Kurtzman, et al v. Compaq Computer Corp, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:99-cv-00779
District Judge Melinda Harmon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 6, 2016 at 12:12 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cheng, Lee, Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Jeff Kurtzman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia M Hynes +1 212 594 5300

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sherrie R. Savett +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 ssavett@bm.net

Represented by Caddell & Chapman

Toggle Switch Represented by Emmons & Jackson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William B Emmons +1 713 522 4435 + 713 527 8850 bill@emmonsjackson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kohn Swift & Graf PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph C. Kohn +1 215 238 1700 +1 215 238 1968 jkohn@kohnswift.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Bernard M Gross PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Paul Frutkin +1 215 561 3600 +1 215 561 3000 rpf@bernardmgross.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Salvatore J Graziano +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sgraziano@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SAVETT FRUTKIN PODELL & RYAN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART H. SAVETT +1 215 923 5400 + 215 923 9353

Represented by Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, PC

No Logo Joaquin Demonet, Plaintiff
No Logo Joseph Perri, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert C Daniels, Plaintiff
No Logo The City of Philadelphia Through Its Board of Pensions & Retirement, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
v.
Compaq Computer Corporation Compaq Computer Corporation, Defendant
Unknown Role, Navisite, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Craig Smith +1 202 662 4768 +1 956 383 8209

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E Wurtz +1 212 450 4548 + 212 450 5575

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Loyd Carter +1 713 758 2124 +1 713 615 5307 jcarter@velaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karl S. Stern +1 713 758 3828 +1 713 615 5603 kstern@velaw.com
No Logo Earl L Mason, Defendant
No Logo Eckhard Pfeiffer, Defendant
No Logo Angel L Rosas, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

No Logo Barbara Virgo, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Betti Lidsky, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Leonard-Christo Vaccaro +1 305 822 2100
No Logo Dr. Robert W Bailey, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Aaron Solomon, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Claxton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger F Claxton +1 214 969 9029 +1 214 953 0583 roger@claxtonlaw.com
No Logo Individually Alan Smith, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Andrew Kesler +1 713 621 4900 + 713 621 5595
No Logo Individually Arnold Silverstein, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Behrad Nakhai, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Craig Houston, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually David Golan, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually David L Richards, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually David W Mazone, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Debbie Knobluth, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Bilek Law Firm, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Emerson Bilek +1 713 227 7720 +1 713 227 9404 tbilek@hb-legal.com
No Logo Individually Deborah A Dyckman, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Emanuel Catechis, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Emmons & Jackson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W Jackson +1 713 522 4435 +1 713 527 8850 daniel@emmonsjackson.com
No Logo Individually Gary Gilman, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S. Goldman +1 215 545 7200
No Logo Individually Herbert J Haas, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Hyman Schwartz, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Jeanne E Libit, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually John E Clark, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Joseph Cotroneo, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Julius Turner, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Justin M Vanderpot, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Laurence E Balfus, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Melissa McCue, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Michael Zelman, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Milton Applebaum, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Neil Gilligan, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Perry Dicaspri, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Richard J Kneebone, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Robert Honmyhr, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Robert Strougo, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Roslyn Applebaum, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Ruth Graifman, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Ruth L Kneebone, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Steven Kammerman, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by James N. Esterkin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth H Kilbride +1 713 255 2065 +1 713 520 0213 bjk@kilbridelaw.com
No Logo Individually Steven Ostrow, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Suzanne P Goodman, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Individually Warren Hills, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert G. Turner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel James Petroski, Jr. +1 713 305 5753 +1 281 859 8899 djpetroski@swbell.net
No Logo John Virgo, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Julius Graifman, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Theresa Malde, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo V Pinnock Bailey, II, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Virgo Family Trust, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Wayne Lee, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo W Mark Lanier, Movant

