Wireless Mobile Devices LLC v. HTC Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-01859
District Judge David C Godbey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2017 at 2:20 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wireless Mobile Devices LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
AT&T Mobility LLC AT&T Mobility LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by AT&T Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/17/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Brian James Gaffney +1 214 757 3024 +1 214 746 2213 bg172e@att.com
v.
AT&T, Inc. AT&T, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Ncr Corp
Unknown Role, At Home Corp
Unknown Role, Net2phone, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mail.com, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by AT&T Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Brian James Gaffney +1 214 757 3024 +1 214 746 2213 bg172e@att.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Brian James Gaffney +1 214 757 3024 +1 214 746 2213 bg172e@att.com
AT&T Mobility LLC AT&T Mobility LLC, Defendant
No Logo Cellco Partnership, Defendant
No Logo HTC America Inc, Defendant
No Logo HTC Corporation, Defendant
Sprint Nextel Corporation Sprint Nextel Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/22/2013 Matthew C Acosta +1 214 953 5806 +1 214 661 6607 macosta@jw.com
TERMINATED: 08/22/2013 Jeffrey G Hamilton +1 214 953 6034 +1 214 661 6637 jhamilton@jw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rouse Hendricks German May PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/22/2013 Mark W McGrory +1 816 471 7700 +1 816 471 2221 markm@rhgm.com
TERMINATED: 08/22/2013 Lawrence A Rouse +1 816 471 7711 +1 816 471 2221 larryr@rhgm.com
No Logo Sprint Solutions, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/11/2014 Matthew C Acosta +1 214 953 5806 +1 214 661 6607 macosta@jw.com
TERMINATED: 07/11/2014 Jeffrey G Hamilton +1 214 953 6034 +1 214 661 6637 jhamilton@jw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rouse Hendricks German May PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/11/2014 Mark W McGrory +1 816 471 7700 +1 816 471 2221 markm@rhgm.com
TERMINATED: 07/11/2014 Lawrence A Rouse +1 816 471 7711 +1 816 471 2221 larryr@rhgm.com
No Logo Sprint Spectrum, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/11/2014 Matthew C Acosta +1 214 953 5806 +1 214 661 6607 macosta@jw.com
TERMINATED: 07/11/2014 Jeffrey G Hamilton +1 214 953 6034 +1 214 661 6637 jhamilton@jw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rouse Hendricks German May PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/11/2014 Mark W McGrory +1 816 471 7700 +1 816 471 2221 markm@rhgm.com
TERMINATED: 07/11/2014 Lawrence A Rouse +1 816 471 7711 +1 816 471 2221 larryr@rhgm.com
T-Mobile USA, Inc. T-Mobile USA, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "T-Mobile US, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/12/2014 Brett E. Cooper +1 212 402 9415 +2 124 029 4444 bcooper@mckoolsmith.com
TERMINATED: 06/12/2014 David R Dehoney +1 212 402 9424 ddehoney@mckoolsmith.com
TERMINATED: 06/12/2014 Eric Conley Green +1 512 692 8700 +1 512 692 8744 egreen@mckoolsmith.com
TERMINATED: 06/12/2014 Shahar Harel +1 212 402 9400 sharel@mckoolsmith.com
TERMINATED: 06/12/2014 Steven John Pollinger +1 512 692 8702 +1 512 692 8744 spollinger@mckoolsmith.com
Verizon Communications, Inc. Verizon Communications, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (99) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Final Order. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (tln) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
    STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Stipulation of Joint Dismissal of All Claims Between the Plaintiff and Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
      STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Stipulation of Joint Dismissal of All Claims Between the Plaintiff and Defendants Sprint Solutions, Inc. and Sprint Spectrum L.P. by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
        STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Stipulation of Joint Dismissal of All Claims between the Plaintiff and Defendants HTC Corp. and HTC America, Inc. by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
          STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Stipulation of Joint Dismissal of All Claims Between the Plaintiff and Defendant Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
            STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Stipulation of Joint Dismissal of All Claims Between the Plaintiff and Defendant Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
              STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Stipulation of Joint Dismissal of All Claims Between the Plaintiff and Defendant T-Mobile US, Inc. by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                Appendix in Support filed by Cellco Partnership, HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation, Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US Inc, Verizon Communications Inc. re 91 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Declaration(s) of Kevin Patariu, # 2 Exhibit(s) 1, # 3 Exhibit(s) 2, # 4 Exhibit(s) 3, # 5 Exhibit(s) 4, # 6 Exhibit(s) 5, # 7 Exhibit(s) 6, # 8 Exhibit(s) 7, # 9 Exhibit(s) 8, # 10 Exhibit(s) 9, # 11 Exhibit(s) 10) (Patariu, Kevin) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Stay filed by Cellco Partnership, HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation, Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US Inc, Verizon Communications Inc. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay) (Patariu, Kevin) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                    CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Acacia Research Group LLC for Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Kelly D Hine on behalf of HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hine, Kelly) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 84 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael James Fagan, Jr terminated. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/31/2014) (axm) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 86 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shahar Harel. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/21/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                            Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Shahar Harel (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 72979) filed by T-Mobile US Inc. (axm) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of DEFENDANTS HTC CORPORATION, HTC AMERICA, INC., AT&T MOBILITY LLC, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., CELLCO PARTNERSHIP, T-MOBILE US, INC., SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC. AND SPRINT SPECTRUM L.P.S re: 82 Scheduling Order, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership, HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US Inc, Verizon Communications Inc. (Govett, Brett) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                  ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. Related document: 78 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, (Fagan, Michael) Modified on 1/28/2014 to enhance text(dss). (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2014. Deadline to provide discovery re: opposition to claims of invalidity, inequitable conduct, and patent misuse due by 4/14/2014. Following filing of the Court's ruling regarding claim construction, the Court will by separate Order set the case for trial and address any further pretrial scheduling issues. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/22/2014) (ykp) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                      ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. Related document: 73 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim. (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                        AMENDED ANSWER to 67 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                          ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. Related document: 72 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim. (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                            ANSWER to 67 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Verizon Communications Inc., Cellco Partnership. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership., COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Mobile Devices LLC filed by Verizon Communications Inc., Cellco Partnership (Smith, Sheria) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                              ANSWER to 67 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by T-Mobile US Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Cooper, Brett) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/7/2014) (jrr) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 69 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Verizon Communications Inc. answer or responsive pleding due 1/8/2014. Cellco Partnership answer or responsive pleading due 1/8/2014. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/3/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 68 Motion to Extend Time. Answer or responsive pleading due by 1/8/2014 (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/3/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                      ANSWER to 67 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership., COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Mobile Devices LLC filed by HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation (Hine, Kelly) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                        ANSWER to 67 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership., COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Mobile Devices LLC filed by AT&T Mobility LLC (Govett, Brett) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                          ***Disregard per attorney, filed in error*** ANSWER to 67 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Acosta, Matthew) Modified on 12/26/2013 (axm). (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                            ANSWER to 67 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                              Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Move, or Otherwise Respond filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Sheria) (Entered: 12/24/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by T-Mobile US Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Cooper, Brett) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership, HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation, Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US Inc, Verizon Communications Inc. filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership, HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation, Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US Inc, Verizon Communications Inc., Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A) (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin John Patariu on behalf of HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Patariu, Kevin) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Joint Report filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 61 Motion to Extend Time. Status Report due by 11/18/2013. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/1/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Agreed MOTION to Extend Time and Consolidate Status and Scheduling Conferences with Related Matters filed by AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership, HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US Inc, Verizon Communications Inc., Wireless Mobile Devices LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion) (Smith, Sheria) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 59 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John P. Schnurer. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/23/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney John P. Schnurer (Filing fee $25; Receipt number DS069410) filed by HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation. (tln) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. Related document: 48 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,,,, (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 55 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brett E. Cooper. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/6/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christie B Lindsey on behalf of Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Lindsey, Christie) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Brett E. Cooper (Filing fee $25; Receipt number #69057) filed by T-Mobile US Inc. (ndt) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 47 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karin A. Hessler. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/30/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 46 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin P. Anderson. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/30/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 45 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lawrence Allen Rouse. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/30/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 44 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark W. McGrory. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/30/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order regarding the following matters, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/29/2013) (twd) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation. (Hine, Kelly) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership., COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Mobile Devices LLC filed by HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation (Hine, Kelly) Docket text modified on 8/29/2013 (twd). (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Karin A. Hessler (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5516788) filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Sheria) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Kevin P. Anderson (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5516759) filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Sheria) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Lawrence Allen Rouse (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 68854) filed by Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP. (twd) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Mark W. McGrory (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 68854) filed by Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP. (twd) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RESPONSE filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC re: 21 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC re: 28 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC re: 28 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 37 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David R. Dehoney. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/23/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice as to Defendant AT&T Inc. by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice as to Defendant Sprint Nextel Corporation by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney David R Dehoney (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 068681) filed by T-Mobile US Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing) (cea) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Sprint Nextel Corporation answer due 8/22/2013. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/16/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Sprint Nextel Corporation answer due 8/12/2013. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/12/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer / Response to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Sprint Nextel Corporation (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Waheed U Khan on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Khan, Waheed) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gita Srivastava on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Srivastava, Gita) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael B Regitz on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Regitz, Michael) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dustin M Mauck on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Mauck, Dustin) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Verizon Communications, Inc. for Cellco Partnership, Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Communications Inc.. (Carter, E) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Verizon Communications Inc., Cellco Partnership. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Verizon Communications Inc., Cellco Partnership (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Rule 7.1 Disclosure) (Carter, E) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by T-Mobile US Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate T Mobile Global Holding GmbH for T-Mobile US Inc. (Green, Eric) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by T-Mobile US Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Green, Eric) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Sprint Spectrum Holding Company L.P. for Sprint Spectrum LP; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Sprint Communications, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate SoftBank Corp., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Sprint Corporation for Sprint Solutions Inc. (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Second) filed by Sprint Nextel Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Govett, Brett) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership., COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Mobile Devices LLC filed by AT&T Mobility LLC (Govett, Brett) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett C Govett on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Govett, Brett) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice as to Defendant AT&T Inc. by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 13 Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Answers due by 8/5/2013 (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/21/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer HTC America Inc answer due 8/28/2013; HTC Corporation answer due 8/28/2013. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/21/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Sprint Nextel Corporation answer due 8/5/2013; Sprint Solutions Inc answer due 8/5/2013; Sprint Spectrum LP answer due 8/5/2013. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/21/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Cellco Partnership answer due 8/5/2013. Verizon Communications, Inc. answer due 8/5/2013. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/21/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer AT&T Inc. answer due 8/5/2013; AT&T Mobility LLC answer due 8/5/2013. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/21/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint filed by T-Mobile US Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Pollinger, Steven) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Selinger, Jerry) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Hamilton, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed as to HTC America, Inc. ; served on 5/30/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service- AT&T Inc., # 2 Proof of Service- AT&T Mobility, # 3 Proof of Service- Cellco, # 4 Proof of Service- Sprint Nextel, # 5 Proof of Service- Sprint Solutions, # 6 Proof of Service- Sprint Spectrum, # 7 Proof of Service- T-Mobile, # 8 Proof of Service- Verizon) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Carter, E) Modified Docket Text on 6/18/2013 (cea). (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC (Gaffney, Brian) Modified Docket Text on 6/18/2013 (cea). (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Fagan, Jr on behalf of Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (Attachments: # 1 notice of AO 120) (tln) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., Verizon Communications Inc. (tln) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Godbey. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of AO 120 re: 1 Complaint, filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-5309514) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Cover Sheet) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 344 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?