Shew et al v. Malloy et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-00739
District Judge Alfred V. Covello, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 27, 2017 at 11:35 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brian McClain, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 203

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Thomas Stapleton +1 914 798 5400 +1 914 798 5401 bstapleton@goldbergsegalla.com
No Logo Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 203

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Thomas Stapleton +1 914 798 5400 +1 914 798 5401 bstapleton@goldbergsegalla.com
No Logo Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 203

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Thomas Stapleton +1 914 798 5400 +1 914 798 5401 bstapleton@goldbergsegalla.com
No Logo Hiller Sports, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Dan M Peterson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Porter Halbrook +1 703 352 7276 +1 703 359 0938 protell@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 203

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Thomas Stapleton +1 914 798 5400 +1 914 798 5401 bstapleton@goldbergsegalla.com
No Logo June Shew, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg Segalla LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Thomas Stapleton +1 914 798 5400 +1 914 798 5401 bstapleton@goldbergsegalla.com
Space Brian Thomas Stapleton +1 914 798 5400 +1 914 798 5401 bstapleton@goldbergsegalla.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 203

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Thomas Stapleton +1 914 798 5400 +1 914 798 5401 bstapleton@goldbergsegalla.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Offices of Avrum J. Rosen, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Porter Halbrook +1 703 352 7276 +1 703 359 0938 protell@aol.com
No Logo MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 203

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Thomas Stapleton +1 914 798 5400 +1 914 798 5401 bstapleton@goldbergsegalla.com
No Logo Mitchell Rocklin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Dan M Peterson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Rabbi Stephen Porter Halbrook +1 703 352 7276 +1 703 359 0938 protell@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 203

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Rabbi Brian Thomas Stapleton +1 914 798 5400 +1 914 798 5401 bstapleton@goldbergsegalla.com
No Logo Peter Owens, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 203

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Thomas Stapleton +1 914 798 5400 +1 914 798 5401 bstapleton@goldbergsegalla.com
No Logo Rabbi Mitchell Rocklin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 203

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Thomas Stapleton +1 914 798 5400 +1 914 798 5401 bstapleton@goldbergsegalla.com
No Logo Stephanie Cypher, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 203

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Thomas Stapleton +1 914 798 5400 +1 914 798 5401 bstapleton@goldbergsegalla.com
No Logo Stephen Holly, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 203

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Thomas Stapleton +1 914 798 5400 +1 914 798 5401 bstapleton@goldbergsegalla.com
v.
No Logo Brian Preleski, Defendant
No Logo Dannel P. Malloy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Connecticut Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maura Murphy-Osborne +1 860 808 5020 +1 860 808 5347 maura.murphyosborne@po.state.ct.us
Space Michael Skold +1 860 808 5020 michael.skold@ct.gov
Space Perry A. Zinn Rowthorn +1 860 808 5315 +1 860 808 5387 Perry.Zinn-Rowthorn@ct.gov
No Logo Dannell P. Malloy, Defendant
No Logo David I. Cohen, Defendant
No Logo David Shepack, Defendant
No Logo Gail P. Hardy, Defendant
No Logo John C. Smriga, Defendant
No Logo Kevin D. Lawlor, Defendant
No Logo Kevin T. Kane, Defendant
No Logo Matthew C. Gedansky, Defendant
No Logo Maureen Platt, Defendant
No Logo Michael Dearington, Defendant
No Logo Michael L. Regan, Defendant
No Logo Patricia M. Froehlich, Defendant
No Logo Peter A. McShane, Defendant
No Logo Reuben F. Bradford, Defendant
No Logo Stephen J. Sedensky, III, Defendant
No Logo Brady Center To Prevent Gun Violence, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Cleveland School Remembers, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Connecticut Against Gun Violence, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Darren Edwards, Amicus Curiae
No Logo David Murad, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Douglas Hall, Amicus Curiae
No Logo International Brotherhood of Police Officers, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Koskoff, Koskoff & Bieder, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua D. Koskoff +1 203 336 4421
Space Alinor Clemans Sterling +1 203 336 4421 +1 203 368 3244 asterling@koskoff.com
No Logo International Law Enforcement Educators and Trainers Association (ILEETA), Amicus Curiae
No Logo James Bleidner, Amicus Curiae
No Logo John Bunce, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael C. D'Agostino +1 860 240 2731 +1 860 240 2818 michael.dagostino@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KATTEN AND MUCHIN, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan K. Baum +1 312 902 5479 +1 312 902 1061 jonathan.baum@kattenlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Robert Friedman +1 212 940 8516 +1 212 894 5616 alan.friedman@kattenlaw.com
No Logo Law Enforcement Action Network (LEAN), Amicus Curiae
No Logo Law Enforcement Legal Defense Fund (LELDF), Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Rachel M. Baird

