Strahan v. Smith, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-10017
District Judge William Young, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 15, 2016 at 1:59 AM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pro Se Party Richard Max Strahan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Earl & Earl, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Max Strahan +1 617 233 3854 esistoo@yahoo.com
No Logo Equity Office Property Management, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Equity Office Property Management, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goulston & Storrs, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L. DeTeso +1 617 482 1776 +1 617 574 7515
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana F. Rodin +1 617 574 6445 +1 617 574 7626 drodin@goulstonstorrs.com
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority, Defendant
No Logo Thomas O'Loughlin, Defendant
No Logo William Smith, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan P. Feltner +1 617 722 3175 +1 617 222 3194 jfeltner@mbta.com
No Logo Pro Se Party Richard Max Strahan, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Max Strahan +1 617 233 3854 esistoo@yahoo.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: None
Mandate of US Court of Appeals re: [26-1] appeal dismissing [26-1] appeal. (jr) (Entered: 03/27/2003)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: None
    Stipulation of dismissal by Richard Max Strahan, William Smith, Massachusetts Bay Tr, John Doe, John Doe #2, Thomas O'Loughlin, Equity Office Proper, Equity Office Proper, Richard Max Strahan with prejudice, filed. without costs (mlb) Modified on 01/22/2003 (Entered: 01/08/2003)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
      Chief Judge William G. Young . Settlement Order of Dismissal entered. [EOD Date 1/3/03] (efs) (Entered: 01/03/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: None
        Motion by Richard Max Strahan for a written decision of the Court's denial of his Motion for a Preliminary Injunction , filed. c/s. (mlb) (Entered: 08/09/2002)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: None
          Corrected Affidavit of Richard Max Strahan , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 08/09/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: None
            Notice of filing of Corrected Document by Richard Max Strahan , filed. c/s. (mlb) (Entered: 08/09/2002)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: None
              Notice of appeal by Richard Max Strahan filed. Fee Status: unk Appealing: Denial of Moiton for a Preliminary Injunction dated 7/11/02 . Appeal record due on 8/23/02 (mlb) (Entered: 08/09/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                Chief Judge William G. Young . Clerk's Notes: re: Motion hearing held. Pltf. files affidavit. After hearing the [12-2] motion for preliminary injunction is denied. The case is on the RTL for 1/2003. (mlb) (Entered: 07/16/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: None
                  Affidavit of James L. Sheehan , re: [23-1] opposition response to, [12-2] motion for preliminary injunction , filed. (mlb) Modified on 07/03/2002 (Entered: 07/03/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: None
                    Response by Equity Office Proper in opposition to [12-2] motion for preliminary injunction , filed. c/s. (mlb) (Entered: 07/03/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: None
                      Affidavit of Jonathan P. Feltner , re: [17-1] opposition response to, [12-2] motion for preliminary injunction , filed. Exhibits attached. (mlb) (Entered: 07/03/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: None
                        Affidavit of William Smith , re: [17-1] opposition response,to [12-2] motion for preliminary injunction , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 07/03/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: None
                          Affidavit of Anne McCall , re: [17-1] opposition response, to [12-2] motion for preliminary injunction , filed. c/s. Exhibits attached. (mlb) (Entered: 07/03/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: None
                            Affidavit of Thomas O'Loughlin , re: [17-1] opposition response to, [12-2] motion for preliminary injunction , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 07/03/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: None
                              Memorandum of law by William Smith, Massachusetts Bay Tr, John Doe, John Doe #2, Thomas O'Loughlin re: opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed. c/s. (mlb) (Entered: 07/03/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: None
                                Response by William Smith, Massachusetts Bay Tr, John Doe, John Doe #2, Thomas O'Loughlin in opposition to [12-2] motion for preliminary injunction , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 07/03/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: None
                                  Motion by William Smith, Massachusetts Bay Tr, John Doe, John Doe #2, Thomas O'Loughlin, Equity Office Proper to extend time to 7/2/02 to respond to motion , filed. (efs) (Entered: 06/26/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Chief Judge William G. Young . Clerk's Notes: re: 16.1 Conference held., Court explains requirements of session . Court inquires as to whether parties want to proceed before Magistrate; ADR pamphlet issued. set Jury trial on running trial list as of 7/1/02 , Motion hearing set for 2:00 7/11/02 for [12-2] motion for preliminary injunction . (mlb) (Entered: 06/20/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Chief Judge William G. Young . Notice of Hearing/conference: Motion hearing set for 2:00 7/11/02 for [12-2] motion for preliminary injunction . (efs) (Entered: 06/18/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None
                                        Affidavit of Richard Max Strahan , re: [12-1] motion for temporary restraining order, [12-2] motion for preliminary injunction , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 06/14/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None
                                          Motion by Richard Max Strahan for temporary restraining order , and for preliminary injunction , filed. c/s. (mlb) (Entered: 06/14/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Chief Judge William G. Young . Notice of Hearing/conference: reset scheduling conference for 2:00 6/19/02 . (efs) (Entered: 06/13/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Chief Judge William G. Young . Notice of Scheduling conference: set scheduling conference for 2:00 6/18/02 . cc/cl. (mlb) (Entered: 05/16/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                Answer by William Smith, Massachusetts Bay Tr, John Doe, John Doe #2, Thomas O'Loughlin to complaint; jury demand, filed. c/s. (mlb) (Entered: 05/01/2002)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                  Answer to complaint and Counterclaim by Equity Office Proper against Richard Max Strahan, filed; c/s. (sat) (Entered: 04/30/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                    Return of service executed as to William Smith with service on 4/4/02 filed. Answer due on 4/24/02 for William Smith (mlb) (Entered: 04/09/2002)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                      Return of service executed as to Equity Office Proper with service on 4/4/02 filed. Answer due on 4/24/02 for Equity Office Proper (mlb) (Entered: 04/09/2002)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Chief Judge William G. Young . Memorandum and Order entered. It is Ordered that [4-1] motion for temporary restraining and preliminary injunction is Denied without prejudice and [3-1] motion to proceed without prepayment of fees (in forma pauperis), and [2-1] motion to waive filing fee is GRANTED. It is ORDERED the U. S. Marshall serve a copy of the complaint, Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, summons and this Order upon the named defendants as directed by the plaintiff with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. SO ORDERED." [EOD Date 1/8/02] (mlb) (Entered: 01/08/2002)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                          Motion by Richard Max Strahan for preliminary injunction , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 01/08/2002)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                            Motion by Richard Max Strahan to proceed without prepayment of fees (in forma pauperis) , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 01/04/2002)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                              Motion by Richard Max Strahan to waive filing fee , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 01/04/2002)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                Complaint filed. Case assigned to Judge: William G. Young. . (mlb) (Entered: 01/04/2002)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 132 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?