WADE v. MILLER et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00708
District Judge Rudolph Contreras, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 24, 2016 at 2:21 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo E K Wade, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space E K Wade
v.
No Logo AARON SCHOCK, Defendant
No Logo ADAM KINZINGER, Defendant
Schiff, Adam Schiff, Adam, Defendant
Officially listed as "ADAM SCHIFF"
No Logo Adam Smith, Defendant
No Logo ADDISON WILSON, Defendant
No Logo Adrian, Smith +., Defendant
No Logo AL FRANKEN, Defendant
No Logo AL GREEN, Defendant
No Logo ALAN NUNNELEE, Defendant
No Logo ALBIO SIRES, Defendant
No Logo ALCEE HASTINGS, Defendant
No Logo ALL DEFENDANTS - REPRESENATIVES, Defendant
No Logo ALL DEFENDANTS - SENATORS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Morgan John Frankel +1 202 224 4435 +1 202 224 3391 morgan_frankel@legal.senate.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Senate

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia M. Bryan +1 202 224 4435 +1 202 224 3391 pat_bryan@legal.senate.gov
Space Grant Raymond Vinik +1 202 224 4435 +1 202 224 3391 grant_vinik@legal.senate.gov
No Logo ALLEN WEST, Defendant
No Logo ALLYSON SCHWARTZ, Defendant
No Logo AMY KLOBUCHAR, Defendant
No Logo ANDER CRENSHAW, Defendant
No Logo ANDRE CARSON, Defendant
No Logo ANDY HARRIS, Defendant
No Logo ANNA ESHOO, Defendant
No Logo ANNA MARIE BUERKLE, Defendant
No Logo Austin, Scott, Defendant
No Logo BARBARA BOXER, Defendant
No Logo BARBARA LEE, Defendant
No Logo BARBARA MIKULSKI, Defendant
No Logo BARNEY FRANK, Defendant
No Logo BEN CARDIN, Defendant
No Logo BEN CHANDLER, Defendant
No Logo BEN LUJAN, Defendant
No Logo BEN NELSON, Defendant
No Logo BEN QUAYLE, Defendant
No Logo Bennie Thompson, Defendant
No Logo BERNIE SANDERS, Defendant
No Logo BETTY MCCOLLUM, Defendant
No Logo BETTY SUTTON, Defendant
No Logo BILL CASSIDY, Defendant
No Logo BILL FLORES, Defendant
No Logo BILL HUIZENGA, Defendant
No Logo BILL JOHNSON, Defendant
No Logo BILL NELSON, Defendant
No Logo Bill Posey, Defendant
No Logo BILL YOUNG, Defendant
No Logo BILLY LONG, Defendant
No Logo BLAINE LUETKEMEYER, Defendant
No Logo BLAKE FARENTHOLD, Defendant
No Logo BOB CORKER, Defendant
No Logo BOB DOLD, Defendant
No Logo BOB GIBBS, Defendant
No Logo BOBBY RUSH, Defendant
No Logo BRAD SHERMAN, Defendant
No Logo BRADLEY MILLER, Defendant
No Logo BRETT GUTHRIE, Defendant
No Logo BRIAN BILBRAY, Defendant
No Logo Brian Higgins, Defendant
No Logo BRUCE BRALEY, Defendant
No Logo CANDICE MILLER, Defendant
No Logo CARL LEVIN, Defendant
No Logo CAROLYN MALONEY, Defendant
No Logo CAROLYN MCCARTHY, Defendant
No Logo CATHY MCMORRIS RODGERS, Defendant
No Logo CEDRIC RICHMOND, Defendant
No Logo CHAKA FATTAH, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES BASS, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES BOUSTANY, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES DENT, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES GONZALEZ, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES RANGEL, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES SCHUMER, Defendant
No Logo CHELLIE PINGREE, Defendant
No Logo CHIP CRAVAACK, Defendant
No Logo CHRIS COONS, Defendant
No Logo Chris Gibson, Defendant
No Logo CHRISTOPHER MURPHY, Defendant
No Logo Christopher Smith, Defendant
No Logo CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, Defendant
No Logo CHUCK FLEISCHMANN, Defendant
No Logo CHUCK GRASSLEY, Defendant
No Logo CLAIRE MCCASKILL, Defendant
No Logo CLIFFORD STEARNS, Defendant
No Logo COLLEEN HANABUSA, Defendant
No Logo COLLIN PETERSON, Defendant
No Logo CONNIE MACK, Defendant
No Logo CORRINE BROWN, Defendant
No Logo CORY GARDNER, Defendant
No Logo CYNTHIA LUMMIS, Defendant
No Logo DALE KILDEE, Defendant
No Logo DAN BENISHEK, Defendant
No Logo DAN BOREN, Defendant
No Logo DAN BURTON, Defendant
No Logo DAN COATS, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL AKAKA, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL LIPINSKI, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL LUNGREN, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL WEBSTER, Defendant
No Logo DANNY DAVIS, Defendant
No Logo DARRELL ISSA, Defendant
No Logo DAVE REICHERT, Defendant
No Logo David Camp, Defendant
No Logo DAVID CICILLINE, Defendant
No Logo DAVID DRELER, Defendant
No Logo DAVID LOEBSACK, Defendant
No Logo DAVID MCKINLEY, Defendant
No Logo David Price, Defendant
No Logo DAVID RIVERA, Defendant
No Logo DAVID SCHWEIKERT, Defendant
No Logo DAVID SCOTT, Defendant
No Logo DAVID VITTER, Defendant
No Logo DEAN HELLER, Defendant
No Logo DEBBIE STABENOW, Defendant
No Logo DEBBIE WASSERMAN-SCHULTZ, Defendant
No Logo DENNIS KUCINICH, Defendant
No Logo DENNIS REHBERG, Defendant
