Tamica Daniel by United States of America. (Brooker, Gregory) Modified on 3/6/2012 (TSS). (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of U.S. Government Attorney for Thomas Perez by United States of America. (Brooker, Gregory) Modified text on 3/6/2012 (TSS). (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of U.S. Government Attorney for Torey Cummings by United States of America. (Brooker, Gregory) Modified on 3/6/2012 (TSS). (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  DOCUMENT FILED IN ERORR (Duplicate Entry): MOTION to Approve Consent Decree. Modified docket text on 3/6/2012 (TSS). (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION to Seal Pleading/Motion/Other Document by B.G., D.F., D.M.-B., K.R.. (Dolan, Christopher) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Lodging of Consent Decree by Anoka-Hennepin School Board, Anoka-Hennepin School District No. 11, B.G., Dennis Carlson, D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, Michael Farley, Tom Hagerty, K.R., Jerri McGonigal, United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Brooker, Gregory) Modified docket text on 3/6/2012 (TSS). (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 68 JOINT MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSED CONSENT DECREE filed by Anoka-Hennepin School Board, Anoka-Hennepin School District No. 11, B.G., Dennis Carlson, D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, Michael Farley, Tom Hagerty, K.R., Jerri McGonigal, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Brooker, Gregory) Modified docket text on 3/6/2012 (TSS). (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          JOINT MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSED CONSENT DECREE by Anoka-Hennepin School Board, Anoka-Hennepin School District No. 11, B.G., Dennis Carlson, D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, Michael Farley, Tom Hagerty, K.R., Jerri McGonigal, United States of America. (Brooker, Gregory) Modified docket text on 3/6/2012 (TSS). (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            STIPULATION by Anoka-Hennepin School Board, Anoka-Hennepin School District No. 11, B.G., Dennis Carlson, D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, Michael Farley, Tom Hagerty, K.R., Jerri McGonigal, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Intervenor Complaint of the United States, # 2 Attorney General Certification)(Brooker, Gregory) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Continued Settlement Conference held on 3/1/2012. (kt) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 60 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on March 1, 2012. (slf) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: At a date and time to be set by the Court, or on the written submissions if the Court so prefers, the plaintiffs and defendants will jointly move the Court for an order consolidating these cases for pretrial proceedings, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42, without prejudice to future motions by any party to separate claims for trial. The parties have no objection if the Court wishes to consider this motion without a hearing. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service). (Johnson, Mark) Modified text on 2/29/2012 (lmb). (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Anoka-Hennepin School Board, Anoka-Hennepin School District No. 11, B.G., Dennis Carlson, D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, Michael Farley, Tom Hagerty, K.R., Jerri McGonigal re 60 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Pretrial Proceedings (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 60 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Pretrial Proceedings filed by Anoka-Hennepin School Board, Anoka-Hennepin School District No. 11, B.G., Dennis Carlson, D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, Michael Farley, Tom Hagerty, K.R., Jerri McGonigal. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 60 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Pretrial Proceedings : Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Pretrial Proceedings by Anoka-Hennepin School Board, Anoka-Hennepin School District No. 11, B.G., Dennis Carlson, D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, Michael Farley, Tom Hagerty, K.R., Jerri McGonigal. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Status Conference via Telephone held on 2/14/2012. Continued settlement discussions. (jz) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* NOTICE of Setting Hearing:Settlement Conference set for 3/1/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau. Settlement Conference set for 3/2/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau. (ME) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Continued Settlement Conference held on 1/18/2012. No settlement reached. (kt) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Status Conference held on 1/6/2012. Continued settlement discussions. (kt) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Turner, Ilona) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Continued Settlement Conference held on 12/15/2011. No settlement reached. (kt) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* NOTICE of Setting Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 12/15/2011 09:00 AM and 1/18/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau. (ME) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Continued Settlement Conference held on 11/18/2011. No settlement reached. (kt) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Continued Settlement Conference held on 11/14/2011. No settlement reached. (kt) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Settlement Conference held on 11/4/2011. No settlement reached. (kt) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* NOTICE of Setting Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 11/4/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau. Settlement Conference set for 11/14/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau. Settlement Conference set for 11/18/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau. (ME) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Status Conference held on 10/19/2011. Continued settlement discussions. (kt) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Settlement Conference held on 10/17/2011. No settlement reached. (kt) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: DUPLICATE ENTRY. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Settlement Conference held on 10/13/2011. A continued Settlement Conference was held before Steven E. Rau, United States Magistrate Judge, in Saint Paul, Minnesota. No settlement was reached. (kt) Modified on 10/14/2011 (kt). (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Settlement Conference held on 10/14/2011. A continued Settlement Conference was held before Steven E. Rau, United States Magistrate Judge, in Saint Paul, Minnesota. No settlement was reached. (kt) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Continued Settlement Conference held on 10/13/2011. No settlement reached. (kt) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Continued Settlement Conference held on 10/6/2011. No settlement reached. (kt) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Continued Settlement Conference held on 10/5/2011. No settlement reached. (kt) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* NOTICE of Setting Hearing: Continued Settlement Conference set for 10/14/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau. (ME) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* NOTICE of Setting Hearing: Continued Settlement Conference set for 10/13/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau. (ME) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* NOTICE of Setting Hearing: Continued Settlement Conference set for 10/6/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau. (ME) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/28/2011. (kt) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Continued Settlement Conference set for 10/5/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau on 9/26/11. (kt) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Status Conference held on 9/20/2011. (kt) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 34 Stipulation; Defendants shall have until seven (7) days after Plaintiffs provide Defendants with written notice that settlement discussions are at an impasse. Defendants may, however, file their answer or other response to the Complaint at any time before there is an impasse in settlement discussions or before it receives notice of an impasse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau on 9/16/11. (LPH) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION extending Defendants' time in which to answer by Anoka-Hennepin School Board, Anoka-Hennepin School District No. 11, B.G., Dennis Carlson, D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, Michael Farley, Tom Hagerty, K.R., Jerri McGonigal. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Telephone Conference held on 9/14/2011. (LPH) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Status Conference held on 9/1/2011. (kt) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Status Conference held on 8/31/2011. A telephone conference was held regarding discovery dispute. (kt) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau on 8/25/11. (kt) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Settlement Conference held on 8/23/2011. No settlement reached. (kt) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Status Conference held on 8/22/2011. Discussion regarding upcoming Settlement Conference. (haz) Text modified on 8/24/2011 (Arent-Zachary, Heather). (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Anoka-Hennepin School Board, Anoka-Hennepin School District No. 11, B.G., Dennis Carlson, D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, Michael Farley, Tom Hagerty, K.R., Jerri McGonigal re 26 Stipulation, for Protective Order (Dolan, Christopher) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION for Protective Order by Anoka-Hennepin School Board, Anoka-Hennepin School District No. 11, B.G., Dennis Carlson, D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, Michael Farley, Tom Hagerty, K.R., Jerri McGonigal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Dolan, Christopher) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Status Conference held on 8/22/2011. Discussion regarding upcoming Settlement Conference. (haz) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Status Conference held on 8/22/2011. Discussion regarding upcoming Settlement Conference. (haz) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER That Plaintiff Jane Does Motion for Leave to Proceed Under a Pseudonym [Doc. No. 2 ] is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau on 08/16/2011. (jz) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anoka-Hennepin School Board, Anoka-Hennepin School District No. 11, B.G., Dennis Carlson, D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, Michael Farley, Tom Hagerty, K.R., Jerri McGonigal re 21 Stipulation, (Dolan, Christopher) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION Regarding Plaintiff Jane Doe's Motion for Leave to Proceed Under a Pseudonym by Anoka-Hennepin School Board, Anoka-Hennepin School District No. 11, B.G., Dennis Carlson, D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, Michael Farley, Tom Hagerty, K.R., Jerri McGonigal. (Dolan, Christopher) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF DIRECTION TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR REASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE that 11cv2282 is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 8/12/2011. (JME) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Settlement Conference set for 8/23/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau on 8/12/11. (kt) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that Defendants shall have until September 16, 2011, to answer or otherwise respond to the PlaintiffsComplaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau on 8/9/11. (kt) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME IN WHICH TO ANSWER by Anoka-Hennepin School Board, Anoka-Hennepin School District No. 11, B.G., Dennis Carlson, D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, Michael Farley, Tom Hagerty, K.R., Jerri McGonigal. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau: Status Conference held on 8/3/2011. A telephone conference was held regarding case management. (kt) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by K.R., D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, B.G.. Anoka-Hennepin School Board served on 7/27/2011, answer due 8/17/2011; Anoka-Hennepin School District No. 11 served on 7/27/2011, answer due 8/17/2011; Dennis Carlson served on 7/27/2011, answer due 8/17/2011; Michael Farley served on 7/25/2011, answer due 8/15/2011; Tom Hagerty served on 7/25/2011, answer due 8/15/2011; Jerri McGonigal served on 7/25/2011, answer due 8/15/2011. (Ponto, Michael) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by B.G., D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, K.R. re 2 MOTION for leave to proceed under a pseudonym AMENDED (Ponto, Michael) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by B.G., D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, K.R. re 2 MOTION for leave to proceed under a pseudonym (Ponto, Michael) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Christopher F. Stoll by B.G., D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, K.R.. (Ponto, Michael) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Ilona M. Turner by B.G., D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, K.R.. (Ponto, Michael) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Sam Wolfe by B.G., D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, K.R. (Ponto, Michael) Modified on 7/27/2011 (MMC). (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Mary Bauer by B.G., D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, K.R. (Ponto, Michael) Modified on 7/27/2011 (MMC). (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Christine Sun by B.G., D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, K.R. (Ponto, Michael) Modified on 7/27/2011 (MMC). (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 2 MOTION for leave to proceed under a pseudonym : Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau. (Dolan, Christopher) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Jane Doe re 3 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Jane Doe. (Dolan, Christopher) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Christopher H. Dolan in Support of 2 MOTION for leave to proceed under a pseudonym, 3 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Jane Doe. (Dolan, Christopher) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Jane Doe (Pseudonym) in Support of 2 MOTION for leave to proceed under a pseudonym, 3 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Jane Doe. (Dolan, Christopher) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 2 MOTION for leave to proceed under a pseudonym filed by Jane Doe. (Dolan, Christopher) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to proceed under a pseudonym by Jane Doe. (Dolan, Christopher) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 95 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 93 MOTION to Seal Pleading/Motion/Other Document - forthcoming Modification Petition (Unopposed Motion) (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on May 6, 2013. (CBC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Anoka-Hennepin School Board, Anoka-Hennepin School District No. 11, Dennis Carlson, Michael Farley, Tom Hagerty, Jerri McGonigal ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 40056960.) assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Civil Rights List and referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau, filed by K.R., D.F., D.M.-B., Jane Doe, B.G.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kt) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 69 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?