Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Burrito Shoppe LLC, The

Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-00329
District Judge Larry M. Boyle, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Larry M. Boyle
Last Updated September 23, 2016 at 10:29 AM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Equal Employment Opportunity Commission"

Represented by United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

v.
No Logo Allied Foodservice Inc, Defendant
No Logo Burrito Shoppe LLC, The, Defendant

Represented by BENGOECHEA LAW OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shane O Bengoechea +1 208 424 8332 Shane@soblawyers.com

Represented by Clark, D Blair

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/02/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D Blair Clark +1 208 475 2050 +1 208 475 2055 dbc@dbclarklaw.com
Other Parties
No Logo Burrito Shoppe LLC, The, Intervenor-Defendant
No Logo Idaho Human Rights Commission, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Represented by Office of the Attorney General, Civil Litigation Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Michael Adelson +1 208 334 4901 +1 208 334 5548 rob.adelson@ag.idaho.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY Jo-Ann Leigh Bowen +1 208 334 2873 +1 208 334 2664 lgoddard@ihrc.idaho.gov

Represented by State of Idaho

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Steven Lamar Olsen +1 208 334 2400 +1 208 854 8073 steven.olsen@ag.idaho.gov
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 451
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Timeline
  Entries (185) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
WRIT of Execution issued(cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF IHRC'S APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION re 183 Application for Writ filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/15/2012
APPLICATION for Writ of of Execution (Second) by Idaho Human Rights Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Robert M. Adelson)(Adelson, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 181 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney D Blair Clark terminated. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by krb) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney D Blair Clark appearing for Defendants Allied Foodservice Inc, Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Responses due by 10/4/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Withdraw)(Clark, D)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re 179 Stipulation Consent Order filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission. The May 2009 Consent Order is approved as the final agreement in full settlement of this action. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice, eachparty to bear its own fees and/or costs; the Court retains jurisdiction of this matter for the purposes of enforcing the August 11, 2008 Consent Decree and the foregoing May 2009 Consent Order. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION May 2009 Consent Order by Idaho Human Rights Commission. (Adelson, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry M. Boyle: Show Cause Hearing held on 5/20/2009. (Court Reporter/ESR Vicki Jones.) (so)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Allied Foodservice Inc, Burrito Shoppe LLC, The re Set/Reset Hearings, 176 Order on Motion to Compel, (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Answers to Plaintiff's Post-Judgment Requests for Discovery)(Clark, D)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 172 Motion to Compel. Defendants shall respond to Post-Judgment Interrogatories and Requests for Production filed on 3/3/09, on or before 5/19/09, or appear at the federal courthouse in Boise, Idaho on 5/20/09, at 1:00 p.m. (MST), to show cause why Defendants should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with this Order. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL (Flores, Carmen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 172 MOTION to Compel Responses to Post-Judgment Discovery Requests March 3, 2009 Affidavit of Robert M. Adelson filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission.(Adelson, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 172 MOTION to Compel Responses to Post-Judgment Discovery Requests filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission.(Adelson, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Motion to Compel
MOTION to Compel Responses to Post-Judgment Discovery Requests Robert Michael Adelson appearing for Intervenor Plaintiff Idaho Human Rights Commission. Responses due by 3/27/2009 (Adelson, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None
WRIT of Execution issued (cc: USMS)(jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Plaintiffs' Application for Writ of Execution 161 is GRANTED and Defendant's Motion for Stay 163 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry M. Boyle: Motion Hearing held on 11/25/2008 re 161 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Application for Writ of Execution filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission. (Court Reporter ESR: Vicki Jones.) (so)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission 11/14-21/2008 (Flores, Carmen) Modified on 11/12/2008 to edit text (jm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Please take notice that the Motion Hearing on Motion 161 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Application for Writ of Execution previously scheduled on 11/24/2008 has been VACATED and reset for 11/25/2008 at 10:00 AM in Boise, ID before Judge Larry M. Boyle. (loh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 161 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Application for Writ of Execution : Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2008 10:30 AM in Boise, ID before Judge Larry M. Boyle. (loh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None
