Allure Energy, Inc. v. Nest Labs, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 9:13-cv-00102
District Judge Ron Clark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 6, 2018 at 10:28 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Allure Energy, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Vickery Waldner & Malta, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Earl Landers Vickery +1 512 435 6666 +1 512 435 6669 lanny@justiceseekers.com
No Logo Green Mountain Energy Company, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Nest Labs, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Green Mountain Energy Company, Defendant
No Logo Nest Labs, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Allure Energy, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (329) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: 7/16/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation of Dismissal 298 is GRANTED, this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Plaintiff's claims and DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendants' claims, defenses and counterclaims. The costs will be borne by the party incurring the same. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions in this matter be DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/16/15. (ljw, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: 7/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Reichman, Courtland)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Settlement Conference
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Settlement Conference held on 6/1/2015. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Final
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Final Pretrial Conference held on 5/29/2015. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
              REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: Amended Report of Settlement(Folsom, David)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER in Limine on Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants' Deposition Designations. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/29/15. (ljw, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Order in Limine on Defendants' Objection to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/28/15. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        SUMMARY ORDER in Limine on Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Amended Exhibit List. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/28/15. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          JOINT FINAL PRE-TRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/28/15. (ljw, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC re 282 Order on Sealed Patent Motion Defendants' Notice of Potential References to Statements in Inter Partes Reviews (McGann, Kevin)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Unknown Document Type
                              Additional Attachments to Main Document: 252 Proposed Pretrial Order.. (Attachments: # 1 Defs Objections to Allure's Amended Exhibit List, # 2 Allure's Amended Trial Exhibit List)(McGann, Kevin)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                  Joint Proposed Jury Instructions by Allure Energy, Inc, Nest Labs Inc, Green Mountain Energy Company, Reliant Energy Retail Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reichman, Courtland) Modified on 5/27/2015 (bjc, ). (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: 5/26/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                    REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended(Folsom, David)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: 5/19/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER that the court is not convinced that there is no question of material fact as to whether Ivang or Inncom anticipated the '518 Patent. Defendants' motion for summary judgment based on anticipation 208 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/19/15. (ljw, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: 5/19/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Order In Limine on Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant's Exhibits. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/19/15. (ljw, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: 5/19/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER denying 219 Plaintiff's motion to strike Defendants' anticipation defenses. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/19/15. (ljw, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Summary Order In Limine on Defendant's Objections to Plaintiffs' Exhibits. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/18/15. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Order on Sealed Patent Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  SUMMARY ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF ALLURE'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/18/15. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Summary Order on Defendants' Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/18/15. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER that by May 26, 2015, Plaintiff shall provide to the court and opposing counsel a redacted exhibit list, including only those exhibits it reasonably believes in good faith may be used at trial. Plaintiff shall not renumber any exhibits, even if its redactions results in gaps in numbering as that would confuse other rulings the court will be making on other objections. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/18/15. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 219 Opposed MOTION to Strike 208 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment That Claim 1 of U.S. Patent 8,571,518 is Invalid as Anticipated by Ivang and/or Inncom filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (McGann, Kevin)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                              RESPONSE to 252 Proposed Pretrial Order OBJECTIONS AND COUNTERS TO DEFENDANTS' VIDEO DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Reichman, Courtland)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  Proposed Jury Instructions by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B.1, # 3 Exhibit B.2)(Reichman, Courtland) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      RESPONSE to 252 Proposed Pretrial Order OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Reichman, Courtland) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          RESPONSE to 252 Proposed Pretrial Order Defendants' Objections to Allure's Intended Trial Witnesses filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (McGann, Kevin) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              RESPONSE to 252 Proposed Pretrial Order Defendants' Objections to Allure's Intended Trial Exhibits filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (McGann, Kevin) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  RESPONSE to 252 Proposed Pretrial Order OBJECTIONS AND REBUTTAL DESIGNATIONS TO DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS AND COUNTER VIDEO DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Reichman, Courtland) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      RESPONSE to 252 Proposed Pretrial Order Defendants' Objections and Counter Video Deposition Designations filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (McGann, Kevin) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        RESPONSE to 252 Proposed Pretrial Order OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' TRIAL WITNESS LIST by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Bovenkamp, Christopher)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 270 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 251 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Omnibus Motions in Limine (Nos. 1-12) filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Blake H. Bailey, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Reichman, Courtland)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Additional Attachments to Main Document: 252 Proposed Pretrial Order.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D - Defs Amended Exhibit List)(McGann, Kevin)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 268 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE re 250 filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Allure's 12-11-14 Prelim Response to Petition for IPR of the '954 Patent, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 3-20-15 Excerpts from D. Nutter Report, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Unpublished Cases, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Heit, Warren)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting 264 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney J Benjamin Dolan; Erin M Pawlowski; Franklin Michael Smith; John A Artz and John S Artz terminated. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/13/15. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 266 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: 5/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 208 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment That Claim 1 of U.S. Patent 8,571,518 is Invalid as Anticipated by Ivang and/or Inncom filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION OF BAHRAD A. SOKHANSANJ, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Reichman, Courtland)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 219 Opposed MOTION to Strike 208 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment That Claim 1 of U.S. Patent 8,571,518 is Invalid as Anticipated by Ivang and/or Inncom filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alan P. Block, # 2 Exhibit 4)(Block, Alan)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for John S. Artz, John A. Artz, J. Benjamin Dolan, Erin M. Pawlowski and Franklin M. Smith with Dickinson Wright PLLC by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ali Mirsaidi on behalf of Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5194320. (Mirsaidi, Ali)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 219 Opposed MOTION to Strike 208 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment That Claim 1 of U.S. Patent 8,571,518 is Invalid as Anticipated by Ivang and/or Inncom filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (email McGann to Artz, # 2 Exhibit B (excerpts of 3/25/2015 transcript))(McGann, Kevin)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/11/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 206 Defendants' motion for summary judgment on willful infringement. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/11/15. (ljw, )
