National Labor Relations Board v. Newman Livestock 11, Inc.
Federal Court Proceeding California Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:13-mc-00007-SAB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 20, 2016 at 5:49 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Status of Action Within 10 Days, Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/13/2013. (Arellano, S.)
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER requiring obedience to subpoena duces tecum signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 5/8/2013. (Hernandez, M)
      LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 20 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?