JOINDER by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission joining 161 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Application for Writ of Execution. (Flores, Carmen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by D Blair Clark on behalf of Allied Foodservice Inc (Clark, D)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 161 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Application for Writ of Execution filed by Allied Foodservice Inc. Replies due by 11/6/2008.(Clark, D)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Robert M. Adelson re 161 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Application for Writ of Execution filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission. (Adelson, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
APPLICATION for Writ of Execution Robert Michael Adelson appearing for Intervenor Plaintiff Idaho Human Rights Commission. Responses due by 11/10/2008 (Adelson, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT DECREE. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Consent Decree and Proposed Order by Idaho Human Rights Commission. (Adelson, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Pursuant to the Notice of Settlement(DOC.157), Counsel shall file their Final dismissal papers & Proposed Order, on or before AUGUST 20, 2008. (lc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement by Idaho Human Rights Commission (Adelson, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER re 130 Defendants' Amended Motion for Order Compelling Disclosure of Discovery and Sanctions. It appears from Plaintiffs' Response (Docket No. 154) and Defendants' choice not to reply that all outstanding discovery issues have been resolved by the parties. Nonetheless, the parties are hereby required to file on or before Monday, August 4, 2008 a joint, status report regarding any outstanding issues relevant to Defendants' Amended Motion for Order Compelling Disclosure of Discovery and Sanctions (Docket No. 130). Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by kp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition by Robert M. Adelson re 130 MOTION to Compel filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission. Replies due by 7/3/2008.(Adelson, Robert) Modified on 6/17/2008 to link to dkt 154 (jm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 130 MOTION to Compel filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission. Replies due by 7/3/2008.(Adelson, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition by Christine Wilson re 130 MOTION to Compel filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission. Replies due by 6/30/2008.(Adelson, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 152 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None
Sealed Document Re: 150 Affidavit in Support of Motion,. (Bengoechea, Shane)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 151 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None
Sealed Document Re: 150 Affidavit in Support of Motion, Supplemental Affidavit Of Shane O. Bengoechea In Support Of Amended Motion For Order Compelling Disclosure Of Discovery And Sanctions And Supplemental Affidavit Of Shane O. Bengoechea In Support Of Motion To Continue Trial Date. (Bengoechea, Shane)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 133 MOTION to Continue Trial Date Supplemental Affidavit Of Shane O. Bengoechea In Support Of Amended Motion For Order Compelling Disclosure Of Discovery And Sanctions And Supplemental Affidavit Of Shane O. Bengoechea In Support Of Motion To Continue Trial Date filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The.(Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER re: GRANTED 133 MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part 120 MOTION Piercing of Corporate Veil re 119 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission, ( Jury Trial set for 8/25/2008 09:00 AM in Boise, ID before Judge Larry M. Boyle., Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2008 10:00 AM in Boise, ID before Judge Larry M. Boyle.) No further continuances of the trial will be allowed.. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 133 MOTION to Continue Trial Date Affidavit Of Erika Birch In Support Of Motion To Continue Trial Date And In Response to Plaintiffs' Opposition To Continue Trial Date filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Replies due by 6/23/2008.(Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 133 MOTION to Continue Trial Date Supplemental Affidavit Of Shane O. Bengoechea In Support Of Motion To Continue Trial Date And In Response To Plaintiffs' Opposition To Continuing Trial Date filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 133 MOTION to Continue Trial Date Defendant's Memorandum In Response To Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Opposition To Continuing Trial Date filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The.(Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 120 MOTION Piercing of Corporate Veil re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil MOTION Piercing of Corporate Veil re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil Memorandum In Support Of Bifurcation Of claims Re: Motion To Pierce The Corporate Veil filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The.(Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 120 MOTION Piercing of Corporate Veil re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil MOTION Piercing of Corporate Veil re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil Supplemental filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission.(Adelson, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER regarding deadlines set at hearing: (1) Simultaneous, supplemental briefing due on or before June 5, 2008 on the issue of whether a decision to pierce the corporate veil may be determined prior to a finding of liability; and (2) All outstanding and supplemental discovery due on or before June 6, 2008. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by kp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry M. Boyle: Motion Hearing held on 6/3/2008 re 133 MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The, 130 MOTION to Compel filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The, 120 MOTION Piercing of Corporate Veil re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil MOTION Piercing of Corporate Veil re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission. MOTIONS DEEMED UNDER ADVISEMENT, pending breifing. (Court Reporter Sherri O'Larey.) (lc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Support by Robert M. Adelson re 120 MOTION Piercing of Corporate Veil re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil MOTION Piercing of Corporate Veil re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil With Correct Exhibit filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission.(Adelson, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Support by Robert M. Adelson re 120 MOTION Piercing of Corporate Veil re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil MOTION Piercing of Corporate Veil re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission.(Adelson, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition by Robert M. Adelson re 133 MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission. Replies due by 6/16/2008.(Adelson, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 133 MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission. Replies due by 6/16/2008.(Adelson, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Mailed Via U.S. Mail hard-copy of Docket Text Order to Mr. Bengoechea/Refer to DOC>136. By L. Case. (lc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER re expedited briefing schedule applicable to 133 Motion to Continue Trial Date. Because the pre-trial conference is scheduled for July 1, 2008 (Docket No. 117), the briefing schedule applicable to this motion is expedited as follows: Plaintiffs shall file a response on or before Monday, June 2, 2008 and Defendant shall file a reply (if any) on or before Wednesday, June 4, 2008. The Court further requests that the Clerk of the Court send a copy of this Docket Entry Order to Mr. Bengoechea at the following address: 671 E. Riverpark Lane, Suite 130 Boise, Idaho 83706. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by kp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of James Dorsey filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The Affidavit Of James Dorsey In Support Of Motion To Continue Trial Date. (Bengoechea, Shane) Modified on 5/23/2008 to link to dkt #133 (jm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Shane O. Bengoechea filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The In Support Of Motion To Continue Trial Date. (Bengoechea, Shane) Modified on 5/23/2008 to link to dkt #133 (jm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Continue Trial Date Shane O Bengoechea appearing for Defendant Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Responses due by 6/16/2008 (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
AMENDED AFFIDAVIT of Shane O. Bengoechea filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The Amended Affidavit of Shane O. Bengoechea. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - G)(Bengoechea, Shane) Modified on 5/23/2008 to edit text and link to dkt #130. Exhibit sealed due to personal identifiers (jm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
AMENDED MEMORANDUM in Support filed by The Burrito Shoppe LLC, Amended Memorandum In Support Of Motion For Order Compelling Disclosure Of Discovery And Sanctions. (Bengoechea, Shane) Modified on 5/23/2008 to edit text and link to dkt #130 (jm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
AMENDED MOTION For Order Compelling Disclosure Of Discovery And Sanctions Shane O Bengoechea appearing for Defendant Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Responses due by 6/16/2008 (Bengoechea, Shane) Modified on 5/23/2008 to edit text (jm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Robert M. Adelson in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil re 120 Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission.(Adelson, Robert) Modified on 5/20/2008 to edit text and link to dkt #128 (jm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil re 120 Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission.(Adelson, Robert) Modified on 5/20/2008 to edit text (jm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission OF UNAVAILABILITY (Flores, Carmen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Audrey Powers re 120 MOTION Piercing of Corporate Veil re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission. (Olsen, Steven).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 119 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET TEXT NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 120 MOTION Piercing of Corporate Veil re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil MOTION Piercing of Corporate Veil re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil : Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2008 01:30 PM (MTN. TIME) at the Boise, IDAHO Federal Courthouse, 5th Floor, Courtroom #7 before Judge Larry M. Boyle. (lc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 120 MOTION Piercing of Corporate Veil re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil MOTION Piercing of Corporate Veil re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil Defendants Objection To Plaintiffs' Motion To Pierce The Corporate Veil filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Replies due by 5/19/2008.(Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil Defendant's Objection To Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To File Motion To Pierce The Corporate Veil filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Replies due by 5/19/2008.(Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Michael Adelson on behalf of Idaho Human Rights Commission (Adelson, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
