B2B Internet IPO, et al v. Merrill Lynch,, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-02858
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2017 at 10:54 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fenyong Tan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
v.
Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc. Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch & Co. Inc."
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated"
Unknown Role, Cumulus Media Inc.
Unknown Role, Lodgian, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Unknown Role, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Unknown Role, Infospace.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, New BlackRock, Inc.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Bank of America, NA Unknown Role, Bank of America, NA
Unknown Role, Gabelli Utility Fund
Unknown Role, Muniholdings Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munivest Fund II Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Holland +1 212 813 8800 +1 212 355 3333 mholland@goodwinlaw.com
No Logo Aaron Fleck & Associates, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo AFA Management Partners, L.P., Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Alton H. Howard, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Barry Plotkin, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo BERT ZAUDERER, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Binh Q. Nguyen, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Bruce A. Fadem, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Carol Larkin, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Carol Raisefeld, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Catu Limited, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Chavy Weisz, Consolidated Plaintiff

Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

No Logo Christopher Williamson, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Coast Investments, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Daniel Kucera, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Tzivia Brody +1 212 687 7230
No Logo David Bornstein, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo David E. Bellville, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Duan Wen Tan, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Fara Manshadi, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Hui Min Qu, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo ICC Wealth Management Inc., Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Ira Dore Feder, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Abraham, Fruchter & Twersky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Jack W. Fruchter +1 212 279 5050 +1 212 279 3655 jfruchter@aftlaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Mitchell M Z Twersky +1 212 279 5050 +1 212 279 3655 mtwersky@aftlaw.com
No Logo James P. Larkin, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Ira Harwood +1 212 935 7400 +1 212 753 3630 rharwood@whesq.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew M. Houston , +1 212 935 7400 +1 212 753 3630 mhouston@hfesq.com
No Logo Jeffrey Mosczyc, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bull and Lifshitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter D.. Bull +1 212 213 6222 +1 212 213 9405 pdb@nyclasslaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua M. Lifshitz +1 212 213 6222 +1 212 213 9405 jml@jlclasslaw.com
No Logo Lawrence Raisefeld Trust, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Leonard Handler, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Lou Ann Murphy, Consolidated Plaintiff

Represented by Pomerantz LLP

No Logo Mario Alexis Joseph, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher E Lometti +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 clometti@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jay Saltzman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Jay P Saltzman +1 212 943 2300 +1 212 943 2300 jay@saltzmanlawny.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schoengold Sporn Laitman & Lometti, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Philips Sporn +1 212 964 0046 +1 212 267 8137 sporn@spornlaw.com
No Logo Mark Rubin, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Mary Beth Hamil, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Egan, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
No Logo Michael G. Ryan, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sirota & Sirota, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Saul Roffe +1 609 791 7007 +1 609 896 9060 saul@sirotalaw.com
No Logo Michael Weiss, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Paul Guez, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cauley Geller Bowman & Coates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven E Cauley +1 501 312 8500 + 501 312 8505

Represented by Hoffman & Edelson

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Marc A Topaz +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ecf_filings@sbclasslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian M. Felgoise

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Brian M Felgoise +1 215 886 1900 felgoiselaw@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuinn Hillsman & Palefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seeger Weiss LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Buchanan +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 DBuchanan@SeegerWeiss.com
TERMINATED: 01/18/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen A. Weiss +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 sweiss@seegerweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sixbey Friedman Leedom & Ferguson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY EVAN R. SMITH +1 703 615 3555
No Logo Paul M. Hoffman, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick William Gerkens, III +1 212 382 2221 +1 212 382 3944 fgerkens@glancylaw.com
No Logo Pradeep Srivastava, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stamell & Schaffer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Jared Bennett Stamell +1 212 566 4047 +1 212 566 4061 stamell@ssnyc.com
No Logo Robert H Thomas, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
No Logo Seymour Mansfield, Consolidated Plaintiff

Represented by Wolf, Popper, Ross, Wolf & Jones, LLP

No Logo Stanley M. Klein, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 pmclean@gibsondunn.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
No Logo Stephen Fiske, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Steven G. Meyers, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Susan Mansfield, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Abraham, Fruchter & Twersky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Lawrence Donald Levit +1 212 279 5050 +1 212 279 3655 llevit@aftlaw.com
No Logo Terry Van Der Tuuk, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo The Theresa T. Fadem Trust, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Tia Ying Mo, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Valerie Kofsky, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo William W. Mann, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Ahmass L. Fakahany, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Bancboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Consolidated Defendant
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo David Gathman, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo George A. Schieren, Consolidated Defendant
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Internet Capital Group, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
Unknown Role, Onvia. Com. Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY William K Dodds +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599 william.dodds@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn McCabe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Simon Block +1 212 447 5500 +1 212 889 2981 sblock@qmlegal.com
No Logo John L. Steffens, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Julian Brodsky, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Kenneth A. Fox, Consolidated Defendant
Lehman Brothers, Inc. Lehman Brothers, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
Officially listed as "Lehman Brothers"
Unknown Role, Lehman Abs Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Emanuel Tauber +1 202 263 3324 +1 202 263 5324 ATauber@mayerbrownrowe.com
No Logo Michael Forgash, Consolidated Defendant
Morgan Stanley & Company, Inc. Morgan Stanley & Company, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
Officially listed as "Morgan Stanley Dean Witter & Co."
