AMERICAN CHEMISTRY COUNCIL INC v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00495
District Judge James E. Boasberg, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 15, 2018 at 3:45 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American Chemistry Council, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake A. Biles +1 202 942 5836 +1 202 942 5999 blake.biles@aporter.com
Space Kent A. Yalowitz +1 212 715 1113 +1 212 715 1399 Kent.Yalowitz@aporter.com
v.
National Institutes of Health National Institutes of Health, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Bryce +1 202 616 8335 +1 202 616 8470 peter.bryce@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Bryce +1 202 616 8335 +1 202 616 8470 peter.bryce@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services and Defendant National Institutes of Health (Biles, Blake) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Plaintiff's Failure to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION to Dismiss by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5 of Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        AMENDED COMPLAINT Supplemental Complaint against NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES filed by AMERICAN CHEMISTRY COUNCIL INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Yalowitz, Kent) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Proposed Order filed by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of Proposed Order Notice of Filing of Proposed Scheduling Order by AMERICAN CHEMISTRY COUNCIL INC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Biles, Blake) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION for Scheduling Order by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Text of Proposed Order (Alternative Scheduling Order))(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                REPLY to opposition to motion re 16 MOTION for Scheduling Order RENEWED MOTION FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE filed by AMERICAN CHEMISTRY COUNCIL INC. (Yalowitz, Kent) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Memorandum in opposition to re 16 MOTION for Scheduling Order RENEWED MOTION FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE filed by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION for Scheduling Order RENEWED MOTION FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by AMERICAN CHEMISTRY COUNCIL INC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yalowitz, Kent) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION for Scheduling Order RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND CROSS-MOTION FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by AMERICAN CHEMISTRY COUNCIL INC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yalowitz, Kent) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION to Dismiss by AMERICAN CHEMISTRY COUNCIL INC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Biles, Blake) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION to Dismiss by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patricia M. Mantoan, # 2 Exhibit Mantoan Exhibits, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Bryce on behalf of All Defendants (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney
                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/1/2013. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/31/2013. (td, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/29/2013. (Biles, Blake)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General
                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 5/1/2013. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 5/22/2013. (Biles, Blake)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH served on 4/26/2013 (Biles, Blake)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 4/24/2013 (Biles, Blake)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                        ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General April 24, 2013. (Biles, Blake) Modified on 5/3/2013 (td, ).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: 4/12/2013 Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS Issued (4) as to NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2nd, # 2 Summons 3rd, # 3 Summons 4th, # 4 Notice of Consent, # 5 Consent Form)(md, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: 4/11/2013 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kent A. Yalowitz, :Firm- Arnold & Porter LLP., :Address- 399 Park Avenue, N.Y., NY. 10022. Phone No. - 212.715.1000. Fax No. - 212.715.1399 by AMERICAN CHEMISTRY COUNCIL, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Biles, Blake) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: 4/11/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                              NOTICE Notice of Designation of Related Civil Cases by AMERICAN CHEMISTRY COUNCIL, INC. re 1 Complaint,, 2 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests (Biles, Blake) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: 4/11/2013 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CHEMISTRY COUNCIL, INC. (Biles, Blake) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: 4/11/2013 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT against NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0090-3281328) filed by AMERICAN CHEMISTRY COUNCIL, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Complaint, # 4 Summons United States Department of Health and Human Services, # 5 Summons National Institutes of Health, # 6 Summons Attorney General of the United States, # 7 Summons United States Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Biles, Blake) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 105 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?