Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank v. Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alabama Middle District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00784
District Judge William Keith Watkins, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 5:17 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank"

Represented by Grais & Ellsworth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Grais +1 212 755 0100 +1 212 755 0052 dgrais@graisellsworth.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Benjamin Holton +1 212 351 3891 +1 212 351 5230 mholton@graisellsworth.com

Represented by Rushton, Stakely, Johnston & Garrett, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis Ray Bailey +1 334 206 3234 +1 334 481 0031 drb@rushtonstakely.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Evans Bailey +1 334 206 3114 +1 334 481 0848 ebailey@rushtonstakely.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. +1 334 206 3126 +1 334 481 0815 rah2@rsjg.com
v.
Bank of America Corporation Bank of America Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Joan Cox +1 213 683 9575 +1 213 683 5175
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Christopher Rutten +1 213 683 9189 +1 213 683 4056

Represented by Law Offices of WILLIAM B WAHLHEIM , JR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd H Cox +1 205 254 1000 +1 205 254 1999 tcox@maynardcooper.com

Represented by Maynard, Cooper & Gale, PC

Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7000 +1 213 229 7520

Represented by Copeland Franco Screws & Gill

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Hamilton Gill +1 334 834 1180 +1 334 834 3172 gill@copelandfranco.com

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander K Mircheff +1 213 229 7000 +1 213 229 7520 amircheff@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Countrywide Financial Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Countrywide Securities Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Inez H. Friedman-Boyce +1 617 570 1000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Pastuszenski +1 617 570 1000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Roeser +1 212 813 8800
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Slutsky +1 617 570 8243

Represented by Balch & Bingham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordan Dorman Walker, Jr. +1 334 269 3138 +1 334 269 3115 dwalker@balch.com
Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Defendant
No Logo CWALT, Inc., Defendant
No Logo CWMBS, Inc., Defendant
J.P. Morgan Securities LLC J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Defendant
Morgan Stanley & Company LLC Morgan Stanley & Company LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC"

Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dylan Cook Black +1 205 521 8296 +1 205 488 6296 dblack@babc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Robert Parker +1 334 956 7700 +1 205 956 7701 gparker@babc.com

Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James P. Rouhandeh +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3835 james.rouhandeh@dpw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana Meredith Seshens +1 212 450 4855 +1 212 450 3855 dana.seshens@dpw.com
No Logo Rbs Securities, Inc., Defendant
UBS Securities LLC UBS Securities LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1452
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (137) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TEXT ORDER granting 90 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/14/2016. (No pdf attached to this entry))(wcl, ) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER re 121 joint stipulation of dismissal, which comports with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) FRCP, this action has been dismissed with prejudice by operation of Rule 41, on the terms agreed to and set out by the parties; DIRECTING the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/8/2016. (furn: calendar, ar) (term: PTC for 09/15/2016; Jury Trial for 10/24/2016) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (wcl, ) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      STIPULATION of Dismissal by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., and UBS Securities LLC. (Gillis, Henry) Modified on 6/2/2016 to include additional filers. (dmn, ) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        TEXT ORDER granting 119 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to and including 6/13/2016. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/20/2016. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply In Support of Daubert Motions by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., and UBS Securities LLC. (Gillis, Henry) Modified on 5/18/2016 to add additional filers. (dmn, ) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC Notice of Settlement Agreement In Principle. (Gillis, Henry) Modified on 5/17/2016 to add as also filed on behalf of the dfts (wcl, ). (Entered: 05/17/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 106 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Ann E. Rutledge filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Gillis, Henry) Modified on 5/17/2016 to add the link to the 106 motion and to clarify the docket text (wcl, ). (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 104 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Norman G. Miller filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Exhibit F-P)(Gillis, Henry) Modified on 5/17/2016 to add the link to the 104 motion and to clarify the docket text (wcl, ). (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 105 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of James L. Johnson filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-AA)(Gillis, Henry) Modified on 5/17/2016 to add the link to the 105 motion and to clarify the docket text (wcl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2016: # 2 Main Document (Filed Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit D (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit E (Filed Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit F (Filed Under Seal), # 6 Exhibit G (Filed Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit H (Filed Under Seal), # 8 Exhibit T (Filed Under Seal), # 9 Exhibit V (Filed Under Seal), # 10 Exhibit W (Filed Under Seal)) (wcl, ). (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 103 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Richard L. Borges filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-I, # 2 Exhibit J-K)(Gillis, Henry) Modified on 5/17/2016 to add the link to the 103 motion and to clarify the docket text (wcl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2016: # 3 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit D (Filed Under Seal), # 6 Exhibit E (Filed Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit J (Filed Under Seal)) (wcl, ). (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting 109 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Redacted Materials Publicly and to File Unredacted Materials Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/16/2016. (wcl, ) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 102 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Christopher M. James filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Gill, Richard) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 101 