Director, Toy Biz, Inc.
Unknown Role, Vital Images, Inc.
Unknown Role, Xcyte Therapies, Inc.
Unknown Role, Websense, Inc.
Unknown Role, Silgan Holdings Inc.
Unknown Role, Msci Inc.
Unknown Role, Wci Communities, Inc.
Unknown Role, Cadiz Land Co Inc
Unknown Role, Ivf America Inc /de
Unknown Role, Imre Corp
Unknown Role, Uniholding Corp
Unknown Role, Cardiac Pathways Corp
Unknown Role, Impsat Corp
Unknown Role, Allscripts Inc /il
Unknown Role, Digitalglobe, Inc.
Unknown Role, Remec, Inc.
Unknown Role, Golden Tan, Inc
Unknown Role, Ms Holdings Inc
Unknown Role, NB Telecom, Inc.
Unknown Role, Pacholder Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Innocoll Holdings plc
Unknown Role, Visions In Glass Inc
Unknown Role, Bloom Energy Corp
Unknown Role, Rps Realty Trust
Unknown Role, Symix Systems, Inc.
Unknown Role, Cfw Communications Co
No Logo Robert E. Keith, Jr., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Scott Gould, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Stanley E. O'Neal, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Thomas Gerrity, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Walter W. Buckley, III, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Claude Amsellem, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Represented by Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Theodore N Cox

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Howard Barry Sirota +1 212 425 9055 +1 212 425 9055 howard.sirota@gmail.com
No Logo Scott Stitcher, Intervenor Plaintiff
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (67) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER APPROVING REISSUE OF EXPIRED DISTRIBUTION DRAFTS AND AUTHORIZING DONATION TO CHARITY: It is hereby ORDERED that the claims administrator Garden City Group LLC shall reissue the thirty-nine (39) distribution drafts referenced in Stanley D. Bernstein's letter to the Court dated June 15, 2015; and it is further ORDERED that no claims or requests for reissues received after seven days after the date of this Order will be accepted or paid; and it is further ORDERED that whatever funds remain after authorized reissue distribution drafts are cashed or expire shall be donated to the following 501(c)(3) charities in the specified proportion: 1) New York Lawyers for the Public Interest (30%) 2) The Southern Poverty Law Center (10%) 3) MFY Legal Services (30%) 4) Sharsheret (30%). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/23/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(ajs) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER RE: CLAIMANTS SEEKING COURT REVIEW OF THE REJECTION OF THEIR PROOFS OF CLAIM: The POCs submitted by the following claimants who have requested this Court's review, are hereby finally REJECTED: Joan Rodriguez, 5165197; Charles E. Herbert, P.E., 1765520; Sumana S. Rockich IRA, 30012298; Sumana S. Rockich & Michael Rockich, JT, 30012244. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/23/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(ft) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
      DECLARATION of Stephen J Cirami in Opposition re: responses receied on plaintiffs' motion to approve rejection of certain claimants who have disputed the rejection of their claims. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(cd) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
        DECLARATION of George A Bauer in Opposition to answering submission from Charles A Herbert, P.E. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(cd) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
          DECLARATION of Stephen J. Cirami in Support re: (58 in 1:01-cv-11249-SAS, 60 in 1:01-cv-10753-SAS, 41 in 1:01-cv-10988-SAS, 39 in 1:01-cv-09883-SAS, 58 in 1:01-cv-06873-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-12881-SAS, 37 in 1:01-cv-10799-SAS, 97 in 1:01-cv-06001-SAS, 66 in 1:01-cv-08404-SAS, 45 in 1:01-cv-10901-SAS, 22 in 1:01-cv-09190-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-10230-SAS, 37 in 1:01-cv-11219-SAS, 38 in 1:01-cv-10942-SAS, 61 in 1:01-cv-10838-SAS, 49 in 1:01-cv-10576-SAS, 43 in 1:01-cv-10683-SAS, 39 in 1:01-cv-10105-SAS, 28 in 1:01-cv-06780-SAS, 57 in 1:01-cv-09748-SAS, 74 in 1:01-cv-00242-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-14287-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-14202-SAS, 78 in 1:01-cv-03857-SAS, 33 in 1:01-cv-09619-SAS, 55 in 1:01-cv-02359-SAS, 54 in 1:01-cv-06288-SAS, 36 in 1:01-cv-10800-SAS, 64 in 1:01-cv-07048-SAS, 51 in 1:01-cv-06277-SAS, 61 in 1:01-cv-09417-SAS, 46 in 1:01-cv-10053-SAS, 48 in 1:01-cv-09504-SAS, 51 in 1:01-cv-06820-SAS, 36 in 1:01-cv-10108-SAS, 41 in 1:01-cv-09411-SAS, 22 in 1:01-cv-09191-SAS, 37 in 1:01-cv-10839-SAS, 58 in 1:01-cv-05258-SAS, 72 in 1:01-cv-02261-SAS, 68 in 1:01-cv-03020-SAS, 38 in 1:01-cv-11220-SAS, 60 in 1:01-cv-02858-SAS, 6319 in 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP, 37 in 1:01-cv-09741-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-14286-SAS) MOTION iohkjm.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(pl) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