No Logo DENNIS ROSS, Defendant
No Logo DEVINE NUNES, Defendant
No Logo DIANA DEGETTE, Defendant
No Logo DIANE BLACK, Defendant
No Logo DIANE FEINSTEIN, Defendant
No Logo DICK DURBIN, Defendant
No Logo DICK LUGAR, Defendant
No Logo DOC HASTINGS, Defendant
No Logo DONALD MANZULLO, Defendant
No Logo DONALD PAYNE, Defendant
No Logo DONALD YOUNG, Defendant
No Logo DONNA EDWARDS, Defendant
No Logo DORIS MATSUI, Defendant
No Logo DOUG LAMBORN, Defendant
No Logo DUNCAN HUNTER, Defendant
No Logo DUTCH RUPPERSBERGER, Defendant
No Logo EARL BLUMENAUER, Defendant
No Logo ED PERLMUTTER, Defendant
No Logo Eddie Johnson, Defendant
No Logo EDOLPHUS TOWNS, Defendant
No Logo EDWARD MARKEY, Defendant
No Logo EDWARD PASTOR, Defendant
No Logo EDWARD ROYCE, Defendant
No Logo EDWARD WHITFIELD, Defendant
No Logo ELIJAH CUMMINGS, Defendant
No Logo ELIOT ENGEL, Defendant
No Logo ELTON GALLEGLY, Defendant
No Logo EMANUEL CLEAVER, Defendant
No Logo ERIC CANTOR, Defendant
No Logo ERIK PAULSEN, Defendant
No Logo FORTNEY STARK, Defendant
No Logo FRANCISCO CANSECO, Defendant
No Logo FRANK GUINTA, Defendant
No Logo FRANK LAUTENBERG, Defendant
No Logo FRANK LOBIONDO, Defendant
No Logo Frank, Lucas, Defendant
No Logo FRANK PALLONE, Defendant
No Logo FRANK WOLF, Defendant
No Logo FREDERICK UPTON, Defendant
No Logo GARY MILLER, Defendant
No Logo Gary Peters, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE BUTTERFIELD, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE MILLER, Defendant
No Logo GERALD CONNALLY, Defendant
No Logo GLENN THOMPSON, Defendant
No Logo GRACE NAPOLITANO, Defendant
No Logo GREG WALDEN, Defendant
No Logo GREGG HARPER, Defendant
No Logo GREGORY MEEKS, Defendant
No Logo GUS BILIRAKIS, Defendant
No Logo GWEN MOORE, Defendant
No Logo HANSEN CLARKE, Defendant
No Logo HAROLD ROGERS, Defendant
No Logo HARRY REID, Defendant
No Logo HEATH SHULER, Defendant
No Logo HENRY CUELLAR, Defendant
No Logo Henry Johnson, Defendant
No Logo HENRY WAXMAN, Defendant
No Logo HERB KOHL, Defendant
No Logo HON. DANA ROHRABACHER, Defendant
No Logo HOWARD BERMAN, Defendant
No Logo HOWARD COBLE, Defendant
No Logo HOWARD MCKEON, Defendant
No Logo ILEANA ROS-LEHTINEN, Defendant
No Logo JACK KINGSTON, Defendant
No Logo JACK REED, Defendant
No Logo JACKIE SPEIER, Defendant
No Logo JAIME HERRERA BEUTLER, Defendant
No Logo JAMES CLYBURN, Defendant
No Logo JAMES HIMES, Defendant
No Logo JAMES INHOFE, Defendant
No Logo JAMES LANGEVIN, Defendant
No Logo JAMES LANKFORD, Defendant
No Logo JAMES MCDERMOTT, Defendant
No Logo JAMES MCGOVERN, Defendant
No Logo JAMES MORAN, Defendant
No Logo JAMES RISCH, Defendant
No Logo JAMES SENSENBRENNER, Defendant
No Logo JANICE HAHN, Defendant
No Logo JANICE SCHAKOWSKY, Defendant
No Logo JARED POLIS, Defendant
No Logo JASON ALTMIRE, Defendant
No Logo JASON CHAFFETZ, Defendant
No Logo JAY INSLEE, Defendant
No Logo JAY ROCKEFELLER, Defendant
No Logo JEAN SCHMIDT, Defendant
No Logo JEANNE SHAHEEN, Defendant
No Logo JEB HENSARLING, Defendant
No Logo JEFF BINGAMAN, Defendant
No Logo JEFF DENHAM, Defendant
No Logo JEFF DUNCAN, Defendant
No Logo JEFF LANDRY, Defendant
No Logo JEFF MERKLEY, Defendant
No Logo JEFF MILLER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States House of Representatives

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Bullock Pittard, IV +1 202 225 9700 +1 202 226 1360 william.pittard@mail.house.gov
No Logo JEFFREY FORTENBERRY, Defendant
No Logo JERROLD NADLER, Defendant
No Logo JERRY COSTELLO, Defendant
No Logo JERRY LEWIS, Defendant
No Logo JERRY MCNERNEY, Defendant
No Logo JERRY MORAN, Defendant
Jackson, Sr., Jesse L. Jackson, Sr., Jesse L., Defendant
Officially listed as "JESSE JACKSON"
No Logo JIM COOPER, Defendant
No Logo JIM COSTA, Defendant
No Logo JIM GERLACH, Defendant
No Logo JIM JORDAN, Defendant
No Logo JIM RENACCI, Defendant
No Logo JIM WEBB, Defendant
No Logo JO ANN EMERSON, Defendant
No Logo JO BONNER, Defendant
No Logo JOE BACA, Defendant
No Logo JOE BARTON, Defendant
No Logo JOE COURTNEY, Defendant
No Logo JOE DONNELLY, Defendant
No Logo JOE HECK, Defendant
No Logo JOE MANCHIN, Defendant
No Logo JOE WALSH, Defendant
No Logo JOHN BARRASSO, Defendant
No Logo JOHN BARROW, Defendant
No Logo JOHN BOOZMAN, Defendant
No Logo JOHN CARNEY, Defendant
No Logo JOHN CARTER, Defendant
No Logo JOHN CONYERS, Defendant
No Logo JOHN CORNYN, Defendant
No Logo JOHN CULBERSON, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DINGELL, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DUNCAN, Defendant
No Logo John F. Kerry, Defendant
No Logo John Fleming, Defendant
No Logo JOHN GARAMENDI, Defendant
No Logo JOHN GINGREY, Defendant
No Logo JOHN HOEVEN, Defendant
No Logo JOHN KERRY, Defendant
No Logo JOHN KLINE, Defendant
No Logo JOHN LARSEN, Defendant
No Logo JOHN MICA, Defendant