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions And Testimony of Defendants' Expert Kerry D. Vandell filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexander K. Mircheff)(Gill, Richard) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 100 MOTION to Exclude Evidence Offered By Defendants' Expert Jerry A. Hausman filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jerry A. Hausman)(Gill, Richard) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION for Leave to File Redacted Materials Publicly & To File Unredacted Materials Under Seal by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gillis, Henry) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting 107 Joint Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule; it is ORDERED as follows: (1) the deadline for filing oppositions to Daubert motions is EXTENDED from 5/9/2016, to and including 5/16/2016; (2) The deadline for filing replies in support of Daubert motions is EXTENDED from 5/19/2016, to and including 6/1/2016; and (3) The deadline for filing motions in limine is EXTENDED from 6/1/2016, to and including 6/15/2016; further ORDERED, as a matter of clarification, that the deadline for filing proposed jury instructions is 9/26/2016. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/6/2016. (wcl, ) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Joint MOTION to Amend re 89 Order, by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Gill, Richard) Modified on 5/5/2016 to add as also filed on behalf of the plf and to clarify the docket text (wcl, ). (Entered: 05/04/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Ann E. Rutledge by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration and Exhibits A-D, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F)(Gill, Richard) Modified on 4/11/2016 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION to Exclude Testimony of James L. Johnson by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexander K. Mircheff)(Gill, Richard) Modified on 4/11/2016 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Norman G. Miller by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexander K. Mircheff)(Gill, Richard) Modified on 4/11/2016 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Richard L. Borges by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexander K. Mircheff)(Gill, Richard) Modified on 4/11/2016 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Christopher M. James by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Gillis, Henry) Modified on 4/11/2016 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ).
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions And Testimony of Defendants' Expert Kerry D. Vandell by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-12)(Gillis, Henry) Modified on 4/11/2016 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ).
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                MOTION to Exclude Evidence Offered By Defendants' Expert Jerry A. Hausman by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-5)(Gillis, Henry) Modified on 4/11/2016 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: 4/7/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER denying 98 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/7/2016. (wcl, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: 4/6/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION to Seal by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Gillis, Henry)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: 3/31/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER: The court finds that the FDIC-R's 43 Motion for Leave to Amend is due to be denied based on undue delay and prejudice. It is ORDERED that the FDIC-R's 43 Motion to Amend the Complaint is DENIED as further set out in the order. It is further ORDERED that Defendants' 75 Motion for Oral Arugment is DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/31/2016. (dmn, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: 3/31/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER that the FDIC-R's 45 Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses is GRANTED in part and denied in part as further set out in the order. The motion is GRANTED as to Defendants' affirmative defense of lack of loss causation and that affirmative defense is STRICKEN. The motion is DENIED as to Defendants' affirmative defense of failure to mitigate damages. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/31/2016. (dmn, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: 3/29/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER: Before the court is a 93 Stipulation of Dismissal which the court construes as a Motion for a court order of dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2) It is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that all of Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC are DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to terminate Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC as a defendant in this action. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/29/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(dmn, )
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank of Filing Settlement Documents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Spotswood, Robert) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed order)(Spotswood, Robert) Modified on 3/28/2016 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC (qc/djy, ). (Entered: 03/25/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: 3/10/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as follows: (1) Defendant's 79 Motion for Reconsideration is GRANTED and the brief in support of the motion (Doc. 80 ) is construed as a reply brief in support of Defendants Motion to Reopen Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Discovering Settlement Information and Motion to Compel Disclosure of Settlement Information. (2) The Order entered on 11/19/2015 (Doc. 69 ) is VACATED. (3) Defendants 54 Motion to Reopen Discovery and Motion to Compel Disclosure of Settlement Information are GRANTED to the following extent. On or before 3/28/2016, the FDIC-R shall provide Defendants and the court a summary of the techniques, methods, and formulas by which the FDIC-R allocated the FDIC-R Settlement proceeds among the various lawsuits. The FDIC-R is not required to divulge, however, the settlement amounts for claims other than those related to the instant lawsuit. (4) For purposes of preserving the record, on or before 3/28/2016, the FDIC-R is DIRECTED to file a copy of the applicable publicly available settlement documents that pertain to the settlement of the claims in this action. The filing shall be titled, Notice of Filing Settlement Documents. (5) Plaintiffs 68 Motion for Oral Argument on Pending Motions is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/10/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(dmn, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  RESPONSE in Support re 81 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Demand for a Jury filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC. (Gill, Richard) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Gill, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2016: # 1 Response (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 2 Exhibit A to Response (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 3 Exhibit B to Response (FILED UNDER SEAL)) (dmn, ).