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/11/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER denying 204 Defendants' motion for summary judgment regarding non-infringement of the '954 Patent. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/11/15. (ljw, )
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Courtland Lewis Reichman on behalf of Allure Energy, Inc. (Reichman, Courtland)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/11/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 205 Defendants' motion for summary judgment based on a lack of written description. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/11/15. (ljw, )
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John Padro on behalf of Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5192252. (Padro, John)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC Defendants' Notice of Intent to Offer Certified Records (McGann, Kevin)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Allure Energy, Inc. NOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER CERTIFIED RECORDS (Li, Kathy)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Allure Energy, Inc. re 203 SEALED MOTION Regarding Defendants' Expert Alan Ratliff NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF ALLURE ENERGY INC.'S DAUBERT MOTION REGARDING DEFENDANTS' EXPERT REPORT OF ALAN RATLIFF (Reichman, Courtland)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 253 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 250 SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Exhibit A)(Bovenkamp, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Proposed Pretrial Order (JOINT) by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 251 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION Defendants' Omnibus Motions in Limine (Nos. 1-12) by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Heit, Warren) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 250 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Blake H. Bailey, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bovenkamp, Christopher) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 246 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 244 CORRECTED Exhibit D Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,. (McGann, Kevin) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 208 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment That Claim 1 of U.S. Patent 8,571,518 is Invalid as Anticipated by Ivang and/or Inncom filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Heit, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 244 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 206 Defendants' Reply In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin C. Menes, # 2 Exhibit D - 5-1-2015 IPR Decision)(McGann, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 205 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Lack of Written Description for Claims 1, 5 and 8 of U.S. Patent 8,571,518 filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin C. Menes, # 2 Exhibit Q - 4-2-15 Auslander Depo Excerpts)(Heit, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 242 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion 204 Defendants' Reply In Support of SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent 8,509,954 filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin C. Menes, # 2 Exhibit M - Excerpt from the '954 Patent, # 3 Exhibit N - 4-8-15 Nutter Depo Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit O - 4-17-15 McAlexander Depo Excerpts, # 5 Exhibit P - 2-27-15 McAlexander Expert Report Excerpts)(Heit, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC Defendants' Notice of Prior Art Under 35 U.S.C. Section 282 (Heit, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE: PRESENTING WITNESSES. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/1/15. (ljw, )
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: 4/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC Regarding Court's Order (Dkt. No. 213) (Heartfield, J)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER ON LIMITATIONS OF TRIAL TIME. Plaintiff will be allowed 12.75 hours, whether used in direct examination or cross examination. Defendants (as a group) will be allowed 15 hours, whether used in direct examination or cross examination. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/28/15. (ljw, ) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that the parties Agreed Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule 191 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Permit Deposition of Expert Witness After Close of Discovery 184 and Opposed Motion to Permit Deposition of Expert Witness After Close of Discovery 185 are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/28/15. (ljw, ) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 235 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 177 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants Motion to Strike Opinions of Allure's Damages Expert Witness Walter Bratic filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shawna Ballard, # 2 Exhibit 23, # 3 Exhibit 24, # 4 Exhibit 25, # 5 Exhibit 26)(Ballard, Shawna) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Additional Attachments to Main Document: 233 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,.. (McGann, Kevin) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 233 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 200 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS AND DEPOSITIONS filed by Nest Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Decl of K Menes, # 2 Exhibit A - 12-17-15 Ruff Depo Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit B - 4-9-15 Lancaster Letter, # 4 Exhibit C - 2-2-15 Fadell Depo Excerpts, # 5 Exhibit D - 1-28-15 Stefanski Depo Excerpts, # 6 Exhibit E - NEST-ALLR-00003392, # 7 Exhibit F - Ex. 3 to 4-1-15 Ruff Depo, # 8 Exhibit G - 4-10-15 Stefanski Depo Excerpts, # 9 Exhibit H - 3-13-15 Lancaster Letter, # 10 Exhibit I - 3-31-15 Lancaster Letter, # 11 Exhibit J - 4-1-15 Ruff Depo Excerpts, # 12 Exhibit K- 4-2-15 Bailey Letter, # 13 Exhibit L - 3-26-15 Email, # 14 Exhibit M - 4-1-15 Lancaster Letter, # 15 Exhibit N - Ex. 2 to 4-1-15 Ruff Depo, # 16 Exhibit O -Ex. 2 to 4-10-15 Stefanski Depo, # 17 Exhibit P - 2-5-15 Krause Letter, # 18 Exhibit Q - 1-22-15 Email, # 19 Exhibit R - Excerpt from 3-3-15 Veron Depo, # 20 Exhibit S - 3-27-15 Lancaster email, # 21 Exhibit T - 3-29-15 Bailey Email)(McGann, Kevin) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 232 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 199 SEALED MOTION /Defendants' Motion to Exclude Allure's Rebuttal Invalidity Expert Dr. John A. Palmer filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bahrad A. Sokhansanj, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Sokhansanj, Bahrad)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 231 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 203 SEALED MOTION Regarding Defendants' Expert Alan Ratliff / Defendants' Response to Allure's Daubert Motion Regarding Defendants' Expert Report of Alan Ratliff filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from transcript of April 15, 2015 Deposition of Alan Ratliff, CPA, # 2 Exhibit B - Order filed in Pioneer Corporation v. Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., et al. signed by US District Judge David Folsom dated October 2, 2008., # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(McGann, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 202 SEALED MOTION Regarding Defendants' Expert Gabriel M. Gelb / Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion Regarding Defendants' Expert Gabriel M. Gelb filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts from transcript of April 2, 2015 Deposition of Gabriel Gelb, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Sawtooth Software Inc. MaxDiff System Technical Paper, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Order filed in Droplets, Inc. v. Overstock.com, Inc., et al. signed by US District Judge Roy S. Payne dated January 7, 2015., # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(McGann, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Additional Attachments to Main Document: 227 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time Their Response to Docket No. 208.. (Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Franklin Baxter on behalf of Allure Energy, Inc. (Baxter, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time Their Response to Docket No. 208 by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Entry; Notice of Electronic Filing)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 224 Filed: 4/25/2015, Entered: 4/25/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 223 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/25/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 223 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 208 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment That Claim 1 of U.S. Patent 8,571,518 is Invalid as Anticipated by Ivang and/or Inncom filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erin Pawlowski)(Pawlowski, Erin) (Entered: 04/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 4/25/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 222 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 204 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent 8,509,954 filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Sokhansanj, Bahrad) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 221 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: 4/24/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 206 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alan Block, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Block, Alan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 220 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: 4/24/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 205 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Lack of Written Description for Claims 1, 5 and 8 of U.S. Patent 8,571,518 filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erin M. Pawlowski, # 2 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 8,571,518, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts from Provisional Application Serial No. 61/255,678, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts of Palmer's Expert Report, including (1) 9, (2) §2.4, and (3) § 4.3.4, pp. 153-161, RE: Written Description and Enablement, and accompanying Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts from the Deposition of Kevin Imes Taken March 10, 2015, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Section IV.B of Auslander's Expert Report, pp. 25-33, RE: Invalidity for Lack of Written Description, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Section IV.A. of Auslander's Expert Report, pp. 19-25, RE: Priority Date, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Certified File History of '518 Patent (Bates Nos. A0220558-A0220559), # 9 Exhibit 8 - Notice of Allowability, # 10 Exhibit 9 - August 21, 2014, Email from K. McGann)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: 4/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposed MOTION to Strike 208 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment That Claim 1 of U.S. Patent 8,571,518 is Invalid as Anticipated by Ivang and/or Inncom by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Alan P. Block, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Block, Alan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 218 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 186 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Quash Notice of Deposition of Matt Rogers and for Protective Order filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erin M. Pawlowski, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Deposition of Matt Rogers, served Feb. 16, 2015, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Letter to Blake Bailey, dated April 1, 2015, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts from the Deposition of Anthony Fadell, taken Feb. 12, 2015, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts from the Deposition of Joseph Ruff, taken Apr. 1, 2015, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts from the Deposition of Mark Stefanski, taken Apr. 10, 2015, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts from the Deposition of Mark Stefanski, taken Jan. 28, 2015, # 8 Exhibit 7 - E-mails between Matt Rogers, Tony Fadell, and Yoky Matsuoka, dated Oct. 3-4, 2011)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 173 SEALED MOTION to Exclude or Limit The Expert Report and Testimony of Nikolaus Baer filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erin Pawlowski, # 2 Exhibit 1 - E-mail from Bailey to Lancaster, March 31, 2015, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 175 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFF ALLURE ENERGY, INC.'S DAUBERT MOTION REGARDING DEFENDANTS' EXPERT REPORT OF AUSLANDER filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Block, Alan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 174 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE UNTIMELY, NEW INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS CONTAINED IN THE EXPERT REPORTS OF DAVID M. AUSLANDER AND RICHAR QUIRINO filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Block, Alan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 172 Plaintiff's motion to exclude or limit the testimony of Defendants' Expert Richard Quirino. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/18/15. (ljw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 212 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 177 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants Motion to Strike Opinions of Allure's Damages Expert Witness Walter Bratic filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(McGann, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 176 Defendants' Motion to Strike or Limit the Opinions of Allure's Technical Expert Witness Joseph C. McAlexander, III. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/13/15. (ljw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 198 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File. Defendants' responses are due by April 10, 2015. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/11/15. (ljw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/11/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment That Claim 1 of U.S. Patent 8,571,518 is Invalid as Anticipated by Ivang and/or Inncom by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Decl of K. McGann ISO MSJ re Claim 1 of the '518 Patent is Invalid as Anticipated by Invang/Inncom, # 2 Exhibit A - Ivang, # 3 Exhibit B - Palmer Report (Public), # 4 Exhibit C - Palmer Depo Transcript, # 5 Exhibit D - Respone to 4th Set of Rogs, # 6 Exhibit E - Table of Constructions, # 7 Exhibit F - Quirino Report, # 8 Exhibit G - Quirino Depo Transcript, # 9 Exhibit H - e529 Packing Slip, # 10 Exhibit I - e529 User Manual, # 11 Exhibit J - e529 Marriott Offer, # 12 Exhibit K - e528 User Guide, # 13 Exhibit L - e428 User Guide, # 14 Exhibit M - Sneezer Guide v3, # 15 Exhibit N - PDC Manual, # 16 Exhibit O - '518 FH Excerpt, # 17 Exhibit P - Sneezer Guide v6, # 18 Exhibit Q - e4 Literature, # 19 Exhibit R - e4 Brochure, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(McGann, Kevin) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/11/2015, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 207 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 206 Exhibit A - Nutter Report MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement. (McGann, Kevin) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 4/11/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Decl of E. Lancaster ISO MSJ of No Willful Infringement, # 2 Exhibit A - Slip Sheet Notice of Under Seal Filing, # 3 Exhibit B - '518 IPR Institution Decision, # 4 Exhibit C - '954 IPR Institution Decision, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(McGann, Kevin) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 4/11/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Lack of Written Description for Claims 1, 5 and 8 of U.S. Patent 8,571,518 by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Decl of E Krause ISO MSJ of Invalidity for Lack of Written Description, # 2 Exhibit A - Response to 5th Rogs, # 3 Exhibit B - 792 Pub App, # 4 Exhibit C - 798 Pub App, # 5 Exhibit D - 799 Pub App, # 6 Exhibit E - 518 FH Excerpt, # 7 Exhibit F - 518 FH Excerpt, # 8 Exhibit G - 518 FH Excerpt, # 9 Exhibit H - Election of Claims, # 10 Exhibit I - '518 Excerpts, # 11 Exhibit J - Table of Constructions, # 12 Exhibit K - Resposne to 1st Rogs, # 13 Exhibit L - Response to 8th Rogs, # 14 Exhibit M - Palmer Transcript, # 15 Exhibit N - Palmer Report (Public), # 16 Exhibit O - Aulsander Report (Public), # 17 Exhibit P - '678 Provisional, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Heit, Warren) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/11/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 204 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent 8,509,954 by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Decl of C. Lo ISO MSJ re Non-Infringement of the '954 Patent, # 2 Exhibit A - USP 8,509.954, # 3 Exhibit B - Palmer Expert Report, # 4 Exhibit C - Feb. 18, 2015 Eddings Depo Transcript, # 5 Exhibit D - Feb. 27, 2015 ATT A to McAlexander Expert Report, # 6 Exhibit E - Apr. 10, 2014 Allure's Prelim Infringe Contentions, # 7 Exhibit F - Allure's '954 IPR Response, # 8 Exhibit G - Jan. 28, 2015 Stefanski Depo Transcript, # 9 Exhibit H - Jan. 29, 2015 Baynes Depo Transcript, # 10 Exhibit I - Nest Website, # 11 Exhibit J - Feb. 12, 2012 Fadell Depo Transcript, # 12 Exhibit K - Apr. 7, 2015 Palmer Depo Transcript, # 13 Exhibit L - Nest Website, # 14 Decl of M. Eddings ISO Defs MSJ re Non-Infringement of the '954 Patent, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Heit, Warren) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 203 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION Regarding Defendants' Expert Alan Ratliff by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Erin M. Pawlowski, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Alan Ratliff, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 202 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION Regarding Defendants' Expert Gabriel M. Gelb by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Bruce MacLeod, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Bovenkamp, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 201 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document - Text of Proposed Order to Document 200. (Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 200 