No Logo JOHN OLVER, Defendant
No Logo JOHN SARBANES, Defendant
No Logo JOHN SHIMKUS, Defendant
No Logo JOHN SULLIVAN, Defendant
No Logo JOHN TESTER, Defendant
No Logo JOHN THUNE, Defendant
No Logo JOHN TIERNEY, Defendant
No Logo JOHN YARMUTH, Defendant
No Logo JOHNNY ISAKSON, Defendant
No Logo JON KYL, Defendant
No Logo JON RUNYAN, Defendant
No Logo JOSE SERRANO, Defendant
No Logo JOSEPH CROWLEY, Defendant
No Logo JOSEPH LIEBERMAN, Defendant
No Logo JOSEPH PITTS, Defendant
No Logo JUDY BIGGERT, Defendant
No Logo JUDY CHU, Defendant
No Logo KATHLEEN HOCHUL, Defendant
No Logo KATHY CASTOR, Defendant
No Logo KAY BAILEY HUTCHISON, Defendant
No Logo KAY GRANGER, Defendant
No Logo KEITH ELLISON, Defendant
No Logo KELLY AYOTTE, Defendant
No Logo KEN CALVERT, Defendant
No Logo KENNY MARCHANT, Defendant
No Logo KENT CONRAD, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Brady, Defendant
No Logo Kevin McCarthy, Defendant
No Logo KEVIN YODER, Defendant
Gillibrand, Kirsten Gillibrand, Kirsten, Defendant
Officially listed as "KIRSTEN GILLIBRAND"
No Logo KRISTI NOEM, Defendant
No Logo KURT SCHRADER, Defendant
No Logo Lamar, Alexander, Defendant
No Logo LAMAR SMITH, Defendant
No Logo LARRY BUCSHON, Defendant
No Logo LARRY KISSELL, Defendant
No Logo LAURA RICHARDSON, Defendant
No Logo Lee, Terry, Defendant
No Logo LEONARD BOSWELL, Defendant
No Logo LEONARD LANCE, Defendant
No Logo LINDA SANCHEZ, Defendant
Graham, Lindsey O. Graham, Lindsey O., Defendant
Officially listed as "LINDSEY GRAHAM"
No Logo LISA MURKOWSKI, Defendant
No Logo LLOYD DOGGETT, Defendant
No Logo LOIS CAPPS, Defendant
No Logo LORETTA SANCHEZ, Defendant
No Logo LOU BARLETTA, Defendant
No Logo LOUIS GOHMERT, Defendant
No Logo LUCILLE ROYBAL-ALLARD, Defendant
No Logo Luis Gutierrez, Defendant
No Logo LYNN JENKINS, Defendant
No Logo LYNN WESTMORELAND, Defendant
No Logo LYNN WOOLSEY, Defendant
No Logo MARCIA FUDGE, Defendant
No Logo Rubio, Marco, Defendant
Officially listed as "MARCO RUBIO"
No Logo MARCY KAPTUR, Defendant
No Logo MARIA CANTWELL, Defendant
No Logo MARIO DIAZ-BALART, Defendant
No Logo MARK AMODEI, Defendant
No Logo MARK BEGICH, Defendant
No Logo MARK CRITZ, Defendant
No Logo MARK KIRK, Defendant
No Logo MARK PRYOR, Defendant
No Logo MARK UDALL, Defendant
No Logo MARK WARNER, Defendant
No Logo MARLIN STUTZMAN, Defendant
No Logo MARSHA BLACKBURN, Defendant
No Logo MARTHA ROBY, Defendant
No Logo Martin, Heinrich, Defendant
No Logo MARY BONO MACK, Defendant
No Logo MARY LANDRIEU, Defendant
No Logo MAURICE HINCHEY, Defendant
No Logo MAX BAUCKUS, Defendant
No Logo MAXINE WATERS, Defendant
No Logo MAZIE HIRONO, Defendant
No Logo MELVIN WATT, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL BENNETT, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL BURGESS, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL CAPUANO, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL CONAWAY, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL DENNIS ROGERS, Defendant
No Logo Michael Doyle, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL FITZPATRICK, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL GRIMM, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL HONDA, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL MCCAUL, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL MICHAUD, Defendant
No Logo Michael Rogers, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL SIMPSON, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL THOMPSON, Defendant
No Logo michael, Turner, Defendant
No Logo MICHELLE BACHMANN, Defendant
Mulvaney, Mick Mulvaney, Mick, Defendant
Officially listed as "MICK MULVANEY"
No Logo MIKE COFFMAN, Defendant
No Logo MIKE CRAPO, Defendant
No Logo MIKE ENZI, Defendant
No Logo MIKE JOHANNS, Defendant
No Logo Mike Kelly, Defendant
No Logo MIKE LEE, Defendant
No Logo MIKE MCINTYRE, Defendant
Pence, Michael Richard Pence, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "MIKE PENCE"
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "MIKE POMPEO"
No Logo MIKE QUIGLEY, Defendant
No Logo MIKE ROSS, Defendant
McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch, Defendant
Officially listed as "MITCH MCCONNELL"
No Logo MO BROOKS, Defendant
No Logo MORGAN GRIFFITH, Defendant
No Logo NAN HAYWORTH, Defendant
Pelosi, Nancy Pelosi, Nancy, Defendant
Officially listed as "NANCY PELOSI"
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 4, 2007 - January 3, 2011
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 3, 2019 - Present
No Logo NICK RAHALL, Defendant
No Logo NIKI TSONGAS, Defendant
No Logo NITA LOWEY, Defendant
No Logo NORMAN DICKS, Defendant
No Logo NYDIA VELAZQUEZ, Defendant
No Logo ORRIN HATCH, Defendant
No Logo OSA DELAURO, Defendant
No Logo PAT ROBERTS, Defendant
No Logo PATRICK LEAHY, Defendant
No Logo PATRICK MCHENRY, Defendant