Represented by Berg & Androphy

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (94) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT: The consolidated putative class action is DISMISSED with prejudice under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9 and 12(b)(6) and the Privat e Securities Litigation Reform Act, entered. Parties ntfd. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (fmremp) (Entered: 04/01/2002)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/30/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defts' motion to dismiss Turner's Second Amended Class Action Complaint is GRANTED, entered. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (fmremp) (Entered: 04/01/2002)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: None
      Notice of change of address by Weinstein Kitchenoff Scarlato and Goldman Ltd (1845 Walnut Street, Suite 1100, Philadelphia, PA 19103) atty Gary Gilman , filed. (ljackson) (Entered: 02/21/2002)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: None
        Notice of change of address by Bernard Gross and Deborah Gross attorneys for Jeff Kurtzman, City of Philadelphia, Robert C Daniels , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 09/18/2001)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: None
          APPENDIX by Deft Compaq Computer Corp and the Individual Defts to its [88-1] Reply Memorandum in support of Renewed Motion to Dismiss (Section 10(b) Complaint, filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 05/02/2001)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: None
            REPLY MEMORANDUM by Deft Compaq Computer Corp and the Individual Defts in support of [79-1] motion to dismiss Section 11 Complaint, filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 05/02/2001)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: None
              REPLY MEMORANDUM by Deft Compaq Computer Corp and the Individual Defts in support of [76-1] renewed motion to dismiss Section 10(b) complaint, filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 05/02/2001)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/11/2001, Entered: None
                COMPENDIUM OF UNREPORTED AUTHORITY cited in Pltfs' [86-1] Memorandum of Law In Opposition to Defts' [76-1] renewed motion to dismiss The Kurtzman Action, filed. (Placed in Brown Expandable Folder) (fmremp) (Entered: 04/12/2001)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/11/2001, Entered: None
                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITON by Pltfs Jeff Kurtzman, etals to Defts' [76-1] renewed motion to dismiss The Kurtzman Action for Violations of The Securities Exchange Act of 1934, filed (fmremp) (Entered: 04/12/2001)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/11/2001, Entered: None
                    APPENDIX SECTION II COMPLAINT by Pltfs, filed (Placed in Brown Expandable Folder) (fmremp) Modified on 04/12/2001 (Entered: 04/12/2001)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/11/2001, Entered: None
                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION by Pltfs Jeff Kurtzman, etals to Defts' [79-1] renewed motion to dismiss Section 11 Complaint, filed (fmremp) Modified on 04/12/2001 (Entered: 04/12/2001)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [82-1] agreed motion to extend deadlines concerning defts' renewed motions to dismiss; Response to motion reset to 4/11/01 for [76-1] motion to dismiss Section 10(b) complaint, reset to 4/11/01 for [79-1] motion to dismiss Section 11 complaint , Motion Docket Date 4/11/01 [76-1] motion to dismiss Section 10(b) complaint, 4/11/01 [79-1] motion to dismiss Section 11 complaint , Reply to Response to Motion set to 5/2/01 for [76-1] motion to dismiss Section 10(b) complaint, set to 5/2/01 for [79-1] motion to dismiss Section 11 complaint , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 03/23/2001)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/21/2001, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/23/2001
                          AGREED MOTION to extend deadlines concerning defts' renewed motions to dismiss by Jeff Kurtzman, City of Philadelphia, et al and Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer et al, filed. (sguevara) (Entered: 03/21/2001)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: None
                            SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION in support of Defts' [79-1] Renewed Motion to Dismiss Section 11 complaint by Compaq Computer Corp, filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 03/16/2001)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: None
                              MEMORANDUM by Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer, Earl L Mason in support of their [79-1] renewed motion to dismiss Section 11 complaint , filed (ltien) (Entered: 03/09/2001)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: None
                                RENEWED MOTION to dismiss Section 11 complaint by Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer, Earl L Mason, Motion Docket Date 3/27/01 [79-1] motion , filed. (ltien) (Entered: 03/09/2001)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: None
                                  APPENDIX by Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer, Earl L Mason to their [76-1] renewed motion to dismiss Section 10(b) complaint , filed. (ltien) (Entered: 03/09/2001)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: None
                                    MEMORANDUM by Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer, Earl L Mason in support of of their [76-1] renewed motion to dismiss Section 10(b) complaint , filed (ltien) (Entered: 03/09/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: None
                                      RENEWED MOTION to dismiss Section 10(b) complaint by Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer, Earl L Mason, Motion Docket Date 3/27/01 [76-1] motion , filed. (ltien) Modified on 03/23/2001 (Entered: 03/09/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/19/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER: granting Defts' [74-1] motion to extend time within which to move or otherwise respond to pltfs second consolidated and amended class action complaint reset answer due for 3/7/01 for Earl L Mason, for Eckhard Pfeiffer, for Compaq Computer Corp , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (fmremp) Modified on 02/23/2001 (Entered: 02/20/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/19/2001