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS AND DEPOSITIONS by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erin Pawlowski, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Anthony Fadell Deposition Transcript Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit 2 - February 26, 2015 Letter to Eric Lancaster, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Maxim Veron Deposition Transcript Excerpts, # 5 Exhibit 4 - March 6, 2015 Letter to Eric Lancaster, # 6 Exhibit 5 - March 13, 2015 Letter to Blake Bailey, # 7 Exhibit 6 - March 27, 2015 Letter to Eric Lancaster, # 8 Exhibit 7 - March 31, 2015 Letter to Franklin Smith, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Joseph Ruff Deposition Transcript Excerpts, # 10 Exhibit 9 - April 1, 2015 Letter to Eric Lancaster, # 11 Exhibit 10 - April 2, 2015 Letter to Eric Lancaster, # 12 Exhibit 11 - April 8, 2015 Letter to Eric Lancaster, # 13 Exhibit 12 - April 9, 2015 Letter to Blake Bailey, # 14 Exhibit 13 - NEST-ALLR-00433956-4014, # 15 Exhibit 14 - Part 1 - NEST-ALLR-00435857, # 16 Exhibit 14 - Part 2 - NEST-ALLR-00439111, # 17 Exhibit 15 - Nests Objections and Responses to Allure Energys Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6), # 18 Exhibit 16 - March 15, 2015 Letter to E. Lancaster)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 199 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION /Defendants' Motion to Exclude Allure's Rebuttal Invalidity Expert Dr. John A. Palmer by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Palmer Report Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Palmer Depo Tr. Excerpts (Mini), # 3 Exhibit 3 - Unreported Cases (highlighted), # 4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts from McAlexander Expert Report, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Nest Thermostat Flyer, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(McGann, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time Their Response in Opposition to Docket Entries 172, 173, 174 and 175 by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(McGann, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 197 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: 4/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 172 MOTION in Limine to Exclude or Limit the Expert Report and Testimony of Richard Quirino filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 4/7/2015 Deposition of Richard N. Quirino (excerpts), # 2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 7,643,908, # 3 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent No. 6,832,072, # 4 Exhibit 4 - 3/21/2015 Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. John A. Palmer (excerpts), # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(McGann, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 196 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: 4/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 175 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFF ALLURE ENERGY, INC.'S DAUBERT MOTION REGARDING DEFENDANTS' EXPERT REPORT OF AUSLANDER filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 4/2/2015 Deposition of David M. Auslander (Excerpts), # 2 Exhibit 2 - 3/21/2015 Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. John A. Palmer (Excerpts), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(McGann, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 195 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: 4/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 173 SEALED MOTION to Exclude or Limit The Expert Report and Testimony of Nikolaus Baer filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 3/23/2015 Lancaster email re allowing inspection of newly relevant code, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 2015-04-09 AEO Source Code Baer Supplemental Report, # 3 Exhibit 3 - 5/30/2014 letter from Smith (Allure's rep that Allure SC for Eversense available), # 4 Exhibit 4 - 6/12/2014 letter from Krause, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts of Hollister deposition 60-61, 91-92, 97-99, 100, 236, 239-240, 242, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Bailey 3/27/2015 email, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Ballard 3/28/2015 email, # 8 Exhibit 8 - 2015-02-12 Allure responses to Nest's interrogatory no. 27, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(McGann, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 194 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: 4/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 174 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE UNTIMELY, NEW INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS CONTAINED IN THE EXPERT REPORTS OF DAVID M. AUSLANDER AND RICHAR QUIRINO filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 2/27/2015 Krause Letter, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 4/2/2015 Deposition of David M. Auslander (Excerpts), # 3 Exhibit 3 - 5/13/2015 Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Nest's First Set of Interrogatories to Allure Energy, Inc. (No. 1, # 4 Exhibit 4 - 4/10/2014 Nest's Second Set of Interrogatories to Allure (No. 2), # 5 Exhibit 5 - 3/21/2015 Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. John A. Palmer, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Hollister Deposition Exhibit 33-B (Excerpt), # 7 Exhibit 7 - 3/25/2014 Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing Transcript (Excerpts), # 8 Exhibit 8 - Cited Unpublished Decisions, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(McGann, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 193 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 177 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants Motion to Strike Opinions of Allure's Damages Expert Witness Walter Bratic filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shawna Ballard, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18 Part 1, # 20 Exhibit 18 Part 2, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Text of Proposed Order)(Ballard, Shawna) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 176 MOTION to Strike or Limit the Opinions of Allure's Technical Expert Witness Joseph C. McAlexander III filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alan P. Block, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Block, Alan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: 4/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct 184 MOTION to Permit Deposition of Expert Witness After Close of Discovery and Amend Briefing Schedule by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heit, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/2/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 117 Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/2/15. (ljw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Thor Bovenkamp on behalf of Allure Energy, Inc. (Bovenkamp, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Dimitrios T Drivas on behalf of Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5131051. (Drivas, Dimitrios)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: 4/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Peter Block on behalf of Allure Energy, Inc. (Block, Alan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 186 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: 4/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Quash Notice of Deposition of Matt Rogers and for Protective Order by Nest Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Feb. 4, 2015 Krause Letter, # 2 Exhibit B - Feb. 20, 2015 Lancaster Letter, # 3 Exhibit C - Feb. 20, 2015 Bailey Letter, # 4 Exhibit D - J. Ruff Deposition Excerpts, # 5 Exhibit E - M. Stefanski Deposition Excerpts, # 6 Declaration of K. Menes In Support of Defendants Motion to Quash Deposition of M. Rogers, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Heit, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: 4/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion to Permit Deposition of Expert Witness After Close of Discovery by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: 4/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Permit Deposition of Expert Witness After Close of Discovery by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit 1 - January 18, 2015 Order Granting Agreed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, # 3 Exhibit 2 - March 16, 2015 Letter from Eric Lancaster, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Joseph C. McAlexander III, # 5 Exhibit 4 - March 26, 2015 Email, # 6 Exhibit 5 - March 27, 2015 Email)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawna Lee Ballard on behalf of Allure Energy, Inc. (Ballard, Shawna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 100 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/24/15. (ljw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 181 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 176 MOTION to Strike or Limit the Opinions of Allure's Technical Expert Witness Joseph C. McAlexander III. (Attachments: # 1 Expert Report of Joseph McAlexander III, # 2 Attachment A to McAlexander Report)(Heartfield, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/23/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying as moot 102 & 103 Defendant Nest Labs, Inc.'s Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/23/15. (ljw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/23/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying without prejudice 93 Plaintiff Allure Energy, Inc.s Motion to Compel. Plaintiff has specific documents or information that it believes have not been produced, Plaintiff may file a motion to compel its production. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/23/15. (ljw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/23/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that by April 17, 2015, at 4:00 p.m., the parties shall each submit to the court an estimate of the time that party needs to complete the presentation of testimony in this case. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/22/15. (ljw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/21/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 177 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants Motion to Strike Opinions of Allure's Damages Expert Witness Walter Bratic by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Decl of Warren S. Heit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Heit, Warren) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/21/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike or Limit the Opinions of Allure's Technical Expert Witness Joseph C. McAlexander III by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Warren Heit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Heit, Warren) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: 3/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFF ALLURE ENERGY, INC.'S DAUBERT MOTION REGARDING DEFENDANTS' EXPERT REPORT OF AUSLANDER by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Blake H. Bailey, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Reichman, Courtland)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: 3/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE UNTIMELY, NEW INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS CONTAINED IN THE EXPERT REPORTS OF DAVID M. AUSLANDER AND RICHAR QUIRINO by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Blake H. Bailey, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Reichman, Courtland)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 173 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: 3/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION to Exclude or Limit The Expert Report and Testimony of Nikolaus Baer by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - E-mail from McGann to Artz, Jan. 8, 2015, # 2 Exhibit 2 - E-mail from Blake Bailey to Eric Lancaster, Feb. 26, 2015, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Allure's Initial Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Preliminary Infringement Contentions, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Report of Nikolaus Baer, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Hollister Dep at 240:2-8)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: 3/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Exclude or Limit the Expert Report and Testimony of Richard Quirino by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Errata 1 - Report of Richard Quirino)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 170 Agreed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The deadline for the designation of expert witnesses on issues for which the parties do not bear the burden of proof is March 22, 2015 at 5:00 pm. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/19/15. (ljw, ) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: 3/19/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDERED that Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Entry of Order AuthorizingFiling Under Seal (Doc. # 69) is granted and that the Supplemental Declaration of Joseph C. McAlexander III (Doc. # 63-1) may remain under seal.. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/16/2015. (bjc, ) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/16/2015, Entered: 2/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blake H Bailey on behalf of Allure Energy, Inc. (Bailey, Blake)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: 2/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric E Lancaster on behalf of All Defendants (Lancaster, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: 2/4/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Allure Energy, Inc. NOTICE OF AGREEMENT REGARDING TRIAL LOCATION (Li, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 164 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dallas William Tharpe and Herbert A Yarbrough, III terminated. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 1/29/15. (ljw, ) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: 1/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: 1/28/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bahrad Ali Sokhansanj on behalf of Allure Energy, Inc. (Sokhansanj, Bahrad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: 1/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas A Cawley on behalf of Allure Energy, Inc. (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: 1/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Courtland L Reichman on behalf of Allure Energy, Inc. (Reichman, Courtland)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: 1/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kathy H Li on behalf of Allure Energy, Inc. (Li, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: 1/20/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 156 AGREED MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER. Jury Selection and Trial are set for 6/1/2015 at 10:30 AM in Ctrm 102 (Lufkin) before Judge Ron Clark. Pretrial Conference is set for 5/28/2015 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm 13 (Lufkin) via video conference before Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 1/18/15. (ljw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: 1/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dallas William Tharpe on behalf of Allure Energy, Inc. (Tharpe, Dallas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: 1/8/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Status Conference held on 1/8/2015. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: 1/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Allure Energy, Inc., Green Mountain Energy Company, Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: 1/6/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Franklin Michael Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4987778. (Smith, Franklin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: 1/5/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC re 151 Notice (Other), - Defendants' Reply Letter Brief Regarding Discovery Dispute re: Allure's Source Code (Heartfield, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/2/2015, Entered: 1/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Allure Energy, Inc. re 151 Notice (Other), Letter Brief in Response to Defendants' Letter Brief Re: Inspection of Allure's Source Code (Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: 12/23/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Allure Energy, Inc. of subpoena for documents to Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Google subpoena, # 2 Exhibit A to Google subpoena)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: 12/18/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC - Defendants' Letter Brief regarding Discovery Dispute re: Allure's Source Code (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Heartfield, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS OF UNITED STATES PATENT NOS. 8,509,954 AND 8,571,518. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/1/14. (ljw, ) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of March 25, 2014 Volume 2 of 2, REDACTED held on March 25, 2014 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/26/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2015. (Chris Bickham, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing, Volume 1 of 2, REDACTED held on March 24, 2014 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/26/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2015. (Chris Bickham, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Claim Construction Hearing held on 11-7-2014 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/26/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2015. (Chris Bickham, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: 11/25/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting out claim constructions for United States Patent Nos. 8,509,954 and 8,571,518. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 11/25/2014. (bjc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Redact Portions of the March 24 and 25, 2014 Hearing Transcripts by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER CONSTRUING THE "ENCODED LOGIC" TERM OF UNITED STATES PATENT NO. 8,442,695. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 11/22/14. (ljw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by J Thad Heartfield re 137 Transcript,,,. (Heartfield, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by J Thad Heartfield re 136 Transcript,,,. (Heartfield, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: 11/7/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Markman Hearing held on 11/7/2014. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (Attachments: # 1 Court's Exhibits) (fal, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/4/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Allure Energy, Inc. re 123 Notice (Other) Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority (Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/4/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendants' Proposed Corrected Final Joint Claim Construction Chart Pursuant to Pat. L. Rule 4-5(d) by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Heartfield, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing, Volume 2 of 2, held on March 25, 2014 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2015. (Chris Bickham, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing, Volume 1 of 2, held on March 24, 2014 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2015. (Chris Bickham, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: 10/29/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 117 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Excerpt from Preliminary Injunction Transcript)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Carmen K Lo on behalf of Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4897624. (Lo, Carmen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 117 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Heartfield, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Eric A Krause on behalf of Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4896735. (Krause, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Wendi R Schepler on behalf of Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4896718. (Schepler, Wendi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kevin Menes on behalf of Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4896699. (Menes, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Silvia Medina on behalf of Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4896679. (Medina, Silvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: 10/21/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Claim Construction Chart by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: 10/21/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Allure Energy, Inc. of Compliance of Submission of Technology Synopsis (Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: 10/21/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC of Compliance re: Technology Synopsis (Heartfield, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: 10/20/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 117 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Preliminary Injunction Tr. at p. 304)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: 10/17/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 102 MOTION to Compel filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC re 116 Reply to Claim Construction Brief, (Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Heartfield, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: 10/10/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to 99 Claim Construction Brief,,,, filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - United States Patent No. 8,452,457)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 121 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 120 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C)(Heartfield, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 102 MOTION to Compel filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Heartfield, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Dr. Frank Shipman, Professor, Department of Computer Science and Engineering, Texas A&M University, TAMU 3112, College Station, TX 77843-3112 (shipman@cse.tamu.edu), is appointed as a technical advisor to the court. Fees of the technical advisor shall be taxed, as they are incurred, equally against the parties as costs of court. the parties shall deliver physical and electronic (in pdf format) copies of their preliminary proposed claim constructions, the Joint Claim Construction and Pre-hearing Statement, the Claim Construction briefs, including the Joint Claim Construction Chart, and any technology synopses to Dr. Shipman on the date these submissions are filed or exchanged by the parties. Those that have already been filed or exchanged shall be delivered to him immediately. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 10/6/14. (ljw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 118 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/3/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 100 MOTION Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Email Dated March 19, 2014)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/3/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/26/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to 99 Claim Construction Brief,,,, filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - IEEE Definition, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Orig. Spec. from 518 FH App., # 3 Exhibit 3 - USP 5,544,036, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Pat. App. Pub. 2005-0040247, # 5 Exhibit 5 - 2013-04-15 954 FH Amendment)(McGann, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 9/25/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Brief filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Letter Brief)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 9/25/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 100 MOTION Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Heartfield, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: 9/23/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REGARDING THE POSSIBLE APPOINTMENT OF A TECHNICAL ADVISOR. The court finds that this case is an exceptional one under the standards set forth in the Techsearch decision. The court is familiar with Dr. Shipman and his qualifications and proposes his appointment. Any objections to Dr. Shipman must be filed by September 29, 2014. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/23/14. (ljw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Allure Energy, Inc. re 111 Response to Motion,,,, of filing of Certificate of Serivce (Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 102 MOTION to Compel filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Nest's Third Set of Interrogatories to Allure (Nos. 3-6), # 2 Exhibit 2 - May 22, 2014 Email, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Nest's Third Set of Interrogatories to Allure Energy, Inc. (Nos. 3-6), # 4 Exhibit 4 - June 12, 2014 Letter, # 5 Exhibit 5 - June 23, 2014 Letter, # 6 Exhibit 6 - June 25, 2014 Letter, # 7 Exhibit 7 - July 2, 2014 Letter, # 8 Exhibit 8 - July 23, 2014 Letter, # 9 Exhibit 9 - August 28, 2014 Letter, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Defendants' Invalidity Contentions, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Nest's Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Allure (Nos. 7-8), # 12 Exhibit 12 - Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Nest's Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Allure (Nos. 7-8), # 13 Exhibit 13 - Defendants' Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art, # 14 Exhibit 14 - August 8, 2014 Letter, # 15 Exhibit 15 - Plaintiff's Supplemental Responses to Nests Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Allure (Nos. 7-8))(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 93 MOTION to Compel filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Heartfield, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Allure Energy, Inc. re 95 Order - Joint Submission Regarding Most Significant Claim Terms (Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 100 MOTION Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - PCT Application, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Information Disclosure Statement, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Defendants' Transmittal Letter Dated 7/31/14, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Defendants' 8/7/14 Letter, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Allure's 8/8/14 Letter, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Allure's 8/13/14 Letter, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Erin M. Pawlowski, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Petitions for Inter Partes Review, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Cited References Section of U.S. Patent No. 8,571,518)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Brief filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Heartfield, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 102 MOTION to Compel by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: 9/12/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 93 MOTION to Compel filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - September 11, 2014 Letter)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: 8/29/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 93 MOTION to Compel filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2014.04.21 Nest's Third Set of Rogs to Allure, # 2 Exhibit 2014.05.30 Letter Krause-Ohanian, # 3 Exhibit 2014.06.23 Letter Pawlowski-Krause, # 4 Exhibit 2014.07.22 Email Ohanian-Krause, # 5 Exhibit 2014.08.20 Letter Krause-Pawlowski, # 6 Exhibit 2014.08.26 Letter Krause-Dolan, # 7 Exhibit 2014.08.28 Letter Artz-Krause, # 8 Exhibit 2014.08.28 Letter Krause-Artz, # 9 Exhibit 2014.08.29 Letter Krause-Pawlowski)(McGann, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: 8/29/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Part 2 of Exhibits to Motion to Compel [Dkt.102] by Nest Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G-Ex B to PLR 3-3 Disclosures, # 2 Exhibit H - Ex. C to PLR 3-3 Disclosures, # 3 Exhibit I - 2014-07-23 Allure's Responses to Nest's 4th Interrogatories, # 4 Exhibit J - 2014-06-23 Ltr Pawlowski to Krause, # 5 Supplement)(McGann, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: 8/29/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel by Nest Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-2014-04-21 Nest's 3rd Interrogatories to Allure, # 2 Exhibit B-2014-06-20 Nest's 4th Interrogatories to Allure, # 3 Exhibit C-2014-05-30 Allure's Response to Nest's 3rd Interrogatories, # 4 Exhibit D-2014-07-23 ltr Pawlowski to Krause re Disclosure Obligations, # 5 Exhibit E-2014-05-22 PLR 3-3 Disclosure, # 6 Exhibit F -Ex. A to PLR 3-3 Disclosures)(McGann, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: 8/27/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Additional Attachments to Main Document: 100 MOTION Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions .. (McGann, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: 8/27/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Decl. of E. Krause In Support, # 2 Exhibit A-Infringement Contentions Cover, # 3 Exhibit B-Invalidity Contentions Cover, # 4 Exhibit