Conroy v. The Dannon Company, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 7:12-cv-06901
District Judge Vincent L. Briccetti, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 24, 2016 at 6:03 PM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Kristie Conroy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bursor & Fisher PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A. Bursor +1 212 989 9113 +1 212 989 9163 scott@bursor.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neal Jamison Deckant +1 646 837 7165 +1 212 989 9163 ndeckant@bursor.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph I. Marchese +1 212 989 9113 +1 212 989 9163 jmarchese@bursor.com
v.
No Logo The Dannon Company, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
JUDGMENT - ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision, dated May 9, 2013, defendants motion to dismiss the complaint is granted, the complaint is dismissed, and the case is hereby closed.. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 05/15/2013) (dcr) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 29 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    MEMORANDUM DECISION: Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the motion (Doc. # 11) and close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 5/9/2013) (lnl) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      SCHEDULING NOTICE: Oral Argument on the motion to dismiss (Doc. #11) set for 5/3/2013 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 620, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 3/29/2013) (mml) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Fred D. Weomstein dated 2/26/2013 re: We respectfully request your permission to file a notice of supplemental authority regarding the following decision, issued yesterday in a similar case about milk protein concentrate: Smith v. Cabot Creamery Cooperative, Inc. No.12-4591-SC (Dkt. No. 38) (N.D. Cal. Feb. 25, 2013) (order granting motion to dismiss with prejudice).. ENDORSEMENT: Application Denied. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 3/4/2013) (rj) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Joseph I. Marchese dated 2/1/2013 re: I represent Plaintiff Conroy ("Plaintiff") in the above referenced action. Pursuant to Rules IA and IC of your Honor's individual practices. I write in response to Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority [Dkt. No. 25]. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk is instructed to docket this letter. No further submissions will be permitted unless counsel obtains prior permission from the Court. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 2/1/2013) (rj) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
            RESPONSE in Support re: 11 MOTION to Dismiss the Dannon Company, Inc.. (Supplemental Authority). Document filed by The Dannon Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Allen, Zachary) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
              RESPONSE in Support re: 11 MOTION to Dismiss the Dannon Company, Inc.. (Supplemental Authority). Document filed by The Dannon Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Allen, Zachary) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Complaint served on The Dannon Company, Inc. on 9/13/2012. Document filed by Kristie Conroy. (Bursor, Scott) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 11 MOTION to Dismiss the Dannon Company, Inc... Document filed by The Dannon Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Appendix of Regulatory Authorities Adding Exhibit K, # 2 Exhibit K)(Allen, Zachary) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 11 MOTION to Dismiss the Dannon Company, Inc... Document filed by Kristie Conroy. (Bursor, Scott) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 9 Motion for Zachary B. Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 10/9/2012) (rj) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 8 Motion for Angel A. Garganta to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 10/9/2012) (rj) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Neal Jamison Deckant on behalf of Kristie Conroy. New Address: Bursor & Fisher, P.A., 888 Seventh Ave., New York, NY, USA 10019, 212-989-9113. (Deckant, Neal) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Joseph Ignatius Marchese on behalf of Kristie Conroy. New Address: Bursor & Fisher, P.A., 888 Seventh Ave., New York, NY, USA 10019, 212-989-9113. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Scott A. Bursor on behalf of Kristie Conroy. New Address: Bursor & Fisher, P.A., 888 Seventh Ave., New York, NY, USA 10019, 212-989-9113. (Bursor, Scott) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                AFFIRMATION of Zachary B. Allen in Support re: 11 MOTION to Dismiss the Dannon Company, Inc... Document filed by The Dannon Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Allen, Zachary) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                  BRIEF re: 13 Brief APPENDIX OF REGULATORY AUTHORITIES WITH EXHIBITS. Document filed by The Dannon Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Allen, Zachary) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                    BRIEF re: 12 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion APPENDIX OF REGULATORY AUTHORITIES. Document filed by The Dannon Company, Inc..(Allen, Zachary) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 11 MOTION to Dismiss the Dannon Company, Inc... Document filed by The Dannon Company, Inc.. (Allen, Zachary) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                        MOTION to Dismiss the Dannon Company, Inc.. Document filed by The Dannon Company, Inc..(Allen, Zachary) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Motion to Dismiss of the Dannon Company, Inc.. Document filed by The Dannon Company, Inc.. (Allen, Zachary) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Zachary B. Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice SECOND CORRECTED. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Dannon Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Zachary) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Angel B. Garganta to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Dannon Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garganta, Angel) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Zachary B. Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Dannon Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weinstein, Fred) Modified on 10/4/2012 (bcu). (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Danone SA for The Dannon Company, Inc.. Document filed by The Dannon Company, Inc..(Weinstein, Fred) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Angel B. Garganta to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-7877218. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Dannon Company, Inc..(Weinstein, Fred) Modified on 10/4/2012 (bcu). (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Zachary B. Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-7877064. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Dannon Company, Inc..(Weinstein, Fred) Modified on 10/4/2012 (bwa). (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2012) (rj) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kristie Conroy.(rj) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                            COMPLAINT against The Dannon Company, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401048214)Document filed by Kristie Conroy.(rj) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 237 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?