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: 2/2/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      AMENDED ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL-MOTION DEADLINES: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's 76 Objection to the Trial Date and Defendants' 85 Response, the Objection is well taken and is unopposed. The trial of this action, which the parties estimate will take fifteen to twenty days, will be specially set and the pretrial deadlines adjusted as follows: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/15/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B in Montgomery, AL before Chief Judge William Keith Watkins. Jury Trial set for 10/24/2016 trial term in Montgomery, AL before Chief Judge William Keith Watkins. Daubert Motions due by 4/8/2016. Responses to daubert motions due 5/9/2016 and any replies shall be filed no later than 5/19/2016. Severance Motions due 4/8/2016, responses due 5/9/2016 and replies due 5/19/2016. Trial Witness Lists due 8/25/2106. Deposition Designations due 8/25/2016. Trial Exhibits due 8/2/2016. Voir Dire due 9/26/2016. Motion in limine due 6/1/2016 and objections to motions due 7/1/2016. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/2/2016. Copies furnished to calendar group, AR. (Deadlines terminated: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2016 in Montgomery, AL and Jury Trial set for 8/15/2016 trial term in Montgomery, AL.) (dmn, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 81 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Demand for a Jury filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Spotswood, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: 1/22/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER that Plaintiff's 86 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants may file a response to the FDIC-R's Supplemental Submission on or before 2/8/2016. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/22/2016. (dmn, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: 1/19/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Gillis, Henry) Modified on 1/26/2016 to reflect actual title and remove duplicate text. (dmn, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              RESPONSE to Plaintiff FDIC's 76 Objection to Trail Date, filed in response to Court's 12/23/2015 78 Order, filed by Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Gill, Richard) Modified on 1/11/2016 to create link to Doc. 78 and reflect actual title. (dmn, ) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/5/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC's 81 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Demand for a Jury, which is joined by Defendants Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC and UBS Securities LLC (Doc. 83 ), it is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion on or before 2/1/2016. Defendants may file a reply brief on or before 2/12/2016. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/5/2016. (dmn, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  JOINDER re 81 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Demand for a Jury by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC. (Gill, Richard) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 81 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Demand for a Jury filed by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Black, Dylan) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: 12/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Demand for a Jury by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Black, Dylan)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of 79 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBS Securities Inc., and UBS Securities LLC. (Gill, Richard) Modified on 1/5/2016 to clean up text and add additional filers. (dmn, ) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: 12/28/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's 11/19/2015 69 Order denying Defendant's 54 Motion to Reopen Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Discovering Settlement Information and Motion to Compel Disclosure of Settlement Information by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBS Securities Inc., and UBS Securities LLC. (Gill, Richard) Modified on 1/5/2016 to reflect actual title, to create link to Doc. 54, and to add additional filers. (dmn, )
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: 12/23/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER re 76 Objection to the 74 Order setting the trial of this action on the term of court commencing 8/15/2016. It is ORDERED that Defendants, after consultation with counsel for Plaintiff, are DIRECTED to file a response to Plaintiffs objection on or before 1/11/2016. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/23/2015. (dmn, )
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE of Correction re 76 Objection. This notice has been docketed to entere the corrected pdf of the referenced document into the record. The original pdf contained a typographical error in the "Section 10(B)." The corrected pdf is attached to this notice. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected pdf of Doc. 76 )(dmn, ) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Objection to the Trial Date in the Court's 74 Order Setting Trial and Pretrial-Motion Deadlines by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Gillis, Henry) Modified on 12/18/2015 to reflect actual title and to create link to Doc. 74 . (dmn, ) (Main Document 76 replaced on 12/18/2015 due to a typographical error on the referenced "Section 10(B)") (dmn, ) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: 12/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MOTION for Oral Argument on Pending Motions re 43 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, 45 MOTION to Strike Defenses Motion for Oral Argument on Pending Motions by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBS Securities Inc., and UBS Securities LLC. (Gill, Richard) Modified on 12/16/2015 to reflect actual title and to add additional filers. (dmn, )
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: 12/3/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL-MOTION DEADLINES: It is ORDERED that the 70 Agreed Joint Motion to Set Briefing Schedule for Certain Pretrial Motions is GRANTED. An on-the-record Pretrial Conference is set for 7/7/2016 in Montgomery, AL before Chief Judge William Keith Watkins. Jury Trial set for 8/15/2016 trial term in Montgomery, AL before Chief Judge William Keith Watkins. Daubert Motions due 3/9/2016; responses due 4/8/2016, replies due 4/18/2016. Severance Motions pursuant to FRCP 42(b) due 3/9/2016, responses due 4/8/2016, replies due 4/18/2016. Trial Witness Lists due 6/19/2016. Deposition Designations due 6/19/2016. Trial Exhibits due 6/19/2016. Voir Dire due 7/25/2016; motions in limine due 5/2/2016; objections to motions in limine due 6/2/2016. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/3/2015. Copies furnished to calendar group, AR. (dmn, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: 12/3/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER: Before the court is Bank of America Corporation's 31 Motion requesting that the court's records reflect its dismissal from this action. Because the court's records previously have been modified to reflect Bank of America Corporation's termination as a defendant in this action, it is ORDERED that the motion is DENIED as moot. It is further ORDERED that the notices of deficiency regarding pro hac vice applications issued to Bank of America Corporation are deemed moot. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/3/2015. (dmn, )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        REPLY BRIEF re 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Gill, Richard) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          JOINDER in 68 MOTION for Oral Argument on Pending Motions by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Gill, Richard) Modified on 11/30/2015 to add additional filers. (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: 11/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Agreed Joint MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule for Certain Pretrial Motions by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBS Securities Inc., and UBS Securities LLC. (Gill, Richard) Modified on 11/23/2015 to add additional filers. (dmn, )
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: 11/19/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              [VACATED PURSUANT TO COURT 92 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER] ORDER: Before the court are Defendants' 54 Motion to Reopen Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Discovering Settlement Information and Motion to Compel Disclosure of Settlement Information. Plaintiff filed an Opposition to the Motions. (Doc. 64 .) Based upon careful consideration of the arguments and the authorities cited, it is ORDERED that the motions are DENIED without prejudice. Defendants are granted leave to re-file the motions as they pertain to a damages set-off should Plaintiff obtain a judgment in its favor. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/19/2015. (dmn, ) Modified on 3/11/2016 (dmn, ).
