Pacific Design Ctr, et al v. Lincoln Electric Co, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:97-cv-01013
District Judge J. Spencer Letts, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 29, 2016 at 11:24 AM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Automobile Club Of Southern California, Plaintiff
No Logo Pacific Design Center, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie G Duffy +1 213 488 7100

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles E Patterson +1 213 892 5200 +1 213 892 5454 cpatterson@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth R. Chiate +1 213 624 7707 +1 213 443 3100 kenchiate@quinnemanuel.com
v.
No Logo Lincoln Electric Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Lincoln Electric Company The"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary H Loeb +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry W Bird +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 twb@birdmarella.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dorothy Wolpert +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 dw@birdmarella.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 240 - Real Property: Torts to Land
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/11/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES: crt gr w/out hrg plf's motion for leave to amnd the first A/C to add clms & substitute named dfts for doe dfts [8-1], & to remand state crt [8-2] by Judge J. S. Letts CR: N/A (lori) (Entered: 04/22/1997)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/11/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
    MINUTES: dft mot to dism is den w/out hrg by Judge J. S. Letts CR: N/A (lori) (Entered: 04/22/1997)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER by Judge J. S. Letts denying Lincoln Electric's motion to dismiss [3-1] (Ent 4/21/97), mld cpies & nots. (lori) (Entered: 04/21/1997)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER by Judge J. S. Letts gr plfs Pacific Design Center, et al's motion for leave to amnd the first A/C to add clms & substitute named dfts for doe dfts [8-1], & to remand state crt [8-2]. This act shall be rmd to state crt. remanding case to state court (Ent 4/21/97), MD JS-6, mld cpies & nots. (lori) (Entered: 04/21/1997)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/7/1997, Entered: None
          DECLARATION of Kenneth R Chiate by plaintiff Pacific Design Ctr, plaintiff Automobile Club SC in suppt of plfs' reply to dft's oppo re [16-1] (lori) (Entered: 04/08/1997)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/7/1997, Entered: None
            Reply by plaintiff Pacific Design Ctr, plaintiff Automobile Club SC to dft's oppo to motion for leave to amd the first A/C to add clms & substitute named dfts for doe dfts [8-1], & to remand state crt [8-2] (lori) (Entered: 04/08/1997)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: None
              Reply by defendant Lincoln Electric Co to plfs' memo in oppo to dft's motion to dismiss [3-1] (lori) (Entered: 04/07/1997)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: None
                Oppositon by defendant Lincoln Electric Co to motion for leave to amnd the first A/C to add clms & substitute named dfts for doe dfts [8-1], motion to remand state crt [8-2] (lk) (Entered: 04/01/1997)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/27/1997, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by plaintiff Pacific Design Ctr, plaintiff Automobile Club SC to all counsel of doc entitled "Notice to Parties". (lk) (Entered: 03/28/1997)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/27/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                    STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge J. S. Letts continuing hearing on motion to dismiss [3-1] 1:00 4/14/97 and thereby consolidated with the Motion for Leave to Amend. (lk) (Entered: 03/28/1997)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/20/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                      MINUTES: In chambers dtd 3/20/97, in light of the disml the Clerk is dir to reverse the transf to this judge under the Low Number Rule, vacating [4-1] Scheduling order Case reassigned to Judge George H. King for all further proceedings, vacating [4-2] Scheduling order Case referred to Discovery Robert N. Block, vacating [4-3] order Case reassigned back to Judge J. S. Letts for all further proceedings , Case referred back to Discovery Brian Q. Robbins by Judge George H. King CR: N/A (jc) (Entered: 03/27/1997)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/21/1997, Entered: None
                        NOTICE by plaintiff Pacific Design Ctr, plaintiff Automobile Club SC of lodgment in suppt of plfs' mot for lv to amnd 1st A/C & for remand to state crt. (twdb) (Entered: 03/24/1997)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/21/1997, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION of Stewart S. Harrison by plaintiff Pacific Design Ctr, plaintiff Automobile Club SC in suppt of plfs mot for lv & for remand to state crt [8-1] [8-2] (twdb) (Entered: 03/24/1997)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/21/1997, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff Pacific Design Ctr, plaintiff Automobile Club SC for leave to amnd the first A/C to add clms & substitute named dfts for doe dfts , and to remand state crt ; motion hearing set for 1:00 4/14/97 (twdb) (Entered: 03/24/1997)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/20/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Not to pties by Judge J. S. Letts (lori) (Entered: 03/21/1997)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/17/1997, Entered: None
                                NOTICE by plaintiff Pacific Design Ctr, plaintiff Automobile Club SC of intention to seek leave to file Second Amd Cmp. (lk) (Entered: 03/18/1997)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/6/1997, Entered: None
                                  DEMAND for jury trial by plaintiff Pacific Design Ctr, plaintiff Automobile Club SC (lk) (Entered: 03/07/1997)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER RE TRANSF PURS TO GO 224 (REL CSE) by Judge J. S. Letts Case reassigned to Judge George H. King for all further proceedings , Case referred to Discovery Robert N. Block [L/N CV97-817 GHK (RNBx)] (c: ptys) (jc) (Entered: 03/07/1997)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/24/1997, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/16/1997
                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by defendant Lincoln Electric Co to dismiss ; motion hearing set for 1:00 3/31/97 (lc) (Entered: 02/25/1997)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/14/1997, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE by defendant Lincoln Electric Co of related case(s) CV97-817 GHK (RNBx) (jc) (Entered: 02/24/1997)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/14/1997, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by dft Lincoln Electric Co from Supr Crt LA Case Number: BC 164229 with copy of summons and complaint referred to Discovery Brian Q. Robbins (1ST A/C SUBMITTED W/OUT FILE STAMP) (bg) Modified on 02/19/1997 (Entered: 02/19/1997)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 72 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?