MOTION Piercing of Corporate Veil re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil Steven L Olsen appearing for Intervenor Plaintiff Idaho Human Rights Commission. Responses due by 5/2/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit)(Olsen, Steven)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Pierce the Corporate Veil Steven L Olsen appearing for Intervenor Plaintiff Idaho Human Rights Commission. Responses due by 5/2/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Olsen, Steven)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission Unavailability of (Flores, Carmen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2008 10:00 AM in Boise, ID before Judge Larry M. Boyle. Jury Trial set for 7/14/2008 09:00 AM in Boise, ID before Judge Larry M. Boyle. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry M. Boyle: Scheduling Conference held on 3/3/2008, ( 7-day Jury Trial set for 7/14/2008 09:00 AM in Boise, ID before Judge Larry M. Boyle.). ORDER to follow. (Court Reporter Sherri O'Larey.) (lc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2008 11:45 AM (Mountain Time) in Boise Chambers before Judge Larry M. Boyle. Ms. Flores shall initiate the Conference Call to Chambers at (208) 334-1495. Parties shall be prepared to advise the Court the Status of the case and have calendars available to set this matter for Trial.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by lc, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE by Idaho Human Rights Commission of Service of Discovery Responses (Olsen, Steven)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting 112 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. For good cause shown, the parties' joint motion to extend the date of Mr. Dorsey's deposition from October 5, 2007 to November 6, 2007 is hereby granted. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery /Deposition of James Dorsey by Idaho Human Rights Commission. Responses due by 11/5/2007 (Olsen, Steven)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L Olsen on behalf of Idaho Human Rights Commission (Olsen, Steven)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. Consistent with the Court's written Order (Docket No. 109), counsel for the City of Nampa Police Department is directed to collect the original documents and discs delivered to the Court for in camera review pursuant to the Court's Order of August 6, 2007 (Docket No. 108). Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that NPD is to produce by 8/21/07 all of the material delivered to this Court pursuant to order 108 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Order on Motion for Disclosure, Order on Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by wm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 86 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery- Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by 9/10/07; granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion for Disclosure; granting in part and denying in part 94 Motion for Order Compelling Disclosures or Discovery and Sanctions. Plaintiffs must respond to written discovery and make Audrey Powers available for deposition by 9/10/07. No sanctions will be awarded. The Nampa Police Dept, a non-party to the instant lawsuit, is directed to produce to Plaintiffs by 8/10/07, all records identified by the NPD as responsive to the IHRC Subpoena and this Court's Order of 5/17/07 provided that such records are not subject to defs' objection.The NPD, is directed to produce in camera to the Court by 8/10/07, all records identified by the NPD as responsive to the IHRC Subpoena and this Court's Order of 5/17/07 that are subject to defs' objection. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by ja, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry M. Boyle : Motion Hearing held on 8/6/2007 re 92 MOTION for Disclosure Motion To Limit Disclosure Of Records, Documents And Things Pursuant To Protective Order And Order filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The, 94 MOTION for Sanctions Motion For Order Compelling Disclosure Or Discovery And Sanctions filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The, 86 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (certain discovery matters) filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Idaho Human Rights Commission, Motions terminated:. COURT TO ENTER ORDER ON TODAY'S HEARING.(Court Reporter Vicki Jones.) (lc, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT re 104 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The Affidavit Of James Dorsey In Support Of Reply Memorandum To Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Response To Defendants' Motion To Limit Disclosure Of Records, Documents And Things (Docket #99). (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Shane O. Bengoechea re 104 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The Affidavit Of Shane O. Bengoechea In Support Of Reply Memorandum In Response To Defendants' Motion To Limit Disclosure of Records, Documents And Things (Docket #99). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H)(Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 92 MOTION for Disclosure Motion To Limit Disclosure Of Records, Documents And Things Pursuant To Protective Order And Order Reply Memorandum To Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Response To Defendants' Motion To Limit Disclosure Of Records, Documents And Things (Docket #99) filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL (Flores, Carmen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
