Smartflash LLC et al v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00448
District Judge Michael H. Schneider, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 12, 2019 at 4:45 PM DT (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Smartflash LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Caldwell Cassady Curry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley Wayne Caldwell +1 214 593 7129 bcaldwell@caldwellcc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Dodd Cassady +1 214 810 4705 +1 214 481 1757 jcassady@cassadycurry.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Austin Curry +1 214 810 4705 +1 214 481 1757 acurry@cassadycurry.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hamad M Hamad +1 214 810 4705 +1 214 481 1757 hhamad@caldwellcc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R Pearson +1 214 810 4705 +1 214 481 1757 dpearson@caldwellcc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T John Ward +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 tjw@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Smartflash Technologies Ltd., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Smartflash Technologies Limited"
No Logo Exedea Inc, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Game Circus LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo HTC America Inc, Counter-Claimant
No Logo HTC Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd."
No Logo Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo David Keyzer, Technical Advisor

Toggle Switch Represented by 5170 Golden Foothill Parkway

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Michael Keyzer +1 916 243 5259 +1 916 404 0436 david@keyzerlaw.com
No Logo Honorable Robert Faulkner, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by JAMS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W Faulkner +1 214 744 5267 +1 214 720 6010 rfaulkner@jamsadr.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (607) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Bill of Costs
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Bill of Costs
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Judgment
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None USCA Judgment
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Pretrial Conference held on 7/7/2015. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (leh, ) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Order Staying Case
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Sealed Transcript
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 7/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 526 Opposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INCREASE THE LIMIT FOR EXHIBIT DESIGNATIONS filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kevin A. Smith, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin) (Entered: 07/05/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 7/4/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 7/3/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 521 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration re 396 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, by Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dr. Andrew Wolfe, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaericher, Jordan) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 6/14/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Expedite
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION to Expedite AGREED MOTION FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CLARIFY PROTECTIVE ORDER by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Opposed MOTION Motion to Clarify Protective Order by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Austin Curry, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Expedite
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 2/1/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 468 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Robert Mills by Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Smith Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court ADOPTS the above claim construction for the patents-in-suit. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/26/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 1/25/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Sealed Document DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(1) SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITEDS AND SMARTFLASH LLCS PATENT INFRINGEMENT CLAIMS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Christopher A. Mathews, # 2 Exhibit AA, # 3 Exhibit BB)(Chen, Howard) Modified on 1/23/2015 (sm, ). (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposed MOTION LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(1) SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITEDS AND SMARTFLASH LLCS PATENT INFRINGEMENT CLAIMS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Howard) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 460 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - DEFENDANTS' CORRECTED OBJECTIONS TO THE MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION [DKT. 434] REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING INVALIDITY [DKT. 325]. (Holmes, Andrew) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File CORRECTED OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING INVALIDITY by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holmes, Andrew) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 458 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Sealed Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 453 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Portion of Transcript (CONT) of Dispositive Motions Hearing before the Honorable Nicole K. Mitchell, United States Magistrate Judge, on 12/2/2014. (tlh, ) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Sealed Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 452 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Portion of Transcript of Dispositive Motions Hearing before the Honorable Nicole K. Mitchell, United States Magistrate Judge, on 12/2/2014. (tlh, ) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL UNSEALED TRANSCRIPT of Dispositive Motion Proceedings held on 12/2/2014 before Judge Nicole K. Mitchell. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jill E. McFadden,Telephone number: (903) 530-3163. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2015. (tlh, ) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/6/2015. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheets) (leh, ) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 1/4/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 1/2/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 1/2/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 427 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 420 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS IN LIMINE filed by Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Howard Chen, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y)(Chen, Howard) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITEDS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS USE OF CERTAIN WITNESSES IDENTIFIED UNDER FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26(a)(3)(A)(i) (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 412 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST, EXHIBITS AH-AI TO PRE-TRIAL ORDER (Chen, Howard) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Claim Construction Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Exedea, Inc., Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Dr. Benjamin Goldberg and Exhibits A - F, # 2 Affidavit of Dr. George T. Ligler and Exhibits A - F)(Botzenhart, Adam) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 12/4/2014 re 318 SEALED Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of No Willful And No Indirect Infringement; 328 Opposed SEALED SMARTFLASH'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF DR. REIBSTEIN, DR. UGONE, AND MR. NAPPER; 323 SEALED DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING INDEFINITENESS; 325 SEALED DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. §§ 102, 103, 316 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (leh, ) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Court adopts 274 Report and Recommendations as the findings and conclusions of this Court; overrules 303 and 304 Objections to the Report and Recommendations; denies 177 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/04/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 12/2/2014 re 320 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Section 101; 363 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO ENFORCE COMPLIANCE WITH O2 MICRO, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO RESOLVE MANUFACTURED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DISPUTES THAT DEFENDANTS INTEND TO ARGUE TO THE JURY; 329 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE ROBERT MILLS EXPERT OPINION TESTIMONY PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF EVIDENCE 403 AND 702; 331 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINION TESTIMONY FROM PLAINTIFFS TECHNICAL EXPERT DR. MARK JONES; 330 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINION TESTIMONY RELATED TO SURVEYS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF EVIDENCE 403 AND 702. Dispositive/Daubert Motion Hearing continued to 12/4/2014 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (leh, ) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 386 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 331 Opposed SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINION TESTIMONY FROM PLAINTIFFS TECHNICAL EXPERT DR. MARK JONES filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 374 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document. DEFENDANTS PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (Holmes, Andrew) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 361 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 329 Opposed SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE ROBERT MILLS EXPERT OPINION TESTIMONY PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF EVIDENCE 403 AND 702 filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Howard Chen, # 2 Exhibit T, # 3 Exhibit U, # 4 Exhibit V, # 5 Exhibit W, # 6 Exhibit X)(Chen, Howard) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 343 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 318 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of No Willful And No Indirect Infringement filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher S. Stewart, # 2 Declaration of Patrick S. Racz, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Declaration of Mark T. Jones, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 333 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to complete the second mediation between Smartflash and Game Circus is herebyextended to 11-12-2014. Parties shall submit an amended docket control order reflecting this change within five business days. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/03/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 10/25/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 325 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. §§ 102, 103 by Exedea, Inc., Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dr. Andrew Wolfe, Ph.D., # 2 Declaration of Anthony Wechselberger, # 3 Declaration Andrew Holmes, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D (Part 1), # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Text of Proposed Order, # 12 Exhibit D (Part 2))(Holmes, Andrew) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 10/25/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE*** SEALED MOTION To Exclude Mills by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Reibstein Declaration and Exhibits, # 2 Affidavit Chen Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F1, # 9 Exhibit F2, # 10 Exhibit F3, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N, # 19 Exhibit O, # 20 Exhibit P, # 21 Exhibit Q, # 22 Exhibit R, # 23 Exhibit S, # 24 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Howard) Modified on 10/27/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 10/25/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 323 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING INDEFINITENESS by Exedea, Inc., Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew M. Holmes, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Holmes, Andrew) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 10/25/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 322 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT by Exedea, Inc., Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dr. Benjamin Goldberg, # 2 Declaration of Andrew M. Holmes, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Holmes, Andrew) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 10/25/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINION TESTIMONY RELATED TO SURVEYS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF EVIDENCE 403 AND 702 by Exedea, Inc., Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Reibstein, # 2 Declaration of Howard Chen, # 3 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 5), # 4 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 5), # 5 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 5), # 6 Exhibit A (Part 4 of 5), # 7 Exhibit A (Part 5 of 5), # 8 Exhibit B, # 9 Exhibit C, # 10 Exhibit D, # 11 Exhibit E, # 12 Exhibit F, # 13 Exhibit G, # 14 Exhibit H, # 15 Exhibit I, # 16 Exhibit J, # 17 Exhibit K, # 18 Exhibit L, # 19 Exhibit M, # 20 Exhibit N, # 21 Exhibit O, # 22 Exhibit P, # 23 Exhibit Q, # 24 Exhibit R, # 25 Exhibit S, # 26 Exhibit T, # 27 Exhibit U, # 28 Exhibit V, # 29 Exhibit W, # 30 Exhibit X, # 31 Exhibit Y, # 32 Exhibit Z, # 33 Exhibit AA, # 34 Exhibit BB, # 35 Exhibit CC, # 36 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Howard) Modified on 10/27/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION to 274 Report and Recommendations DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS [DKT. 274] DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INDEFINITENESS [DKT. 177] by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Holmes, Andrew) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 286 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/07/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Hotline Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 274
