Mancini, et al v. Prudential-Bache/Fog, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:90-cv-05213
District Judge Paul E. Plunkett, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 2, 2016 at 12:29 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ace-Atlas Corporate Employee Benefit, Plaintiff
No Logo Adele Bacon, Plaintiff
No Logo Ali R Ghahramani, Plaintiff
No Logo Allen J Staib, Plaintiff
No Logo Anthony A Fizzano, Plaintiff
No Logo Arthur Diamond, Plaintiff
No Logo Beatrice Lichtenberg, Plaintiff
No Logo Bedrick Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Berg Family Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Carolyn L Burrell, Plaintiff
No Logo Charles M Roy, Plaintiff
No Logo CV Sorelle & Co., Plaintiff
No Logo Daniel A Duran, Plaintiff
No Logo Daniel W Terry, Plaintiff
No Logo David Berelson, Plaintiff
No Logo David Morris, Plaintiff
No Logo Debra Tobis, Plaintiff
No Logo Dennis Demetropoulos, Plaintiff
No Logo Dennis S Perrotta, Plaintiff
No Logo Dennis Webber, Plaintiff
No Logo Don Ratkowski, Plaintiff
No Logo E Boyer Chrisman, Plaintiff
No Logo Edgar U Paine, Plaintiff
No Logo Edith W Staib, Plaintiff
No Logo Law Offices Of Eduardo Garcia, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Eduardo Garcia"
No Logo Elaine M Metcalf, Plaintiff
No Logo Elizabeth Pigott, Plaintiff
No Logo Elizabeth W McMaster, Plaintiff
No Logo Elliot R Fischer, Plaintiff
No Logo Florence E Deegan, Plaintiff
No Logo Frances Ripley, Plaintiff
No Logo Frances Sachs, Plaintiff
No Logo Fred E Kauffman, Plaintiff
No Logo Fred W Alber, Plaintiff
No Logo Gene Festa, Plaintiff
No Logo George C Desmond, Plaintiff
No Logo Gerald Christensen, Plaintiff
No Logo Gerald T Knight, Plaintiff
No Logo Gianna Sciacqua, Plaintiff
No Logo Grandolfo Terranova, Plaintiff
No Logo Guy T Fizzano, Plaintiff
No Logo H Robert Weiner, Plaintiff
No Logo Harvey J Weinstein, Plaintiff
No Logo Helen Hawk Windes, Plaintiff
No Logo Herbert Plotkin, Plaintiff
No Logo Herbert S McReynolds, Plaintiff
No Logo Hilliard M Eure, III, Plaintiff
No Logo Horace P Dansby, Plaintiff
No Logo Irving Zeldman, Plaintiff
No Logo James C McManis, Plaintiff
No Logo James M Ciaravella, Jr, Plaintiff
No Logo Janice Shinder, Plaintiff
No Logo Jeff Stone, Plaintiff
No Logo John Cutler, Plaintiff
No Logo John H Deegan, Plaintiff
No Logo John T. Fizzano, Jr, Plaintiff
No Logo Joseph M Caruso, Plaintiff
No Logo Joyce E Truitt, Plaintiff
No Logo Joyce V Smith, Plaintiff
No Logo Judith Knight, Plaintiff
No Logo K R Chaudry, Plaintiff
No Logo Karen L Bishop, Plaintiff
No Logo Kay Koplovitz, Plaintiff
No Logo Keith Kobet, Plaintiff
No Logo Ken Neuhaus, Plaintiff
No Logo Kenneth M Metcalf, Plaintiff
No Logo Kenneth Stephens, Plaintiff
No Logo Kevin J Hackett, Plaintiff
No Logo Leon Schekter, Plaintiff
No Logo Leopold Sciacqua, Plaintiff
No Logo Lisa Beth Sachs, Plaintiff
No Logo Lou Shinder, Plaintiff
No Logo Louis Krajack, Plaintiff
No Logo Lyman A Rust, Plaintiff
No Logo Lynne B Terry, Plaintiff
No Logo Mae Festa, Plaintiff
No Logo Manmohan A Patel, Plaintiff
No Logo Margaret H Demant, Plaintiff
No Logo Marion Driver Carr Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Marjorie Annis, Plaintiff
No Logo Marshall F Bishop, Plaintiff
No Logo Martha V Jyurovati, Plaintiff
No Logo Martin V Smith, Plaintiff
No Logo Marvan R Voshall, Plaintiff
No Logo Mary Demetropoulos, Plaintiff
No Logo Mina Terranova, Plaintiff
No Logo Murray Hozman, Plaintiff
No Logo N K Dansby, Plaintiff
No Logo Neta Ruth Sunderwirth, Plaintiff
No Logo Nicholas Mancini, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Alan Schy +1 312 986 8600

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herbert Beigel +1 520 825 1995 +1 520 825 1995 hbeigel@gmail.com
No Logo Norman Cohen, Plaintiff
No Logo Norman L Martin, Plaintiff
No Logo Patricia A Desmond, Plaintiff
No Logo Patricia A Kauffman, Plaintiff
No Logo Paul, Thomas, Plaintiff
No Logo Peter Terranova, Plaintiff
No Logo Phyllis Klass, Plaintiff
No Logo Ralph O Taylor, Plaintiff
No Logo Randy Robbins, Plaintiff
No Logo Richard J Parker, Plaintiff
No Logo Richard Sunderwirth, Plaintiff
No Logo Riva Berelson, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert A. Englander Revocable Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert C Burell, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert E Freeman, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert J. Basney Revocable Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo ROBERT MORRIS, Plaintiff
No Logo Roy S Nagakura, Plaintiff