DOCKET TEXT NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 92 MOTION for Disclosure Motion To Limit Disclosure Of Records, Documents And Things Pursuant To Protective Order And Order, 94 MOTION for Sanctions Motion For Order Compelling Disclosure Or Discovery And Sanctions, 86 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (certain discovery matters) : Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2007 10:30 AM (Mtn. Time) in Boise, ID before Honorable Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by lc, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Shane O. Bengoechea re 97 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The Affidavit Of Shane O. Bengoechea In Support of Response To Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion To Extend (Dkt. #86) and Memorandum In Opposition To Motion To Compel (Dkt. #94). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit)(Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE re 97 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The Response To Plaintiffs' Reoply Memorandum In Support Of Motion To Extend (Dkt. #86) and Memorandum In Opposition To Motion To Compel (Dkt., #94). (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 92 MOTION for Disclosure Motion To Limit Disclosure Of Records, Documents And Things Pursuant To Protective Order And Order filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Replies due by 7/23/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Director Goddard# 2 Exhibit B, Deposition of James Dorsey# 3 Exhibit C, Deposition of Joseph Belanger# 4 Exhibit D, Deposition of Juan Quintana# 5 Exhibit E, Deposition of Pamela Parks)(Bowen, Jo-Ann)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 94 MOTION for Sanctions Motion For Order Compelling Disclosure Or Discovery And Sanctions **SAME AS DOCKET # 97** filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Counsel, Jo-Ann Bowen# 2 Exhibit A - Dorsey deposition# 3 Exhibit B - Korn deposition# 4 Exhibit C - Quintana deposition# 5 Exhibit D - Muchow deposition# 6 Exhibit E - Email correspondence# 7 Affidavit of Counsel, Michael Moore)(Bowen, Jo-Ann)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 86 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (certain discovery matters) filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Counsel, Jo-Ann Bowen# 2 Exhibit A - Dorsey deposition# 3 Exhibit B - Korn deposition# 4 Exhibit C - Quintana deposition# 5 Exhibit D - Muchow deposition# 6 Exhibit E - Email correspondence# 7 Affidavit of Counsel, Michael Moore)(Bowen, Jo-Ann)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 94 MOTION for Sanctions Motion For Order Compelling Disclosure Or Discovery And Sanctions Affidavit of Shane O. Bengoechea filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit)(Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 94 MOTION for Sanctions Motion For Order Compelling Disclosure Or Discovery And Sanctions filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit)(Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None Motion for Sanctions
MOTION for Sanctions Motion For Order Compelling Disclosure Or Discovery And Sanctions by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Responses due by 7/9/2007 (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Shane O. Bengoechea filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The In Support Of Motion To Limit Disclosure Of Records, Documents And Things Pursuant To Protective Order And Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit)(Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Disclosure Motion To Limit Disclosure Of Records, Documents And Things Pursuant To Protective Order And Order by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Responses due by 7/5/2007 (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Shane O. Bengoechea re 90 Response to Motion, filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The Affidavit of Shane O. Bengechea In Support Of Defendants' Response To Plaintiffs' Motion To Extend The Discovery Deadline For Certain Discovery Matters. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit)(Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 86 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (certain discovery matters) Defendants' ResponseTo Plaintiffs' Motion To Extend The Discovery Deadline For Certain Discovery Matters filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Replies due by 6/25/2007. (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney John Freeman Stanley and Carmen Flores for Equal Employment Opportunity Commission added. Attorney Kathryn Olson terminated. (Flores, Carmen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by ja, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 77 Motion for Protective Order; granting 77 Motion to Quash; finding as moot 84 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by ja, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (certain discovery matters) by Idaho Human Rights Commission, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Responses due by 6/7/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Bowen, Jo-Ann)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 84 MOTION to Strike 81 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Affidavit Of Counsel Jo-Ann L. Bowen Memorandum In Support Of Motion To Strike filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Strike 81 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Affidavit Of Counsel Jo-Ann L. Bowen by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Responses due by 5/25/2007 (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None
Expert Witness Disclosure filed by Defendant Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 77 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and Motion for Protective Order filed by Nampa Police Department. (Moore, Michael)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 77 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission. Replies due by 4/30/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Counsel, Jo-Ann L. Bowen# 2 Exhibit A to Affidavit)(Bowen, Jo-Ann)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Response re 77 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and Motion for Protective Order filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Replies due by 4/26/2007. (Bengoechea, Shane) .