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 271 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 232 MOTION to Amend/Correct PATENT RULE 3-3 INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS filed by Exedea, Inc., Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Exhibit G)(Holmes, Andrew) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 9/13/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 9/4/2014 re 236 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Strike filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Exedea, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (leh, ) (Main Document 250 replaced on 9/11/2014) (leh, ). (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/02/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 231 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/02/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 8/31/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 8/31/2014, Entered: None Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 8/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposed MOTION to Expedite PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSED MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING AND FOR ORAL HEARING ON MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER ADOPTING SAMSUNG'S AND HTC'S PROPOSED LIMITATIONS FOR THE REDUCTION OF CLAIMS AND PRIOR ART [DKT. 239] by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curry, John) (Entered: 08/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 8/30/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Defendants' Emergency Motion to Strike by Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Emergency SEALED MOTION to Strike by Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Smith Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 233 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 232 MOTION to Amend/Correct PATENT RULE 3-3 INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS. Declaration of Andrew M. Holmes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Holmes, Andrew) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Exedea, Inc., Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Holmes, Andrew) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Order on Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Markman Hearing held on 7/17/2014. (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (leh, ) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 207 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED REPLY IN SUPPORT to Response to Motion re 197 Emergency MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SMARTFLASH'S INTERROGATORIES AND FOR SANCTIONS filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORRECTED SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 197 Emergency MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SMARTFLASH'S INTERROGATORIES AND FOR SANCTIONS filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Chen Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C Part 1, # 5 Exhibit C Part 2, # 6 Exhibit C Part 3, # 7 Exhibit C Part 4, # 8 Exhibit C Part 5, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Exhibit E, # 11 Exhibit F, # 12 Exhibit G, # 13 Exhibit H, # 14 Exhibit I, # 15 Exhibit J, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Baily, Melissa) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Additional Attachments to Main Document (Proposed Order) 204 Sealed Response to Motion,,.. (Baily, Melissa) Modified on 7/16/2014 (sm, ). Modified on 7/16/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 204 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 197 Emergency MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SMARTFLASH'S INTERROGATORIES AND FOR SANCTIONS filed by HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Chen Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C Part 1, # 5 Exhibit C Part 2, # 6 Exhibit C Part 3, # 7 Exhibit C Part 4, # 8 Exhibit C Part 5, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Exhibit E, # 11 Exhibit F, # 12 Exhibit G, # 13 Exhibit H, # 14 Exhibit I, # 15 Exhibit J)(Baily, Melissa) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 85 Order, 84 Order of Parties' Meet and Confer Relating to Final Election of Claims (Joint) (Chen, Howard) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Anthony Mathews on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Mathews, Christopher) (Entered: 07/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER entered for a response by 7/15/2014 to 197 Emergency Motion to Compel Responses to Smartflash's Interrogatories and for Sanctions. Additionally Smartflash's request for an oral hearing during the Markman hearing is granted. The Court will take up the Motion to Compel on Thursday, 7/17/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 7/11/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Claim Construction Chart by Exedea, Inc., Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark T. Jones, # 2 Declaration of Justin T. Nemunaitis, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Baily, Melissa) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Emergency MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SMARTFLASH'S INTERROGATORIES AND FOR SANCTIONS by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason S. McManis, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Kramer Verhoeven on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Verhoeven, Charles) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Kramer Verhoeven on behalf of HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation (Verhoeven, Charles) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REVISED AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 07/09/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 191 