Collins, Mary, et al v. PBGC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 07-5342

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 27, 2016 at 7:53 PM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 2371 - Truth in Lending
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207493092 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
REPORT FILED [1434590] by PBGC in 07-5333 abeyance status : Pending further developments before the District Court. [Service Date: 05/07/2013 ] [07-5333, 07-5342] (Maguire, Jill)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207465308 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
    REPORT FILED [1419171] by PBGC in 07-5333 abeyance status : Pending further developments before the District Court. [Service Date: 02/06/2013 ] [07-5333, 07-5342] (Maguire, Jill)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207438663 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
      REPORT FILED [1403819] by PBGC in 07-5333 abeyance status : Negotiations before class action settlement board ongoing; pending further developments before the District Court. [Service Date: 11/08/2012 ] [07-5333, 07-5342] (Maguire, Jill)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207411299 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
        REPORT FILED [1388493] by PBGC in 07-5333 abeyance status : Negotiations before class action settlement board ongoing; pending further developments before the District Court.. [Service Date: 08/10/2012 ] [07-5333, 07-5342] (Maguire, Jill)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207384550 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
          REPORT FILED [1373472] by PBGC in 07-5333 abeyance status : Negotiations before class action settlement board ongoing; pending further developments before the District Court. [Service Date: 05/14/2012 ] [07-5333, 07-5342] (Maguire, Jill)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207356659 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
            REPORT FILED [1357901] by PBGC in 07-5333 abeyance status : Negotiations before class action settlement board ongoing; pending further developments before the District Court. [Service Date: 02/13/2012 ] [07-5333, 07-5342] (Maguire, Jill)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207327245 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
              REPORT FILED [1341466] by PBGC in 07-5333, 07-5342 abeyance status : Negotiations before class action settlement board ongoing; pending further developments before the District Court. [Service Date: 11/14/2011 ] [07-5333, 07-5342] (Maguire, Jill)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207297838 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                REPORT FILED [1324167] by PBGC in 07-5333, 07-5342 abeyance status : Negotiations before class action settlement board ongoing; pending further developments before the District Court.. [Service Date: 08/15/2011 ] [07-5333, 07-5342] (Maguire, Jill)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207270817 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                  REPORT FILED [1308040] by PBGC in 07-5333, 07-5342 abeyance status : Negotiations before class action settlement board ongoing; pending further developments before the District Court. [Service Date: 05/16/2011 ] [07-5333, 07-5342] (Maguire, Jill)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207245353 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                    REPORT FILED [1293174] by PBGC in 07-5333, 07-5342 abeyance status : Negotiations before class action settlement board ongoing.. [Service Date: 02/14/2011 ] [07-5333, 07-5342] (Maguire, Jill)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 51 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?