No Logo PATRICK MEEHAN, Defendant
No Logo PATRICK TIBERI, Defendant
No Logo Patrick Toomey, Defendant
No Logo PATTY MURRAY, Defendant
No Logo PAUL BROUN, Defendant
No Logo PAUL GOSAR, Defendant
No Logo Paul, Ryan, Defendant
No Logo PAUL TONKO, Defendant
No Logo PETE OLSON, Defendant
No Logo PETER DEFAZIO, Defendant
No Logo Peter King, Defendant
No Logo PETER ROSKAM, Defendant
No Logo PETER SESSIONS, Defendant
No Logo PETER VISCLOSKY, Defendant
No Logo PETER WELCH, Defendant
No Logo PHIL ROE, Defendant
No Logo RALPH HALL, Defendant
No Logo Rand, Paul, Defendant
No Logo RANDY FORBES, Defendant
No Logo RANDY HULTGREN, Defendant
No Logo RANDY NEUGEBAUER, Defendant
No Logo RAUL GRIJALVA, Defendant
No Logo RAUL LABRADOR, Defendant
No Logo RAYMOND GREEN, Defendant
No Logo REID RIBBLE, Defendant
No Logo RENEE ELMERS, Defendant
No Logo REPRESENTATIVE GARY ACKERMAN, Defendant
No Logo Blumenthal, Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "RICHARD BLUMENTHAL"
No Logo RICHARD BURR, Defendant
No Logo RICHARD HANNA, Defendant
No Logo RICHARD NEAL, Defendant
No Logo RICHARD NUGENT, Defendant
No Logo RICHARD SHELBY, Defendant
No Logo RICK BERG, Defendant
No Logo RICK CRAWFORD, Defendant
No Logo RICK LARSEN, Defendant
No Logo ROB BISHOP, Defendant
No Logo ROB PORTMAN, Defendant
No Logo ROB WITTMAN, Defendant
No Logo ROB WOODALL, Defendant
No Logo ROBERT ADHERHOLT, Defendant
No Logo ROBERT ANDREWS, Defendant
No Logo Robert Brady, Defendant
No Logo Robert Casey, Defendant
No Logo ROBERT GOODLATTE, Defendant
No Logo ROBERT HURT, Defendant
No Logo ROBERT LATTA, Defendant
No Logo ROBERT MENENDEZ, Defendant
No Logo ROBERT SCHILLING, Defendant
No Logo ROBERT SCOTT, Defendant
No Logo Robert Turner, Defendant
No Logo RODNEY ALEXANDER, Defendant
No Logo RODNEY FRELINGHUYSEN, Defendant
No Logo ROGER WICKER, Defendant
No Logo RON JOHNSON, Defendant
No Logo RON WYDEN, Defendant
No Logo RONALD KIND, Defendant
No Logo ROSCOE BARTLETT, Defendant
No Logo ROY BLUNT, Defendant
No Logo RUBEN HINOJOSA, Defendant
No Logo RUSH HOLT, Defendant
No Logo RUSS CARNAHAN, Defendant
No Logo SAM FARR, Defendant
No Logo SAMUEL GRAVES, Defendant
No Logo SAMUEL JOHNSON, Defendant
No Logo SANDER LEVIN, Defendant
No Logo SANDY ADAMS, Defendant
No Logo SANFORD BISHOP, Defendant
No Logo SAXBY CHAMBLISS, Defendant
No Logo Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "SCOTT BROWN"
No Logo SCOTT DESJARLAIS, Defendant
No Logo SCOTT RIGELL, Defendant
No Logo SCOTT TIPTON, Defendant
No Logo SEAN DUFFY, Defendant
No Logo SHEILA JACKSON-LEE, Defendant
No Logo SHELDON WHITEHOUSE, Defendant
No Logo SHELLEY BERKLEY, Defendant
No Logo SHELLEY CAPITO, Defendant
No Logo SHERROD BROWN, Defendant
No Logo SILVESTRE REYES, Defendant
No Logo SPENCER BACHUS, Defendant
No Logo STEPHEN FINCHER, Defendant
No Logo STEPHEN LYNCH, Defendant
No Logo STEVAN PEARCE, Defendant
No Logo STEVE AUSTRIA, Defendant
No Logo STEVE ISRAEL, Defendant
No Logo STEVE SCALISE, Defendant
No Logo STEVE SOUTHERLAND, Defendant
No Logo STEVE STIVERS, Defendant
No Logo STEVE WOMACK, Defendant
No Logo STEVEN CHABOT, Defendant
No Logo Steven Cohen, Defendant
No Logo STEVEN LATOURETTE, Defendant
No Logo STEVEN PALAZZO, Defendant
No Logo STEVEN ROTHMAN, Defendant
No Logo SUE MYRICK, Defendant
No Logo SUSAN COLLINS, Defendant
No Logo SUSAN DAVIS, Defendant
No Logo TAMMY BALDWIN, Defendant
No Logo TED DEUTCH, Defendant
No Logo TED POE, Defendant
No Logo TERRI SEWELL, Defendant
No Logo THAD COCHRAN, Defendant
No Logo THADDEUS MCCOTTER, Defendant
No Logo THOMAS LATHAM, Defendant
No Logo THOMAS MARINO, Defendant
No Logo THOMAS PETRI, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Rooney, Defendant
No Logo TIM GRIFFIN, Defendant
No Logo TIM HOLDEN, Defendant
No Logo TIM HUELSKAMP, Defendant
No Logo TIM MURPHY, Defendant
No Logo TIM SCOTT, Defendant
No Logo TIMOTHY BISHOP, Defendant
No Logo Timothy Johnson, Defendant
No Logo TIMOTHY RYAN, Defendant
No Logo TIMOTHY WALBERG, Defendant
No Logo TIMOTHY WALZ, Defendant
No Logo TODD AKIN, Defendant
No Logo TODD PLATTS, Defendant
No Logo TODD ROKITA, Defendant
No Logo TODD YOUNG, Defendant
No Logo TOM COBURN, Defendant
No Logo TOM COLE, Defendant
No Logo TOM GRAVES, Defendant
No Logo TOM HARKIN, Defendant
No Logo TOM MCCLINTOCK, Defendant
No Logo TOM PRICE, Defendant
No Logo TOM REED, Defendant
No Logo TRENT FRANKS, Defendant
No Logo TREY GOWDY, Defendant
No Logo U.S. Representative GEOFF DAVIS, Defendant
No Logo U.S. REPRESENTATIVE TIM JOHNSON, Defendant
No Logo U.S. Senator JIM DEMINT, Defendant
No Logo VERN BUCHANAN, Defendant
No Logo VICKY HARTZLER, Defendant
No Logo VIRGINIA FOXX, Defendant
No Logo WALTER HERGER, Defendant
No Logo WILLIAM CLAY, Defendant
No Logo WILLIAM KEATING, Defendant
No Logo WILLIAM OWENS, Defendant
No Logo WILLIAM PASCRELL, Defendant