            JOINT DECLARATION of Stanley D. Bernstein and Ariana J. Tadler in Support re: (58 in 1:01-cv-11249-SAS, 60 in 1:01-cv-10753-SAS, 41 in 1:01-cv-10988-SAS, 39 in 1:01-cv-09883-SAS, 58 in 1:01-cv-06873-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-12881-SAS, 37 in 1:01-cv-10799-SAS, 97 in 1:01-cv-06001-SAS, 66 in 1:01-cv-08404-SAS, 45 in 1:01-cv-10901-SAS, 22 in 1:01-cv-09190-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-10230-SAS, 37 in 1:01-cv-11219-SAS, 38 in 1:01-cv-10942-SAS, 61 in 1:01-cv-10838-SAS, 49 in 1:01-cv-10576-SAS, 43 in 1:01-cv-10683-SAS, 39 in 1:01-cv-10105-SAS, 28 in 1:01-cv-06780-SAS, 57 in 1:01-cv-09748-SAS, 74 in 1:01-cv-00242-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-14287-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-14202-SAS, 78 in 1:01-cv-03857-SAS, 33 in 1:01-cv-09619-SAS, 55 in 1:01-cv-02359-SAS, 54 in 1:01-cv-06288-SAS, 36 in 1:01-cv-10800-SAS, 64 in 1:01-cv-07048-SAS, 51 in 1:01-cv-06277-SAS, 61 in 1:01-cv-09417-SAS, 46 in 1:01-cv-10053-SAS, 48 in 1:01-cv-09504-SAS, 51 in 1:01-cv-06820-SAS, 36 in 1:01-cv-10108-SAS, 41 in 1:01-cv-09411-SAS, 22 in 1:01-cv-09191-SAS, 37 in 1:01-cv-10839-SAS, 58 in 1:01-cv-05258-SAS, 72 in 1:01-cv-02261-SAS, 68 in 1:01-cv-03020-SAS, 38 in 1:01-cv-11220-SAS, 60 in 1:01-cv-02858-SAS, 6319 in 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP, 37 in 1:01-cv-09741-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-14286-SAS) MOTION iohkjm.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(pl) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Members of Plaintiffs' Executive Committee: re: MOTION ENTRY OF THE PROPOSED CLASS DISTRIBUTION ORDER. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(pl) Modified on 10/16/2012 (pl). (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF THE PROPOSED CLASS DISTRIBUTION ORDER BY Members of Plaintiffs' Executive Committee: Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(pl) Modified on 10/16/2012 (pl). (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support OF Charles A. Herbert, P.E. re: (25 in 1:06-cv-14287-SAS) MOTION to Approve FOR AN ORDER APPROVING PROOF OF CLAIM WHERE THE CLAIMANT DISPUTES THE REJECTION AND HAS REQUESTED THE COURT'S REVIEW OF SUCH REJECTION.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(pl) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                    MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING PROOF OF CLAIM WHERE THE CLAIMANT DISPUTES THE REJECTION AND HAS REQUESTED THE COURT'S REVIEW OF SUCH REJECTION. Document filed by Stanley E. O'Neal.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(pl) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO SUBMIT CD-ROM COPY OF EXHIBIT B TO THE DECLARATION OF STEPHEN J. CIRAMI: It is hereby ORDERED, that the Clerk of Court is directed to accept for filing and docket a CD-ROM or other digital storage device that contains a digital copy of Exhibits B-1 (Authorized Claimants) and B-2 (Rejected Claimants) to the Declaration of Stephen J. Cirami, Senior Vice President, Operations, of The Garden City Group, Inc. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(lmb) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS POSTED TO SATISFY RULE 7 BOND TO SETTLING OBJECTIONS granting (6302) Motion for Release of Funds in case 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within ten (10) calendar days of this order the clerk shall release to Jeffrey Weinstein, on behalf of the Movants, the $25,000 deposited with the cashier's office under Objectors Receipt Number 909152. The clerk's check for $25,000 should be made payable to "Jeffrey Weinstein" and mailed to Jeffrey Weinstein, 518 East Tyler Street, Athens, Texas, 75751. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Movants are hereby relieved of their joint and several obligation to post a bond. Movants are to pay their own fees and costs in the action. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion [Docket No. 6302]. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/12/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(mro) Modified on 4/13/2012 (mro). (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER AUTHORIZING CLAIMS ADMINISTRATOR TO PROCESS CLAIMS SUBMITTED PRIOR TO ENTRY OF THIS ORDER AND TO STOP PROCESSING ANY NEW PROOFS OF CLAIM: The Claims Administrator is authorized to process all Proofs of Claim it received on or before entry of this Order; and it is further ORDERED, that any Proofs of Claim received by the Claims Administrator after entry of this Order shall not be processed, may not be accepted and shall be returned by the Claims Administrator to the sender together with a notice stating that "The Court has entered an Order providing that no Proof of Claim submitted after the date of entry of this Order may be accepted for any reason whatsoever" and it is further ORDERED, that the Claims Administrator is directed to include a notice on the www.iposecuritieslitigationsettlement.com website stating that no Proof of Claim submitted after the date ofentry of this Order may be accepted for any reason whatsoever; and it is further ORDERED, that the Claims Administrator is directed to promptly conclude the processing of all Proofs of Claim received on or before entry of this Order; and it is further ORDERED, that, upon the Claims Administrator's conclusion of the processing of the Proofs of Claim submitted or before entry of this Order, Plaintiffs' Executive Committee shall move for the Class Distribution Order contemplated in paragraph 14 of the Stipulation; and it is further ORDERED, that this Court retain jurisdiction over any further application or matter which may arise in connection with the administration an Settlement of this litigation. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/9/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(ft) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                            PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO PRO SE OBJECTOR JAMES J. HAYES'S AUGUST 8, 2011 SUBMISSION. Document filed by the plaintiffs. (Received in the night deposit box on 8/16/11 at 11:18 pm) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(mro) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                              DECLARATION of Christian Siebott in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to this Court's July 20, 2011 Order addressing whether Pro Se objector James J. Hayes is a class member. Document filed by the plaintiffs. (Received in the night deposit box on 8/5/11 at 11:13pm) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(mro) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO THIS COURT'S JULY 20, 2011 ORDER ADDRESSING WHETHER PRO SE OBJECTOR JAMES J. HAYES IS A CLASS MEMBER. Document filed by the plaintiffs. (Received in the night deposit box on 8/5/11 at 11:13pm)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(mro) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER: If Hayes is directed to submit any further support he wishes to be considered on the question of whether he is a class member, i.e., a "person...[who] purchased or otherwise acquired the securities of [Specific Issuer] during the Class Period and [was] damaged thereby," by the close of business on July 29, 2011. If Hayes makes any further submissions he shall simultaneously serve Plaintiffs' Executive Committee by email or by overnight express mail. Any party who wises to respond to Hayes's submissions to date or in response to this Order shall do so by the close of business on August 5, 2011. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/20/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(tro) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    OPINION AND ORDER #100514. For the foregoing reasons, total fees shall be allocated according to the methodology described herein and in the amounts included in the attached Spreadsheet. Expenses and interest shall be allocated according to Exhibit A of the Proposal. The Objectors are directed to file their Objections and any responses thereto. The Clerk of the Court is then directed to close these motions. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/8/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(djc) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER Plaintiffs' Executive Committee ("EC") is hereby ordered to prepare a spreadsheet showing the allocation of total fees of $170,084,950.00 based on the "revised adjusted lodestars" of both the EC and non-EC law firms. This spreadsheet must be submitted to the Court by close of business Monday, June 20, 2011. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/15/11); Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(djc) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Fred Taylor Isquith dated 12/17/10 re: We respectfully request a pre-motion conference for an Order directing Piven not to bring claims relating to his entitlement to fees in the IPO Litigation other than before Your Honor. ENDORSEMENT: To the extent that the law firm of Brower Piven, P.C. is directly seeking attorney's fees related to its work in the IPO litigation, such claim will be heard by Judge Scheindlin. But any disputes between Brower Piven and Wolf Haldenstein arising out of any alleged contract or agreement between those parties will be heard by Judge Sullivan. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/23/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(rjm) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Fred Taylor Isquith dated 12/17/2010 re: Requesting a pre-motion conference for an Order directing Piven not to bring claims relating to his entitlement to fees in the IPO Litigation other than before Your Honor. ENDORSEMENT: To the extent that the law firm of Brower Piven P.C. is directly seeking attorneys fees related to its work in the IPO litigation, such claims will be heard by Judge Scheindlin. But any disputes between Brower Piven and Wolf Haldenstein arriving out of any alleged contract or agreement between those parties will be heard by Judge Sullivan. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/23/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(jpo) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Fred Taylor Isquith dated 12/17/10 re: Request for a pre-motion conference for an Order directing Piven not to bring claims relating to his entitlement to fees in the IPQ Litigation other than before Your Honor. ENDORSEMENT: To the extent that the law firm Brower Piven PC is directly seeking attorneys' fees related to its work in the IPO litigation, such caim will be heard by Judge Sheindlin. But only disputes between Brower Piven and Wolf Halderstein arising out of any alleged contract or agreement between those parties will be heard by Judge Sullivan. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/23/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(db) Modified on 1/13/2011 (db). (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                              RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Baum.Document filed by Lester Baum.Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(Greene, Leland) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leland L. Greene on behalf of Lester Baum Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(Greene, Leland) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT settling action as to 01 Civ. 2858. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)(ml) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by John G. Emerson, Jr on behalf of Robert J. Hart. New Address: EMERSON POYNTER LLP, 500 President Clinton Avenue, Suite 305, Little Rock, Arkansas, USA 72201, 501-907-2555. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS et al.(Emerson, John) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Name Change. Document filed by Gigamedia Ltd., Organic, Inc., Lexent, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Aether Systems, Inc., Corvis Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS et al.(Miness, Russell) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                        FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (5588 in 1:21-mc-00092-SAS) MOTION.. Document filed by Zagoda A.G.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Neil Fraser in Support of Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Intervene and remove Milberg Weiss & Bershad as Lead Counsel and Exhibit 1, pages 1 - 48# 2 Exhitibt 1 (Cont.) to Exhibit 7# 3 Exhitbit 8 to Exhibit 12# 4 Exhibit 13 to Exhibit 14# 5 Letter to the Hon. Shira A. Scheindlin from Neil Fraser)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS et al.(Tadler, Ariana) Modified on 5/15/2007 (lb). (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                          ORDER by Special Master Daniel Capra directing plaintiffs to produce correspondence and analyses of trading information and to submit privilege logs. (9/14/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS,1:01-cv-00242-SAS,1:01-cv-02261-SAS,1:01-cv-02359-SAS,1:01-cv-02858-SAS, 1:01-cv-06780-SAS,1:01-cv-09190-SAS,1:01-cv-09191-SAS(Huth, Karl) (Entered: 09/27/2004)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                            ANSWER by Merrill Lynch, Merrill Lynch & Co. to [34-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Mark Holland from the Firm: Clifford Chance US LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/15/2003)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Firm Registration as an LLP and Name Change by Lehman Brothers, Inc. (sac) (Entered: 04/07/2003)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Merrill Lynch, by Sueanne Codman on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Merrill Lynch, by Sueanne Codman, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by Fenyong Tan, Duan Wen Tan, Tia Ying Mo amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 06/11/2002)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/14/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      STIPULATION and ORDER; that plaintiff will serve a consolidated amended