No Logo Samuel M Puder Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Sharon Marquis, Plaintiff
No Logo Stanley A. Kinoshita, Plaintiff
No Logo Stephen A Guifre, Plaintiff
No Logo Ted Kotcheff, Plaintiff
No Logo Thomas Bridgmon Chestnut Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Thomas F. Hewitt, Plaintiff
No Logo Thomas R Mullens, Plaintiff
No Logo Timothy Knight, Plaintiff
No Logo Vera Terranova, Plaintiff
No Logo Victor P Chelovich, Plaintiff
No Logo Vilas V Voshall, Plaintiff
No Logo Walter Pigott, Plaintiff
No Logo Wayne E Ripley, Jr, Plaintiff
No Logo William, Adams &., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "William Adams"
No Logo William B Bauman, Plaintiff
No Logo William C Albert, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Fogelman Limited Partnership, Defendant
No Logo Fogelman Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fogelman Propertioes L.P., Defendant
No Logo Prudential-Bache Properties Inc, Defendant
No Logo Prudential-bache Securities,inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Miriam Goldman Bahcall +1 312 476 5135 +1 312 456 8435 bahcallm@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay B. Kasner , +1 212 735 2628 +1 917 777 2628 Jay.Kasner@skadden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Lynn McDevitt +1 312 407 0910 +1 312 407 8581 donna.mcdevitt@skadden.com
No Logo Prudential-Bache/Fogelman Harbour, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James H. Neale +1 212 983 6900

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Lynch +1 312 876 7700 +MDL TER MINATED john.lynch@lw.com
Space James F. Stern +1 312 876 7700

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Matthew Davis +1 312 207 1000 +1 312 207 6400 jdavis@reedsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy A. Nelsen +1 312 407 0700 +1 312 407 0700 tnelsen@skadden.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (72) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/5/1991, Entered: None
Document Sealed (pursuant to Court Order) (Temporarily unavailable for docketing.) (fce) (Entered: 07/16/1992)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/4/1992, Entered: None
    MINUTE ORDER of 3/4/92 by Hon. Paul E. Plunkett : Petition of class counsel for authorization to pay the costs of administering the settlement and for an award of additional expenses, granted. [74-1] Enter order for authorization to pay costs of administrating the settlement and for an award of additional expenses. Mailed notice (fce) (Entered: 03/05/1992)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/4/1992, Entered: None
      ORDER regarding motion for authorization to pay the costs of administering the settlement and for an award of additional expenses [74-1] (fce) (Entered: 03/05/1992)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/2/1992, Entered: None
        VERIFICATION of Ronald A. Schy (Attachment) (fce) (Entered: 03/05/1992)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/4/1992, Entered: None
          PETITION by class counsel for authorization to pay the costs of administering the settlement and for an award of additional expenses (Exhibits) ; notice of motion. (fce) (Entered: 03/05/1992)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/5/1992, Entered: None
            MINUTE ORDER of 2/5/92 by Hon. Paul E. Plunkett : Enter memorandum opinion and order: The petitioners are entitled to a fee of $247,642.50 plus expenses totalling $20,723.44. Mailed notice (fce) (Entered: 02/06/1992)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/5/1992, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM, OPINION, AND ORDER (fce) (Entered: 02/06/1992)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/31/1992, Entered: None
                MINUTE ORDER of 1/31/92 by Hon. Paul E. Plunkett : Enter order permitting those who previously excluded themselves from the above-entitled class action settlement to rescind their opt out. Mailed notice (fce) (Entered: 02/03/1992)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/31/1992, Entered: None
                  ORDER (fce) (Entered: 02/03/1992)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/29/1992, Entered: None
                    SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs in support of class counsel's petition for attorneys' fees (Exhibits) (fce) (Entered: 01/30/1992)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/22/1992, Entered: None