No Logo WILLIAM SHUSTER, Defendant
No Logo WILLIAM THORNBERRY, Defendant
No Logo XAVIER BACERRA, Defendant
No Logo YVETTE CLARKE, Defendant
No Logo ZOE LOFGREN, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER finding as moot 21 Motion to Issue Summons; finding as moot 26 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 36 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 46 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 47 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous, and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; and granting with conditions 48 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's motion to dismiss is GRANTED WITH CONDITIONS, and all other motions are DENIED AS MOOT. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/22/2013. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
    RESPONSE re 48 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ALL DEFENDANTS - REPRESENATIVES. (Pittard, William) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
      MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint without prejudice by E K WADE (jf, ) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
        MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ALL DEFENDANTS - REPRESENATIVES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pittard, William) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
          MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by ALL DEFENDANTS - SENATORS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vinik, Grant) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by E K WADE. "Leave to file Granted" signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/16/2013(jf, ) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              SURREPLY to re 26 MOTION to Dismiss , 36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by E K WADE. "Leave to file Granted" signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/16/2013 (jf, ) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                ERRATA by E K WADE 41 SUPPLEMENTAL (Addendum) MEMORANDUM to re 40 Surreply filed by E K WADE. (jf, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by E K WADE re 40 Surreply, 41 Supplemental Memorandum. (jf, ) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    SUPPLEMENTAL (Addendum) MEMORANDUM to re 40 Surreply filed by E K WADE; ("Leave to file granted, Let this be filed" by Judge Rudolph Contreras) (td, ) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      SURREPLY to re 26 MOTION to Dismiss , 36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by E K WADE. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/25/2013 (jf, ) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        SURREPLY to re 26 MOTION to Dismiss , 36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by E K WADE. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/19/2013 (jf, ) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan John Frankel on behalf of ALL DEFENDANTS - SENATORS (Frankel, Morgan) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia M. Bryan on behalf of ALL DEFENDANTS - SENATORS (Bryan, Patricia) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                              MOTION to Dismiss by ALL DEFENDANTS - SENATORS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vinik, Grant) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Grant Raymond Vinik on behalf of ALL DEFENDANTS - SENATORS (Vinik, Grant) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  RESPONSE (Objection) re 27 Notice of Plaintiff's Failure to File an Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss of Current and Former Members of the U.S. House of Representatives filed by E K WADE. "Leave to file granted" signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/12/2013 (jf, ) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ALL DEFENDANTS - REPRESENATIVES. (Pittard, William) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                      AFFIDAVIT re 31 Supplemental Memorandum by E K WADE. (jf, ) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                        SUPPLEMENT to re 28 Memorandum in opposition to re 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by E K WADE. "Leave to file Granted" filed by E K WADE. "Leave to File Granted" signed on 09/06/2013 (jf, ) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                          MOTION to ClarifyTime for Filing Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to House Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by ALL DEFENDANTS - REPRESENATIVES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pittard, William) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                            