                                          UNOPPOSED MOTION to extend time within which to move or otherwise respond to pltfs second consolidated and amended class action complaint , by Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer, Earl L Mason, Motion Docket Date 2/28/01 [74-1] motion , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 02/08/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                            SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Pltfs Jeff Kurtzman, etals, amending [1-1] complaint, filed. (per letter of Attorney Michael A Cadell, the Amended Class Acton Complaint filed in the Turner action on 1/31/01 was filed in error) (fmremp) (Entered: 02/05/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: None
                                              SECOND CONSOLIDATED AND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Pltfs Jeff Kurtzman, etals ,(Answer due 2/10/01 for Compaq Computer Corp, for Eckhard Pfeiffer, for Earl L Mason ) amending [1-1] complaint, filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 01/31/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: None
                                                AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Pltf Jeff Kurtzman ,(Answer due 2/10/01 for Michael J Winkler, for Compaq Computer Corp, for Eckhard Pfeiffer, for Earl L Mason, for William D Strecker ) amending [1-1] complaint, filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 01/31/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/27/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER entered GRANTING the [68-1] motion for extension of time until 1/31/01 to file amended Kurtzman Complaint. The deadline for filing the Kurtzman complaint is extended to 1/31/01 . Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (psmith) (Entered: 12/27/2000)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/27/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER entered GRANTING Pltfs [67-1] motion for extension of time to file amended Turner complaint. The deadline for filing the Turner amended complaint is extended to 1/31/01 ; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (psmith) (Entered: 12/27/2000)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/27/2000
                                                      UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time until 1/31/01 to file amended Kurtzman Complaint by Pltfs Jeff Kurtzman, etal Motion Docket Date 1/10/01 [68-1] motion , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 12/22/2000)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/27/2000
                                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file amended Turner complaint by Pltf Julius Turner, Motion Docket Date 1/10/01 [67-1] motion , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 12/22/2000)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Compaq's [55-1] motion to dismiss statments #3, 7, 13, and 14 in the Kurtzman complaint as puffery is GRANTED but the motion as to the other statements and grounds asserted is DENIED without prejudice to subsequent reurging, if appropriate; Kurtman Pltfs shall replead w/in twenty days of receipt of this Order, sufficient relevant facts in the Kurtzman action in detail to show how, by what and when Defts became conscious of Compaq's alleged deteriorating business status as as to support a strong inference of scienter with respect to each named Deft to cure the deficiencies pointed out by the Court; Compaq's [52-1] motion to dismiss the Turner complaint is currently denied witout prejudice to reurging subsequently, Meanwhile Turner shall replead w/in twenty days of this order sufficient facts to support a claim that Compaq's statements were made with actual knowledge of their falsity, entered. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (fmremp) (Entered: 12/12/2000)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/27/2000, Entered: None
                                                            REPLY APPENDIX by Defts Compaq Computer Corp, etals in support of their [63-1] and [64-1] reply memorrandums in support of their motions to dismiss, filed. (Placed in Brown Expandable Folder) (fmremp) (Entered: 03/27/2000)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/27/2000, Entered: None
                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM by Defts Compaq Computer Corp, etals in support of [55-1] motion to dismiss pltfs' Section 11 complaint, filed. (Placed in Brown Expandable Folder) (fmremp) (Entered: 03/27/2000)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/27/2000, Entered: None
                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM by Defts Compaq Computer Corp, etals in support of [52-1] motion to dismiss pltfs' consolidated and amended complaint, filed. (Placed in Brown Expandable Folder) (fmremp) (Entered: 03/27/2000)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of attorney appearance for Jeff Kurtzman, City of Philadelphia, Robert C Daniels, Joseph Perri by Joseph Kohn, filed (psmith) (Entered: 03/22/2000)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: None
                                                                    APPENDIX (Vols. 1-5) by pltfs Jeff Kurtzman, et al. to [60-1] opposition memorandum filed. (documents placed in 3 expandable folders) (khightower) (Entered: 02/11/2000)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: None
                                                                      MEMORANDUM by pltfs Jeff Kurtzman, et al. in opposition to defts' [52-1] motion to dismiss pltfs' consolidated and amended complaint, filed (khightower) (Entered: 02/11/2000)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: None
