USA v. Poveda-Ortega et al
Criminal Case Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:10-cr-00073-K

Tags

Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd.

This docket is featured in the May 29, 2018 article Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd..

Last Updated November 10, 2016 at 4:09 AM ST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rick Alan Calvert-DOJ, Jr +1 214 659 8675 rick.calvert@usdoj.gov
Space Brian D. Harrison +1 703 299 3700 brian.harrison@usdoj.gov
Space Mark A Irish +1 202 514 1263 mark.irish2@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo FNU LNU 1, Defendant
No Logo FNU LNU 2, Defendant
No Logo Harold Mauricio Poveda-Ortega, Defendant
No Logo Horley Rengifo-Pareja, Defendant
No Logo Jenny Vivian Hurtado-Beltran, Defendant
No Logo Joaquin Alejandro Senderos-Higuera, Defendant
No Logo Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza, Defendant
No Logo Tito Miller Parra-Isaza, Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Dallas
Filed 3/24/2010
County Dallas
Terminated 7/10/2013
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 963=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21963 CONSPIRACY TO IMPORT FIVE KILOGRAMS OR MORE OF COCAINE
Count 2
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 963=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21963 ATTEMPT TO IMPORT FIVE KILOGRAMS OR MORE OF COCAINE
Count 84
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 853.F
Offense Level 4
21853(a)(1) and (2) and 18982(a)(1) FORFEITURE ALLEGATION
Defendant Custody Status
Flag DFTTERM
  Entries (99) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: 9/27/2016 Warrant Returned
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 6/5/2015 as to Horley Rengifo-Pareja. (trk)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: 2/2/2016 CJA 20 - Order to Appoint or Pay Attorney in Non-DP CaseCourt Filing
    (Document Restricted) CJA 20 Order authorizing payment to attorney. Payment of $9,503.30 per voucher number 160125000006 made to Carolyn Hill in case as to Horley Rengifo-Pareja. For information regarding this document, please write to: US District Court, Attention: Finance Department, 1100 Commerce St., Rm. 1452, Dallas, TX 75242. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/21/2016) (ykp)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: 11/2/2015 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [112] Motion to Dismiss as to FNU LNU (6). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/2/2015) (axm)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: 10/29/2015 Motion to Dismiss
        MOTION to Dismiss Indictment as to Defendant FNU LNU, a.k.a. El Mono filed by USA as to FNU LNU (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Irish, Mark)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: 10/20/2015 CJA 20 - Order to Appoint or Pay Attorney in Non-DP CaseCourt Filing
          (Document Restricted) CJA 20 Order authorizing payment to attorney. Payment of $6728.20 per voucher number 151019000052 made to Hugo Aguilar in case as to Tito Miller Parra-Isaza. For information regarding this document, please write to: US District Court, Attention: Finance Department, 1100 Commerce St., Rm. 1452, Dallas, TX 75242. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/14/2015) (jrr)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: 9/25/2015 Scheduling Order - SentencingCourt Filing
            ELECTRONIC Amended Sentencing Scheduling Order as to Horley Rengifo-Pareja: Presentence Investigation Report due by 11/6/2015. Objections to Presentence Investigation Report due by 11/10/2015. Presentence Investigation Addendum due by 11/13/2015. Objections to Presentence Investigation Addendum due by 11/16/2015. Sentencing reset for 11/18/2015 09:30 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/25/2015) (chmb)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: 9/24/2015 Judgment*Court Filing
              JUDGMENT Tito Miller Parra-Isaza (7), Count(s) 17-29, 30, 4-16, 84, Dismissed on the Government's Motion; Count(s) 3, Defendant sentenced to 63 Months Custody of the Bureau of Prisons. The defendant shall receive Credit for Time Served in Mexican Custody from the date of the Indictment, 3/24/2010; No term of Supervised Release Ordered; MSA $100.00. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/23/2015) (bdb)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: 9/23/2015 Order Accepting Report and Recommendations on Guilty PleaCourt Filing
                ORDER ACCEPTING [103] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONCERNING PLEA OF GUILTY as to Horley Rengifo-Pareja. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/23/2015) (tln)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: 9/23/2015 SentencingCourt Filing
                  ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ed Kinkeade: Sentencing held on 9/23/2015 for Tito Miller Parra-Isaza (7) on Count 3. Defendant sentenced to 63 Months Custody of the Bureau of Prisons. The defendant shall receive Credit for Time Served in Mexican Custody from the date of the Indictment, March 24, 2010. No term of Supervised Release Ordered. MSA $100.00. The remaining Counts of the Indictment filed on March 24, 2010, (Counts 17-29, 30, 4-16, and 84), are Dismissed on the Government's Motion. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Mark Irish; Defense - Hugo Aguilar. (Court Reporter: Todd Anderson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :30. (Interpreter Alma Adriano.) (chmb)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: 9/9/2015 Scheduling Order - SentencingCourt Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER FOR SENTENCING as to Horley Rengifo-Pareja: Presentence Investigation Report due by 11/18/2015. Objections to Presentence Investigation Report due by 12/2/2015. Presentence Investigation Addendum due by 12/9/2015. Objections to Presentence Investigation Addendum due by 12/16/2015. Sentencing set for 12/23/2015 09:30 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/9/2015) (tln)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Report and Recommendation on Guilty PleaCourt Filing
