Smith v. The City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-02900
District Judge J. Paul Oetken, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 25, 2017 at 11:10 PM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kennedy Berg LLP, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Andrew Smith"

Toggle Switch Represented by WylieLaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Benjamin Cohen +1 212 566 8000 +1 212 202 4952 sam@wylielaw.com
v.
No Logo JOHN DOES 1-12, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Esposito, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
New York City Police Chief (Retired) Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Kenneth O'Donnell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
New York City Police Detective Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mayor Michael R. Bloomberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Raymond W Kelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
New York City Police Commissioner Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that: 1. The above-referenced action is hereby dismissed with prejudice; and 2. Notwithstanding the dismissal of this action in accordance with this agreement, the District Court shall continue to maintain jurisdiction over this action for the purpose of enforcing the terms of the settlement agreement reached between the parties and set forth in the Stipulation of Settlement executed by the parties in this matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/03/2013) (ama) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Joseph Esposito, Raymond W. Kelly, Kenneth O'Donnell, The City of New York.(Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      PROTECTIVE ORDER: Regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 9/10/2013) (ama) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: The parties shall appear for a settlement conference before the undersigned on October 22, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 21-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Formal discovery shall be stayed until that time, with the exception of any informal discovery agreed to by the parties. The Court's "Standing Order for All Cases Referred for Settlement to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott" is enclosed and is incorporated herein by reference. Please read the Standing Order carefully. The parties are directed to pay particular attention to paragraph 4, which sets forth who must appear at the conference on behalf of a government party. The parties should also note that paragraph 3 of the Standing Order requires ex parte written submissions, which must be received by the Court no later than five (5) business days before the conference, that is, October 15, 2013, and that paragraph 5 requires the Acknowledgment Form be submitted together with the ex parte settlement letter. The parties should also provide the Court with a videotape of the incident referred to in the Complaint. Notwithstanding the instructions in the Standing Order, the parties should email (rather than fax) these materials to CottNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. Finally, paragraph 3 requires that if Plaintiff has not already made a demand, he must do so no later than 14 days prior to the conference and Defendants shall respond no later than 7 days thereafter. (Settlement Conference set for 10/22/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 21D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 8/21/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Joseph Esposito served on 7/25/2013, answer due 8/15/2013. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Andrew Smith. (Myers, Isaac) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER FOR CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 16: This action is scheduled for an initial case management conference in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a), on August 21, 2013 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 21-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2013 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 21D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 7/24/2013) (ama) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/22/2013) (ama) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Raymond W. Kelly, Kenneth O'Donnell, The City of New York.(Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Raymond W. Kelly served on 5/13/2013, answer due 6/3/2013. Service was accepted by Vanessa Castellina, Legal Bureau. Document filed by Andrew Smith. (Myers, Isaac) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Kenneth O'Donnell served on 5/13/2013, answer due 6/3/2013. Service was accepted by Vanessa Castellina, Legal Bureau. Document filed by Andrew Smith. (Myers, Isaac) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                      COMPLAINT against Michael R. Bloomberg, John Does 1-12, Joseph Esposito, Raymond W. Kelly, Kenneth O'Donnell, The City of New York. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401066206)Document filed by Andrew Smith.(cde) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 82 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?