AFFIDAVIT of Service re 1 Complaint by E K WADE. (jf, ) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by E K WADE. "Leave to file Granted" signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/29/2013 (jf, ) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Plaintiff's Failure to File an Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss of Current and Former Members of the U.S. House of Representatives by ALL DEFENDANTS - REPRESENATIVES re 26 MOTION to Dismiss (Pittard, William) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                  MOTION to Dismiss , by ALL DEFENDNANTS - REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Pittard, William) Modified title and filers on 8/5/2013 (znmw, ). (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Mailing re 1 Complaint by E K WADE. (jf, ) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Clerk's Failure to Docket Affidavit by E K WADE (jf, ) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICEof Invalid Service of Process by E K WADE re 1 Complaint (jf, ) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Mailing re 1 Complaint by E K WADE. (jf, ) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION to Issue Summons by E K WADE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summons)(jf, ) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Mailing re 1 Complaint by E K WADE. (jf, ) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:13-cv-00861. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2013: # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jf, ). (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/9/2013 TRANSFERRING this case to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. (Michel, G) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/15/2013.] (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                    SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Mark Udall, Frederick Upton, Christopher Van Hollen, Nydia Velazquez, Peter Visclosky, David Vitter, E K Wade, Timothy Walberg, Greg Walden, Joe Walsh, Timothy Walz, Mark Warner, Debbie Wasserman-Schultz, Maxine Waters, Melvin Watt, Henry Waxman, Jim Webb, Daniel Webster, Peter Welch, Allen West, Lynn Westmoreland, Sheldon Whitehouse, Edward Whitfield, Roger Wicker, Addison Wilson, Rob Wittman, Frank Wolf, Steve Womack, Rob Woodall, Lynn Woolsey, Ron Wyden, John Yarmuth, Kevin Yoder, Bill Young, Donald Young, Todd Young* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *E.K. Wade* *300 Bel Air Drive #99* *Vacaville, CA 95687*. (Meuleman, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/15/2013.] (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                      SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Lee Terry, John Tester, Bennie Thompson, Glenn Thompson, Michael Thompson, William Thornberry, John Thune, Patrick Tiberi, John Tierney, Scott Tipton, Paul Tonko, Patrick Toomey, Edolphus Towns, Niki Tsongas, Michael Turner, Robert Turner* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *E.K. Wade* *300 Bel Air Drive #99* *Vacaville, CA 95687*. (Meuleman, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/15/2013.] (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                        SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Linda Sanchez, Loretta Sanchez, Bernie Sanders, John Sarbanes, Steve Scalise, Janice Schakowsky, Adam Schiff, Robert Schilling, Jean Schmidt, Aaron Schock, Kurt Schrader, Charles Schumer, Allyson Schwartz, David Schweikert, Austin Scott, David Scott, Robert Scott, Tim Scott, James Sensenbrenner, Jose Serrano, Peter Sessions, Terri Sewell, Jeanne Shaheen, Richard Shelby, Brad Sherman, John Shimkus, Heath Shuler, William Shuster, Michael Simpson, Albio Sires, Adam Smith, Adrian Smith, Christopher Smith, Lamar Smith, Steve Southerland, Jackie Speier, Debbie Stabenow, Fortney Stark, Clifford Stearns, Steve Stivers, Marlin Stutzman, John Sullivan, Betty Sutton* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *E.K. Wade* *300 Bel Air Drive #99* *Vacaville, CA 95687*. (Meuleman, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/15/2013.] (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                          SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ben Quayle, Mike Quigley, Nick Rahall, Charles Rangel, Jack Reed, Tom Reed, Dennis Rehberg, Dave Reichert, Harry Reid, Jim Renacci, Silvestre Reyes, Reid Ribble, Laura Richardson, Cedric Richmond, Scott Rigell, James Risch, David Rivera, Pat Roberts, Martha Roby, Jay Rockefeller, Cathy McMorris Rodgers, Phil Roe, Harold Rogers, Michael Dennis Rogers, Michael Rogers, Dana Rohrabacher, Todd Rokita, Thomas Rooney, Ileana Ros-Lehtinen, Peter Roskam, Dennis Ross, Mike