                      Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea as to Horley Rengifo-Pareja re: [102] Consent Regarding Entry of a Plea of Guilty. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 9/8/2015) (tln)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Consent Regarding Entry of a Plea of Guilty
                        NOTICE/CONSENT REGARDING ENTRY OF A PLEA OF GUILTY as to Horley Rengifo-Pareja. (tln)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Rearraignment/Guilty Plea at Arraignment HearingCourt Filing
                          ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney: Rearraignment Hearing as to Horley Rengifo-Pareja held on 9/8/2015. Plea entered by Horley Rengifo-Pareja (2) Guilty Count 3. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Mark Irish; Defense - Carolyn Hill. (Court Reporter: Shawnie Archuleta) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :11. (Interpreter Alma Adriano.) (mcrd)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: 9/3/2015 Order Setting Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
                            ELECTRONIC ORDER as to Tito Miller Parra-Isaza: Sentencing reset for 9/23/2015 09:30 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/3/2015) (chmb)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: 8/11/2015 Order Setting Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
                              ELECTRONIC ORDER as to Horley Rengifo-Pareja: Rearraignment set for 9/8/2015 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/11/2015) (chmb)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015 Plea Agreement
                                PLEA AGREEMENT as to Horley Rengifo-Pareja (Irish, Mark)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015 Factual Resume
                                  Factual Resume as to Horley Rengifo-Pareja (Irish, Mark)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: 7/16/2015 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE in the Interest of Justice as to Horley Rengifo-Pareja. Time excluded from 8/17/2015 until 11/2/2015. Pretrial Motions due by 9/16/2015. Responses due by 9/23/2015. Pretrial Materials due by 10/19/2015. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/16/2015) (ndt)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: 7/16/2015 Motion to Continue
                                      First MOTION to Continue filed by Horley Rengifo-Pareja (Hill, Carolyn)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/24/2015 CJA 20 - Order to Appoint or Pay Attorney in Non-DP CaseCourt Filing
                                        CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the Attorney Timekeeping System immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the CJA Attorney Information page or use the directory to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/18/2015) (skt)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 84 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                          ORDER as to Horley Rengifo-Pareja(2): Before the Court is Movant Camille Knight's [83] Unopposed Motion to Withdraw filed on 6/12/2012. The Motion is GRANTED. Camille Knight and the Office of the Federal Public Defendant are hereby allowed to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Rengifo-Pareja and are relieved of any further duties and obligations to Defendant Rengifo-Pareja. Further, Carolyn Hill is hereby appointed as counsel for Defendant Rengifo-Pareja. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/18/2015) (bdb)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 83 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015, Terminated: 6/18/2015 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Horley Rengifo-Pareja (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Knight-FPD, Camille)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 82 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/10/2015 Order Accepting Report and Recommendations on Guilty PleaCourt Filing
                                            ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONCERNING PLEA OF GUILTY (doc. [72]) as to Tito Miller Parra-Isaza. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/10/2015) (ctf)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 81 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                              PRETRIAL ORDER as to Horley Rengifo-Pareja: This case is set for jury trial on Monday, 8/17/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade. Motions due by 7/15/2015. Responses due by 7/29/2015. Pretrial Materials due by 8/3/2015. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/9/2015) (ctf)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 80 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Arraignment/Not GuiltyCourt Filing