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The Notice To Withdraw Defendants' Motion To Require Depositions To Be Taken In Boise, Idaho (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Quash Subpoena and Motion for Protective Order by Nampa Police Department. Responses due by 4/16/2007 (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Moore, Michael) Modified on 3/23/2007 to edit text (ja, ).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The Affidavit Of Shane O. Bengoechea In Support Of Motion To Require Depositions To Be Taken In Boise, Idaho. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit)(Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The Affidavit Of James Dorsey In Support Of Motion To Require Depositions To Be Taken In Boise, Idaho. (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
MOTION re 72 MOTION by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Responses due by 3/19/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit)(Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
MOTION by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Responses due by 3/19/2007 (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to require depositions to be taken in Boise, Idaho by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Responses due by 3/19/2007 (Bengoechea, Shane) Modified on 2/26/2007 to edit text (ja).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry M. Boyle : Status Conference held on 1/31/2007. Pltff.'s Oral Motion to Extend Dead-lines: GRANTED. (Court Reporter Vicki Jones.) (lc, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 61 Telephone status conference held 1/31/07. Amended Pleadings due by 3/12/2007. Discovery due by 5/15/2007. Joinder of Parties due by 3/12/2007. Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2007. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by ja, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/31/2007 01:00 PM in Boise, ID before Honorable Larry M. Boyle. (Bowen, Jo-Ann)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of TELEPHONE Hearing: Status Conference set for 2/12/2007 11:00 AM (Mtn. Time)in Boise, ID before Honorable Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by lc, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mikel H. Williams : Settlement Conference held on 11/28/2006. This case did not settle however parties continue negotiations and will notify the Court. (al, ) (Entered: 12/04/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER re 65 Notice of Hearing, Shall take place on Tuesday 11/28/06 @9:30am. Signed by Judge Mikel H. Williams. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jg, ) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 11/28/2006 09:30 AM in Boise, ID before Honorable Mikel H. Williams. Settlement Conference Order forthcoming. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by al, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None
Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint Of Plaintiff By Intervention And Demand For Jury Trial by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The.(Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint Jury Trial Demand by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The.(Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: None
Amended SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Allied Foodservice Inc, Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. (ja, ) (Entered: 10/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Flores, Carmen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT Jury Trial Demand against all defendants, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Amended Summons in a Civil Action)(Flores, Carmen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allied Foodservice Inc. dba Squeezers, filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission.(Bowen, Jo-Ann)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 43 Motion to Amend Complaints and Join Second Defendant. Plaintiffs shall serve and file their amended complaints by 9/15/06. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by ja, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 37 Motion to Dismiss or in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, denying 38 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer . Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by ja, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 43 First MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPLAINTS AND JOIN SECOND DEFENDANT filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Bowen, Jo-Ann)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 43 First MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPLAINTS AND JOIN SECOND DEFENDANT Defendant's Objection To Plaintiffs Motion To Amend Complaints And Join Second Defendant filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Replies due by 6/1/2006. (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 43 First MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPLAINTS AND JOIN SECOND DEFENDANT Defendant's Objection To Plaintiffs Motion To Amend Complaints And Join Second Defendant filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 38 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests of Documents Response To Plaintiff's Memorandum In Opposition filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 38 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests of Documents Response To Plaintiff's Memorandum In Opposition To Defendant's Motion For Enlargement Of Time filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Replies due by 5/26/2006. (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition by Shane O. Bengoechea re 38 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests of Documents Affidavit of Shane O. Bengoechea In Support Of Response To Plaintiff's Memorandum In Opposition To Defendant's Motion For Enlargement Of Time filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Replies due by 5/26/2006. (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 38 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests of Documents Affidavit of James Dorsey In Support Of Response To Plaintiff's Memorandum In Opposition To Defendant's Motion For Enlargement Of Time filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Replies due by 5/26/2006. (Bengoechea, Shane) Modified on 5/15/2006 to edit(ja, ).