                                                                        MEMORANDUM by pltfs Jeff Kurtzman, et al. in opposition to defts' [55-1] motion to dismiss pltfs' Section 11 complaint , filed (document placed in expandable folder) (khightower) Modified on 02/14/2000 (Entered: 02/10/2000)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION; the Court sua sponte orders that H-99-1429 is consolidated into H-99-779, entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (khightower) (Entered: 02/02/2000)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/27/1999, Entered: None
                                                                            APPENDIX by defts Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer, Earl L Mason to [55-1] motion to dismiss pltfs' Section 11 complaint , filed. (document placed in expandable folder) (khightower) (Entered: 12/27/1999)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/27/1999, Entered: None
                                                                              MEMORANDUM of Law by defts Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer, Earl Mason in support of [55-1] motion to dismiss pltfs' Section 11 complaint , filed (khightower) (Entered: 12/27/1999)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/27/1999, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                MOTION to dismiss pltfs' Section 11 complaint by defts Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer, Earl L Mason, Motion Docket Date 1/16/00 [55-1] motion , filed. (khightower) (Entered: 12/27/1999)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/27/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                  APPENDIX (Vols. 1&2) by defts Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer, Earl L Mason to [53-1] support memorandum and [52-1] motion to dismiss pltfs' consolidated and amended complaint , filed. (document placed in 2 expandable folders) (khightower) (Entered: 12/27/1999)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/27/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM of law by defts Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer, Earl Mason in support of [52-1] motion to dismiss pltfs' consolidated and amended complaint , filed (khightower) (Entered: 12/27/1999)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/27/1999, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                      MOTION to dismiss pltfs' consolidated and amended complaint by defts Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer, Earl L Mason, Motion Docket Date 1/16/00 [52-1] motion , filed. (khightower) (Entered: 12/27/1999)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                        AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Julius Turner, (Answer due 11/4/99 for Compaq Computer Corp, for Eckhard Pfeiffer, for Earl L Mason) amending [1-1] complaint, filed. (ltien) (Entered: 10/26/1999)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                          CONSOLIDATED AND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by lead pltfs City of Philadelphia Board of Pension & Retirement, Robert C Daniels, Joseph Perri, Joaquin Demonet, Cheng Lee ,(Answer due 11/4/99 for Compaq Computer Corp, for Eckhard Pfeiffer, for Earl L Mason, for William D Strecker, for Michael J Winkler) amending [1-1] complaint, filed. (ltien) (Entered: 10/26/1999)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            Pre-Trial ORDER No 1 granting pltfs' [31-1] motion for entry of Pre-Trial Order No 1, entered; within 60 days of entry of this order, pltfs shall file a Consolidated Complaint; answer due within 60 days of the time defts are required to be served. If defts move against the Consolidated Complaint, co-lead counsel for pltfs shall file their memorandum in opposition 45 days after service of the motion; reply due within 45 days after service of opposition. Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (ltien) (Entered: 08/25/1999)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                              Minute entry: pretrial conference held, terminated deadlines . Apps: Stern, Wurtz/Davis Polk, Caddell, Hynes, Milberg Weiss, Roseman. Consolidated amended complaint due for 10/5/99 . Discovery deadline - one year after court rules on a motion to dismiss. Other deadlines to be agreed to by parties and submitted to court the week of August 23rd. Ct Reporter: Jackie Smith (ltien) (Entered: 08/23/1999)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting pltfs' [46-1] third motion to consolidate 99-2187 into 99-779, entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 08/23/1999)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/20/1999
                                                                                                  THIRD MOTION to consolidate 99-2187 into 99-779 by pltfs Jeff Kurtzman et al, Motion Docket Date 9/8/99 [46-1] motion , filed. (ltien) (Entered: 08/23/1999)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting pltfs' [42-1], [43-1], [38-1], [39-1], [40-1] and [41-1] motions for Patricia M Hynes, Robert M Roseman, Salvatore Graziano, Stuart H Savett, Robert P Frutkin, and Sherrie R Savett to appear pro hac vice, entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 08/20/1999)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting defts' [37-1] motion for William E Wurtz to appear pro hac vice , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 08/20/1999)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION for Robert M Roseman to appear pro hac vice by pltfs Jeff Kurtzman et al, Motion Docket Date 9/9/99 [43-1] motion , filed. (ltien) (Entered: 08/20/1999)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/20/1999
                                                                                                          MOTION for Patricia M Hynes to appear pro hac vice by pltfs Jeff Kurtzman et al, Motion Docket Date 9/9/99 [42-1] motion , filed. (ltien) (Entered: 08/20/1999)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION for Sherrie R Savett to appear pro hac vice by pltfs Jeff Kurtzman et al, Motion Docket Date 9/8/99 [41-1] motion , filed. (ltien) (Entered: 08/20/1999)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION for Robert P Frutkin to appear pro hac vice by pltfs Jeff Kurtzman et al, Motion Docket Date 9/8/99 [40-1] motion , filed. (ltien) (Entered: 08/20/1999)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION for Stuart H Savett to appear pro hac vice by pltfs Jeff Kurtzman et al , Motion Docket Date 9/8/99 [39-1] motion , filed. (ltien) (Entered: 08/20/1999)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Salvatore J Graziano to appear pro hac vice by pltfs Jeff Kurtzman et al, Motion Docket Date 9/8/99 [38-1] motion , filed. (ltien) (Entered: 08/20/1999)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/20/1999