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L Horan: Arraignment as to Horley Rengifo-Pareja (2) Count 1,2,3,4-16,17-29,30-31,32,33,34-59,60-83,84 held on 6/8/2015. Plea entered by Horley Rengifo-Pareja: Not Guilty on counts 1-84. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Walt Junker; Defense - Camille Knight. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :01. (Interpreter Alma Adriano.) (ctf)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 79 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                  DETENTION ORDER as to Horley Rengifo-Pareja. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L Horan on 6/8/2015) (ctf)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 78 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Waiver of Detention Hearing
                                                    WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Horley Rengifo-Pareja. (ctf)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 77 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Order Appointing Public DefenderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Horley Rengifo-Pareja. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L Horan on 6/8/2015) (ctf)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                        (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Horley Rengifo-Pareja. (ctf)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document 75 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L Horan: Initial Appearance as to Horley Rengifo-Pareja held on 6/8/2015. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Walt Junker; Defense - Camille Knight. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :06. (Interpreter Alma Adriano.) (ctf)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 74 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015, Terminated: 6/8/2015 motion for detention
                                                            First MOTION for Detention filed by USA as to Horley Rengifo-Pareja with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Junker-DOJ - DALLAS, Walt)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Arrest
                                                              Arrest of Horley Rengifo-Pareja. (ctf)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Defendant On/Off Fugitive Status (3998)
                                                                Defendant removed from 3998 status: Horley Rengifo-Pareja Returned to Judge Ed Kinkeade. (ctf)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 73 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015 Scheduling Order - SentencingCourt Filing
                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER FOR SENTENCING as to Tito Miller Parra-Isaza: Presentence Investigation Report due by 8/5/2015. Objections to Presentence Investigation Report due by 8/19/2015. Presentence Investigation Addendum due by 8/26/2015. Objections to Presentence Investigation Addendum due by 9/2/2015. Sentencing set for 9/9/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/26/2015) (twd)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 72 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: 5/26/2015, Terminated: 6/10/2015 Report and Recommendation on Guilty PleaCourt Filing
                                                                    Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea as to Tito Miller Parra-Isaza re: [71] Consent Regarding Entry of a Plea of Guilty. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/26/2015) (tln)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 71 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: 5/26/2015 Consent Regarding Entry of a Plea of Guilty
                                                                      NOTICE/CONSENT REGARDING ENTRY OF A PLEA OF GUILTY as to Tito Miller Parra-Isaza. (tln)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: 5/26/2015 Rearraignment/Guilty Plea at Arraignment HearingCourt Filing
                                                                        ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver: Rearraignment Hearing as to Tito Miller Parra-Isaza held on 5/26/2015. Plea entered by Tito Miller Parra-Isaza (7) Guilty Count 3 of the Indictment. Defendant remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Mark Irish; Defense - Hugo Aguilar. (Court Reporter: Shawnie Archuleta) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :27. (Interpreter Michael Mahler.) (mcrd)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015 Order Setting Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER as to Tito Miller Parra-Isaza: Rearraignment Hearing is hereby set for 5/26/2015 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/12/2015) (chmb)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 67 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/11/2015 Plea Agreement
                                                                            PLEA AGREEMENT as to Tito Miller Parra-Isaza (Irish, Mark)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 66 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/11/2015 Factual Resume
                                                                              Factual Resume as to Tito Miller Parra-Isaza (Irish, Mark)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 65 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: 4/22/2015 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE (doc. [64]) as to Tito Miller Parra-Isaza: The court finds that the provisions of 18 U.S.C. ยง 3161(h)(7)(A) and (B)(iv) are satisfied and accordingly, the motion is GRANTED. It is therefore ordered that the trial of the case is reset from 5/4/2015 to 10/19/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade. Motions due by 9/9/2015. Responses due by 9/23/2015. Pretrial Materials due by 10/5/2015. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/22/2015) (ctf)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 64 Filed: 4/18/2015, Entered: 4/18/2015, Terminated: 4/22/2015 Motion to Continue
