Queen et al v. Alvarez et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-03483
District Judge Amy J. St. Eve, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 24, 2017 at 5:41 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Andre J.W. Queen, Sr., Plaintiff
No Logo Maria Queen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Nicholas Howard +1 312 443 0333 +1 312 896 6433 whoward@lockelord.com

Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ENTERED JUDGMENT Signed by the Deputy Clerk on 9/25/2013:Mailed notice(kef, ) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/25/2013:Mailed notice(kef, ) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The Court grants Defendants' Rule 12(b)(1) motion to dismiss 21 and dismisses this lawsuit in its entirety. All pending dates and deadlines are stricken. Civil case terminated. [For further details, see separate Memorandum Opinion and Order.] Mailed notice (kef, ) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        REPLY by Defendants Anita Alvarez, Robert Berlin to motion to dismiss 21 (Baker, Sisavanh) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
          RESPONSE by Andre J.W. Queen, Sr, Maria Queenin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Robert Berlin, Anita Alvarez to dismiss complaint 21 Supplemental (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The Court directs Plaintiffs to file a supplemental brief in response to Defendants' motion to dismiss in light of the Illinois Senate and Assembly overriding Illinois Governor Quinn's amendatory veto of the concealed carry bill by no later than 7/17/13. Defendants' reply brief is due on or before 7/31/13. Mailed notice (kef, ) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              RESPONSE by Andre J.W. Queen, Sr, Maria Queenin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Robert Berlin, Anita Alvarez to dismiss complaint 21 (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Defendants' motion to dismiss 21 is entered. Response by 6/28/13. Reply by 7/29/13. Joint status report deadline is stricken. Status hearing set for 6/20/13 is stricken and reset to 9/30/13 at 8:30 a.m. No appearance is required on the 6/11/13 notice date. Mailed notice (kef, ) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Motion by Sisavanh Baccam Baker for presentment of motion to dismiss 21 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/11/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Baker, Sisavanh) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                    LREF
                    Blank 23
                      LREF
                      Blank 22 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Motion by Sisavanh Baccam Baker for presentment of motion to dismiss 21 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/11/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Baker, Sisavanh) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                        LREF
                        Blank 22
                          LREF
                          Blank 21 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                          MOTION by Defendants Robert Berlin, Anita Alvarez to dismiss complaint (Baker, Sisavanh) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                            LREF
                            Blank 21
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Anita Alvarez by Kent Stephen Ray (Ray, Kent) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Anita Alvarez by Sisavanh Baccam Baker (Baker, Sisavanh) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andre J.W. Queen, Sr, Maria Queen as to Robert Berlin on 5/17/2013, answer due 6/7/2013. (Howard, William) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Anita Alvarez by Paul Anthony Castiglione (Castiglione, Paul) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Robert Berlin by Gregory E. Vaci (Vaci, Gregory) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andre J.W. Queen, Sr, Maria Queen as to Anita Alvarez on 5/13/2013, answer due 6/3/2013. (Howard, William) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Andre J.W. Queen, Sr, Maria Queen by Nicole J. Moss (Moss, Nicole) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Andre J.W. Queen, Sr, Maria Queen by Peter A Patterson (Patterson, Peter) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Andre J.W. Queen, Sr, Maria Queen by David Henry Thompson (Thompson, David) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Andre J.W. Queen, Sr, Maria Queen by Charles J. Cooper (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motions for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs by Charles Cooper, David Thompson, Peter Patterson and Nicole Moss [ 6 ][ 7 ][ 8 ][ 9 ] are granted. Mailed notice. (et, ) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-8333139. (Moss, Nicole) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-8333108. (Patterson, Peter) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-8332938. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-8332747. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                            EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Andre J.W. Queen, Maria Queen [AMENDED EXHIBIT A] regarding complaint 3 (Howard, William) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Initial status hearing set for 6/20/13 at 8:30 a.m. in courtroom 1241. Parties shall refer to Judge St. Eve's web page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov and file a joint status report by 6/17/13 as set forth in the Initial Status Conferences procedure. Mailed notice (kef, ) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                COMPLAINT [Receipt - 0752-8330751] filed by Andre J.W. Queen, Maria Queen; (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Howard, William) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Andre J.W. Queen, Maria Queen by William Nicholas Howard (Howard, William) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    CIVIL Cover Sheet (Howard, William) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 175 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?