Ratner v. Smith Barney Fund Management LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-08356
District Judge William H. Pauley, III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 10, 2016 at 3:27 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Seymour Ratner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Uri Seth Ottensoser +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 ottensoser@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com
v.
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Smith Barney Fund Management LLC, Defendant

Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 3/6/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 3/6/2013 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/2/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/12/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/12/2012 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/28/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/7/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          MEMO ENDORSEMENT ON NOTICE OF MOTION OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF APPEARANCE: TO: THE CLERK OF THE COURT, ALL PARTIES OF RECORD AND LINDA ROTSKOFF PLEASE TAKE NOTICE, that Joshua H. Vinik will shortly be leaving Milberg LLP and hereby moves to be withdrawn as counsel for plaintiff Linda Rotskoff. Mr. Vinik appeared in this case as counsel for Linda Rotskoff on July 14,2011 (docket no. 145). Linda Rotskoff was one of the class representatives proposed in connection with the then Lead Plaintiff Operating Local 649 Annuity Trust Fund's July 15, 2011 motion for class certification (docket no. 147) (the "Motion"). The Motion was terminated by this Court in its order dated September 8, 2011 (docket no. 165.) Accordingly, Linda Rotskoff is neither a Lead Plaintiff nor a Class Representative. Further, Milberg LLP is not Lead Counsel in this action. Accordingly, please remove Joshua H. Vinik from all service lists, including the Court's electronic notification listand the mailing list in this case. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/20/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(ago) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            MEMO ENDORSEMENT ON NOTICE OF MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE: THE CLERK OF THE COURT, ALL PARTIES OF RECORD AND LINDA ROTSKOFF PLEASE TAKE NOTICE, that John R. S. McFarlane hereby moves to be withdrawn as counsel for plaintiff Linda Rotskoff. Mr. McFarlane appeared in this case as counsel for Linda Rotskoff on July 14,2011 (docket no. 146). Linda Rotskoff was one of the class representatives proposed in connection with the then Lead Plaintiff Operating Local 649 Annuity Trust Fund's July 15, 2011 motion for class certification (docket no. 147) (the "Motion"). The Motion was terminated by this Court in its order dated September 8, 2011 (docket no. 165.) Accordingly, Linda Rotskoff is neither a Lead Plaintiff nor a Class Representative. Further, Milberg LLP is not Lead Counsel in this action. Accordingly, please remove John R. S. McFarlane from all service lists, including the Court's electronic notification list and the mailing list in this case. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/20/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(ago) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a MOTION proceeding held on 6/13/2012 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: MOTION held on 6/13/2012 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/13/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a MOTION proceeding held on 6/13/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: MOTION held on 6/13/2012 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      MEMORANDUM & ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' application to lift the PSLRA discovery stay in its entirety is denied. However, Plaintiffs may serve a document-preservation subpoena on Legg Mason. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 4/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(lmb) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 1/13/2012 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 1/13/2012 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ann Hairston, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/12/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/22/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER: The Parties are directed to appear for a status conference on January 13, 2012, at 12:00 p.m. at which this Court will consider renewed motion applications. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate all pending motions. ( Status Conference set for 1/13/2012 at 12:00 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III.), Motions terminated: (21 in 1:05-cv-08399-WHP) MOTION for Judgment (Notice of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings that The Newly Named Plaintiffs' Claims are Time-Barred). MOTION for Judgment (Notice of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings that The Newly Named Plaintiffs' Claims are Time-Barred). filed by Smith Barney Fund Management LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/21/2011) (djc) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the reasons in this Memorandum and Order, these consolidated actions shall proceed with David Zagunis as lead plaintiff and Stull, Stull & Brody and Weiss & Lurie as co-lead counsel. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motions pending at ECF Nos. 182, 184, and 188. Terminating (182) Motion to Appoint; Terminating (184) Motion to Substitute Party; Terminating (184) Motion to Appoing; Terminating (184) Motion to Appoint Counsel; Terminating (188) Motion to Appoint in case 1:05-cv-07583-WHP. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/15/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(rjm) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 6/24/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 6/24/2011 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/3/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Argument proceeding held on 10/28/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Argument held on 10/28/2011 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/15/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF BRIAN A. SUTHERLAND AS COUNSEL OF RECORD AND ORDER: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Brian Sutherland is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record in the above-captioned matter for defendants Citigroup Global Markets Inc. and Smith Barney Fund Management LLC, because as of November 2, 2011, Mr. Sutherland will no longer be employed by the law firm Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, and will no longer have any association with the above-captioned matter. Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and DOH LLP will continue as counsel for the above-referenced defendants. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/3/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(djc) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/15/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CORRECTED TRANSCRIPT held on 9/15/2011 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Dugald Galbraith on behalf of Ann Yiambellis, Robert Yiambellis Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(Galbraith, Kevin) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/8/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 9/8/2011 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Joseph Quinones, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/29/2011.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Local 649's request to withdraw as Lead Plaintiff must be granted because it never was a proper plaintiff at all. However, for the foregoing reasons, the request to amend the complaint to add a new lead plaintiff is denied at this time. Renewed lead plaintiff motions are appropriate to ensure the appointment of suitable class representatives and lead counsel. The withdrawal of Local 649 calls into question the propriety of permitting Jeffrey Weber to act as the only lead plaintiff. Moreover, it would be imprudent to permit Lead Counsel to add a lead plaintiff of their choosing. Accordingly, by separate order, this Court will fix a briefing schedule for appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel. And discovery is once again stayed pending resolution of that motion. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 9/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(tro) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/15/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 9/15/2011 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/24/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2011.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/8/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 9/8/2011 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Joseph Quinones, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/6/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2011.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                              DECLARATION of Peter K. Vigeland in Support re: (162 in 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 26 in 1:05-cv-08399-WHP, 26 in 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 36 in 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 26 in 1:05-cv-08357-WHP) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Smith Barney Fund Management LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN, # 41 Exhibit OO, # 42 Exhibit PP, # 43 Exhibit QQ, # 44 Exhibit RR, # 45 Exhibit SS, # 46 Exhibit TT, # 47 Exhibit UU, # 48 Exhibit VV, # 49 Exhibit WW, # 50 Exhibit XX, # 51 Exhibit YY, # 52 Exhibit ZZ, # 53 Exhibit AAA, # 54 Exhibit BBB, # 55 Exhibit CCC)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(Martin, Lori) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                DECLARATION of Vinita M. Juneja in Support re: (162 in 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 26 in 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 36 in 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 26 in 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 26 in 1:05-cv-08399-WHP) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Smith Barney Fund Management LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(Martin, Lori) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (147 in 1:05-cv-07583-WHP) MOTION to Certify Class. (Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification). Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Smith Barney Fund Management LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(Martin, Lori) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 6/24/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 6/24/2011 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/23/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/3/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2011.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        DECLARATION of Brian A. Sutherland in Support re: (21 in 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 21 in 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 21 in 1:05-cv-08399-WHP, 142 in 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 31 in 1:05-cv-07818-WHP) MOTION for Judgment (Notice of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings that The Newly Named Plaintiffs' Claims are Time-Barred). MOTION for Judgment (Notice of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings that The Newly Named Plaintiffs' Claims are Time-Barred).. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Smith Barney Fund Management LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(Martin, Lori) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (21 in 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 21 in 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 21 in 1:05-cv-08399-WHP, 31 in 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 142 in 1:05-cv-07583-WHP) MOTION for Judgment (Notice of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings that The Newly Named Plaintiffs' Claims are Time-Barred). MOTION for Judgment (Notice of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings that The Newly Named Plaintiffs' Claims are Time-Barred).. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Smith Barney Fund Management LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(Martin, Lori) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Judgment (Notice of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings that The Newly Named Plaintiffs' Claims are Time-Barred). Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Smith Barney Fund Management LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(Martin, Lori) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Michael Burkoff on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Smith Barney Fund Management LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(Burkoff, David) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT ON NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CATHERINE MARLANTES RAHM AS COUNSEL OF RECORD AND ORDER: that Catherin Marlantes Rahm is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record in the above-captioned matter for defendants Citigroup Global Markets Inc. and Smith Barney Fund Management LLC. As of November 25, 2010 Ms. Rahm will no longer be employed by Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP. Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP will continue as counsel for the above-referenced defendants. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Catherine Marlantes Rahm terminated. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/7/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP (lnl) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Catherine Marlantes Rahm on behalf of Smith Barney Fund Management LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. (Rahm, Catherine) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Adair Sutherland on behalf of Smith Barney Fund Management LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. (Sutherland, Brian) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Sapir Lesser on behalf of Smith Barney Fund Management LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. (Lesser, David) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lori Ann Martin on behalf of Smith Barney Fund Management LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. (Martin, Lori) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Kristian Vigeland on behalf of Smith Barney Fund Management LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. (Vigeland, Peter) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum and Order and Order dated September 26, 2007and October 26, 2007, defendants motion to dismiss is granted; Counts I and II are dismissed with prejudice; as plaintiffs have failed to file an amended complaint by October 19, 2007, the Court directs that this case is closed, as well as consolidated actions 05 Civ. 7818, 05 Civ. 8356, 05 Civ. 8357 and 05 Civ. 8399. (Signed by J. Michael McMahon, clerk on 11/5/07) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(ml) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER Plaintiffs having failed to file an amended complaint by October 19, 2007 pursuant to this Court's September 26, 2007 Memorandum and Order, the Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case, as well as consolidated actions 05 Civ 7818, 05 Civ 8356, 05 Civ 8357 and 05 Civ 8399, closed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley III on 10/26/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP, 1:05-cv-07818-WHP, 1:05-cv-08356-WHP, 1:05-cv-08357-WHP, 1:05-cv-08399-WHP(jmi) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER; Lead Plaintiff in these consolidated actions shall file and serve the Consolidated Amended Complaint by 6/1/2006. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley III on 4/20/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP,1:05-cv-07818-WHP,1:05-cv-08356-WHP,1:05-cv-08357-WHP,1:05-cv-08399-WHP(kco, ) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 39 MOTION to Appoint OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 649 ANNUITY TRUST AND JEFFREY WEBER to serve as lead plaintiff(s). REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND JEFFREY WEBER'S MOTION AND IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO THE CHIUMENTO GROUP'S MOTION. Document filed by operating engineers local 649 annuity trust fund. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP,1:05-cv-07818-WHP,1:05-cv-08356-WHP,1:05-cv-08357-WHP,1:05-cv-08399-WHP(Stern, Felecia) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Smith Barney Fund Management LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP,1:05-cv-07818-WHP,1:05-cv-08356-WHP,1:05-cv-08357-WHP,1:05-cv-08399-WHP(McCaw, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Michael Plotnick in Support of Defendants' Memo of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Memo of Law in Support of Lifting the PSLRA Discovery Stay in Opposition re: 29 MOTION Lifting PSLRA Discovery Stay The Chiumento Group's Memorandum of Law in Support of a Partial Lifting of the PSLRA's automatic Stay Provision., 25 MOTION Lifting PSLRA Discovery Stay MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF POSITION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 642 ANNUITY TRUST FUND AND JEFFREY WEBER IN FAVOR OF LIFTING PSLRA STAY TO PERMIT DISCOVERY OF CERTAIN CATEGORIES OF DOCUMENTS.. Document filed by Smith Barney Fund Management LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP,1:05-cv-07818-WHP,1:05-cv-08356-WHP,1:05-cv-08357-WHP,1:05-cv-08399-WHP(McCaw, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 29 MOTION Lifting PSLRA Discovery Stay The Chiumento Group's Memorandum of Law in Support of a Partial Lifting of the PSLRA's automatic Stay Provision., 25 MOTION Lifting PSLRA Discovery Stay MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF POSITION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 642 ANNUITY TRUST FUND AND JEFFREY WEBER IN FAVOR OF LIFTING PSLRA STAY TO PERMIT DISCOVERY OF CERTAIN CATEGORIES OF DOCUMENTS.. Document filed by Smith Barney Fund Management LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-07583-WHP,1:05-cv-07818-WHP,1:05-cv-08356-WHP,1:05-cv-08357-WHP,1:05-cv-08399-WHP(McCaw, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER that purs. to FRCP 42(a) the actions, 05cv7583, 05cv7818, 05cv8356, 05cv8357, 05cv8399, are consolidated for all purposes under the caption " In re Smith Barney Transfer Agent Litigation, civ. action 05cv7583(WHP)". (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley III on 12/28/05) (dle, ) (Entered: 01/03/2006)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER No. 2: that the parties shall file and serve their opening memoranda, if any, by 12/23/05; the parties shall file and serve their opposition, if any, by 1/6/06; (on the issue of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (the "Lead Plaintiff/Counsel Issue"); plaintiffs shall file and serve their opposition, if any, by 12/29/05; parties shall file and serve their reply, if any, by 1/6/06; Oral argument on both the Discovery Stay Issue and the Lead Plaintiff/Counsel Issue will be held on 1/13/06 @12:00 p.m. before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley III on 12/21/05) (pl, ) (Entered: 12/28/2005)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2005 10:00 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley III on 11/17/05) (jco, ) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Bruce McCaw on behalf of all defendants (McCaw, Robert) (Entered: 11/09/2005)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge William H. Pauley, III. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (jeh, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/12/2005 (jeh, ). (Entered: 10/12/2005)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Smith Barney Fund Management LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 250.00, Receipt Number 556692)Document filed by Seymour Ratner.(kco, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2005 (kco, ). (Entered: 09/29/2005)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 99 times.

                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?