Ross, Steven Rothman, Lucille Roybal-Allard, Edward Royce, Marco Rubio, Jon Runyan, Dutch Ruppersberger, Bobby Rush, Paul Ryan, Timothy Ryan* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *E.K. Wade* *300 Bel Air Drive #99* *Vacaville, CA 95687*. (Meuleman, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/15/2013.] (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                            SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Jerrold Nadler, Grace Napolitano, Richard Neal, Ben Nelson, Bill Nelson, Randy Neugebauer, Kristi Noem, Richard Nugent, Devine Nunes, Alan Nunnelee, Pete Olson, John Olver, William Owens, Steven Palazzo, Frank Pallone, William Pascrell, Edward Pastor, Rand Paul, Erik Paulsen, Donald Payne, Stevan Pearce, Nancy Pelosi, Mike Pence, Ed Perlmutter, Gary Peters, Collin Peterson, Thomas Petri, Chellie Pingree, Joseph Pitts, Todd Platts, Ted Poe, Jared Polis, Mike Pompeo, Rob Portman, Bill Posey, David Price, Tom Price, Mark Pryor* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *E.K. Wade* *300 Bel Air Drive #99* *Vacaville, CA 95687*. (Meuleman, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/15/2013.] (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                              SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Connie Mack, Mary Bono Mack, Carolyn Maloney, Joe Manchin, Donald Manzullo, Kenny Marchant, Thomas Marino, Edward Markey, Doris Matsui, Carolyn McCarthy, Kevin McCarthy, Claire McCaskill, Michael McCaul, Tom McClintock, Betty McCollum, Mitch McConnell, Thaddeus McCotter, James McDermott, James McGovern, Patrick McHenry, Mike McIntyre, Howard McKeon, David McKinley, Jerry McNerney, Patrick Meehan, Gregory Meeks, Robert Menendez, Jeff Merkley, John Mica, Michael Michaud, Barbara Mikulski, Bradley Miller, Candice Miller, Gary Miller, George Miller, Jeff Miller, Gwen Moore, James Moran, Jerry Moran, Mick Mulvaney, Lisa Murkowski, Christopher Murphy, Tim Murphy, Patty Murray, Sue Myrick* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *E.K. Wade* *300 Bel Air Drive #99* *Vacaville, CA 95687*. (Meuleman, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/15/2013.] (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Steven LaTourette, Raul Labrador, Doug Lamborn, Leonard Lance, Mary Landrieu, Jeff Landry, James Langevin, James Lankford, John Larsen, Rick Larsen, Thomas Latham, Robert Latta, Frank Lautenberg, Patrick Leahy, Barbara Lee, Mike Lee, Carl Levin, Sander Levin, Jerry Lewis, Joseph Lieberman, Daniel Lipinski, Frank LoBiondo, David Loebsack, Zoe Lofgren, Billy Long, Nita Lowey, Frank Lucas, Blaine Luetkemeyer, Dick Lugar, Ben Lujan, Cynthia Lummis, Daniel Lungren, Stephen Lynch* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *E.K. Wade* *300 Bel Air Drive #99* *Vacaville, CA 95687*. (Meuleman, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/15/2013.] (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                  SUMMONS ISSUED as to *James Inhofe, Jay Inslee, Johnny Isakson, Steve Israel, Darrell Issa, Jesse Jackson, Sheila Jackson-Lee, Lynn Jenkins, Mike Johanns, Bill Johnson, Eddie Johnson, Henry Johnson, Ron Johnson, Samuel Johnson, Tim Johnson, Timothy Johnson, Jim Jordan, Marcy Kaptur, William Keating, Mike Kelly, John Kerry, Dale Kildee, Ronald Kind, Peter King, Jack Kingston, Adam Kinzinger, Mark Kirk, Larry Kissell, John Kline, Amy Klobuchar, Herb Kohl, Dennis Kucinich, Jon Kyl* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *E.K. Wade* *300 Bel Air Drive #99* *Vacaville, CA 95687*. (Meuleman, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/15/2013.] (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                    SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Janice Hahn, Ralph Hall, Colleen Hanabusa, Richard Hanna, Tom Harkin, Gregg Harper, Andy Harris, Vicky Hartzler, Alcee Hastings, Doc Hastings, Orrin Hatch, Nan Hayworth, Joe Heck, Martin Heinrich, Dean Heller, Jeb Hensarling, Walter Herger, Brian Higgins, James Himes, Maurice Hinchey, Ruben Hinojosa, Mazie Hirono, Kathleen Hochul, John Hoeven, Tim Holden, Rush Holt, Michael Honda, Tim Huelskamp, Bill Huizenga, Randy Hultgren, Duncan Hunter, Robert Hurt, Kay Bailey Hutchison* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *E.K. Wade* *300 Bel Air Drive #99* *Vacaville, CA 95687*. (Meuleman, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/15/2013.] (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                      SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Elton Gallegly, John Garamendi, Cory Gardner, Jim Gerlach, Bob Gibbs, Chris Gibson, Kirsten Gillibrand, John Gingrey, Louis Gohmert, Charles Gonzalez, Robert Goodlatte, Paul Gosar, Trey Gowdy, Lindsey Graham, Kay Granger, Chuck