                      MINUTE ORDER of 1/22/92 by Hon. Paul E. Plunkett : No objections to the proposed settlement having been filed, the fairness hearing was not held. Enter final judgment and order approving settlement. Supplemental memorandum on attorneys fees to be filed by or on 01/29/92. Ruling on attorneys fees set for 02/5/92 at 9:15 a.m. terminating case Mailed notice (fce) (Entered: 01/24/1992)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/22/1992, Entered: None
                        FINAL JUDGMENT and order approving settlement (fce) (Entered: 01/24/1992)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/22/1992, Entered: None
                          CERTIFICATE of mailing by attorneys for the plaintiff class regarding notices of pendency of class action, proposed settlement and hearing thereon, and right to share in settlement (fce) (Entered: 01/24/1992)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/15/1992, Entered: None
                            AFFIDAVIT of Diane J. Kliebard on behalf of Beigel & Sandler, Ltd. in support of the firm's application for reimbursement of attorneys' fees and costs (Exhibit) (Attachment) (fce) (Entered: 01/16/1992)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/15/1992, Entered: None
                              VERIFIED MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs in support of the proposed settlement and application of plaintiffs' counsel for an award of attorneys' fees and reimbursement of expenses (fce) (Entered: 01/16/1992)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/15/1992, Entered: None
                                MINUTE ORDER of 1/15/92 by Hon. Paul E. Plunkett : Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a brief in excess of fifteen pages, instanter, is granted. [62-1] Telephoned notice (fce) (Entered: 01/16/1992)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/15/1992, Entered: None
                                  MOTION by plaintiff for leave to file a brief in excess of fifteen pages instanter ; notice of motion. (fce) (Entered: 01/16/1992)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/6/1991, Entered: None
                                    SECOND AMENDED CLASS COMPLAINT [20-1] and derivative complaint by plaintiffs; jury demand; adding Ted Kotcheff, Frances Sachs, Lisa Beth Sachs, Dennis Demetropoulos, Mary Demetropoulos, Keith Kobet, Vilas V Voshall, Daniel A Duran, Walter Pigott, Elizabeth Pigott, Marvan R Voshall, Allen J Staib, Edith W Staib, Wayne E Ripley Jr, Frances Ripley, Marshall F Bishop, Karen L Bishop, Mae Festa, Gene Festa, Randy Robbins, Arthur Diamond, Berg Family Trust, Ken Neuhaus, Charles M Roy, George C Desmond, Patricia A Desmond, Ralph O Taylor Jr, Jeff Stone, Herbert Plotkin, Fred E Kauffman, Patricia A Kauffman, Thomas Bridgmon Chestnut Trust, Richard J Parker, William B Bauman, Manmohan A Patel, K R Chaudry, Murray Hozman, Martha V Jyurovati, Paul Thomas, Eduardo Garcia (Exhibits) (fce) Modified on 12/09/1991 (Entered: 12/09/1991)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/6/1991, Entered: None
                                      MINUTE ORDER of 12/6/91 by Hon. Paul E. Plunkett : Leave is granted to file second amended class action and derivative complaint, instanter. Enter order concerning preliminary approval, class certification and notice and scheduling. Fairness hearing set for 01/22/92 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (fce) (Entered: 12/09/1991)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/6/1991, Entered: None
                                        ORDER concerning preliminary approval, class certification, notice and scheduling (Attachment) (fce) (Entered: 12/09/1991)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/6/1991, Entered: None
                                          STIPULATION of settlement (Attachments) (fce) (Entered: 12/09/1991)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/27/1991, Entered: None
                                            MINUTE ORDER of 11/27/91 by Hon. Paul E. Plunkett : Time to reinstate the above-entitled case and time to submit any settlement papers, extended to and including 12/06/91. Mailed notice (fce) (Entered: 11/27/1991)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/15/1991, Entered: None
                                              RULE 39 Affidavit of Jay B. Kasner (fce) (Entered: 11/18/1991)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/15/1991, Entered: None
                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Prudential-Bache Pro, defendant Prudential-Bache Sec by Jay B. Kasner. (fce) (Entered: 11/18/1991)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/15/1991, Entered: None
