Lodsys Group, LLC v. Capcom U.S.A., Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00389
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 12:26 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lodsys Group, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by The Davis Firm, PC-Longview

Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Capcom U.s.a., Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Capcom U.s.a., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lodsys Group, LLC, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Attorney Allen Franklin Gardner; Michael E Jones; Scott Thomas Weingaertner; Wayne M Barsky and Christopher Charles Carnaval terminated., Capcom U.S.A., Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/17/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:13-cv-58. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/6/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Capcom U.S.A., Inc. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 24 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Roth, Kit) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
          LREF
          Blank 23 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE by Apple, Inc. INTERVENOR, APPLE INC.'S, NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT SUBMISSION (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER, ( Scheduling Conference set for 9/5/2013 10:15 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Payne.) Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/7/13. (mrm, ) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Charles Carnaval on behalf of Capcom U.S.A., Inc. (Carnaval, Christopher) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Thomas Weingaertner on behalf of Capcom U.S.A., Inc. (Weingaertner, Scott) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                  ANSWER to 14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lodsys Group, LLC.(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kit W Roth on behalf of Lodsys Group, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4244080. (Roth, Kit) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                      ANSWER to 12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lodsys Group, LLC.(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                        DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Capcom U.S.A., Inc.. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Capcom U.S.A., Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys Group, LLC by Capcom U.S.A., Inc..(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                APPLE INC.'S ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM IN INTERVENTION against Lodsys Group, LLC by Apple, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christopher M Huck on behalf of Lodsys Group, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4186417. (Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Capcom U.S.A., Inc..( Barsky, Wayne) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 7 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/7/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey E Ostrow on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4168845. (Ostrow, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
                                          Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys Group, LLC. Capcom U.S.A., Inc. served on 5/24/2013, answer due 6/14/2013. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                              SUMMONS Issued as to Capcom U.S.A., Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lodsys Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lodsys Holdings Group, LLC for Lodsys Group, LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                    DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                      COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Capcom U.S.A., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4132514.), filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,620,565, # 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,222,078, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 154 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?