Grassley, Samuel Graves, Tom Graves, Al Green, Raymond Green, Tim Griffin, Morgan Griffith, Raul Grijalva, Michael Grimm, Frank Guinta, Brett Guthrie, Luis Gutierrez* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *E.K. Wade* *300 Bel Air Drive #99* *Vacaville, CA 95687*. (Meuleman, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/15/2013.] (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                        SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Donna Edwards, Keith Ellison, Renee Elmers, Jo Ann Emerson, Eliot Engel, Mike Enzi, Anna Eshoo, Blake Farenthold, Sam Farr, Chaka Fattah, Diane Feinstein, Stephen Fincher, Michael Fitzpatrick, Chuck Fleischmann, John Fleming, Bill Flores, Randy Forbes, Jeffrey Fortenberry, Virginia Foxx, Barney Frank, Al Franken, Trent Franks, Rodney Frelinghuysen, Marcia Fudge* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *E.K. Wade* *300 Bel Air Drive, #99* *Vacaville, CA 95687*. (Meuleman, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/15/2013.] (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                          SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Danny Davis, Geoff Davis, Susan Davis, Peter DeFazio, Diana DeGette, Osa DeLauro, Jim DeMint, Jeff Denham, Charles Dent, Scott DesJarlais, Ted Deutch, Mario Diaz-Balart, Norman Dicks, John Dingell, Lloyd Doggett, Bob Dold, Joe Donnelly, Michael Doyle, David Dreler, Sean Duffy, Jeff Duncan, John Duncan, Dick Durbin* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *E.K. Wade* *300 Bel Air Drive #99* *Vacaville, CA 95687*. (Meuleman, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/15/2013.] (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                            SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ken Calvert, David Camp, Francisco Canseco, Eric Cantor, Maria Cantwell, Shelley Capito, Lois Capps, Michael Capuano, Ben Cardin, Russ Carnahan, John Carney, Andre Carson, John Carter, Robert Casey, Bill Cassidy, Kathy Castor, Steven Chabot, Jason Chaffetz, Saxby Chambliss, Ben Chandler, Judy Chu, David Cicilline, Hansen Clarke, Yvette Clarke, William Clay, Emanuel Cleaver, James Clyburn, Dan Coats, Howard Coble, Tom Coburn, Thad Cochran, Mike Coffman, Steven Cohen, Tom Cole, Susan Collins, Michael Conaway, Gerald Connally, Kent Conrad, John Conyers, Chris Coons, Jim Cooper, Bob Corker, John Cornyn, Jim Costa, Jerry Costello, Joe Courtney, Mike Crapo, Chip Cravaack, Rick Crawford, Ander Crenshaw, Mark Critz, Joseph Crowley, Henry Cuellar, John Culberson, Elijah Cummings* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *E.K. Wade* *300 Bel Air Drive, #99* *Vacaville, CA 95687*. (Meuleman, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/15/2013.] (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                              SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Joe Baca, Xavier Bacerra, Michelle Bachmann, Spencer Bachus, Tammy Baldwin, Lou Barletta, John Barrasso, John Barrow, Roscoe Bartlett, Joe Barton, Charles Bass, Max Bauckus, Mark Begich, Dan Benishek, Michael Bennett, Rick Berg, Shelley Berkley, Howard Berman, Jaime Herrera Beutler, Judy Biggert, Brian Bilbray, Gus Bilirakis, Jeff Bingaman, Rob Bishop, Sanford Bishop, Timothy Bishop, Diane Black, Marsha Blackburn, Earl Blumenauer, Richard Blumenthal, Roy Blunt, Jo Bonner, John Boozman, Dan Boren, Leonard Boswell, Charles Boustany, Barbara Boxer, Kevin Brady, Robert Brady, Bruce Braley, Mo Brooks, Paul Broun, Corrine Brown, Scott Brown, Sherrod Brown, Vern Buchanan, Larry Bucshon, Anna Marie Buerkle, Michael Burgess, Richard Burr, Dan Burton, George Butterfield* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *E.K. Wade* *300 Bel Air Drive, #99* *Vacaville, CA 95687*. (Meuleman, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/15/2013.] (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Gary Ackerman, Sandy Adams, Robert Adherholt, Daniel Akaka, Todd Akin, Lamar Alexander, Rodney Alexander, Jason Altmire, Mark Amodei, Robert Andrews, Steve Austria, Kelly Ayotte* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *E.K. Wade* *300 Bel Air Drive, #99* *Vacaville, CA 95687*. (Meuleman, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/15/2013.] (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form) (Meuleman, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/15/2013.] (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    COMPLAINT for Money Damages Under Bivens against All Defendants by E K Wade. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meuleman, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/15/2013.] (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 146 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?