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of James Dorsey re 41 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 37 First MOTION to Dismiss Or In The Alternative Motion For Summary Judgment, 43 First MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPLAINTS AND JOIN SECOND DEFENDANT Defendant's Response To Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Dismiss, F.R.C.P, Rule 12(b)(6) Or In The Alternative Motion For Summary Judgment, F.R.C.P. Rule 56 And Objection To Plaintiffs' Motion For F.R.C.P. 56(f) Continuance filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 38 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests of Documents Response To Plaintiff's Memorandum In Opposition To Defendant's Motion For Enlargement Of Time filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Support by James Dorsey re 38 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests of Documents Affidavit of James Dorsey In Support Of Response To Plaintiff's Memorandum In Opposition To Defendant's Motion For Enlargement Of Time filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 38 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests of Documents Affidavit of Shane O. Bengoechea In Support Of Response To Plaintiff's Memorandum In Opposition To Defendant's Motion For Enlargement Of Time filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Take notice the settlement conference is hereby vacated. Counsel to contact the court for a new conference date following the decision on the motion to amend (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by al, ) Modified on 5/5/2006 to add docket text (al, ).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None
First MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPLAINTS AND JOIN SECOND DEFENDANT by Idaho Human Rights Commission, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Responses due by 5/22/2006 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support # 2 EEOC'S AMENDED COMPLAINT# 3 IDAHO HUMAN RIGHTS' AMENDED COMPLAINT# 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Flores, Carmen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 37 First MOTION to Dismiss Or In The Alternative Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Replies due by 5/11/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Flores, Carmen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 38 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests of Documents filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Replies due by 5/11/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Flores, Carmen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The Affidavit of David W. Hammons. (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM/BRIEF filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The Memorandum In Support To Defendant's Motion To Dismiss Or In The Alternative Motion For Summary Judgment. (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: None
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests of Documents by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Responses due by 4/27/2006 (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: None
First MOTION to Dismiss Or In The Alternative Motion For Summary Judgment by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Responses due by 4/27/2006 (Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Idaho Human Rights Commission. Burrito Shoppe LLC, The waiver sent on 2/2/2006, answer due 4/3/2006. (jg, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: None
Defendant's ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint of Plaintiff by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. (Attachments: # 1)(Bengoechea, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REFERRING to Magistrate Judge Mikel H. Williams for Settlement Amended Pleadings due by 5/13/2006. Discovery due by 6/30/2006. Motions due by 8/30/2006.. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dkh, ) (Entered: 02/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry M. Boyle : Scheduling Conference held on 2/14/2006. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter P. Fulwyler.) (al, ) (Entered: 02/15/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: None
STIPULATION Litigation Plan by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Flores, Carmen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET TEXT ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: This Hearing shall be a Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 2/14/2006 01:30 PM ( Mountain Time) in Boise, ID before Honorable Larry M. Boyle. Ms. Flores shall initiate the Conference Call with all parties on the line to Judge Boyle's Chambers at (208) 334-1495. Parties shall review the previously entered Litigation Plan (Doc. 19) and may amend should those proposed dates be out-dated. Counsel shall submit a new one no later than Feburary 10, 2006, if necessary and use the correct Form- Refer to Doc. 4.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by lc, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None
ERRATA by Intervenor Plaintiff Idaho Human Rights Commission Signed Complaint filed to replace unsigned attachment to Motion to Intervene. (Bowen, Jo-Ann)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: None
Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission.(ja) (Entered: 02/01/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 3 Motion to Intervene, denying 5 Motion to Strike and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings . Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by ja, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: None