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rachel M. Baird +1 860 626 9991 +1 860 626 9992 rbaird@rachelbairdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Michel & Associates, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C D Michel +1 562 216 4444 +1 562 216 4445 cmichel@michelandassociates.com
No Logo Major Cities Chiefs Association, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Matthew F. Tyska, Jr., Amicus Curiae
No Logo Michael McClain, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Moms Demand Action for Gun Sense in America, Amicus Curiae
No Logo National Organization of Black Law Enforcement Executives, Amicus Curiae
No Logo National Rifle Association of America, Amicus Curiae
Officially listed as "National Rifle Association of America, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Halloran & Sage, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph G. Fortner, Jr. +1 860 522 6103 +1 860 548 0006 fortner@halloran-sage.com
Space Kenneth R. Slater, Jr. +1 860 522 6103 slater@halloran-sage.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Space Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
Space David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo Pink Pistols, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Nuzzo & Roberts, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Roberts +1 203 250 2000 +1 203 250 3131 rroberts@nuzzo-roberts.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (134) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
    ENTERED IN ERROR:SCHEDULING ORDER: See Order for details Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/11/16.(Pesta, J.) Modified on 1/12/2016 (Pesta, J.). (Entered: 01/12/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None USCA Mandate
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
        MANDATE of USCA dated 11/16/2015 Affirming in Part and Reversing in Part Judgment re 127 Notice of Appeal, filed by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Hiller Sports, LLC, Stephen Holly, Stephanie Cypher, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Peter Owens, Brian McClain (Hushin, Z.) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
          Corrected Index to Record on Appeal by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, Stephen Holly, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew re 127 Notice of Appeal, 51 Certificate of Good Standing, 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 123 Order, 126 Judgment, 54 Answer to Amended Complaint, 119 MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO SUBMIT TWO SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS, 41 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, 83 Exhibit, 47 Notice of Appearance, 105 Certificate of Good Standing, 109 Order on Motion for Hearing, 50 Notice of Appearance, 36 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 114 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, 28 MOTION for Attorney(s) C.D. Michel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2937331), 19 Certificate of Service, 8 Notice of Appearance, 68 Statement of Material Facts, 38 MOTION for Attorney(s) Charles J. Cooper to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2943708), 31 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, 42 Order, 98 Response, 82 Exhibit, 24 MOTION to Amend/Correct 18 Proposed Order, , 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 84 Exhibit, 27 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief, 121 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 52 Notice of Appearance, 117 Response, 111 Statement of Material Facts,, 29 Amicus Curiae Appearance, 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 56 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time of SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES & COURT APPEARANCES, 45 Affidavit, 4 Electronic Summons Issued, 37 Affidavit, 20 Notice of Appearance, 10 Amended Complaint, 97 Order on Motion for Leave to File, 9 Scheduling Order, 92 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 44 Affidavit, 65 Notice (Other), 85 Exhibit, 59 Certificate of Good Standing, 3 Electronic Filing Order, 88 Exhibit, 81 Exhibit, 80 Exhibit, 113 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiffs' Motion For Permission Nunc Pro Tunc To FIle An Oversized Reply Brief, 90 Notice of Appearance, 73 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 23 Notice of Appearance, 18 Proposed Order, 115 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , 6 Notice of Appearance, 122 Order on Motion for Leave to File, 67 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion,, 34 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 125 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 70 Order, 91 Notice of Appearance, 16 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephen P. Halbrook, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2916268), 55 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, 118 MOTION request for a teleconference to discuss 01/30/14 hearing , 104 Certificate of Good Standing, 53 Certificate of Good Standing, 49 Certificate of Good Standing, 89 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, 75 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jonathan K. Baum to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3028354), 116 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, 95 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 1 Complaint, 100 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 86 Exhibit, 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 77 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, 