Public Record Media, LLC v. U.S. Department of Justice
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:12-cv-01225-MJD-AJB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 8, 2016 at 11:50 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Public Record Media, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 120

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JT Haines +1 612 743 7781 jt@haineslawpllc.com
v.
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Department of Justice"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/05/2013 Mary J Madigan +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 maryjo.madigan@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judson Owen Littleton +1 202 305 8714 +1 202 616 8470 Judson.O.Littleton@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Powell +1 202 514 9836 +1 202 616 8202 amy.powell@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bahram Samie +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 bahram.samie@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 43 Filed: 6/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Defendant's letter request for permission to file a motion for reconsideration 41 shall be deemed a Motion for Reconsideration, and Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration 41 is DENIED. 2. The January 29, 2013 Order 29 shall be designated as a Report and Recommendation. 3. The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation of Chief United States Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan dated January 29, 2013 29 . 4. Plaintiff is granted an award of attorney's fees in the amount of $7,500, plus its $350 filing fee, for a total award of $7,850. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/7/13. (GRR)
    LREF
    Legal Document 43 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Defendant's letter request for permission to file a motion for reconsideration 41 shall be deemed a Motion for Reconsideration, and Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration 41 is DENIED. 2. The January 29, 2013 Order 29 shall be designated as a Report and Recommendation. 3. The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation of Chief United States Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan dated January 29, 2013 29 . 4. Plaintiff is granted an award of attorney's fees in the amount of $7,500, plus its $350 filing fee, for a total award of $7,850. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/7/13. (GRR) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      LETTER RESPONSE re 41 Letter to Request Permission to File Motion to Reconsider. (Haines, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE re Request Permission to File Motion to Reconsider. (Powell, Amy) Modified text on 5/21/2013 (lmb). (Entered: 05/21/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 40 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Chief United States Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan's January 29, 2013 Order 29 is AFFIRMED. 2. Defendant's objections to that Order 33 are OVERRULED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/7/13. (GRR) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Public Record Media, LLC regarding fee documentation. (Haines, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              TEXT ONLY ORDER. Plaintiff may file a surreply to the motion for fees. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/22/13. (KMW) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                REPLY re 34 Response, filed by U.S. Department of Justice. (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  TEXT ONLY ENTRY. ORDER ruling on Defendant's request for leave to file a short reply to plaintiff's bjection and additional documentation is granted. Reply is due by 3/18/13. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/1/13. (KMW) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by U.S. Department of Justice . (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      RESPONSE re 33 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 29 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Public Record Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Complaince certificate, # 2 Exhibit(s) Fee invoice Exhibit A to Memo)(Haines, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 29 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees (Attachments: LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 1 Exhibit(s) A). (Littleton, Judson) Modified text on 2/12/2013 (lmb). (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for U.S. Department of Justice. (Samie, Bahram) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION for Non-Resident Pro Hac Vice Admission for Judson O. Littleton by U.S. Department of Justice. (Samie, Bahram) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Bahram Samie on behalf of U.S. Department of Justice. (Samie, Bahram) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting 22 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 01/29/2013. (lmb) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Reply to Response to Motion re 22 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Public Record Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Complaince certificate)(Haines, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 22 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Powell, Amy) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER REFERRING 22 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Public Record Media, LLC to Judge Arthur J. Boylan. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/31/12. (KMW) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 22 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Public Record Media, LLC. (Haines, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          EXHIBIT INDEX re 23 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 22 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Public Record Media, LLC filed by Public Record Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - D). (Haines, Jonathan) Modified text on 10/30/2012 (lmb). (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 22 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Public Record Media, LLC. (Haines, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION for Attorney Fees by Public Record Media, LLC. (Haines, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CASE. ATTORNEY FEES BREIFING SCHEDULE ATTACHED. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/26/12. (KMW) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal by Public Record Media, LLC, U.S. Department of Justice. (Haines, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* NOTICE to Attorneys: The Hearing on the Motion to Dismiss will be held at 9:30 a.m. before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis in Courtroom 15E of the Minneapolis Federal Courthouse. (KMW) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Declaration of John E. Bies in Support of 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits to Bies Declaration, # 2 Exhibit(s) A-F to Bies Declaration)(Powell, Amy) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. Declaration of John Bies in Support of 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Bies, # 2 Exhibit(s) A-F of Bies Declaration). (Powell, Amy) Modified text on 9/21/2012 (lmb). (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support, LR7.1/72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE, re 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy) Modified text on 9/21/2012 (lmb). (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. Department of Justice. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                NOTICE to Attorneys: The Court has scheduled the hearing on the Cross Motions for Summary Judgment to be filed with the Court on September 21, 2012 and October 19, 2012. The hearing shall take place on Friday, January, 4, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis in Courtroom 15E of the Minneapolis Federal Courthouse. (KMW) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions (disp) due by 11/16/2012. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 08/14/2012. (lmb) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan: Pretrial Conference held on 8/14/2012. Scheduling order to be issued. (lmb) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Public Record Media, LLC, U.S. Department of Justice.(Powell, Amy) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/7/2012. Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2012 01:45 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 07/03/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(jz) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Department of Justice. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER: Upon stipulation of the parties (see Doc. No. 6), it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall be, and hereby is, granted an extension of time to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 06/21/2012. (lmb) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Answer by Public Record Media, LLC, U.S. Department of Justice. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Amy Powell by U.S. Department of Justice. (Madigan, Mary) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Public Record Media, LLC. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s))(Haines, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: WILL REFILE. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Public Record Media, LLC re Summons Issued as to USA, 1 Complaint, (Haines, Jonathan) Modified on 6/1/2012 (kt). (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Public Record Media, LLC re Summons Issued as to USA, 1 Complaint, (Haines, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Chief United States Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan's January 29, 2013 Order 29 is AFFIRMED. 2. Defendant's objections to that Order 33 are OVERRULED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/7/13. (GRR)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 3009604.) assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Master list and referred to Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan, filed by Public Record Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLR) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?