Jamie Meyers v. Michael Lamer
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 13-1438

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 28, 2016 at 12:47 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4350 - Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle
  Entries (99) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
Mandate issued. Referencing: [38] Judgment Order , [37] Published Authored Opinion. Originating case number: 1:11-cv-03507-SAG.. [13-1438] (RW)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: 13-1438 opn.p.arg. Decision: Vacated and remanded. Originating case number: 1:11-cv-03507-SAG. Entered on Docket Date: 02/25/2014. [999303070] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency.. [13-1438] (RW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
      PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 1:11-cv-03507-SAG. [999303066]. [13-1438] (RW)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
        ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellees Carroll County Foods, LLC and Michael Eugene Lamer. Counsel arguing: Brian Goodman Answering argument time: 20 [999221550] [13-1438] Robert Campbell
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
          ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellant Jamie Meyers. Counsel arguing: Paul Bekman Emily Malarkey Opening argument time: 15 Rebuttal argument time: 5 [999221384] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
            CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 12/10/2013. Registration Time: 8:45 - 9:00 am. Daily Arguments Begin: 9:30 am. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 5 days. [13-1438] (JLE)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
              CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 12/10/13 - 12/12/13 argument session. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 10/07/2013 [13-1438] (JLC)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                BRIEF by Appellant Jamie Meyers in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Reply. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 08/23/2013. [999179603] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                        FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Jamie Meyers. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 06/21/2013. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Not applicable. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999134901] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23
                          FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Jamie Meyers. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 06/21/2013. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Not applicable. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999134901] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Blank 22 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                            BRIEF by Appellant Jamie Meyers in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 06/21/2013. [999134844] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                              LREF
                              Blank 22
                              BRIEF by Appellant Jamie Meyers in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 06/21/2013. [999134844] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                ORDER filed [999117846] denying Motion to supplement record [16] Copies to all parties.. [13-1438] (RW)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21
                                  ORDER filed [999117846] denying Motion to supplement record [16] Copies to all parties.. [13-1438] (RW)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21
                                    ORDER filed [999117846] denying Motion to supplement record [16] Copies to all parties.. [13-1438] (RW)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21
                                      ORDER filed [999117846] denying Motion to supplement record [16] Copies to all parties.. [13-1438] (RW)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                        ORDER filed [999117843] granting Motion to extend filing time [18], updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/21/2013. Response brief due 07/26/2013 Copies to all parties.. [13-1438] (RW)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20
                                          ORDER filed [999117843] granting Motion to extend filing time [18], updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/21/2013. Response brief due 07/26/2013 Copies to all parties.. [13-1438] (RW)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20
                                            ORDER filed [999117843] granting Motion to extend filing time [18], updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/21/2013. Response brief due 07/26/2013 Copies to all parties.. [13-1438] (RW)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20
                                              ORDER filed [999117843] granting Motion to extend filing time [18], updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/21/2013. Response brief due 07/26/2013 Copies to all parties.. [13-1438] (RW)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                RESPONSE/ANSWER by Carroll County Foods, LLC and Michael Eugene Lamer to notice requesting response [17], Motion to supplement [16]. Nature of response: in opposition. [13-1438] Robert Campbell
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
                                                  RESPONSE/ANSWER by Carroll County Foods, LLC and Michael Eugene Lamer to notice requesting response [17], Motion to supplement [16]. Nature of response: in opposition. [13-1438] Robert Campbell
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
                                                    RESPONSE/ANSWER by Carroll County Foods, LLC and Michael Eugene Lamer to notice requesting response [17], Motion to supplement [16]. Nature of response: in opposition. [13-1438] Robert Campbell
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
                                                      RESPONSE/ANSWER by Carroll County Foods, LLC and Michael Eugene Lamer to notice requesting response [17], Motion to supplement [16]. Nature of response: in opposition. [13-1438] Robert Campbell
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION by to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix. Date and method of service: 05/29/2013 ecf. [999117572] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
                                                          MOTION by to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix. Date and method of service: 05/29/2013 ecf. [999117572] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
                                                            MOTION by to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix. Date and method of service: 05/29/2013 ecf. [999117572] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
                                                              MOTION by to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix. Date and method of service: 05/29/2013 ecf. [999117572] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. Robert St. John Campbell for Michael Eugene Lamer and Carroll County Foods, LLC and Mr. Brian S. Goodman for Michael Eugene Lamer and Carroll County Foods, LLC requesting response to Motion to supplement [16]Response due: 05/31/2013.[999112295].. [13-1438] (RW)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17
                                                                  NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. Robert St. John Campbell for Michael Eugene Lamer and Carroll County Foods, LLC and Mr. Brian S. Goodman for Michael Eugene Lamer and Carroll County Foods, LLC requesting response to Motion to supplement [16]Response due: 05/31/2013.[999112295].. [13-1438] (RW)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17
