G v. Mukasey et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-00851-DMS-CAB
District Judge Dana M. Sabraw, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Angel Alvarado G, Petitioner
v.
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Respondent
Officially listed as "Department of Homeland Security"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel William Bettwy +1 619 557 7119 +1 619 557 7122 Samuel.Bettwy@usdoj.gov
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel William Bettwy +1 619 557 7119 +1 619 557 7122 Samuel.Bettwy@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael B. Mukasey, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel William Bettwy +1 619 557 7119 +1 619 557 7122 Samuel.Bettwy@usdoj.gov
No Logo Robert Rillamas, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel William Bettwy +1 619 557 7119 +1 619 557 7122 Samuel.Bettwy@usdoj.gov
Office San Diego
Filed 5/14/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 463 - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Lack of Jurisdiction
County Imperial
Terminated 9/2/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, HABEAS
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Mail Returned
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re [7] Discrepancy Order as to: Angel Alvarado Gallardo, A92-055-843, El Centro Detention Center, 1115 Imperial Avenue, El Centro, CA 92243. (lao)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Clerks Judgment
    CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Naturalization Service, Michael B. Mukasey, Robert Rillamas against Angel Alvarado G. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED *Because Petitioner is no longer in DHS custody, the "custody" prerequisite of habeas jurisdiction no longer exists. Therefore, the Petition is denied as moot.* (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(lao) (av1).
      LREF
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Because Petitioner is no longer in DHS custody, the "custody" prerequisite of habeas jurisdiction no longer exists. Therefore, the Petition is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/2/08. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(lao)(av1).
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 ~Notice (other)
        NOTICE by Michael B. Mukasey, Immigration and Naturalization Service, Department of Homeland Security, Robert Rillamas (Notice of Removal of Petitioner to Mexico on August 4, 2008) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Proof of Service)(Bettwy, Samuel) (lao).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 ~Notice (other)
          BRIEF by Angel Alvarado Gallardo. (nunc pro tunc to 07/28/08) (lao) (kaj).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Discrepancy Order Accepting DocumentCourt Filing
            Discrepancy Order by Judge Dana M. Sabraw accepting document: Brief from Petitioner Angel Alvarado Gallardo, non-compliance with local rule Supplemental Documents Require Court Order. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(lao) (kaj).
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Return to Petition
              RETURN TO PETITION by Michael B. Mukasey, Immigration and Naturalization Service, Department of Homeland Security, Robert Rillamas. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Proof of Service)(Bettwy, Samuel) (lao).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Order Setting Briefing Schedule - Habeas CorpusCourt Filing
                Order Setting Briefing Schedule. Response due by 7/14/2008. Reply due by 7/28/2008, at which time the matter shall be taken under submission without oral argument. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/17/08. (lao) (av1).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel William Bettwy on behalf of Michael B. Mukasey, Immigration and Naturalization Service, Department of Homeland Security, Robert Rillamas (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Bettwy, Samuel) (lao).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paupCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting application to proceed in forma pauperis [2]. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/14/08. (lao) (av1).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008, Terminated: 5/14/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angel Alvarado G. (rmm)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                        PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 0. Not paid, motion for IFP submitted), filed by Angel Alvarado G.(rmm) (av1).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 371 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?