                                                                                  First MOTION to Continue ("Defendant's Motion for Extension of Pre-Trial Motions Deadline and Trial") filed by Tito Miller Parra-Isaza (Aguilar, Hugo) Modified title on 4/20/2015 (awc).
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 62 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/3/2015 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to Joaquin Alejandro Senderos-Higuera (8): Before the Court is the Government's Motion to Dismiss the Indictment as to Defendant Joaquin Alejandro Senderos-Higuera (doc. [59]), filed on 4/1/2015. The Court is of the opinion the motion has merit and it is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Indictment as to Defendant Joaquin Alejandro Senderos-Higuera, is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/2/2015) (ctf)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/2/2015 Notice of Correction of Signature Omission
                                                                                      Notice of Correction of Signature Omission, correcting signature omission in [58] Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA by USA as to Harold Mauricio Poveda-Ortega, Horley Rengifo-Pareja, Jenny Vivian Hurtado-Beltran, Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza, FNU LNU, FNU LNU, Tito Miller Parra-Isaza, Joaquin Alejandro Senderos-Higuera. (Grosnoff, Nicole)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 60 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/2/2015 Notice of Correction of Signature Omission
                                                                                        Notice of Correction of Signature Omission, correcting signature omission in [57] Notice of Substitution of Counsel - AUSA - AFPD, by USA as to Harold Mauricio Poveda-Ortega, Horley Rengifo-Pareja, Jenny Vivian Hurtado-Beltran, Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza, FNU LNU, FNU LNU, Tito Miller Parra-Isaza, Joaquin Alejandro Senderos-Higuera. (Grosnoff, Nicole)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 59 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: 4/1/2015, Terminated: 4/2/2015 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                          First MOTION to Dismiss Indictment as to Defendant Senderos filed by USA as to Joaquin Alejandro Senderos-Higuera (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Grosnoff, Nicole)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: 4/1/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nicole Shawna Grosnoff appearing for USA . (Attachments: # (1) Additional Page(s)) (Grosnoff, Nicole)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 57 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: 4/1/2015 Notice of Substitution of Counsel - AUSA - AFPD
                                                                                            Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA in case as to Harold Mauricio Poveda-Ortega, Horley Rengifo-Pareja, Jenny Vivian Hurtado-Beltran, Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza, FNU LNU, FNU LNU, Tito Miller Parra-Isaza, Joaquin Alejandro Senderos-Higuera. Nicole Shawna Grosnoff added as AUSA. (Grosnoff, Nicole)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Defendant On/Off Fugitive Status (3998)
                                                                                              Defendant removed from 3998 status: Joaquin Alejandro Senderos-Higuera Returned to Judge Ed Kinkeade. (ctf)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Defendant On/Off Fugitive Status (3998)
                                                                                                Defendant removed from 3998 status: Joaquin Alejandro Senderos-Higuera Returned to Judge Ed Kinkeade. (ctf)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Legal Document 52 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: 2/27/2015 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  PRETRIAL ORDER as to Tito Miller Parra-Isaza: This case is set for jury trial on Monday, 5/4/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade. Motions due by 3/25/2015. Responses due by 4/8/2015. Pretrial Materials due by 4/20/2015. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/27/2015) (ctf)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 51 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Warrant Returned
                                                                                                    Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 2/20/2015 as to Tito Miller Parra-Isaza. (ctf)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Arraignment/Not GuiltyCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez: Arraignment as to Tito Miller Parra-Isaza (7) Counts 3, 4-16, 17-29, 30 held on 2/25/2015. Plea entered by Tito Miller Parra-Isaza: Not Guilty on count(s) 3-30. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Rick Calvert; Defense - Hugo Aguilar. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :01. (Interpreter Alma Adriano.) (ctf)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Waiver of Detention Hearing