                                                                                                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION for William E Wurtz to appear pro hac vice by Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer, Earl L Mason, Motion Docket Date 9/8/99 [37-1] motion , filed. (ltien) (Entered: 08/20/1999)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      AMENDED [35-1] Notice of Consolidation by pltfs Jeff Kurtzman et al, filed. (ltien) (Entered: 08/19/1999)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Consolidation by pltfs Jeff Kurtzman et al, filed (ltien) (Entered: 08/19/1999)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER, entered; pltfs shall file a notice indicating whether 99-889, 99-936, 99-937, 99-1127 and 99-1471 emcompasses cases known to them that have been consolidated into 99-779. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 08/12/1999)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION, entered; 99-1250 and 99-1415 are CONSOLIDATED sua sponte into 99-779. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 08/12/1999)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/6/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM of Law by pltfs Jeff Kurtzman et al in support of pltfs' [31-1] motion for entry of Pre-Trial Order No 1 , filed (ltien) (Entered: 08/09/1999)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/6/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                UNOPPOSED MOTION for entry of Pre-Trial Order No 1 by pltfs Jeff Kurtzman et al, Motion Docket Date 8/26/99 [31-1] motion , filed. (ltien) (Entered: 08/09/1999)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/12/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [27-1] motion for appointment as Lead Plaintiffs under Section 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 and Section 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933 and [27-2] motion for approval Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Co-Lead Counsel, entered; the City of Philadelphia Board of Pension & Retirement, Robert C Daniels, Joseph Perri, Joaquin Demonet, and Cheng Lee are appointed as Lead Pltfs. The law firms of Berger & Montague PC, Milberg Weiss et al, Savett Frutkin et al, and Spector & Roseman are appointed as Co-Lead Counsel. Cadell & Chapman is appointed as pltfs' Attorney in Charge. Lead Pltfs and their Co-Lead Counsel may designate one or more Lead Pltfs to give testimony on behalf of the class in subsequent proceedings. Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (ltien) (Entered: 07/12/1999)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/6/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiffs City of Philadelphia, Robert C Daniels, Joseph Perri, Joaquin Demonet, Cheng Lee Re: [27-1] motion for appointment of counsel as Lead Plaintiffs under Section 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 and Section 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933, [27-2] motion for approval Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Co-Lead Counsel, filed (fmremp) (Entered: 07/06/1999)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/6/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support by Plaintiffs City of Philadelphia, Robert C Daniels, Joseph Perri, Joaquin Demonet, Cheng Lee in support of [27-1] motion for appointment of counsel as Lead Plaintiffs under Section 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 and Section 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933, [27-2] motion for approval Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Co-Lead Counsel, filed (fmremp) (Entered: 07/06/1999)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/6/1999, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/12/1999
                                                                                                                                        SUPERCEDED MOTION for appointment of Lead Plaintiffs under Section 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 and Section 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933 , and for approval Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Co-Lead Counsel by Plaintiffs City of Philadelphia Board of Pension & Retirement, Robert C Daniels, Joseph Perri, Joaquin Demonet and Cheng Lee, Motion Docket Date 7/26/99 [27-1] motion, 7/26/99 [27-2] motion , filed. (fmremp) Modified on 07/12/1999 (Entered: 07/06/1999)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/15/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION re: waiver of service, answer deadline by Aaron Solomon, Michael Zelman, Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer, Earl L Mason , filed. (ltien) (Entered: 06/16/1999)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/15/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION re: waiver of service, answer deadline by Debbie Knobluth, David L Richards, Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer, Earl L Mason , filed. (ltien) (Entered: 06/16/1999)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/14/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The Court sua sponte orders that H-99-1422 be consolidated into lead case No. H-99-779. All consolidated actions are subject to orders issued in the lead case , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (fmremp) (Entered: 06/15/1999)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/14/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION re: waiver of service, answer deadline by Jeanne E Libit, Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer, Earl L Mason , filed. (psmith) Modified on 06/16/1999 (Entered: 06/14/1999)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/14/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION re: waiver of service, answer deadline by Alan Smith, Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer, Earl L Mason , filed. (psmith) Modified on 06/16/1999 (Entered: 06/14/1999)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/10/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, entered; Court sua sponte order that 99-1295 is CONSOLIDATED into lead case 99-779. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 06/10/1999)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/31/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER , entered; Court sua sponte orders that 99-1376 is CONSOLIDATED into 99-779. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 06/01/1999)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/31/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER , entered; Court sua sponte orders that 99-1359 and 99-1417 are CONSOLIDATED into 99-779. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 06/01/1999)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [17-1] agreed motion to substitute attorney Michael A Caddell in place of Stephen D Susman for pltf Robert C Daniels, entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 05/24/1999)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/21/1999
                                                                                                                                                            AGREED MOTION to substitute attorney Michael A Caddell in place of Stephen D Susman by Robert C Daniels, filed. (ltien) (Entered: 05/20/1999)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting pltfs' [15-1] motion for entry of Consolidation and Scheduling order; 99-779, 99-836, 99-869, 99-889, 99-936, 99-937, 99-952, 99-967, 99-1011, 99-1020, 99-1026, 99-1097, 99-1101, 99-1112, 99-1127, 99-1139, 99-1161, 99-1174, 99-1178, 99-1204, 99-1281, 99-1290, 99-1298, 99-1356, and 99-1381 are CONSOLIDATED; set status/scheduling conference for 1:30 8/20/99 , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 05/18/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/12/1999, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/14/1999
                                                                                                                                                                UNCONTESTED MOTION for entry of Consolidation and Scheduling order by Pltf Jeff Kurtzman, Motion Docket Date 6/1/99 [15-1] motion , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 05/13/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for appointment of W Mark Lanier as lead pltf by W Mark Lanier, Motion Docket Date 5/31/99 [14-1] motion , filed. (ltien) (Entered: 05/11/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Sherrie R Savett Esq and attached exhibits in support of Compaq Pltf Group's [11-1] motion for appointment of lead pltfs under Section 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 and Section 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933, [11-2] motion for approval of lead pltfs' selection of co-lead counsel , filed (in brown expandex folder) (ltien) (Entered: 05/11/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM of Law by City of Philadelphia Board of Pension and Retirement, Robert C Daniels, Joseph Perri, Joaquin Demonet, Cheng Lee in support of their [11-1] motion for appointment of lead pltfs under Section 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 and Section 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933, [11-2] motion for approval of lead pltfs' selection of co-lead counsel , filed (ltien) (Entered: 05/11/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Compaq Pltf Group's MOTION for appointment of lead pltfs under Section 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 and Section 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933 , and for approval of lead pltfs' selection of co-lead counsel by City of Philadelphia Board of Pension and Retirement, Robert C Daniels, Joseph Perri, Joaquin Demonet, Cheng Lee, Motion Docket Date 5/31/99 [11-1] motion, 5/31/99 [11-2] motion , filed. (ltien) (Entered: 05/11/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/5/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION re: waiver of service of summons, defts' answer deadline, by Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer, Earl L Mason, Jeff Kurtzman , filed. (ltien) (Entered: 05/05/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/20/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jeff Kurtzman, filed. (ltien) (Entered: 04/20/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Earl L Mason 3/24/99 filed Answer due on 4/13/99 for Earl L Mason (ltien) (Entered: 04/01/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Eckhard Pfeiffer 3/24/99 filed Answer due on 4/13/99 for Eckhard Pfeiffer (ltien) (Entered: 04/01/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Compaq Computer Corp c/o CT Corp System 3/23/99 filed Answer due on 4/12/99 for Compaq Computer Corp (ltien) (Entered: 03/26/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/22/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting scheduling conference for 9:00 8/5/99 before Magistrate Judge Frances H. Stacy , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H. Stacy ) (ltien) (Entered: 03/23/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/16/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF RECUSAL, entered; Parties notified. Judge Rosenthal stands recused in this case. Deadlines in scheduling orders continue in effect. Court settings are vacated. Case is reassigned to Judge Melinda Harmon. ( signed by Judge Lee H. Rosenthal ) (psmith) (Entered: 03/17/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/15/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT by Jeff Kurtzman Re: [1-1] complaint , filed (ltien) (Entered: 03/15/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/15/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Order setting Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference on 8:30 8/13/99 before Judge Lee H. Rosenthal and Order to Disclose Interested Persons, filed. Party filing case notified. (bchurchill) (Entered: 03/15/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/12/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 488056 (bchurchill) (Entered: 03/15/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 109 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?