124 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 43 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 108 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 120 MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY, 46 Affidavit, 35 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, 79 Exhibit, 30 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief, 103 Certificate of Good Standing, 110 Calendar Entry, 32 Order on Motion for Leave to File, 99 MOTION for Extension of Time , 22 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, 63 Notice (Other), 5 Electronic Service Documents, 74 MOTION for Attorney(s) Alan R. Friedman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3028320), 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time until September 3, 2013 responses to any motions for injunctive relief filed by plaintiffs, 76 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark T. Ciani to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3028377), 112 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 40 MOTION for Attorney(s) David H. Thompson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2943749), 72 Notice of Appearance, 15 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 12 Summons Returned Executed, 106 MOTION for Hearing Request for Hearing or Conference on Request for Preliminary Relief, 64 Notice (Other), 7 Notice of Appearance, 39 MOTION for Attorney(s) Peter A. Patterson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2943737), 57 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 33 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 25 Notice of Appearance, 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 71 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , 102 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time , 66 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
            - ENTERED IN ERROR - Index to Record on Appeal by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, Stephen Holly, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew re 127 Notice of Appeal,. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court to arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Stapleton, Brian) Modified on 2/18/2014 (Ferguson, L.). (Entered: 02/14/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
              Docket Entry Correction re 125 DECISION AND ORDER: REPLACEMENT PDF - Corrected to remove a reference to a nonexistent footnote and re-number footnotes 41-85 to 40-84. There have been no substantive changes. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 127 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF APPEAL re 125 DECISION AND ORDER and 126 Judgment by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, Stephen Holly, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0205-3138460. (Stapleton, Brian) Modified on 2/11/2014 to create link to Doc. Nos. 125 & 126 (Ferguson, L.). (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                  JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants Brian Preleski, Dannel P. Malloy, David Shepack, David I. Cohen, Gail P. Hardy, John C. Smriga, Kevin D. Lawlor, Kevin T. Kane, Matthew C. Gedansky, Maureen Platt, Michael Dearington, Michael L. Regan, Patricia M. Froehlich, Peter A. McShane, Reuben F. Bradford, Stephen J. Sedensky, III.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 1/30/14.(Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 125 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    DECISION AND ORDER DENYING the plaintiffs' 60 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING the defendants' 78 Motion for Summary Judgment; and DENYING as moot the plaintiffs' 14 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. The clerk of the court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on January 30, 2014. (Ruocco, M.) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER finding as moot 118 motion. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 01/21/14. (Covello, Alfred) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER. After thorough review of the well-crafted and well-articulated position of the movants, and the responses thereto, the most recent of which was filed on January 15, 2014, the court concludes that oral argument on the pending motions is not necessary. The issues have been comprehensively briefed and the court is prepared to resolve the pending motions without further argument. The order setting the date for argument in this case is hereby vacated. The court will issue a decision on the merits forthwith. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 01/21/14.(Covello, Alfred) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 119 motion for leave to file; granting 120 motion for leave to file. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 01/21/14. (Covello, Alfred) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                            Memorandum in Opposition PLAINTIFFS' SUR-REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 120 MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY filed by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, Stephen Holly, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew. (Stapleton, Brian) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, Stephen Holly, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Declaration of Gary Kleck)(Stapleton, Brian) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO SUBMIT TWO SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, Stephen Holly, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Stapleton, Brian) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                  MOTION request for a teleconference to discuss 01/30/14 hearing by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, Stephen Holly, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew.Responses due by 1/31/2014 (Stapleton, Brian) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE re 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Reuben F. Bradford, David I. Cohen, Michael Dearington, Patricia M. Froehlich, Matthew C. Gedansky, Gail P. Hardy, Kevin T. Kane, Kevin D. Lawlor, Dannel P. Malloy, Peter A. McShane, Maureen Platt, Brian Preleski, Michael L. Regan, Stephen J. Sedensky, III, David Shepack, John C. Smriga. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 70, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 71, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 72, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 73)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 115 motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on January 7, 2014. (Meskill, J) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Reuben F. Bradford, David I. Cohen, Michael Dearington, Patricia M. Froehlich, Matthew C. Gedansky, Gail P. Hardy, Kevin T. Kane, Kevin D. Lawlor, Dannel P. Malloy, Peter A. McShane, Maureen Platt, Michael L. Regan, Stephen J. Sedensky, III, David Shepack, John C. Smriga. (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting 113 motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on December 12, 2013. (Meskill, J) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiffs' Motion For Permission Nunc Pro Tunc To FIle An Oversized Reply Brief by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, Stephen Holly, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew. (Stapleton, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                              Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply to Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment re 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, Stephen Holly, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew. (Stapleton, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                Statement of Material Facts re 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Local Rule 56(a)(1) filed by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, Stephen Holly, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - I & L, # 3 Exhibit J, # 4 Exhibit K, # 5 Exhibit M, # 6 Exhibit N)(Stapleton, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Hearing set for 1/30/2013 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom One, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Alfred V. Covello (Alexander, R.) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER finding as moot 106 motion for hearing. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 11/26/13. (Covello, Alfred) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 102 motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 11/26/13. (Covello, Alfred) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER. Counsel for the parties shall set up a telephonic conference with the court on November 25, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. to discuss the 102 and 106 pending motions. The parties shall provide chambers with a telephone number to call into the telephonic conference. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on November 22, 2013. (Meskill, J) Modified on 11/22/2013 to edit text(Ferguson, L.). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Hearing Request for Hearing or Conference on Request for Preliminary Relief by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, Stephen Holly, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew. (Stapleton, Brian) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                            CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 74 MOTION for Attorney(s) Alan R. Friedman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3028320) by Cleveland School Remembers, Connecticut Against Gun Violence, Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Moms Demand Action for Gun Sense in America. (D'Agostino, Michael) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                              CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 76 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark T. Ciani to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3028377) by Cleveland School Remembers, Connecticut Against Gun Violence, Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Moms Demand Action for Gun Sense in America. (D'Agostino, Michael) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 75 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jonathan K. Baum to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3028354) by Cleveland School Remembers, Connecticut Against Gun Violence, Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Moms Demand Action for Gun Sense in America. (D'Agostino, Michael) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, Stephen Holly, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew. (Stapleton, Brian) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    ORDER granting 74 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alan R. Friedman; granting 75 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan K. Baum; granting 76 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark T. Ciani. Certificate of Good Standing due by 1/12/2014. Signed by Clerk on 11/13/13. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 99 motion for extension of time. The deadlines shall be extended as follows: November 26, 2013, deadline for the plaintiffs' reply to the defendants' opposition and the plaintiffs' opposition to the defendants' motion for summary judgment. December 17, 2013, deadline for the defendants' reply brief, if any, to the plaintiffs' opposition. The December 9 - 19, 2013, time period for a date for oral argument before the court is postponed sine die. The court will issue a calendar for a telephonic conference to determine a date for oral argument. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on November 12, 2013. (Meskill, J) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, Stephen Holly, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew. (Stapleton, Brian) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          RESPONSE re 97 Order on Motion for Leave to File by Cleveland School Remembers, Connecticut Against Gun Violence, Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Moms Demand Action for Gun Sense in America(Brief of Amici Curiae). (D'Agostino, Michael) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 89 motion for leave to file. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on October 28, 2013. (Meskill, J) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 96 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Memorandum in Support re 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, International Brotherhood of Police Officers, Major Cities Chiefs Association, National Organization of Black Law Enforcement Executives. (Sterling, Alinor) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Organization of Black Law Enforcement Executives. (Sterling, Alinor) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by Major Cities Chiefs Association. (Sterling, Alinor) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by International Brotherhood of Police Officers. (Sterling, Alinor) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (Sterling, Alinor) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D. Koskoff on behalf of Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, International Brotherhood of Police Officers, Major Cities Chiefs Association, National Organization of Black Law Enforcement Executives (Koskoff, Joshua) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Alinor Clemans Sterling on behalf of International Brotherhood of Police Officers, Major Cities Chiefs Association, National Organization of Black Law Enforcement Executives, Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence (Sterling, Alinor) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Cleveland School Remembers, Connecticut Against Gun Violence, Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Moms Demand Action for Gun Sense in America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(D'Agostino, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              EXHIBIT 61-69 by Reuben F. Bradford, David I. Cohen, Michael Dearington, Patricia M. Froehlich, Matthew C. Gedansky, Gail P. Hardy, Kevin T. Kane, Kevin D. Lawlor, Dannel P. Malloy, Peter A. McShane, Maureen Platt, Brian Preleski, Michael L. Regan, Stephen J. Sedensky, III, David Shepack, John C. Smriga re 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                EXHIBIT 59-60 by Reuben F. Bradford, David I. Cohen, Michael Dearington, Patricia M. Froehlich, Matthew C. Gedansky, Gail P. Hardy, Kevin T. Kane, Kevin D. Lawlor, Dannel P. Malloy, Peter A. McShane, Maureen Platt, Brian Preleski, Michael L. Regan, Stephen J. Sedensky, III, David Shepack, John C. Smriga re 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  EXHIBIT 53-58 by Reuben F. Bradford, David I. Cohen, Michael Dearington, Patricia M. Froehlich, Matthew C. Gedansky, Gail P. Hardy, Kevin T. Kane, Kevin D. Lawlor, Dannel P. Malloy, Peter A. McShane, Maureen Platt, Brian Preleski, Michael L. Regan, Stephen J. Sedensky, III, David Shepack, John C. Smriga re 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    EXHIBIT 52 by Reuben F. Bradford, David I. Cohen, Michael Dearington, Patricia M. Froehlich, Matthew C. Gedansky, Gail P. Hardy, Kevin T. Kane, Kevin D. Lawlor, Dannel P. Malloy, Peter A. McShane, Maureen Platt, Brian Preleski, Michael L. Regan, Stephen J. Sedensky, III, David Shepack, John C. Smriga re 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      EXHIBIT 50-51 by Reuben F. Bradford, David I. Cohen, Michael Dearington, Patricia M. Froehlich, Matthew C. Gedansky, Gail P. Hardy, Kevin T. Kane, Kevin D. Lawlor, Dannel P. Malloy, Peter A. McShane, Maureen Platt, Brian Preleski, Michael L. Regan, Stephen J. Sedensky, III, David Shepack, John C. Smriga re 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        EXHIBIT 49 by Reuben F. Bradford, David I. Cohen, Michael Dearington, Patricia M. Froehlich, Matthew C. Gedansky, Gail P. Hardy, Kevin T. Kane, Kevin D. Lawlor, Dannel P. Malloy, Peter A. McShane, Maureen Platt, Brian Preleski, Michael L. Regan, Stephen J. Sedensky, III, David Shepack, John C. Smriga re 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          EXHIBIT 46-48 by Reuben F. Bradford, David I. Cohen, Michael Dearington, Patricia M. Froehlich, Matthew C. Gedansky, Gail P. Hardy, Kevin T. Kane, Kevin D. Lawlor, Dannel P. Malloy, Peter A. McShane, Maureen Platt, Brian Preleski, Michael L. Regan, Stephen J. Sedensky, III, David Shepack, John C. Smriga re 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            EXHIBIT 41-45 by Reuben F. Bradford, David I. Cohen, Michael Dearington, Patricia M. Froehlich, Matthew C. Gedansky, Gail P. Hardy, Kevin T. Kane, Kevin D. Lawlor, Dannel P. Malloy, Peter A. McShane, Maureen Platt, Brian Preleski, Michael L. Regan, Stephen J. Sedensky, III, David Shepack, John C. Smriga re 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              EXHIBIT 21-40 by Reuben F. Bradford, David I. Cohen, Michael