                                                                                                        WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Tito Miller Parra-Isaza. (ctf)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 48 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 CJA 20 - Order to Appoint or Pay Attorney in Non-DP CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                          CJA 20 Order appointing attorney Hugo Aguilar. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the Attorney Timekeeping System immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the CJA Attorney Information page or use the directory to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 2/25/2015) (ctf)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                            (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Tito Miller Parra-Isaza. (ctf)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 46 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez: Initial Appearance as to Tito Miller Parra-Isaza held on 2/25/2015. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Rick Calvert; Defense - Hugo Aguilar. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :05. (Interpreter Alma Adriano.) (ctf)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 45 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 2/25/2015 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER OF DETENTION as to Tito Miller Parra-Isaza. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 2/25/2015) (mcrd)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 44 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 2/25/2015, Terminated: 2/25/2015 motion for detention
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Detention filed by USA as to Tito Miller Parra-Isaza (Calvert-DOJ, Rick)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Defendant On/Off Fugitive Status (3998)
                                                                                                                    Defendant removed from 3998 status: Tito Miller Parra-Isaza Returned to Judge Ed Kinkeade. (ctf)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Defendant On/Off Fugitive Status (3998)
                                                                                                                      Defendant removed from 3998 status: Tito Miller Parra-Isaza Returned to Judge Ed Kinkeade. (ctf)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                        Arrest of Tito Miller Parra-Isaza. (mcrd)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 43 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 Judgment Returned Executed
                                                                                                                          Judgment Returned Executed as to Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza on 12/20/2013 to Dally. (tln)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Defendant On/Off Fugitive Status (3998)
                                                                                                                            Defendant moved to 3998 status: Horley Rengifo-Pareja, Jenny Vivian Hurtado-Beltran, FNU LNU, FNU LNU, Tito Miller Parra-Isaza, Joaquin Alejandro Senderos-Higuera Assigned to Unassigned VJDistrict. Judge Ed Kinkeade no longer assigned to the case. (axm)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 8/29/2013 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                              JUDGMENT as to Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza (4), Count(s) 1, 40 Months BOP; No Supervised Release Ordered. $100.00 MSA; Count(s) 2, 32, 34-59, 60-83, 84, Dismissed on the Government's Motion. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/29/2013) (ctf)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 SentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ed Kinkeade: Sentencing held on 8/28/2013 for Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza (4) on Count 1 to 40 Months BOP; No Supervised Release Ordered. $100.00 MSA. Counts 2, 32, 34-59, 60-83, 84, are Dismissed on the Government's Motion. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Mark Irish; Defense - John Hunter Smith and Thomas Plas Wynne. (Court Reporter: Charyse Crawford) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :40. (chmb)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: 5/8/2013 Order Accepting Report and Recommendations on Guilty PleaCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Order Accepting [26] Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea as to Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/8/2013) (axm)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: 4/23/2013 Scheduling Order - SentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER FOR SENTENCING as to Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza: Presentence Investigation Report due by 6/26/2013. Objections to Presentence Investigation Report due by 7/10/2013. Presentence Investigation Addendum due by 7/24/2013. Objections to Presentence Investigation Addendum due by 8/7/2013. Sentencing set for 8/28/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/23/2013) (ctf)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: 4/23/2013, Terminated: 5/8/2013 Report and Recommendation on Guilty PleaCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Plea of Guilty as to Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza re: [25] Notice Regarding Entry of a Plea of Guilty. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 4/23/2013) (ctf)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: 4/23/2013 Consent Regarding Entry of a Plea of Guilty