                                                  MINUTE ORDER of 11/15/91 by Hon. Paul E. Plunkett : granting motion for attorney Jay B. Kasner to appear pro hac vice [53-1], granting motion for leave to file additional appearance of Mr. Kasner [53-2] Telephoned notice (fce) (Entered: 11/18/1991)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/15/1991, Entered: None
                                                    AGREED MOTION by defendant Prudential-Bache Pro, defendant Prudential-Bache Sec for attorney Jay B. Kasner to appear pro hac vice and for leave to file additional appearance of Mr. Kasner ; notice of agreed motion. (fce) (Entered: 11/18/1991)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/18/1991, Entered: None
                                                      MINUTE ORDER of 10/18/91 by Hon. Paul E. Plunkett : Agreed motion for entry of protective order, granted. [50-1] Enter protective order. No notice (fce) (Entered: 10/21/1991)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/18/1991, Entered: None
                                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER (fce) (Entered: 10/21/1991)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/18/1991, Entered: None
                                                          AGREED MOTION by defendants Prudential-Bache Sec, Prudential-Bache for entry of protective order ; notice of agreed motion. (fce) (Entered: 10/21/1991)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/16/1991, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE by plaintiffs of taking deposition of Chemical Bank on 10/16/91 (fce) (Entered: 10/17/1991)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/11/1991, Entered: None
                                                              MINUTE ORDER of 10/11/91 by Hon. Paul E. Plunkett : Agreed motion to continue the date for amending the complaint, to and including 11/29/91, granted. [47-1] Telephoned notice (fce) (Entered: 10/15/1991)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/11/1991, Entered: None
                                                                AGREED MOTION by plaintiffs to continue the date for amending the complaint to 11/29/91 ; notice of motion. (fce) Modified on 10/15/1991 (Entered: 10/15/1991)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/30/1991, Entered: None
                                                                  MINUTE ORDER of 8/30/91 before Hon. Paul E. Plunkett : re [45-1] Enter memorandum opinion and order: we grant the defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint in its entirety. [27-1] The complaint is dismissed without prejudice, however, and with leave to amend on or before 10/15/91 in accordance with this opinion or the dismissal will be with prejudice and this order will at that time ripen into a final judgment. Status hearing and ruling date of 09/17/91 is stricken. (For further detail see order attached to the original minute order form.) terminating case Notice mailed 09/03/91. (fce) (Entered: 09/03/1991)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/30/1991, Entered: None
                                                                    MEMORANDUM, OPINION, AND ORDER (fce) (Entered: 09/03/1991)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/15/1991, Entered: None
                                                                      MINUTE ORDER of 7/15/91 before Honorable Paul E. Plunkett : Status hearing and ruling date of 08/16/91 is stricken and reset to 09/17/91 at 9:15 a.m. Notice mailed 07/16/91. (fce) (Entered: 07/16/1991)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/26/1991, Entered: None
                                                                        MINUTE ORDER of 6/26/91 before Honorable Paul E. Plunkett : Ruling on defendant's motion to dismiss [27-1] is reset to 08/16/91 at 9:15 a.m.. Status hearing reset for 08/16/91 at 9:15 a.m. Notice mailed 06/27/91. (fce) (Entered: 06/27/1991)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/17/1991, Entered: None