STIPULATION Regarding Pending Motions (docket numbers 3 and 5) by Idaho Human Rights Commission. (Bowen, Jo-Ann)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing on Motions 5 First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, 3 MOTION to Intervene: Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2006 01:30 PM (Mtn. Time) in Boise, ID before Honorable Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by lc, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET TEXT NOTICE of Hearing (no attachment): A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 2/2/2006 10:45 AM (Mountain Time) in Boise, ID before Honorable Larry M. Boyle. Ms. Flores shall initiate the Conference Call with all parties on the line to Judge Boyle's Chambers at(208)334-1495.Note: Parties shall review Doc.19 (stipulated Litigation Plan to determine if dates need adjusted; as it was filed in November). Should the parties file a more up-dated Lit Plan, they shall use the form provided in Doc. 4 and this shall be filed by 1/26/06. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by lc, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: None
ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (ja) (Entered: 01/04/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: None
CONSENT filed. (dkh, ) (Entered: 12/22/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Idaho Human Rights Commission, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Burrito Shoppe LLC, The re 1 Complaint (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jlg, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of unavailable dates by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (dkh, ) (Entered: 11/10/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint by The Burrito Shoppe LLC.(ja, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: None
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Flores, Carmen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Carmen Flores on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Flores, Carmen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: None
CONSENT filed. (ja, ) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE TO WITHDRAW Motion to Strike 12(f) and Motion for judgment on the pleadings 12(b)(2), (4) and (5) re: 8 filed by defendant (ja, ) (Entered: 10/27/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 5 First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (second memorandum) filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Leslie R. Goddard# 2 Exhibit attachment to the Affidavit of Leslie R. Goddard (sealed due to personal identifiers) # 3 Exhibit attachment to the Affidavit of Leslie R. Goddard)(Bowen, Jo-Ann) Modified on 10/31/2005 to seal exhibit attachment (ja, ).
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSIVE MEMORANDUM to Idaho Human Rights Commission's Memorandum in opposition to def's Motion to Strike and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 12(b)(2), (4) and (5) re 5 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Shane O. Bengoechea)(ja, ) (Entered: 10/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Idaho Human Rights Commission, The Burrito Shoppe LLC (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by ja, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: None
CONSENT filed. (ja, ) (Entered: 10/14/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: None
DECLARATION OF Attempted Service of Summons in a civil Action; Complaint- Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Burrito Shoppe LLC. (ja, ) (Entered: 10/12/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- as to Burrito Shoppe LLC. Corporate service served on def 9/21/2005, answer due 10/11/2005. (ja, ) (Entered: 10/12/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 5 First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Idaho Human Rights Commission. (Bowen, Jo-Ann)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to strike 12(f) and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 12(b)(2),(4) and (5) by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Responses due by 10/31/2005 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support # 2 Affidavit of Shane O. Bengoechea)(ja, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 5 First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Strike filed by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. (Christian, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None
First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Memorandum in Support by Burrito Shoppe LLC, The. Responses due by 10/14/2005 (Christian, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None
MOTION TO STRIKE 12(f) AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings 12(b)(2), (4) and (5) by The Burrito Shoppe LLC. Responses due by 10/14/2005 (Christian, Ronald) Modified on 9/21/2005 to edit text (ja, ).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re: scheduling conference. The parties shall confer and discuss the items contained in the Litigation Plan within 60 days of the date of this Order . Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by ja, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to Intervene by Idaho Human Rights Commission. Responses due by 9/19/2005 (Attachments: # 1 pleading setting forth claim for which intervention is sought# 2 Memorandum in Support)(Bowen, Jo-Ann)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Equal Employment Opportunity Commission re 1 Complaint (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by ja, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Burrito Shoppe LLC, The Summons Issued, Jury trial demand, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet)(ja, ) (Entered: 08/22/2005)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 86 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?