complaint on or before 4/2/02, and will not seek an extension of this deadline for serving a consolidated amended complaint ; defendants will move to dismiss the consolidated amended complaint within 60 days of receiving the Court's permission to do so . ( signed by Judge Shirley W. Kram ) (kkc) (Entered: 03/18/2002)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER,... that all cases involving B2B Internet Holders initial public offering in this IPO Securities Litigation, including case numbers 01-CV-2955, 01-CV-3023, 01-CV-03299, 01-CV-3383, 01-CV-3469, 01-cv-03569, 01-cv-03692, 01-cv-04101, and 01-CV-04406, shall be consolidated into case number 01-CV-2858. The Clerk of the Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01-CV-2858 ,... the Clerk of the Court is hereby Ordered to close all cases that have been so consolidated, subject to reopening at a later date on proper application by a party... this Order corrects and Supersedes any previous consolidation order filed in the dockets for case numbers 01-CV-2858, 01-CV-2955, 01-CV-3023, 01-CV-3299, 01-CV-3383, 01-CV-3469, 01-CV-3569, 01-CV-3692, 01-CV-4101, 01-CV-4406 ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-02858 Document No. 32. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-02955; 1:01-cv-03023; 1:01-cv-03299; 1:01-cv-03383; 1:01-cv-03469; 1:01-cv-03569; 1:01-cv-03692; 1:01-cv-04101; 1:01-cv-04406] (dcap) (Entered: 02/25/2002)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          STIPULATION and SCHEDULING ORDER,... The deadline for Lead Plaintiffs to file the Consolidated Complaint shalll be extended to a date to be determined by the Court at or after the initial conference to be held between the parties to the above-entitled action on September 7, 2001 . The defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Complaint within forty-five (45) days after service thereof . . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (dcap) (Entered: 10/30/2001)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER,... that all cases involving Checkfree in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-02858) shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 2858. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 2858 ,... the Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed.(dcap) Modified on 10/30/2001 (Entered: 10/30/2001)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER,... that all cases involving Internet in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-02955, 1:01-cv-03023, 1:01-cv-03299, 1:01-cv-03383, 1:01-cv-03469, 1:01-cv-03569, 1:01-cv-03692, 1:01-cv-03975, 1:01-cv-04069, 1:01-cv-04101, 1:01-cv-04138, 1:01-cv-04146, 1:01-cv-04210, 1:01-cv-04213, 1:01-cv-04406, 1:01-cv-04960, 1:01-cv-05792, 1:01-cv-07161, 1:01-cv-07654) shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 2858. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designted as related to 01 Civ. 2858 ,... the Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-02858 Document No. 29. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-02955; 1:01-cv-03023; 1:01-cv-03299; 1:01-cv-03383; 1:01-cv-03469; 1:01-cv-03569; 1:01-cv-03692; 1:01-cv-03975; 1:01-cv-04069; 1:01-cv-04101; 1:01-cv-04138; 1:01-cv-04146; 1:01-cv-04210; 1:01-cv-04213; 1:01-cv-04406; 1:01-cv-04960; 1:01-cv-05792; 1:01-cv-07161; 1:01-cv-07654] (dcap) Modified on 02/25/2002 (Entered: 10/30/2001)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER,... that all cases involving Harbinger in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rideer (1:01-cv-02858) shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 2858. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 2858 ,... the Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed.(dcap) Modified on 10/30/2001 (Entered: 10/30/2001)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER,... that all cases involving Carinsite in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-02858) shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 2858. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 2858 ,... the Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed.(dcap) Modified on 10/30/2001 (Entered: 10/30/2001)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    STIPULATION and SCHEDULING ORDER,... The deadline for Lead Plaintiffs to file the Consolidated Complaint shall be extended to a date to be determined by the court at or after the initial conference to be held between the parties to the above-entitled action on September 7, 2001 . The defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Complaint within forty-five (45) days after service thereof . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (dcap) Modified on 10/30/2001 (Entered: 10/30/2001)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER,... that all cases involving Agile Software in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-02858) shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 2858. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 2858 ,... the Clerk of Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (dcap) (Entered: 10/30/2001)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: the Lead Pltffs, through Pltffs' Co-Lead Counsel, shall file the Consolidated Complaint on or before 9/5/01. The Defts shall answer or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Complaint within 45 days after service thereof. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (sac) (Entered: 08/28/2001)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with Judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) Modified on 08/10/2001 (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 6/26/01 @ 4:30 p.m. (rmo) (Entered: 08/02/2001)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 6/26/01. (gmo) (Entered: 08/02/2001)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                STIPULATION and SCHEDULING ORDER, The Lead plaintiffs, through plaintiffs' co-lead counsel, shall file the consolidated complaint on or before 8/17/01. The defendants shall move, answer or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Complaint within 45 days after its service . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (tp) (Entered: 07/30/2001)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [8-1] motion consolidating class actions 01 Civ. 2858 (Lead Case), 01 Civ.2955, 01 Civ.3023, 01 Civ.3299, 01 Civ.3383, 01 Civ.3469, 01 Civ.3569, 01 Civ.3692, 01 Civ.4101 & 4406 for all purposes; granting [8-2] motion appointing the Tan Group to serve as Lead pltffs; granting [8-3] motion approving the Tan Groups selection of Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP and Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Learch LLP as lead counsel for all pltffs and the class in these consolidated actions. Every pleading filed in these consolidated actions shall bear the caption: IN RE B2B Internet Holders Trust Securities Litigation. The defts shall answer or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Complaint within 45 days after its service ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (kg) Modified on 10/30/2001 (Entered: 06/28/2001)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Rebecca M. Katz by Fenyong Tan, Duan Wen Tan in further support of the Tan Group's Motion for Consolidation of Related Cases, Appointment of Lead Pltff, and for Approval of its Selection of Counsel. (sac) Modified on 10/30/2001 (Entered: 07/02/2001)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Fenyong Tan, Duan Wen Tan et al., in further support of the Tan Group's motion for appointment as lead pltff and approval of its selection of lead counsel, and in opposition tothe motions of Michael Chapman and ICC Wealth Management Inc. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 6/21/01 at 7:28 p.m.) (sac) Modified on 10/30/2001 (Entered: 07/02/2001)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by ICC Wealth in further support of [5-1] motion for an Order Appointing ICC Wealth Management as Lead pltff, [5-2] motion approving Lead Pltffs selection of Wolf Haldenstein as lead counsel, [5-3] motion for consolidation of all related actions. (kkc) (Entered: 06/25/2001)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Michael Chapman in opposition to [8-1] motion for an Order consolidating all related actions, [8-2] motion appointing the Tan Group to serve as Lead pltffs, [8-3] motion approving the Tan Groups selection of counsel for the class, [11-1] motion for an Order consolidating all related actions, [11-2] motion appointing Tan, Rubin & Weiss as Lead Pltffs, [11-3] motion approving Tan, Rubin & Weiss' selection of Lead Counsel, [5-1] motion for an Order Appointing ICC Wealth Management as Lead pltff, [5-2] motion approving Lead Pltffs selection of Wolf Haldenstein as lead counsel, [5-3] motion for consolidation of all related actions. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 6/18/01 at 11:44 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 06/21/2001)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Gary S. Jacobson in opposition to [8-1] motion for an Order consolidating all related actions, [8-2] motion appointing the Tan Group to serve as Lead pltffs, [8-3] motion approving the Tan Groups selection of counsel for the class, [11-1] motion for an Order consolidating all related actions, [11-2] motion appointing Tan, Rubin & Weiss as Lead Pltffs, [11-3] motion approving Tan, Rubin & Weiss' selection of Lead Counsel, [5-1] motion for an Order Appointing ICC Wealth Management as Lead pltff, [5-2] motion approving Lead Pltffs selection of Wolf Haldenstein as lead counsel, [5-3] motion for consolidation of all related actions. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 6/18/01 at 11:44 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 06/21/2001)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Samuel H. Rudman by Fenyong Tan, Mark Rubin, Michael Weiss in support Re: [11-1] motion for an Order consolidating all related actions, [11-2] motion appointing Tan, Rubin & Weiss as Lead Pltffs, [11-3] motion approving Tan, Rubin & Weiss' selection of Lead Counsel. Received in night deposit on 6/4/01 at 10:03 p.m. (jp) (Entered: 06/12/2001)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Fenyong Tan, Mark Rubin, Michael Weiss in support of [11-1] motion for an Order consolidating all related actions, [11-2] motion appointing Tan, Rubin & Weiss as Lead Pltffs, [11-3] motion approving Tan, Rubin & Weiss' selection of Lead Counsel. Received in night deposit on 6/4/01 at 10:03 p.m. (jp) (Entered: 06/12/2001)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION (filed on service date) by Fenyong Tan, Mark Rubin, Michael Weiss; for an Order consolidating all related actions , appointing Tan, Rubin & Weiss as Lead Pltffs , and, approving Tan, Rubin & Weiss' selection of Lead Counsel . Return date not indicated. Proposed Order attached. Received in night deposit on 6/4/01 at 10:03 p.m. (jp) (Entered: 06/12/2001)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Sandy A. Liebhard by Fenyong Tan, Duan Wen Tan, Tia Ying Mo, Hui Min Qu, Terry Van Der Tuuk, William W. Mann, Stephen Fiske in support of [8-1] motion for an Order consolidating all related actions, [8-2] motion appointing the Tan Group to serve as Lead pltffs, [8-3] motion approving the Tan Groups selection of counsel for the class . (jp) (Entered: 06/12/2001)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Fenyong Tan, Duan Wen Tan, Tia Ying Mo, Hui Min Qu, Terry Van Der Tuuk, William W. Mann, Stephen Fiske in support of [8-1] motion for an Order consolidating all related actions, [8-2] motion appointing the Tan Group to serve as Lead pltffs, [8-3] motion approving the Tan Groups selection of counsel for the class . (jp) (Entered: 06/12/2001)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/27/2001
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION (filed on service date) by Fenyong Tan, Duan Wen Tan, Tia Ying Mo, Hui Min Qu, Terry Van Der Tuuk, William W. Mann, Stephen Fiske (the "Tan Group"); for an Order consolidating all related actions , appointing the Tan Group to serve as Lead pltffs , and, approving the Tan Groups selection of counsel for the class . Return date not indicated. Proposed Order attached. (jp) (Entered: 06/12/2001)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Gregory M. Nespole by ICC Wealth in support Re: [5-1] motion for an Order Appointing ICC Wealth Management as Lead pltff, [5-2] motion approving Lead Pltffs selection of Wolf Haldenstein as lead counsel, [5-3] motion for consolidation of all related actions . (jp) (Entered: 06/12/2001)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by ICC Wealth in support of [5-1] motion for an Order Appointing ICC Wealth Management as Lead pltff, [5-2] motion approving Lead Pltffs selection of Wolf Haldenstein as lead counsel, [5-3] motion for consolidation of all related actions . (jp) (Entered: 06/11/2001)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION (filed on service date) by ICC Wealth; for an Order Appointing ICC Wealth Management as Lead pltff , approving Lead Pltffs selection of Wolf Haldenstein as lead counsel , and, for consolidation of all related actions . Return date not indicated. Proposed Order attached. (jp) (Entered: 06/11/2001)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/17/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and ORDER; plaintiffs shall have forty-five days to serve, by hand and file an amended consolidated complaint for this and, other related class action cases pending in this Court after the filing of an order appointing lead plaintiff and lead counsel; Defendants shall have forty-five days after the filing of a consolidated amended complaint to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint of the plaintiffs ; ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (djc) (Entered: 05/18/2001)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint as to Merrill Lynch, by James Benedict, Clifford Chance Rogers & Wells, on 4/25/01. Answer due on 5/15/01 for Merrill Lynch. (sn) (Entered: 05/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Howard B. Sirota, Christopher Lovell. (kkc) (Entered: 05/01/2001)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 401544. (bm) (Entered: 04/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 180 times.

                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?