                                                                          MINUTE ORDER of 6/17/91 before Honorable Paul E. Plunkett : re [27-1] Status hearing and ruling date of 06/26/91 on defendant's motion to dismiss is stricken and reset to 07/12/91 at 9:15 a.m. Notice mailed 06/18/91. (fce) (Entered: 06/18/1991)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/24/1991, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE by plaintiffs of change of address (fce) (Entered: 05/31/1991)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/24/1991, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE by plaintiffs of change of address (fce) (Entered: 05/31/1991)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/14/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                MINUTE ORDER of 5/14/91 before Honorable Paul E. Plunkett : Status hearing and ruling date of 05/30/91 is stricken and reset to 06/26/91 at 9:15 a.m. Notice mailed 05/15/91. (fce) (Entered: 05/15/1991)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/12/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                  JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM by defendants to response to motion to dismiss first amended complaint [27-1] (Attachments). (fce) (Entered: 04/18/1991)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/29/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE of memorandum in opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss executed as to all parties on 3/28/91 (fce) (Entered: 04/01/1991)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/28/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs in opposition motion to dismiss first amended complaint [27-1] (Attachments)(Exhibits). (fce) (Entered: 03/29/1991)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/27/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER of 3/27/91 before Honorable Paul E. Plunkett : granting motion to exceed page limitation [34-1] Notice not mailed. (fce) (Entered: 03/28/1991)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/27/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION by plaintiffs to exceed page limitation ; notice of motion. (fce) (Entered: 03/28/1991)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/28/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                            APPENDIX filed by defendants regarding memorandum [32-1] (Exhibits). (fce) (Entered: 03/01/1991)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/28/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by defendants in support of motion to dismiss first amended complaint [27-1] (fce) (Entered: 03/01/1991)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/27/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER of 2/27/91 before Honorable Paul E. Plunkett : granting motion to exceed page limitation [30-1] Defendants are given leave to file a brief of no more than 40 pages. Notice not mailed. (fce) (Entered: 02/28/1991)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/27/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION by defendants to exceed page limitation (Attachment) ; notice of motion. (fce) (Entered: 02/28/1991)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/25/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER of 1/25/91 before Honorable Paul E. Plunkett : Discovery is held in abeyance pending ruling on motion to dismiss. Brief in support of motion due 02/28/91. Answer brief to motion due 03/28/91. Reply to answer brief due 04/12/91. Ruling on motion to dismiss first amended complaint [27-1] will be set for 5/30/91 at 9:15 am. Status hearing held; Continued to 05/30/91 at 9:15 am. Notice mailed 01/28/91. (fce) (Entered: 01/28/1991)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/19/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER of 12/19/90 before Honorable Paul E. Plunkett : Filed motion of defendant to dismiss. re [27-1] Status hearing held; Continued to 01/25/91 at 9:15 am. Notice not mailed. (fce) (Entered: 12/19/1990)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/19/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION by Avron B. Fogelman, Prudential-Bache Pro, Prudential-Bache Sec, Fogelman Properties, Fogelman Limited, Prudential-Bache/Fog to dismiss first amended complaint ; notice of motion. (fce) (Entered: 12/19/1990)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/15/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER of 11/15/90 before Honorable Paul E. Plunkett :Defendants' agreed motion to extend the time for the defendants to answer or otherwise plead, is granted to and including 12/17/90. [25-1] Status hearing reset for 12/19/90 at 9:15 am. notice not mailed. (fce) (Entered: 11/16/1990)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/15/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                            AGREED MOTION by Prudential-Bache/Fog, Fogelman Limited, Fogelman Properties, Avron B. Fogelman to extend time to answer (Exhibit); notice of motion. (fce) (Entered: 