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                MOTION for Oral Argument on Pending Motions (Doc. Nos. 54, 58, 64, and 65 ) by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Gillis, Henry) Modified on 11/19/2015 to create links to motions. (dmn, )
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Evidentiary Submission to 66 Reply Brief In Support of Motion for Leave To Amend The First Amended Complaint, Holton Declaration Exhibit A filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Gillis, Henry) Modified on 11/16/2015 to create link to Doc. 66 and to reflect there is no main document pdf. (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM In Support Of 43 Motion For Leave To Amend The First Amended Complaint filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Supplement Pomerantz Declaration, # 5 Supplement Holton Declaration)(Gillis, Henry) Modified on 11/16/2015 to create link to Doc. 43 . (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants Alleged Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-9, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 10-66, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits 67-99, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits 100-103, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 104, # 7 Exhibit Exhibits 105-109)(Gillis, Henry) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 54 MOTION for Discovery to Reopen Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Discovering Settlement Information and Motion to Compel Disclosure of Settlement Information, MOTION to Compel filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Spotswood, Robert) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          REPLY in Support of its 45 MOTION to Strike Defenses filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Spotswood, Robert) Modified on 11/16/2015 to reflect actual title. (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/8/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER that the 61 Agreed Joint Motion to Partially Amend Briefing Schedule is GRANTED to the extent that Defendants' deadline to file a Motion to Strike the Jury Demand is EXTENDED to and including 12/30/2015. If the "other motions" to which the parties refer (Doc. 61, at 2) remain pending as of 12/30/2015, the court will entertain a motion to further extend the deadline for filing the Motion to Strike Jury Demand. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/8/2015. (dmn, )
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Agreed Joint MOTION to Partially Amend Briefing Schedule re 53 Order by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank, and Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Gill, Richard) Modified on 10/5/2015 to add additional filers and reflect actual title. (dmn, )
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Statement of Uncontroverted Facts in Support/Evidentiary Submission re 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexander K. Mircheff in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A-E, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits F-Q, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit R part 1, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit R part 2, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit R part 3, # 7 Exhibit Exhibits S-PP)(Gill, Richard) Modified on 10/5/2015 to include actual title. (dmn, ) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Gill, Richard) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Gill, Richard)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 43 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Gill, Richard) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM of Law in Opposition to 45 MOTION to Strike Defenses filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Gill, Richard) Modified on 10/5/2015 to reflect actual title. (dmn, ) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of Their 54 Motion to Reopen Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Discovering Settlement Information and Motion to Compel Disclosure of Settlement Information filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Gill, Richard) Modified on 10/5/2015 to create link to Doc. 54 . (dmn, ) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Discovery to Reopen Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Discovering Settlement Information and Motion to Compel Disclosure of Settlement Information by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Gill, Richard)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: 9/18/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER ADOPTING PARTIES' PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 47 Joint Stipulation for Proposed Briefing Schedule, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/18/2015. (wcl, )
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: 9/18/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER that the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the following Dfts as parties to this action: (1) J.P. Morgan Securities LLC (see Doc. # 12 -250); (2) Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (see Doc. # 12 -305); (3) Countrywide Financial Corporation (see Doc. # 12 -382), (4) CWALT, Inc. (see Doc. # 12 -382), (5) CWMBS, Inc. (see Doc. # 12 -382),(6) Countrywide Securities Corporation (Doc. # 12 -382.); and (7) Bank of America Corporation (Doc. # 12 -382); The parties are DIRECTED to use the new caption as it appears on this Order for all future submissions to the court, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to change the caption accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/18/2015. (wcl, )
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER granting 48 Motion for J. Evans Bailey to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/8/2015. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER granting 46 Motion for Admission of Michael M. Pomerantz Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/8/2015. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re 46 motion: $ 50.00, receipt number 4602038167. (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: 8/31/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Bailey, John)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Joint STIPULATION for Proposed Briefing Schedule by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Gill, Richard) Modified on 8/31/2015 to add as also filed on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank (wcl, ). (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: 8/31/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Spotswood, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: 8/24/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike Defenses by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Spotswood, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2015: # 1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (wcl, ).