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE REGARDING ENTRY OF A PLEA OF GUILTY as to Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza. (ctf)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Rearraignment/Guilty Plea at Arraignment Hearing
                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez: Rearraignment Hearing as to Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza held on 4/23/2013. Plea entered by Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza (4) Guilty Count 1. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Mark Irish; Defense - Thomas Wynee. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :27. (Interpreter Monica Munera.) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Rearraignment/Guilty Plea at Arraignment Hearing
                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez: Rearraignment Hearing as to Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza held on 4/23/2013. Plea entered by Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza (4) Guilty Count 1. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Mark Irish; Defense - Thomas Wynee. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :27. (Interpreter Monica Munera.) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Rearraignment/Guilty Plea at Arraignment Hearing
                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez: Rearraignment Hearing as to Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza held on 4/23/2013. Plea entered by Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza (4) Guilty Count 1. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Mark Irish; Defense - Thomas Wynee. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :27. (Interpreter Monica Munera.) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Rearraignment/Guilty Plea at Arraignment Hearing
                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez: Rearraignment Hearing as to Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza held on 4/23/2013. Plea entered by Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza (4) Guilty Count 1. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Mark Irish; Defense - Thomas Wynee. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :27. (Interpreter Monica Munera.) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: 4/9/2013 Order Setting Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER as to Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza: Rearraignment is hereby set for 4/23/2013 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/9/2013) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: 4/8/2013 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                                                                    PLEA AGREEMENT as to Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza. (ykp)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: 4/8/2013 Factual Resume
                                                                                                                                                      Factual Resume as to Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza. (ykp)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interest of Justice as to Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza. Time excluded from 1/22/12 until 5/13/13. Motions due by 3/13/2013. Responses due by 3/27/2013. Pretrial Materials due by 5/3/2013. Jury Trial set for 5/13/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/21/2012) (ndt)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: 12/17/2012, Terminated: 12/21/2012 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Continue Final Pretrial Conference, Pretrial Order and Scheduling Order filed by Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Smith, John)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: 12/13/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Hunter Smith appearing for Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Smith, John)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Warrant Returned
                                                                                                                                                              Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 11/15/2012 as to Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza. (cea)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: 11/19/2012 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                PRETRIAL ORDER as to Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza: Jury Trial set for 1/22/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade. Pretrial Motions due by 12/19/2012. Responses due by 1/2/2013. Pretrial Materials due by 1/11/2013. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/19/2012) (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: 11/19/2012 Arraignment/Not GuiltyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez: Arraignment as to Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza (4) Count 1,2,32,34-59,60-83 held on 11/16/2012. Plea entered by Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza: Not Guilty on counts 1,2,32,34-59,60-83. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Suzanna Etessam; Defense - Thomas Wynne. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :01. (Interpreter Yovanna Gonzalez.) (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: 11/19/2012 Waiver of Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza. (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: 11/19/2012 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez: Initial Appearance as to Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza held on 11/16/2012. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Suzanna Etessam; Defense - Thomas Wynne. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :05. (Interpreter Yovanna Gonzalez.) (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: 11/19/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Thomas Plas Wynne appearing for Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza. (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: 11/16/2012 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF DETENTION as to Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 11/16/2012) (mcrd)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: 11/16/2012, Terminated: 11/16/2012 motion for detention
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza (Harrison, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                              Arrest of Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza (mcrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: 8/21/2012 Order on Motion to Unseal CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [8] Motion to Unseal Indictment as to Harold Mauricio Poveda-Ortega (1), Horley Rengifo-Pareja (2), Jenny Vivian Hurtado-Beltran (3), Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza (4), FNU LNU (5), FNU LNU (6), Tito Miller Parra-Isaza (7), Joaquin Alejandro Senderos-Higuera (8). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/21/2012) (ctf)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: 8/21/2012, Terminated: 8/21/2012 Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Unseal Case filed by USA as to Harold Mauricio Poveda-Ortega, Horley Rengifo-Pareja, Jenny Vivian Hurtado-Beltran, Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza, FNU LNU, FNU LNU, Tito Miller Parra-Isaza, Joaquin Alejandro Senderos-Higuera. (ctf)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: 8/21/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark A Irish appearing for USA. (ctf)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: 8/21/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brian D Harrison appearing for USA. (ctf)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: 8/21/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by USA as to Harold Mauricio Poveda-Ortega, Horley Rengifo-Pareja, Jenny Vivian Hurtado-Beltran, Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza, FNU LNU, FNU LNU, Tito Miller Parra-Isaza, Joaquin Alejandro Senderos-Higuera. (ctf)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Indictment Unsealed
                                                                                                                                                                                          INDICTMENT UNSEALED per [9] Order as to Harold Mauricio Poveda-Ortega, Horley Rengifo-Pareja, Jenny Vivian Hurtado-Beltran, Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza, FNU LNU, FNU LNU, Tito Miller Parra-Isaza, Joaquin Alejandro Senderos-Higuera. (ctf)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Indictment Unsealed
                                                                                                                                                                                            INDICTMENT UNSEALED per [9] Order as to Harold Mauricio Poveda-Ortega, Horley Rengifo-Pareja, Jenny Vivian Hurtado-Beltran, Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza, FNU LNU, FNU LNU, Tito Miller Parra-Isaza, Joaquin Alejandro Senderos-Higuera. (ctf)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 Order on Motion to Unseal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [3] MOTION for Limited Unsealing of the Indictment and Arrest Warrants as to Harold Mauricio Poveda-Ortega (1), Horley Rengifo-Pareja (2), Jenny Vivian Hurtado-Beltran (3), Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza (4), FNU LNU (5), FNU LNU (6), Tito Miller Parra-Isaza (7), Joaquin Alejandro Senderos-Higuera (8). (see order) (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/15/2010) (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 Motion to Unseal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Limited Unsealing of the Indictment and Arrest Warrants filed by USA as to Harold Mauricio Poveda-Ortega, Horley Rengifo-Pareja, Jenny Vivian Hurtado-Beltran, Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza, FNU LNU, FNU LNU, Tito Miller Parra-Isaza, Joaquin Alejandro Senderos-Higuera. (mcr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/25/2010 Indictment -Sealed
                                                                                                                                                                                                  INDICTMENT as to Harold Mauricio Poveda-Ortega (1) count(s) 1, 2, 84, Horley Rengifo-Pareja (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4-16, 17-29, 30-31, 32, 33, 34-59, 60-83, 84, Jenny Vivian Hurtado-Beltran (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 32, 84, Roberto Mario Angulo-Isaza (4) count(s) 1, 2, 32, 34-59, 60-83, 84, FNU LNU (5) count(s) 1, 2, 32, 34-59, 60-83, 84, FNU LNU (6) count(s) 3, 4-16, 17-29, 30, 84, Tito Miller Parra-Isaza (7) count(s) 3, 4-16, 17-29, 30, 84, Joaquin Alejandro Senderos-Higuera (8) count(s) 3, 4-16, 17-29, 30, 84. (dnc) Modified title on 8/21/2012 (ctf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 760 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?