11/16/1990)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/15/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER of 11/15/90 before Honorable Paul E. Plunkett : Motion of defendants Prudential-Bache Securities Group, Inc. and Prudential-Bache Properties, Inc. for leave to file additional appearance of Donna L. McDevitt of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom is granted. [21-1] notice not mailed. (fce) (Entered: 11/16/1990)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/15/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RULE 39 Affidavit of Donna L. McDevitt (fce) (Entered: 11/16/1990)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/15/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Prudential-Bache Sec, Prudential-Bache Pro by Donna L. McDevitt (fce) (Entered: 11/16/1990)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/15/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION by Prudential-Bache Sec, Prudential-Bache Pro for leave to file additional appearance ; notice of motion. (fce) (Entered: 11/16/1990)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/13/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT by plaintiff; jury demand; adding Avron B. Fogelman (fce) (Entered: 11/14/1990)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/5/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER of 11/5/90 before Honorable Paul E. Plunkett : Defendants' motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead, to and including November 15, 1990, granted. [18-1] notice not mailed. (fce) (Entered: 11/06/1990)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/5/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendants to extend time to answer ; notice of motion. (fce) (Entered: 11/06/1990)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/2/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER of 11/2/90 before Honorable Paul E. Plunkett : Status hearing set for Nov. 28, 1990 at 9:15am. Notice mailed. (fce) (Entered: 11/05/1990)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/31/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              RULE 39 Affidavit of James F. Stern (fce) (Entered: 10/31/1990)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/31/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                RULE 39 Affidavit of James H. Neale (fce) (Entered: 10/31/1990)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/31/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  RULE 39 Affidavit of John P. Lynch (fce) (Entered: 10/31/1990)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/31/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    RULE 39 Affidavit of James M. Davis (fce) (Entered: 10/31/1990)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/31/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Prudential-Bache/Fog, defendant Fogelman Limited, defendant Fogelman Properties, defendant Prudential-Bache Sec, defendant Prudential-Bache Pro by John P. Lynch, James F. Stern, James M. Davis and James H. Neale. (fce) (Entered: 10/31/1990)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/15/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER of 10/15/90 before Honorable Paul E. Plunkett : granting motion to extend time until 11/15/90 for defendants Prudential-Bache Properties, Inc. and Prudential-Bache Securities Group, Inc. to answer, Move or otherwise plead (Exhibit) [10-1] notice mailed (fce) (Entered: 10/16/1990)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/15/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Agreed motion by defendant Prudential-Bache Sec, defendant Prudential-Bache Pro to extend time to answer, Move or otherwise plead (Exhibit) ; notice of agreed motion. (fce) (Entered: 10/16/1990)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/12/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            RULE 39 Affidavit of Miriam G. Bahcall (fce) (Entered: 10/12/1990)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/12/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              RULE 39 Affidavit of Timothy Alan Nelsen (fce) (Entered: 10/12/1990)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/12/1990, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Prudential-Bache/Fog, defendant Fogelman Limited, defendant Fogelman Properties, defendant Prudential-Bache Sec, defendant Prudential-Bache Pro by Timothy Alan Nelsen and Miriam G. Bahcall (fce) (Entered: 10/12/1990)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 108 times.

                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?