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 43 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Spotswood, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2015: # 1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (wcl, ). (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: 8/24/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Spotswood, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2015: # 2 Corrected Certificate of Service) (wcl, ).
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Citigroup Global Markets Inc. re 14 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement, 39 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Gill, Richard) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC re 14 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement, 39 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Gill, Richard) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Citigroup Global Markets Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC of Dismissals with Prejudice and Response to Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement Deficiencies (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Gill, Richard) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Citigroup Global Markets Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/24/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, ) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT (JOINT) in compliance with Court's 33 Order of 7/2/2015 by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Spotswood, Robert) Modified on 7/27/2015 to create link to Doc. 33 . (dmn, ) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Godwin Menge on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank (Menge, Mary) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Keeling Spotswood on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank (Spotswood, Robert) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER granting 34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Dennis R. Bailey. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/15/2015. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: 7/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Bailey, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/2/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER directing that the remaining parties shall confer and file a joint report on or before July 24, 2015, which includes the following information: (1) a citation to each Order in the MDL proceedings that disposed of claims, defenses, and parties; (2) a summary of the remaining claims and defenses; (3) a list of the parties remaining in this lawsuit; (4) a summary of the principal factual issues that are in dispute, if any; (5) a summary of the principal legal issues that are in dispute, if any; (6) a statement as to whether the parties believe that mediation would be helpful; (7) a summary of issues that the parties contend should be resolved prior to trial, if any, and a proposed schedule for resolving those issues, if any; and (8) proposed dates for the pretrial hearing and trial. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on July 2, 2015. (scn, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Dismissal With Prejudice and Notice Regarding 13 Notice of Deficiencies, by CWALT, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Financial Corporation, and Countrywide Securities Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(scn, ) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Bank of America Corporation WITH ATTACHED EXHIBITS A & B, by Bank of America Corporation (Davis, Richard) Modified on 6/25/2015 to clarify text and notate that exhibits are attached to this main document (scn, ). (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Todd Sansbury on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank (Sansbury, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER granting 9 Motion for Mark B. Holton and David J. Grais to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 22 Motion for Dean J. Kitchens to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and 23 Motion for Alexander Mircheff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on June 19, 2015. (No PDF document attached to this entry.) (scn, ) Modified on 7/14/2015 to add the link to the 23 motion (wcl, ). (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of PDF Correction re 25 , 26 , and 27 Notices of Appearance to reflect correction to case caption. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected main document of docket entry 25 , # 2 Corrected main document of docket entry 26 , # 3 Corrected main document of docket entry 27 )(scn, ) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen J. Gillis on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank (Gillis, Kristen) (Main Document 27 replaced on 6/18/2015) (scn, ). (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Lewis Gillis on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank (Gillis, Henry) (Main Document 26 replaced on 6/18/2015) (scn, ). (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Tyrone Carlton Means on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank (Means, Tyrone) (Main Document 25 replaced on 6/18/2015) (scn, ). (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filing fee re 22 Motion for Dean J. Kitchens to Appear Pro Hac Vice and 23 Motion for Alexander Mircheff to Appear Pro Hac Vice : $ 100.00, receipt number 4602037185 (scn, ) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Alexander Mircheff to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Gill, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Dean J. Kitchens to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Gill, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filing fee re 19 Motion for Dana M. Seshens, James P. Rouhandeh, and Daniel J. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice: $ 150.00, receipt number 4602037141 (scn, ) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER granting 19 Motion for Dana M. Seshens, James P. Rouhandeh, and Daniel J. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on June 9, 2015. (No PDF document attached to this entry.) (scn, ) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion (WITH EXHIBITS A, B, and C ATTACHED) for Dana M. Seshens, James P. Rouhandeh, and Daniel J. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Parker, George) Modified on 6/9/2015 to add attorneys and notate that Exhibits A-C are ATTACHED to the main document and not as accompanying attachments (scn, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by UBS Securities LLC re 14 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Gill, Richard) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by RBS Securities Inc. re 14 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Gill, Richard) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC re 14 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Gill, Richard) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on June 4, 2015. (No PDF document attached to this entry.) (scn, ) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, RBS Securities Inc., and UBS Securities LLC.. Corporate Disclosures due by 6/15/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Standing ORDER and sample format)(scn, ) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Deficiency REGARDING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION To Attorneys Adam Slutsky, Brian E. Pastuszenski, Daniel Roeser, Inez H. Friedman-Boyce, Erin Joan Cox, James Christopher Rutten, Marc S.T. Dworsky, Alexander K. Mircheff, Dean J. Kitchens, Dana M. Seshens, Daniel Jacob Schwartz, and James P. Rouhandeh. (scn, ) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Received copy of CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER from UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL on MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, MDL No. 2265, signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of Panel, on 03/17/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation Regarding Record to Be Remanded, # 2 Central District of CA (West Div - LA) Civil Docket for 2:12-cv-08317-MRP-MAN)(scn, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2015: # 3 Document 1, # 4 Document 2, # 5 Document 3, # 6 Document 3-1, # 7 Document 3-2, # 8 Document 3-3, # 9 Document 3-4, # 10 Document 3-5, # 11 Document 3-6, # 12 Document 3-7, # 13 Document 3-8, # 14 Document 3-9, # 15 Document 3-10, # 16 Document 3-11, # 17 Document 3-12, # 18 Document 3-13, # 19 Document 3-14, # 20 Document 3-15, # 21 Document 3-16, # 22 Document 3-17, # 23 Document 3-18, # 24 Document 3-19, # 25 Document 3-20, # 26 Document 3-21, # 27 Document 3-22, # 28 Document 3-23, # 29 Document 3-24, # 30 Document 4, # 31 Document 5, # 32 Document 5-1, # 33 Document 6, # 34 Document 7, # 35 Document 7-1, # 36 Document 7-2, # 37 Document 7-3, # 38 Document 7-4, # 39 Document 7-5, # 40 Document 7-6, # 41 Document 7-7, # 42 Document 7-8, # 43 Document 7-9, # 44 Document 7-10, # 45 Document 7-11, # 46 Document 7-12, # 47 Document 7-13, # 48 Document 7-14, # 49 Document 8, # 50 Document 9, # 51 Document 10, # 52 Document 11, # 53 Document 11-1, # 54 Document 11-2, # 55 Document 12, # 56 Document 13, # 57 Document 14, # 58 Document 15, # 59 Document 15-1, # 60 Document 16, # 61 Document 17, # 62 Document 17-1, # 63 Document 18, # 64 Document 18-1, # 65 Document 19, # 66 Document 20, # 67 Document 20-1, # 68 Document 21, # 69 Document 21-1, # 70 Document 21-2, # 71 Document 21-3, # 72 Document 21-4, # 73 Document 21-5, # 74 Document 21-6, # 75 Document 21-7, # 76 Document 21-8, # 77 Document 21-9, # 78 Document 21-10, # 79 Document 21-11, # 80 Document 22, # 81 Document 23, # 82 Document 24, # 83 Document 24-1, # 84 Document 24-2, # 85 Document 24-3, # 86 Document 25, # 87 Document 26, # 88 Document 27, # 89 Document 28, # 90 Document 29, # 91 Document 29-1, # 92 Document 30, # 93 Document 30-1, # 94 Document 31, # 95 Document 31-1, # 96 Document 32, # 97 Document 32-1, # 98 Document 33, # 99 Document 34, # 100 Document 35, # 101 Document 36, # 102 Document 36-1, # 103 Document 36-2, # 104 Document 36-3, # 105 Document 37, # 106 Document 38, # 107 Document 39, # 108 Document 39-1, # 109 Document 39-2, # 110 Document 39-3, # 111 Document 39-4, # 112 Document 40, # 113 Document 40-1, # 114 Document 40-2, # 115 Document 40-3, # 116 Document 40-4, # 117 Document 41, # 118 Document 42, # 119 Document 43, # 120 Document 44, # 121 Document 44-1, # 122 Document 45, # 123 Document 46, # 124 Document 46-1, # 125 Document 46-2, # 126 Document 46-3, # 127 Document 46-4, # 128 Document 46-5, # 129 Document 46-6, # 130 Document 46-7, # 131 Document 46-8, # 132 Document 46-9, # 133 Document 46-10, # 134 Document 46-11, # 135 Document 46-12, # 136 Document 47, # 137 Document 47-1, # 138 Document 48, # 139 Document 48-1, # 140 Document 48-2, # 141 Document 49, # 142 Document 49-1, # 143 Document 49-2, # 144 Document 49-3, # 145 Document 49-4, # 146 Document 49-5, # 147 Document 49-6, # 148 Document 49-7 , # 149 Document 50, # 150 Document 51, # 151 Document 51-1, # 152 Document 51-2, # 153 Document 51-3, # 154 Document 