C-Plaintiff Resp to Nest's ROGs 7-8, # 5 Exhibit D-DIYcontrols.com BAYweb Page, # 6 Exhibit E-Amazon.com BAYweb Page, # 7 Exhibit F-BAYweb Manual, # 8 Exhibit G-Prelim Election of Prior Art, # 9 Exhibit H-July 31, 2014 Letter, # 10 Exhibit I-Aug. 7, 2014 Letter, # 11 Exhibit J-Aug. 8, 2014 Letter, # 12 Exhibit K-Supp. Invalidity Contentions Cover, # 13 Exhibit L-Supp. Invalidity Contentions '518 Charts, # 14 Exhibit M-Supp. Invalidity Contentions '695 Charts, # 15 Exhibit N-Supp. Invalidity Contentions '954 Charts, # 16 Exhibit O-Aug. 13, 2014 Letter, # 17 Exhibit P-Aug. 14, 2014 Letter, # 18 Exhibit Q-Redline Supp. Invalidity Contentions Cover, # 19 Exhibit R-Redlind Supp. Invalidity Contentions '518 Charts, # 20 Exhibit S-Redline Supp. Invalidity Contentions '695 Charts, # 21 Exhibit T-Redline Supp. Invalidity Contentions '954 Charts, # 22 Exhibit U-Aug. 20, 2014 Letter, # 23 Exhibit V-Aug. 21, 2014 Letter)(McGann, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: 8/22/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Amended Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement, # 3 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 8,442,695, # 4 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent No. 8,571,518, # 5 Exhibit 4 - U.S. Patent No. 8,509,954, # 6 Exhibit 5 - May 4, 2009 Letter from the Environmental Protection Agency, # 7 Exhibit 6 - '695 File History - Notice of Allowability dated January 17, 2013, # 8 Exhibit 7 - '695 File History - Response to Office Action dated December 26, 2012, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts from Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 10 Exhibit 9 - U.S. Provisional Application Serial No. 61/255,678, # 11 Exhibit 10 - '518 File History - Amendment dated July 12, 2013, # 12 Exhibit 11 - '954 File History - Response to Office Action dated November 13, 2012, # 13 Exhibit 12 - U.S. Provisional Application Serial No. 61/235,798, # 14 Exhibit 13 - '954 File History - Office Action dated May 10, 2012)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: 8/22/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REGARDING THE POSSIBLE APPOINTMENT OF A TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/21/14. (ljw, ) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 94 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule. The response is due August 29, 2014 and the reply is due September 12, 2014. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/20/14. (ljw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/20/14. (ljw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: 8/19/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 93 MOTION to Compel by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: 8/8/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Initial Disclosures, # 2 Exhibit 2 - May 14, 2014 Letter, # 3 Exhibit 3 - May 16, 2014 Letter, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Allure's First Set of Document Requests to Defendants, # 5 Exhibit 5 - May 22, 2014 Letter, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiffs' May 30, 2014 Letter, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Defendants' May 30, 2014 Letter, # 8 Exhibit 8 - June 17, 2014 Letter, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Defendants' Responses and Objections to Allure's First Set of Document Requests, # 10 Exhibit 10 - June 25, 2014 Letter, # 11 Exhibit 11 - July 2, 2014 Letter, # 12 Exhibit 12 - July 11, 2014 Letter, # 13 Exhibit 13 - July 23, 2014 Letter, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Nest Lab, Inc.'s Response to First Set of Interrogatories, # 15 Exhibit 15 - August 7, 2014 Letter, # 16 Exhibit 16 - December 19, 2011 Letter, # 17 Exhibit 17 - Defendants' Requests for Production of E-Mail (No. 1-30), # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: 8/1/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC of Compliance (Heit, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Pawlowski, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: 7/24/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Allure Energy, Inc. Of Compliance Re Preliminary Election of Asserted Claims (Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 88 Agreed Motion to Amend Schedule Order. The parties shall have until July 25, 2014 to file the Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/17/14. (ljw, ) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct 78 Scheduling Order, by Allure Energy, Inc., Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 86 Agreed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The parties shall have until June 30, 2014 to exchange preliminary proposed claim construction and extrinsic evidence supporting the same. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/23/14. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct 78 Scheduling Order, by Allure Energy, Inc., Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 84 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debra Elaine Gunter terminated. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/13/14. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Debby E. Gunter by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. The 82 parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Order Regarding E-Discovery is granted. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/15/14. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Entry of Order Regarding E-Discovery by Allure Energy, Inc., Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Regarding E-Discovery)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Allure Energy, Inc. Re Initial Disclosures (Gunter, Debra) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC of Compliance (Heit, Warren) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Allure Energy, Inc. of Compliance re P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Gunter, Debra) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Final Pretrial set for 5/28/2015 01:30 PM in Lufkin, Texas, via video before Judge Ron Clark. Jury Selection and Trial set for 6/1/2015 10:30 AM in Lufkin Courthouse before Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/7/2014. (bjc) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 77 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Transcript, 3/19/2014 Case Management Conference. (clb, ) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION For Entry of Scheduling Order by Allure Energy, Inc., Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Gunter, Debra) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 75 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document. Proposed Findings of Fact (Gunter, Debra) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Evidentiary Hearing held on 3/25/2014. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2014: # 1 Court's Slides) (fal, ). (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Evidentiary Hearing Exhibit List. (fal, ) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Evidentiary Hearing held on 3/24/2014. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC re 60 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,,,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 35 (Corrected))(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 03/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 63-1 by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gunter, Debra) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 68 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Additional Attachments to Main Document: 63 Reply to Response to Motion,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8, # 2 Exhibit 9, # 3 Exhibit 10)(Dolan, J) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document: 63 Reply to Response to Motion,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 7)(Dolan, J) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Additional Attachments to Main Document: 64 Additional Attachments to Main Document.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4)(Dolan, J) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Additional Attachments to Main Document: 63 Reply to Response to Motion,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3)(Dolan, J) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Joseph C. McAlexander, # 2 Exhibit A-D of McAlexander Declaration)(Dolan, J) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Case Management Conference held on 3/19/2014. A Scheduling Order will be entered. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 61 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 60 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion. (Attachments: # 1 vonReichbauer Declaration, # 2 vonReichbauer Ex. 1, # 3 vonReichbauer Ex. 2, # 4 vonReichbauer Ex. 3, # 5 Trainor Declaration, # 6 Trainor Ex. 1, # 7 Trainor Ex. 2, # 8 Trainor Ex. 3, # 9 Trainor Ex. 4, # 10 Auslander Declaration, # 11 Auslander Ex. 1, # 12 Auslander Ex. 2, # 13 Auslander Ex. 3, # 14 Auslander Ex. 4, # 15 Auslander Ex. 5, # 16 Auslander Ex. 6, # 17 Auslander Ex. 7, # 18 Williamson Declaration, # 19 Williamson Ex. 1, # 20 Williamson Ex. 2A, # 21 Williamson Ex. 2B, # 22 Williamson Ex. 3A, # 23 Williamson Ex. 3B, # 24 Williamson Ex. 3C, # 25 Williamson Ex. 4A, # 26 Williamson Ex. 4B, # 27 Williamson Ex. 5A, # 28 Williamson Ex. 5B, # 29 Williamson Ex. 6, # 30 Williamson Ex. 7, # 31 Williamson Ex. 8, # 32 Williamson Ex. 9, # 33 Williamson Ex. 10, # 34 Williamson Ex. 11, # 35 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 60 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to PATENT MOTION re 41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 DeRamus Declaration, # 2 DeRamus Ex. 1, # 3 DeRamus Ex. 2, # 4 DeRamus Ex. 3, # 5 DeRamus Ex. 4, # 6 DeRamus Ex. 5, # 7 DeRamus Ex. 6, # 8 DeRamus Ex. 7, # 9 DeRamus Ex. 8, # 10 DeRamus Ex. 9, # 11 DeRamus Ex. 10, # 12 DeRamus Ex. 11, # 13 DeRamus Ex. 12, # 14 DeRamus Ex. 13, # 15 DeRamus Ex. 14, # 16 DeRamus Ex. 15, # 17 DeRamus Ex. 16, # 18 DeRamus Ex. 17, # 19 DeRamus Ex. 18, # 20 DeRamus Ex. 19, # 21 DeRamus Ex. 20, # 22 DeRamus Ex. 21, # 23 DeRamus Ex. 22, # 24 DeRamus Ex. 23, # 25 DeRamus Ex. 24, # 26 DeRamus Ex. 25, # 27 DeRamus Ex. 26, # 28 DeRamus Ex. 27, # 29 DeRamus Ex. 28, # 30 DeRamus Ex. 29, # 31 DeRamus Ex. 30, # 32 DeRamus Ex. 31, # 33 DeRamus Ex. 32, # 34 DeRamus Ex. 33, # 35 DeRamus Ex. 34, # 36 DeRamus Ex. 35, # 37 DeRamus Ex. 36, # 38 DeRamus Ex. 37, # 39 DeRamus Ex. 38, # 40 DeRamus Ex. 39, # 41 DeRamus Ex. 40, # 42 DeRamus Ex. 41, # 43 DeRamus Ex. 42, # 44 DeRamus Ex. 43, # 45 DeRamus Ex. 44, # 46 DeRamus Ex. 45, # 47 DeRamus Ex. 46, # 48 DeRamus Ex. 47, # 49 DeRamus Ex. 48, # 50 DeRamus Ex. 49, # 51 DeRamus Ex. 50, # 52 DeRamus Ex. 51, # 53 DeRamus Ex. 52, # 54 DeRamus Ex. 53, # 55 DeRamus Ex. 54, # 56 DeRamus Ex. 55, # 57 DeRamus Ex. 56, # 58 DeRamus Ex. 57, # 59 DeRamus Ex. 58, # 60 DeRamus Ex. 59, # 61 DeRamus Ex. 60, # 62 DeRamus Ex. 61, # 63 DeRamus Ex. 62, # 64 DeRamus Ex. 63, # 65 DeRamus Ex. 64, # 66 DeRamus Ex. 65, # 67 DeRamus Ex. 66, # 68 DeRamus Ex. 67, # 69 DeRamus Ex. 68, # 70 DeRamus Ex. 69, # 71 DeRamus Ex. 70, # 72 DeRamus Ex. 71, # 73 DeRamus Ex. 72, # 74 DeRamus Ex. 73, # 75 DeRamus Ex. 74, # 76 DeRamus Ex. 75, # 77 DeRamus Ex. 76)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/18/14. (ljw, ) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Gunter, Debra) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION For Entry of Protective Order by Allure Energy, Inc., Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Protective Order)(Gunter, Debra) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin X McGann on behalf of Green Mountain Energy Company, Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC (McGann, Kevin) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Warren S Heit on behalf of Green Mountain Energy Company, Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC (Heit, Warren) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by James S Trainor, Jr on behalf of Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4553129. (Trainor, James) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 51 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Response Deadline and for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants' response is due March 18, 2014, Defendants may have an addition five pages for their response. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/28/14. (ljw, ) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kevin X McGann on behalf of Nest Labs, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4545243. (McGann, Kevin) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , and for Leave to File Excess Pages by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 43 Motion for Earl Landers Vickery to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/24/2014. (bjc) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 47 Motion for Shawn A Latchford to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/24/2014. (bjc) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 46 Motion for Eric M Albritton to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/24/2014. (bjc) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Latchford, Shawn) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Warren S Heit on behalf of Nest Labs, Inc. (Heit, Warren) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Nest Labs, Inc. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Earl Landers Vickery by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 40 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. The page limit for the motion for preliminary injunction and the response to it is now twenty (20) pages. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/12/14. (ljw, ) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Kevin Imes, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of James Mills, # 3 Exhibit Photographs of EverSense, # 4 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 8,571,518, # 5 Exhibit Declaration of Joseph C. McAlexander, III, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction)(Artz, John) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Exceed Page Limits)(Artz, John) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nest Labs, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Google Inc. for Nest Labs, Inc.. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Allure Energy, Inc. Joint Notice Regarding Agreed Proposed Orders (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order Regarding E-Discovery, # 2 Exhibit B - Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Erin M Pawlowski on behalf of Allure Energy, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4484115. (Pawlowski, Erin) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by J Benjamin Dolan on behalf of Allure Energy, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4484002. (Dolan, J) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John A Artz on behalf of Allure Energy, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4474567. (Artz, John) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Allure Energy, Inc.'s ANSWER to 26 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Allure Energy, Inc..(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Allure Energy, Inc.'s ANSWER to 24 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Allure Energy, Inc..(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Allure Energy, Inc.'s ANSWER to 22 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Allure Energy, Inc..(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn Alexander Latchford on behalf of Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC (Latchford, Shawn) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. This case is set for the Initial Rule 16 Management Conference on March 13, 2014 at 10:30 am, in Courtroom 2 at the United States Courthouse in Beaumont, Texas. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/18/13. (ljw, ) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent NRG Energy, Inc. for Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant Reliant Energy Retail Holding, LLC's Original ANSWER to 17 Amended Complaint, Jury Demand, First COUNTERCLAIM Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint against Allure Energy, Inc. by Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC.(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Green Mountain Energy Company identifying Corporate Parent NRG Energy, Inc. for Green Mountain Energy Company. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant Green Mountain Energy Company's Original ANSWER to 17 Amended Complaint, Jury Demand, First COUNTERCLAIM Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint against Allure Energy, Inc. by Green Mountain Energy Company.(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nest Labs, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Google, Inc. for Nest Labs, Inc.. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant Nest Labs, Inc.'s Original ANSWER to 17 Amended Complaint, Jury Demand, First COUNTERCLAIM Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint against Allure Energy, Inc. by Nest Labs, Inc..(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 19 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' shall file their answers by December 16, 2013. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 11/13/13. (ljw, ) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 18 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 11/12/13. (ljw, ) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint by Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 17) by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit A. U.S. Patent No. 8,442,695, # 3 Exhibit B. U.S. Patent No. 8,509,954, # 4 Exhibit C. U.S. Patent No. 8,571,518)(Artz, John) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allure Energy, Inc. Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC served on 9/4/2013, answer due 10/30/2013. (mjc, ) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allure Energy, Inc. Green Mountain Energy Company served on 9/4/2013, answer due 10/30/2013. (mjc, ) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allure Energy, Inc. Nest Labs, Inc. served on 9/4/2013, answer due 10/30/2013. (mjc, ) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John S Artz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4324463. (Artz, John) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Nest Labs, Inc. Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Green Mountain Energy Company Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Allure Energy, Inc. of Service on Defendants (Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Domingo Manueal Llagostera on behalf of Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Alan Rutherford on behalf of Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC (Rutherford, Keith) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants and emailed back to Attorney in Charge for service. (Attachments: # 1 Nest Lab Summons, # 2 Reliant Energy Summons)(ljw, ) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against Green Mountain Energy Company, Nest Labs, Inc., Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC, filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Elaine Gunter on behalf of Allure Energy, Inc. (Gunter, Debra) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Herbert A Yarbrough, III on behalf of Allure Energy, Inc. (Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4138598.), filed by Allure Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A-U.S. Patent, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Vickery, Earl) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 680 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?