Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. DISH Network L.L.C.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00390
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 4:56 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
v.
No Logo Dish Network LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah J Race +1 903 561 1600 drace@icklaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/30/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims of Plaintiff against Defendant DISH Network L.L.C. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/30/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:13cv384 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for trial. All motions shall be filed in the consolidated case. The Clerk of the Court shall add all consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as each defendants Lead and Local Counsel only. Should additional attorneys wish to appear in the consolidated case, they should file a Notice of Appearance in the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/13/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah J Race on behalf of DISH Network L.L.C. (Race, Deborah) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re DISH Network L.L.C..( Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
            SUMMONS Issued as to DISH Network L.L.C. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chester Jianbon Shiu on behalf of Norman IP Holdings, LLC (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam G Price on behalf of Norman IP Holdings, LLC (Price, Adam) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D Love. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                        Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                            COMPLAINT against DISH Network L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4134560.), filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 66 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?