                                                                    NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. Robert St. John Campbell for Michael Eugene Lamer and Carroll County Foods, LLC and Mr. Brian S. Goodman for Michael Eugene Lamer and Carroll County Foods, LLC requesting response to Motion to supplement [16]Response due: 05/31/2013.[999112295].. [13-1438] (RW)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17
                                                                      NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. Robert St. John Campbell for Michael Eugene Lamer and Carroll County Foods, LLC and Mr. Brian S. Goodman for Michael Eugene Lamer and Carroll County Foods, LLC requesting response to Motion to supplement [16]Response due: 05/31/2013.[999112295].. [13-1438] (RW)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION by Appellant Jamie Meyers to supplement record. Date and method of service: 05/21/2013 ecf. [999112254] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                                                          MOTION by Appellant Jamie Meyers to supplement record. Date and method of service: 05/21/2013 ecf. [999112254] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                                                            MOTION by Appellant Jamie Meyers to supplement record. Date and method of service: 05/21/2013 ecf. [999112254] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                                                              MOTION by Appellant Jamie Meyers to supplement record. Date and method of service: 05/21/2013 ecf. [999112254] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                ORDER filed [999102328] granting Motion to extend filing time [14], updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/03/2013. Response brief due 07/08/2013 Copies to all parties.. [13-1438] (RW)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
                                                                                  ORDER filed [999102328] granting Motion to extend filing time [14], updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/03/2013. Response brief due 07/08/2013 Copies to all parties.. [13-1438] (RW)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
                                                                                    ORDER filed [999102328] granting Motion to extend filing time [14], updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/03/2013. Response brief due 07/08/2013 Copies to all parties.. [13-1438] (RW)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
                                                                                      ORDER filed [999102328] granting Motion to extend filing time [14], updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/03/2013. Response brief due 07/08/2013 Copies to all parties.. [13-1438] (RW)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        CONSENT/STIPULATION by Appellant Jamie Meyers to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until 06/03/13 [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                                                                          CONSENT/STIPULATION by Appellant Jamie Meyers to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until 06/03/13 [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                                                                            CONSENT/STIPULATION by Appellant Jamie Meyers to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until 06/03/13 [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                                                                              CONSENT/STIPULATION by Appellant Jamie Meyers to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until 06/03/13 [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                Mediation conference data modified. [13-1438] (SLW)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 13
                                                                                                  Mediation conference data modified. [13-1438] (SLW)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 13
                                                                                                    Mediation conference data modified. [13-1438] (SLW)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 13
                                                                                                      Mediation conference data modified. [13-1438] (SLW)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1438] (SLW)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                                                                          Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1438] (SLW)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                                                                            Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1438] (SLW)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                                                                              Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1438] (SLW)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Michael Eugene Lamer. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999080470] [13-1438] Robert Campbell
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                                                                                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Michael Eugene Lamer. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999080470] [13-1438] Robert Campbell
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                                                                                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Michael Eugene Lamer. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999080470] [13-1438] Robert Campbell
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 11
                                                                                                                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Michael Eugene Lamer. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999080470] [13-1438] Robert Campbell
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Carroll County Foods, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999080379] [13-1438] Robert Campbell
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10
                                                                                                                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Carroll County Foods, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999080379] [13-1438] Robert Campbell
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10
                                                                                                                            DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Carroll County Foods, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999080379] [13-1438] Robert Campbell
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 10
                                                                                                                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Carroll County Foods, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999080379] [13-1438] Robert Campbell
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Jamie Meyers. [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9
                                                                                                                                  DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Jamie Meyers. [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9
