Kevit v. Steinmetz et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:13-cv-40012
Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 27, 2016 at 12:08 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jason A. Kevit, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John J. McMaster

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J. McMaster +1 508 393 9200 +1 978 663 1213 john@jmcmasterlaw.com
v.
No Logo Andrea M. Steinmetz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pojani, Hurley, Ritter & Salvidio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Ritter +1 508 798 2480 +1 508 797 9651 writter@phrslaw.com
No Logo Premier Insurance Company of Massachusetts, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Farrey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas B. Farrey, III +1 508 756 6288 +1 508 831 9769 farrey@burnsandfarrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kate E. McCarron +1 508 756 6288 Mccarron@burnsandfarrey.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered denying 12 Motion to Remand to State Court. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
      Opposition re 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Premier Insurance Company of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Farrey, Thomas) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Andrea M. Steinmetz. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of William J. Ritter)(Ritter, William) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM in Support re 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jason A. Kevit. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - acceptance of service by Steinmezt, # 2 Exhibit B - acceptance of service by Premier)(McMaster, John) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
            MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jason A. Kevit.(McMaster, John) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Premier Insurance Company of Massachusetts. (Farrey, Thomas) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
                Document disclosure by Jason A. Kevit.(McMaster, John) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                  STATE COURT Record. (Farrey, Thomas) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                    ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Andrea M. Steinmetz.(Ritter, William) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                      Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail.(Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Ritter on behalf of Andrea M. Steinmetz (Ritter, William) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Kate E. McCarron on behalf of Premier Insurance Company of Massachusetts (McCarron, Kate) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas B. Farrey, III on behalf of Premier Insurance Company of Massachusetts (Farrey, Thomas) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Premier Insurance Company of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE)(Farrey, Thomas) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Premier Insurance Company of Massachusetts ( Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 0101-4286019 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Farrey, Thomas) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 215 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?