Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. ZyXEL Communications, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00400
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 7:07 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by ZyXEL Communications, Inc. REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC NOTICES (Yang, Christine) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Plaintiff's claims against ZyXEL are DISMISSED with prejudice in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/13/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims of Plaintiff against Defendant ZyXEL Communications, Inc. are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/13/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:13cv384 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for trial. All motions shall be filed in the consolidated case. The Clerk of the Court shall add all consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as each defendants Lead and Local Counsel only. Should additional attorneys wish to appear in the consolidated case, they should file a Notice of Appearance in the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/13/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
          SUMMONS Issued as to ZyXEL Communications, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chester Jianbon Shiu on behalf of Norman IP Holdings, LLC (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Gerald DiNovo on behalf of Norman IP Holdings, LLC (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None Jury Demand
                DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Price, Adam) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D Love. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                      Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Price, Adam) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC (Price, Adam) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                          COMPLAINT against ZyXEL Communications, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4136685.), filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 73 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?