                                                                                                                                    DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Jamie Meyers. [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9
                                                                                                                                      DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Jamie Meyers. [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Jamie Meyers. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999080063] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8
                                                                                                                                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Jamie Meyers. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999080063] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8
                                                                                                                                            DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Jamie Meyers. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999080063] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8
                                                                                                                                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Jamie Meyers. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999080063] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Paul D. Bekman for Jamie Meyers.[999080059] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7
                                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Paul D. Bekman for Jamie Meyers.[999080059] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7
                                                                                                                                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Paul D. Bekman for Jamie Meyers.[999080059] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7
                                                                                                                                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Paul D. Bekman for Jamie Meyers.[999080059] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Emily C. Malarkey for Jamie Meyers.[999080056] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6
                                                                                                                                                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Emily C. Malarkey for Jamie Meyers.[999080056] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6
                                                                                                                                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Emily C. Malarkey for Jamie Meyers.[999080056] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6
                                                                                                                                                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Emily C. Malarkey for Jamie Meyers.[999080056] [13-1438] Emily Malarkey
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Brian S. Goodman for Carroll County Foods, LLC and Michael Eugene Lamer.[999079629] [13-1438] Robert Campbell
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5
                                                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Brian S. Goodman for Carroll County Foods, LLC and Michael Eugene Lamer.[999079629] [13-1438] Robert Campbell
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5
                                                                                                                                                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Brian S. Goodman for Carroll County Foods, LLC and Michael Eugene Lamer.[999079629] [13-1438] Robert Campbell
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5
                                                                                                                                                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Brian S. Goodman for Carroll County Foods, LLC and Michael Eugene Lamer.[999079629] [13-1438] Robert Campbell
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Robert S. Campbell for Carroll County Foods, LLC and Michael Eugene Lamer.[999079627] [13-1438] Robert Campbell
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4
                                                                                                                                                                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Robert S. Campbell for Carroll County Foods, LLC and Michael Eugene Lamer.[999079627] [13-1438] Robert Campbell
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4
                                                                                                                                                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Robert S. Campbell for Carroll County Foods, LLC and Michael Eugene Lamer.[999079627] [13-1438] Robert Campbell
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4
                                                                                                                                                                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Robert S. Campbell for Carroll County Foods, LLC and Michael Eugene Lamer.[999079627] [13-1438] Robert Campbell
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: James Gentry and Brian Goodman. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/13/2013. Response Brief due 06/17/2013 [13-1438] (RW)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3
                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: James Gentry and Brian Goodman. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/13/2013. Response Brief due 06/17/2013 [13-1438] (RW)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3
                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: James Gentry and Brian Goodman. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/13/2013. Response Brief due 06/17/2013 [13-1438] (RW)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3
                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: James Gentry and Brian Goodman. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/13/2013. Response Brief due 06/17/2013 [13-1438] (RW)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:11-cv-03507-SAG.. [13-1438] (RW)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2
                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:11-cv-03507-SAG.. [13-1438] (RW)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2
                                                                                                                                                                                            DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:11-cv-03507-SAG.. [13-1438] (RW)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2
                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:11-cv-03507-SAG.. [13-1438] (RW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:11-cv-03507-SAG. Case manager: RWarren. [13-1438] (RW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:11-cv-03507-SAG. Case manager: RWarren. [13-1438] (RW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:11-cv-03507-SAG. Case manager: RWarren. [13-1438] (RW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:11-cv-03507-SAG. Case manager: RWarren. [13-1438] (RW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 141 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?