51-4, # 155 Document 52, # 156 Document 53, # 157 Document 53-1, # 158 Document 53-2, # 159 Document 53-3, # 160 Document 53-4, # 161 Document 53-5, # 162 Document 53-6, # 163 Document 53-7, # 164 Document 54, # 165 Document 55, # 166 Document 55-1, # 167 Document 56, # 168 Document 57, # 169 Document 58, # 170 Document 59, # 171 Document 59-1, # 172 Document 59-2, # 173 Document 59-3, # 174 Document 60, # 175 Document 61, # 176 Document 61-1, # 177 Document 61-2, # 178 Document 61-3, # 179 Document 62, # 180 Document 63, # 181 Document 64, # 182 Document 64-1, # 183 Document 64-2, # 184 Document 65, # 185 Document 67, # 186 Document 68, # 187 Document 69, # 188 Document 70, # 189 Document 71, # 190 Document 72, # 191 Document 74, # 192 Document 75, # 193 Document 76, # 194 Document 76-1, # 195 Document 77, # 196 Document 77-1, # 197 Document 78, # 198 Document 80, # 199 Document 80-1, # 200 Document 81, # 201 Document 81-1, # 202 Document 82, # 203 Document 82-1, # 204 Document 83, # 205 Document 84, # 206 Document 85, # 207 Document 86, # 208 Document 87, # 209 Document 88, # 210 Document 89, # 211 Document 90, # 212 Document 90-1, # 213 Document 90-2, # 214 Document 90-3, # 215 Document 90-4, # 216 Document 90-5, # 217 Document 90-6, # 218 Document 90-7, # 219 Document 90-8, # 220 Document 91, # 221 Document 92, # 222 Document 92-1, # 223 Document 92-2, # 224 Document 92-3, # 225 Document 92-4, # 226 Document 92-5, # 227 Document 92-6, # 228 Document 93, # 229 Document 93-1, # 230 Document 93-2, # 231 Document 94, # 232 Document 94-1, # 233 Document 94-2, # 234 Document 94-3, # 235 Document 94-4, # 236 Document 95, # 237 Document 97, # 238 Document 98, # 239 Document 99, # 240 Document 100, # 241 Document 102, # 242 Document 103, # 243 Document 103-1, # 244 Document 104, # 245 Document 105, # 246 Document 105-1, # 247 Document 106, # 248 Document 107, # 249 Document 108, # 250 Document 109, # 251 Document 110, # 252 Document 110-1, # 253 Document 110-2, # 254 Document 111, # 255 Document 112, # 256 Document 112-1, # 257 Document 113, # 258 Document 114, # 259 Document 114-1, # 260 Document 114-2, # 261 Document 115, # 262 Document 116, # 263 Document 117, # 264 Document 118, # 265 Document 119, # 266 Document 120, # 267 Document 121, # 268 Document 122, # 269 Document 122-1, # 270 Document 122-2, # 271 Document 123, # 272 Document 123-1, # 273 Document 123-2, # 274 Document 124, # 275 Document 124-1, # 276 Document 124-2, # 277 Document 125, # 278 Document 126, # 279 Document 127, # 280 Document 128, # 281 Document 129, # 282 Document 130, # 283 Document 131, # 284 Document 132, # 285 Document 133, # 286 Document 134, # 287 Document 135, # 288 Document 135-1, # 289 Document 136, # 290 Document 137, # 291 Document 137-1, # 292 Document 137-2, # 293 Document 137-3, # 294 Document 137-4, # 295 Document 138, # 296 Document 139, # 297 Document 141, # 298 Document 141-1, # 299 Document 142, # 300 Document 143, # 301 Document 144, # 302 Document 145, # 303 Document 146, # 304 Document 146-1, # 305 Document 147, # 306 Document 148, # 307 Document 148-1, # 308 Document 149, # 309 Document 149-1, # 310 Document 149-2, # 311 Document 149-3, # 312 Document 149-4, # 313 Document 149-5, # 314 Document 149-6, # 315 Document 149-7, # 316 Document 149-8, # 317 Document 149-9, # 318 Document 149-10, # 319 Document 149-11, # 320 Document 149-12, # 321 Document 150, # 322 Document 151, # 323 Document 151-1, # 324 Document 152, # 325 Document 153, # 326 Document 154, # 327 Document 154-1, # 328 Document 156, # 329 Document 156-1, # 330 Document 157, # 331 Document 158, # 332 SEALED Document 159, # 333 Document 160, # 334 Document 161, # 335 SEALED Document 162 Part 1, # 336 SEALED Document 162 Part 2, # 337 SEALED Document 162 Part 3, # 338 SEALED Document 163, # 339 SEALED DOCUMENT 164, # 340 SEALED DOCUMENT 164 Part 2, # 341 SEALED DOCUMENT 164 Part 3, # 342 SEALED DOCUMENT 165 Part 1, # 343 SEALED DOCUMENT 165 Part 2, # 344 SEALED DOCUMENT 166 Part 1, # 345 SEALED DOCUMENT 166 Part 2, # 346 SEALED DOCUMENT 166 Part 3, # 347 SEALED DOCUMENT 167 Part 1, # 348 SEALED DOCUMENT 167 Part 2, # 349 SEALED DOCUMENT 167 Part 3, # 350 SEALED DOCUMENT 168 Part 1, # 351 SEALED DOCUMENT 168 Part 2, # 352 SEALED DOCUMENT 168 Part 3, # 353 SEALED DOCUMENT 168 Part 4, # 354 SEALED DOCUMENT 168 Part 5, # 355 SEALED DOCUMENT 169 Part 1, # 356 SEALED DOCUMENT 169 Part 2, # 357 SEALED DOCUMENT 169 Part 3, # 358 SEALED DOCUMENT 170, # 359 SEALED DOCUMENT 171 Part 1, # 360 SEALED DOCUMENT 171 Part 2, # 361 SEALED DOCUMENT 172 Part 1, # 362 SEALED DOCUMENT 172 Part 2, # 363 SEALED DOCUMENT 172 Part 3, # 364 SEALED DOCUMENT 172 Part 4, # 365 SEALED DOCUMENT 172 Part 5, # 366 SEALED DOCUMENT 173, # 367 SEALED DOCUMENT 174, # 368 SEALED DOCUMENT 175 Part 1, # 369 SEALED DOCUMENT 175 Part 2, # 370 SEALED DOCUMENT 176 Part 1, # 371 SEALED DOCUMENT 176 Part 2, # 372 SEALED DOCUMENT 177, # 373 Document 178, # 374 Document 179, # 375 Document 180, # 376 Document 181, # 377 Document 181-1, # 378 Document 183, # 379 Document 184, # 380 Document 185, # 381 Document 186, # 382 Document 187, # 383 SEALED DOCUMENT 190 Part 1, # 384 SEALED DOCUMENT 190 Part 2, # 385 SEALED DOCUMENT 190 Part 3, # 386 SEALED DOCUMENT 191 Part 1, # 387 SEALED DOCUMENT 191 Part 2, # 388 SEALED DOCUMENT 191 Part 3, # 389 SEALED DOCUMENT 191 Part 4, # 390 SEALED DOCUMENT 191 Part 5, # 391 SEALED DOCUMENT 191 Part 6, # 392 SEALED DOCUMENT 192, # 393 Document 193, # 394 Document 194, # 395 Document 195, # 396 Document 196, # 397 Document 197, # 398 SEALED DOCUMENT 198, # 399 SEALED DOCUMENT 198-1) (scn, ). Modified on 6/3/2015 to notate that this pleading has been regenerated to Counsel of Record and to Judges of Record after all the PDF documents have been attached (scn, ). (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re 9 Motion: $ 100.00, receipt number 4602024275. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this action to the USDC, Central District of California. (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bailey, Dennis) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Bailey, John) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION Regarding Schedule for Defendants to Move Against, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Bank of America Corporation, CWALT, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (Walker, Jordan) Modified on 9/18/2012 to add as filed on behalf of all parties (wcl, ). (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (wcl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2012: # 1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (wcl, ). (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Consent to and JOINDER in Removal re 1 Notice of Removal, by Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(wcl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2012: # 14 Corrected Certificate of Service) (wcl, ). (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bank of America Corporation. (Cox, Todd) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Consent to and JOINDER in 1 Notice of Removal by Bank of America Corporation. (wcl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2012: # 1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (wcl, ). (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by CWALT, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Securities Corporation. (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CWALT, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Securities Corporation from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, case number CV-12-901037.00. (Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 4602024142)(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Summons and Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Part 1, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Part 2, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Part 1, # 9 Exhibit 7 - Part 2, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Receipt)(wcl, ) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for a Court Order of Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2) by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. 93 for pdf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY BRIEF in support of Defendants' 54 Motion to Reopen Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Discovering Settlement Information and Motion to Compel Disclosure of Settlement Information filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (dmn, )(NO PDF, see Doc. 80 for pdf and 92 Memorandum Opinion and Order.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Settlement Information by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (dmn, ) (NO PDF attached, see Doc. 54 .)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***Attorney John Evans Bailey terminated pursuant to the court's text order (doc # 51). (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***Attorney Michael M. Pomerantz for Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank added pursuant to the 43 motion. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                *** Attorney Dennis Ray Bailey terminated pursuant to the court's text order (doc # 35). (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Order Deeming the 13 Notice of Deficiency as Moot, by Bank of America Corporation. (No PDF document attached to this entry; see 31 Notice.) (scn, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case transferred to Central District of California. Entire file with certified copy of docket sheet sent ELECTRONICALLY via EMAIL to Clerk's Office. (No pdf attached) (wcl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***Attorney Marc S.T. Dworsky, James Christopher Rutten, Erin Joan Cox for Bank of America Corporation and Adam Slutsky for CWALT, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Securities Corporation added pursuant to 7 Stipulation. (No pdf attached) (wcl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***Attorney Richard Hamilton Gill, Dean J. Kitchens, Alexander K. Mircheff for Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC and George Robert Parker, Dylan Cook Black, James P. Rouhandeh, Dana M. Seshens, Daniel J. Schwartz for Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC added pursuant to Notice of Consent. (No pdf attached) (wcl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***Attorney Carl Stanley Burkhalter, Richard Jon Davis, Todd Harris Cox for Bank of America Corporation added pursuant to 3 Joinder. (No pdf attached) (wcl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Bank of America Corporation, CWALT, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC, filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (No pdf attached - See docket entry 1 )(wcl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank. (No pdf attached - See docket entry 1 ) (wcl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing to State Court by CWALT, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Securities Corporation re: filing of 1 Notice of Removal. (No pdf attached - See docket entry 1 ) (wcl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 357 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?