Wireless Mobile Devices LLC v. LG Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-01880
District Judge Sam A Lindsay, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2017 at 4:04 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wireless Mobile Devices LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
AT&T Mobility LLC AT&T Mobility LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Cellco Partnership, Counter-Claimant
Verizon Communications, Inc. Verizon Communications, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
AT&T, Inc. AT&T, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Ncr Corp
Unknown Role, At Home Corp
Unknown Role, Net2phone, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mail.com, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by AT&T, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian James Gaffney +1 214 757 3024 +1 214 746 2213 bg172e@att.com
AT&T Mobility LLC AT&T Mobility LLC, Defendant
No Logo Cellco Partnership, Defendant
No Logo Lg Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas A Brown +1 650 655 1300 +1 415 520 5609 brownn@gtlaw.com
Space Herbert H. Finn +1 312 456 8400 +1 312 456 8435 finnh@gtlaw.com
Space Vera Ranieri +1 415 655 1259 +1 415 707 2010 ranieriv@gtlaw.com
Space Stephen M Ullmer +1 415 655 1261 ullmers@gtlaw.com
LG Electronics USA, Inc. LG Electronics USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph P Griffith +1 214 665 3600 +1 214 665 5966 griffithj@gtlaw.com
Space Victor D Vital +1 214 665 3664 +1 214 665 3601 vitalv@gtlaw.com
LG Electronics, Inc. LG Electronics, Inc., Defendant
Sprint Nextel Corporation Sprint Nextel Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew C Acosta +1 214 953 5806 +1 214 661 6607 macosta@jw.com
Space Jeffrey G Hamilton +1 214 953 6034 +1 214 661 6637 jhamilton@jw.com
No Logo Sprint Solutions, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rouse Hendricks German May PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark W McGrory +1 816 471 7700 +1 816 471 2221 markm@rhgm.com
Space Lawrence A Rouse +1 816 471 7711 +1 816 471 2221 larryr@rhgm.com
No Logo Sprint Spectrum, LP, Defendant
T-Mobile USA, Inc. T-Mobile USA, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "T-Mobile US Inc"

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brett E. Cooper +1 212 402 9415 +2 124 029 4444 bcooper@mckoolsmith.com
Space Steven John Pollinger +1 512 692 8702 +1 512 692 8744 spollinger@mckoolsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC - Houston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R Dehoney +1 212 402 9424 ddehoney@mckoolsmith.com
Space Eric Conley Green +1 512 692 8700 +1 512 692 8744 egreen@mckoolsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MetroPCS Communications

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Garreth Alexander Sarosi +1 469 330 4784 +1 866 715 8790 gsarosi@metropcs.com
Verizon Communications, Inc. Verizon Communications, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Wireless Mobile Devices LLC, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (131) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Final Order. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (tln) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
    STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Stipulation of Joint Dismissal of All Claims Between the Plaintiff and Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
      STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Stipulation of Joint Dismissal of All Claims Between the Plaintiff and Defendants Sprint Solutions, Inc. and Sprint Spectrum L.P. by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
        STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Stipulation of Joint Dismissal of All Claims Between the Plaintiff and Defendants LG Electronics, Inc. and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
          STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Stipulation of Joint Dismissal of All Claims Between the Plaintiff and Defendant Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
            STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Stipulation of Joint Dismissal of All Claims Between the Plaintiff and Defendant Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
              JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL of All Claims Between the Plaintiff and Defendant T-Mobile US, Inc. by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC, T-Mobile US Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) Modified filers on 6/12/2014 (axm). (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                STIPULATION to Stay All Deadlines by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 122 Motion to Extend Time. Responses due by 6/3/2014 (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/28/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                    Joint STIPULATION Requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Wireless Mobile Devices' Motion for Protective Order by AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership, LG Electronics USA Inc, LG Electronics, Inc., Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US Inc, Verizon Communications Inc, Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Carrano, Cono) Converted to pending motion on 5/28/2014 (gmg). (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER GRANTING 120 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS LG ELECTRONICS, INC. AND LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.: Therefore, it is ORDERED that Vera Ranieri is hereby withdrawn as counsel for LG Electronics, Inc. and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/23/2014) (ctf) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Withdraw As Counsel For Defendants LG Electronics, Inc. and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. filed by LG Electronics USA Inc, LG Electronics, Inc. (Griffith, Joseph) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                          CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Acacia Research Group LLC for Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Protective Order From Defendants' Common Interrogatory No. 3 filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration(s) of Barry J. Bumgardner, # 2 Exhibit(s) Appendix A, # 3 Proposed Order) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 100 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael James Fagan, Jr terminated. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/31/2014) (axm) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 115 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shahar Harel. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/21/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                  Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Shahar Harel (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 72979) filed by T-Mobile US Inc. (axm) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 109 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph E. Young. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/14/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 108 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David C. Vondle. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/14/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 107 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Romeao J. Jennings. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/14/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 106 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ashraf A. Fawzy. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/14/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 104 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick C. Reidy. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/14/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                              Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Joseph E Young (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 72859) filed by LG Electronics USA Inc, LG Electronics Inc. (axm) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney David C. Vondle (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 72768) filed by LG Electronics USA Inc, LG Electronics Inc. (axm) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Romeao J Jennings (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 72766) filed by LG Electronics USA Inc, LG Electronics, Inc. (axm) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Ashraf A Fawzy (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 72767) filed by LG Electronics USA Inc, LG Electronics, Inc. (axm) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Service of Invalidity Contentions filed by AT&T Inc, AT&T Mobility LLC, Verizon Communications Inc, Cellco Partnership, T-Mobile US Inc, Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP re: 98 Scheduling Order. (Govett, Brett) Modified filers on 3/10/2014 (axm). (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Patrick C. Reidy (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 72765) filed by LG Electronics USA Inc, LG Electronics, Inc. (axm) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Defendants' Service of Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by LG Electronics USA Inc, LG Electronics, Inc. (Carrano, Cono) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cono A Carrano on behalf of LG Electronics USA Inc, LG Electronics, Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Carrano, Cono) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew F Newman on behalf of LG Electronics USA Inc, LG Electronics, Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Newman, Andrew) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. Related document: 94 Answer to Second Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, (Fagan, Michael) Modified on 1/28/2014 to enhance text(dss). (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2014. Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2014. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/22/2014) (skt) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. Related document: 89 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim. (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER to 84 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. Related document: 88 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim. (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            ANSWER to 84 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership., COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Mobile Devices LLC filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc (Smith, Sheria) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              ANSWER to 84 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by T-Mobile US Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Cooper, Brett) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/7/2014) (cea) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 86 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Verizon Communications Inc. answer or responsive pleding due 1/8/2014. Cellco Partnership answer or responsive pleading due 1/8/2014. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/3/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 85 Motion to Extend Time. Answer or responsive pleading due by 1/8/2014 (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/3/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      ANSWER to 84 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics USA Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics USA Inc (Griffith, Joseph) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        ANSWER to 84 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership., COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Mobile Devices LLC filed by AT&T Mobility LLC (Govett, Brett) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          ANSWER to 84 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Move, or Otherwise Respond filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Sheria) (Entered: 12/24/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by T-Mobile US Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Cooper, Brett) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership, LG Electronics USA Inc, LG Electronics, Inc., Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US Inc, Verizon Communications Inc filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 83 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership, LG Electronics USA Inc, LG Electronics, Inc., Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US Inc, Verizon Communications Inc, Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A) (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Joint Report filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. Related document: 77 Answer to Amended Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LG Electronics USA Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate LG Electronics, Inc. for LG Electronics USA Inc. (Griffith, Joseph) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LG Electronics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate LG Corporation for LG Electronics, Inc.. (Griffith, Joseph) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          LG Electronic, Inc. and LG Electronics, U.S.A., Inc.'s ANSWER to 46 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics USA Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership., COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Mobile Devices LLC filed by LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics USA Inc (Griffith, Joseph) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            RESPONSE filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC re: 61 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,,,, (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              RESPONSE filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC re: 62 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,,,, (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 73 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brett E. Cooper. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/6/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Brett E. Cooper (Filing fee $25; Receipt number DS069059) filed by T-Mobile US Inc. (ykp) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christie B Lindsey on behalf of Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Lindsey, Christie) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 59 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Garreth A Sarosi Withdrawn. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/30/2013) (cea) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 68 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark W. McGrory. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/30/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 67 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lawrence Allen Rouse. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/30/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Mark W McGrory (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 68854) filed by Sprint Corporation, Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP (jrr) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Lawrence A Rouse (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 68854) filed by Sprint Corporation, Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP. (jrr) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 46 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC re: 36 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC re: 44 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC re: 36 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        First Amended ANSWER to 46 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership., Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Mobile Devices LLC filed by AT&T Mobility LLC (Govett, Brett) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Verizon Communications, Inc and Cellco Partnership's ANSWER to 46 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership., COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Mobile Devices LLC filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc (Smith, Sheria) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 46 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by T-Mobile US Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Dehoney, David) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re Garreth A. Sarosi filed by T-Mobile US Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Dehoney, David) (Entered: 08/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 54 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David R. Dehoney. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/23/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice as to Defendant Sprint Corporation by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice as to Defendant AT&T Inc. by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ***DISREGARD, FILED IN ERROR (SEE 3:13-CV-01859-N)*** STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice as to Defendant Sprint Corporation by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bumgardner, Barry) Modified text on 8/22/2013 (tla). (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney David R. Dehoney (Filing fee $25; Receipt number DS068682) filed by T-Mobile US Inc. (tla) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Sprint Nextel Corporation answer due 8/12/2013. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/12/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 38 Motion to Extend Time. Answer due by 10/9/2013 (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/12/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael B Regitz on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Regitz, Michael) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Waheed U Khan on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Khan, Waheed) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gita Srivastava on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Srivastava, Gita) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dustin M Mauck on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Mauck, Dustin) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to LG Electronics, Inc., Sprint Corporation. (skt) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Clerk to issue summons(es). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Verizon Communications, Inc. for Cellco Partnership, Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc. (Carter, E) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Verizon Communications Inc, Cellco Partnership. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Verizon Communications Inc, Cellco Partnership (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Rule 7.1 Disclosure) (Carter, E) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by T-Mobile US Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate T Mobile Global Holding GmbH for T-Mobile US Inc. (Green, Eric) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand filed by T-Mobile US Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Green, Eric) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Sprint Spectrum Holding Company L.P. for Sprint Spectrum LP; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Sprint Communications, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate SoftBank Corp., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Sprint Corporation for Sprint Solutions Inc. (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Second) filed by Sprint Nextel Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Extend Time Answer filed by LG Electronics USA Inc, Wireless Mobile Devices LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Vital, Victor) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Govett, Brett) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership., COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Mobile Devices LLC filed by AT&T Mobility LLC (Govett, Brett) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett C Govett on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Govett, Brett) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant LG Corporation Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(i) filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice as to Defendant AT&T Inc. by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 28 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas A. Brown. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/19/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 27 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Vera Ranieri. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/19/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 26 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephen M. Ullmer. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/19/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 25 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Herbert H. Finn. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/19/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Nicholas A Brown (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 67796) filed by LG Corporation, LG Electronics USA Inc. (tla) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Vera Ranieri (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 67796) filed by LG Corporation, LG Electronics USA Inc. (tla) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Stephen M. Ullmer (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 67796) filed by LG Corporation, LG Electronics USA Inc. (tla) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Herbert H. Finn (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 67796) filed by LG Corporation, LG Electronics USA Inc. (tla) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Keven P. Anderson. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/12/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karin A. Hessler. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/12/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer LG Electronics USA Inc answer due 8/5/2013. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/12/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Rspond to Complaint filed by LG Electronics USA Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Vital, Victor) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Kevin P. Anderson (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5412782) filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Carter, E) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Karin A. Hessler (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5412752) filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s) Certificates of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Carter, E) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed as to LG Electronics USA Inc ; served on 6/20/2013. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 16 Motion to Extend Time to file responsive pleading by T-Mobile US Inc. New deadline - August 5, 2013. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/28/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint filed by T-Mobile US Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Sarosi, Garreth) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Cellco Partnership answer due 8/5/2013. Verizon Communications, Inc. answer due 8/5/2013. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/21/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer AT&T Inc answer due 8/5/2013; AT&T Mobility LLC answer due 8/5/2013. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/21/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Sprint Nextel Corporation answer due 8/5/2013; Sprint Solutions Inc answer due 8/5/2013; Sprint Spectrum LP answer due 8/5/2013. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/21/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP (Hamilton, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed as to AT&T Inc ; AT&T Mobility Inc; Cellco Partnership; Sprint Solutions Inc; Sprint Spectrum LP; T-Mobile US Inc; Verizon Communications Inc; served on 5/31/2013; as to Sprint Nextel Corporation; served on 5/30/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service- AT&T Mobility, # 2 Proof of Service- Cellco, # 3 Proof of Service- Sprint Nextel, # 4 Proof of Service- Sprint Solutions, # 5 Proof of Service- Sprint Spectrum, # 6 Proof of Service- T-Mobile, # 7 Proof of Service- Verizon) (Bumgardner, Barry) Modified docket text on 6/19/2013 (cea). (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Carter, E) Modified Docket Text on 6/18/2013 (cea). (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by AT&T Inc, AT&T Mobility LLC (Gaffney, Brian) Modified Docket Text on 6/18/2013 (cea). (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/22/2013) (tln) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Fagan, Jr on behalf of Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (skt) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to AT&T Inc, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership, LG Corporation, LG Electronics USA Inc, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US Inc, Verizon Communications Inc. (skt) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Lindsay. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (skt) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of AO 120 re: 1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against AT&T Inc, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership, LG Corporation, LG Electronics USA Inc, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US Inc, Verizon Communications Inc filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-5310963) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Cover Sheet) (Bumgardner, Barry) Modified on 5/17/2013 (skt). (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 198 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?