Dearington, Patricia M. Froehlich, Matthew C. Gedansky, Gail P. Hardy, Kevin T. Kane, Kevin D. Lawlor, Dannel P. Malloy, Peter A. McShane, Maureen Platt, Brian Preleski, Michael L. Regan, Stephen J. Sedensky, III, David Shepack, John C. Smriga re 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                EXHIBIT 1 - 20 by Reuben F. Bradford, David I. Cohen, Michael Dearington, Patricia M. Froehlich, Matthew C. Gedansky, Gail P. Hardy, Kevin T. Kane, Kevin D. Lawlor, Dannel P. Malloy, Peter A. McShane, Maureen Platt, Brian Preleski, Michael L. Regan, Stephen J. Sedensky, III, David Shepack, John C. Smriga re 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by Reuben F. Bradford, David I. Cohen, Michael Dearington, Patricia M. Froehlich, Matthew C. Gedansky, Gail P. Hardy, Kevin T. Kane, Peter A. McShane, Maureen Platt, Brian Preleski, Michael L. Regan, Stephen J. Sedensky, III, David Shepack, John C. Smriga.Responses due by 11/1/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Material Facts, # 3 Statement of Material Facts)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 71 motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on October 9, 2013. (Meskill, J) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark T. Ciani to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3028377) by Cleveland School Remembers, Connecticut Against Gun Violence, Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Moms Demand Action for Gun Sense in America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(D'Agostino, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney(s) Jonathan K. Baum to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3028354) by Cleveland School Remembers, Connecticut Against Gun Violence, Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Moms Demand Action for Gun Sense in America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(D'Agostino, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney(s) Alan R. Friedman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3028320) by Cleveland School Remembers, Connecticut Against Gun Violence, Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Moms Demand Action for Gun Sense in America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(D'Agostino, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cleveland School Remembers, Connecticut Against Gun Violence, Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Moms Demand Action for Gun Sense in America. (D'Agostino, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. D'Agostino on behalf of Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Connecticut Against Gun Violence, Moms Demand Action for Gun Sense in America, Cleveland School Remembers (D'Agostino, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Reuben F. Bradford, David I. Cohen, Michael Dearington, Patricia M. Froehlich, Matthew C. Gedansky, Gail P. Hardy, Kevin T. Kane, Kevin D. Lawlor, Dannel P. Malloy, Peter A. McShane, Maureen Platt, Brian Preleski, Michael L. Regan, Stephen J. Sedensky, III, David Shepack, John C. Smriga. (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER. The deadline for all amicus briefs in opposition to the plaintiffs' underlying cause of action shall be extended to October 18, 2013. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on September 12, 2013. (Meskill, J) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Support re 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew. (Doc. No. 62 corrected.) (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Statement of Material Facts re 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew. (Doc. No. 61 corrected.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Pew Reseach Center Gun Homicide Rate Report May 2013, # 2 Exhibit - USDOJ BOJS Firearm Violence 1993-2011, # 3 Exhibit - CRS Report on Mass Shootings March 2013, # 4 Exhibit - FBI UCRs, # 5 Exhibit - Koper Report 2004, # 6 Exhibit - Kiper Report 1997, # 7 Exhibit - Wilson Declaration, # 8 Exhibit - Hiller Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Shew Supplemental Declaration, # 10 Exhibit - Diagram, # 11 Exhibit - G. Roberts Declaration)(Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 66 motion for extension of time. The deadlines shall be extended as follows: October 11, 2013, deadline for the defendants' opposition to the plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment, and the defendants' cross motion for summary judgment. November 12, 2013, deadline for the plaintiffs' reply to defendants' opposition and the plaintiffs' opposition to the defendants' motion for summary judgment. December 9 - 19, 2013, time period for a date for oral argument before the court, if requested by a party at the conclusion of briefing, and at the convenience and option of the court. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on September 6, 2013. (Gentile, N.) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment until October 11, 2013 by Reuben F. Bradford, David I. Cohen, Michael Dearington, Patricia M. Froehlich, Matthew C. Gedansky, Gail P. Hardy, Kevin T. Kane, Kevin D. Lawlor, Dannel P. Malloy, Peter A. McShane, Maureen Platt, Brian Preleski, Michael L. Regan, Stephen J. Sedensky, III, David Shepack, John C. Smriga. (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by James Bleidner, John Bunce, Darren Edwards, Douglas Hall, International Law Enforcement Educators and Trainers Association (ILEETA), Law Enforcement Action Network (LEAN), Law Enforcement Legal Defense Fund (LELDF), Michael McClain, David Murad, Matthew F. Tyska, Jr of Amici Curiae Brief 34 Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Baird, Rachel) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Pink Pistols (Roberts, Richard) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by National Rifle Association of America, Inc. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  - ENTERED IN ERROR - MOTION for Summary Judgment by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew.Responses due by 9/13/2013 (Stapleton, Brian) Modified on 9/11/2013 (Ferguson, L.). (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    - ENTERED IN ERROR - MOTION for Summary Judgment by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew.Responses due by 9/13/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pew Research Ctr. Gun Homicide Rate Report May 2013, # 2 Exhibit USDOJ BOJS Firearm Violence 1993-2011, # 3 Exhibit CRS Report on Mass Shootings March 2013, # 4 Exhibit FBI UCRs, # 5 Exhibit Koper Report 2004, # 6 Exhibit Koper Report 1997, # 7 Exhibit Wilson Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Hiller Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Shew Supplemental Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Diagram, # 11 Exhibit G. Roberts Declaration)(Stapleton, Brian) Modified on 9/11/2013 (Ferguson, L.). (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew.Responses due by 9/13/2013 (Stapleton, Brian) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 28 MOTION for Attorney(s) C.D. Michel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2937331) by James Bleidner, John Bunce, Darren Edwards, Douglas Hall, International Law Enforcement Educators and Trainers Association (ILEETA), Law Enforcement Action Network (LEAN), Law Enforcement Legal Defense Fund (LELDF), Michael McClain, David Murad, Matthew F. Tyska, Jr. (Michel, C) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen P. Halbrook on behalf of Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew (Halbrook, Stephen) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting, absent objection, 56 motion for extension of time. The scheduling order is hereby amended in accordance with the motion. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on August 12, 2013. (Gentile, N.) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time of SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES & COURT APPEARANCES by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, Stephen Holly, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew. (Stapleton, Brian) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephen P. Halbrook. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/11/2013. Signed by Clerk on 8/12/12. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint, by Reuben F. Bradford, David I. Cohen, Michael Dearington, Patricia M. Froehlich, Matthew C. Gedansky, Gail P. Hardy, Kevin T. Kane, Kevin D. Lawlor, Dannel P. Malloy, Peter A. McShane, Maureen Platt, Brian Preleski, Michael L. Regan, Stephen J. Sedensky, III, David Shepack, John C. Smriga.(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 39 MOTION for Attorney(s) Peter A. Patterson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2943737) by National Rifle Association of America, Inc.. (Patterson, Peter) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A. Patterson on behalf of National Rifle Association of America, Inc. (Patterson, Peter) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 40 MOTION for Attorney(s) David H. Thompson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2943749) by National Rifle Association of America, Inc.. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Thompson on behalf of National Rifle Association of America, Inc. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 38 MOTION for Attorney(s) Charles J. Cooper to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2943708) by National Rifle Association of America, Inc.. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Entry Correction re 47 Notice of Appearance modified: to correct filer (LaLone, L.) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J. Cooper on behalf of National Rifle Association of America, Inc.(Cooper, Charles) Modified text to correct filer on 7/31/2013 (LaLone, L.). (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended AFFIDAVIT re 41 Order on 39 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,,,,, Signed By David H. Thompson filed by National Rifle Association of America, Inc.. (Fortner, Joseph) Modified on 8/9/2013 to create link to Doc. No. 39 (Ferguson, L.). (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended AFFIDAVIT re 41 Order on 38 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Signed By Charles J. Cooper filed by National Rifle Association of America, Inc.. (Fortner, Joseph) Modified on 8/9/2013 to create link to Doc. No. 38 (Ferguson, L.). (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended AFFIDAVIT re 37 Affidavit re 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephen P. Halbrook, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Signed By Stephen P. Halbrook, Esq. filed by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, Stephen Holly, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin, June Shew. (Stapleton, Brian) Modified on 8/2/2013 to create link to Doc. No. 11 (Ferguson, L.). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2013: # 1 REPLACEMENT OCR SEARCHABLE PDF) (Ferguson, L.). (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 13 motion for extension of time and denying 24 motion to amend/correct. The motions are denied as moot in light of the court's amended scheduling order. See amended scheduling order, ECF No. 42 Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 24, 2013. (Gentile, N.) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: The following amended briefing schedule shall apply in this case: (1) On or before August 9, 2013, the defendants are to file their answer; (2) On or before August 16, 2013, the plaintiffs shall file their brief in support of their underlying cause of action; (3) On or before August 23, 2013, all amicus briefs in support of the plaintiffs' underlying cause of action shall be filed; (4) On or before September 13, 2013, the defendants shall file their brief in opposition to the plaintiffs' motion; (5) On or before September 20, 2013, all amicus briefs in in opposition to the plaintiffs' underlying cause of action shall be filed; (6) On or before September 27, 2013, the plaintiffs shall file their reply brief, if any, to the defendants' opposition; (7) On October 8, 2013, at 2:00 P.M., the court will conduct a hearing, if requested, on the merits of the underlying cause of action. SEE ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 24, 2013. (Gentile, N.) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Charles J. Cooper; granting 39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Peter A. Patterson; granting 40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David H. Thompson. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/20/2013. Signed by Clerk on 7/22/13. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Attorney(s) David H. Thompson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2943749) by National Rifle Association of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of David H. Thompson)(Fortner, Joseph) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Attorney(s) Peter A. Patterson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2943737) by National Rifle Association of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Peter A. Patterson)(Fortner, Joseph) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney(s) Charles J. Cooper to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2943708) by National Rifle Association of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Charles J. Cooper)(Fortner, Joseph) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended AFFIDAVIT re 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephen P. Halbrook, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2916268) Signed By Stephen P. Halbrook, Esq. filed by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Stephanie Cypher, Hiller Sports, LLC, Stephen Holly, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Brian McClain, Peter Owens, Mitchell Rocklin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (Virginia State Bar))(Stapleton, Brian) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support re 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Pink Pistols. (Roberts, Richard) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney C.D. Michel. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/14/2013. Signed by Clerk on 7/16/13. (Kelsey, N.) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: 7/15/2013 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: 7/15/2013 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: 7/15/2013 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: 7/15/2013 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/13/2013, Entered: 7/13/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/13/2013, Entered: 7/13/2013 Amicus Curiae Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: 7/11/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: 7/9/2013 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: 6/27/2013 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: 6/25/2013 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: 6/19/2013 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: 6/11/2013 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: 6/4/2013 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: 5/29/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: 5/29/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: 5/29/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 1 Complaint,, filed by Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, Hiller Sports, LLC, Stephen Holly, Stephanie Cypher, June Shew, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Peter Owens, Rabbi Mitchell Rocklin, Brian McClain, 3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2013. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Reuben F. Bradford, David I. Cohen, Michael Dearington, Patricia M. Froehlich, Matthew C. Gedansky, Gail P. Hardy, Kevin T. Kane, Kevin D. Lawlor, Dannell P. Malloy, Peter A. McShane, Maureen Platt, Brian Preleski, Michael L. Regan, Stephen J. Sedensky, III, David Shepack, John C. Smriga* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Brian T. Stapleton* *Goldberg Segalla-NY* *170 Hamilton Ave., Suite 203* *White Plains, NY 10601*. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 5/22/2013. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 8/22/2013. Amended Pleadings due by 7/21/2013 Discovery due by 11/21/2013 Signed by Clerk on 5/22/2013. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Reuben F. Bradford, David I. Cohen, Michael Dearington, Patricia M. Froehlich, Matthew C. Gedansky, Gail P. Hardy, Kevin T. Kane, Kevin D. Lawlor, Dannell P. Malloy, Peter A. McShane, Maureen Platt, Brian Preleski, Michael L. Regan, Stephen J. Sedensky, III, David Shepack, John C. Smriga, filed by Stephen Holly, Peter Owens, Connecticut Citizens' Defense League, June Shew, Hiller Sports, LLC, Rabbi Mitchell Rocklin, Brian McClain, MD Shooting Sports, LLC, Coalition of Connecticut Sportsmen, Stephanie Cypher. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Coversheet) (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 206 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?