Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. ADTRAN, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00392
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 28, 2017 at 1:38 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. This action is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED until the PTO has issued its final decisions on the inter partes review of claim 6 of the '597 Patent. The Court ORDERS the parties to file a status report within ten days of issuance of the IPR decision of claim 6 of the '597 Patent. The parties may either file an agreed upon status report or individual motions which inform the court of the ruling of the IPR and how the parties would like to proceed with the case. The Court ORDERS that ADTRAN is estopped from asserting invalidity contentions raised and adjudicated in the Nissan IPR proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/08/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/09/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Chester Jianbon Shiu terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Chester Shiu by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:13cv384 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for trial. All motions shall be filed in the consolidated case. The Clerk of the Court shall add all consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as each defendants Lead and Local Counsel only. Should additional attorneys wish to appear in the consolidated case, they should file a Notice of Appearance in the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/13/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ADTRAN, Inc..( Bolus, Paul) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                SUMMONS Issued as to ADTRAN, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chester Jianbon Shiu on behalf of Norman IP Holdings, LLC (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Gerald DiNovo on behalf of Norman IP Holdings, LLC (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None Jury Demand
                      DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Price, Adam) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D Love. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                            Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Price, Adam) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC (Price, Adam) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                COMPLAINT against ADTRAN, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4135609.), filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 83 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?