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 07/09/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 190 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 07/09/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Pursuant to the Court's July 3 2014 Order by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Howard) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Pursuant to the Court's July 3 2014 Order by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Howard) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S AMENDED RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING INDEFINITENESS filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John F. Summers, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited re 187 Response in Opposition to Motion, SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S NOTICE OF AMENDED BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INDEFINITENESS (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John F. Summers, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC of Estimated Amount of Time for Markman Hearing (Joint) (Chen, Howard) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 173 Joint Notice, filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Exedea, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Smartflash LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 7/3/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 183 Motion for Extension of Time to Exchange Privilege Logs. Deadline for privilege logs regarding all non-email discovery is 7/9/2014. The deadline to exchange privilege logs regarding all e-mail ESI discovery will be no later than 7/30/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 7/3/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File AGREED JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EXCHANGE PRIVILEGE LOGS by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Howard) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 180 Motion to Seal Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 6/30/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 181 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT RESPONSE Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Exedea, Inc. to 175 Claim Construction Brief, filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Exedea, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dr. Andrew Wolfe, Ph.D., # 2 Declaration of Andrew M. Holmes, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9 (Part 1), # 12 Exhibit 9 (Part 2), # 13 Exhibit 9 (Part 3), # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11 (Part 1), # 16 Exhibit 11 (Part 2), # 17 Exhibit 12, # 18 Exhibit 13, # 19 Exhibit 14, # 20 Exhibit 15, # 21 Exhibit 16, # 22 Exhibit 17)(Holmes, Andrew) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Their Responsive Claim Construction Brief by Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holmes, Andrew) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 149 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending "Covered Business Method" Review of US Patent Nos. '720, '317, '458, '598, '221 and '772 By the US Patent and Trademark Office filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Game Circus LLC (GAME CIRCUS LLC' NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R.4-5(b)) (Gorham, Andrew) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by Exedea, Inc., Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Responses due by 7/3/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dr. Andrew Wolfe, Ph.D., # 2 Declaration of Andrew M. Holmes, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Holmes, Andrew) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 149 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending "Covered Business Method" Review of US Patent Nos. '720, '317, '458, '598, '221 and '772 By the US Patent and Trademark Office filed by Exedea, Inc., Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Holmes, Andrew) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Jones Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 Nemunaitis Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION (Baily, Melissa) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited NOTICE OF DISPUTE REGARDING CATEGORIES OF DISCOVERY FROM JUNE 4, 2014 HEARING (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 171 Motion for Extension of Time to File. ORDERED that the deadline for the parties to file a Joint Notice of Dispute Regarding Categories of Discovery from June 4, 2014 hearing is to no later than June 10, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 6/10/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE NOTICE OF DISPUTE REGARDING CATEGORIES OF DISCOVERY FROM JUNE 4, 2014 HEARING by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 6/4/14 before Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/30/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2014. (sms, ) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 149 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending "Covered Business Method" Review of US Patent Nos. '720, '317, '458, '598, '221 and '772 By the US Patent and Trademark Office filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bradley W. Caldwell, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC of Compliance Regarding Technology Tutorial (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 6/4/2014 re Plaintiffs' 113 Motion to Compel and Defendants' 119 Cross Motion for a Protective Order. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (leh, ) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING. The opening claim construction brief will be due 6-13-2014. The response will be due 6-27-2014 and the reply will be due 7-10-2014. Parties will have an additional five pages for their opening and response claim construction briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 06/03/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 163 Motion for Extension of Time. The current deadline for exchanging privilege logs is hereby extended to 7-02-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 06/03/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 162 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Smartflash to respond to Defendants' Motion to Stay is hereby extended to 5:00 p.m. on 6-06-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 06/03/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Exchange Privilege Logs by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Howard) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING COVERED BUSINESS METHOD REVIEWS by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 152 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited.(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 151 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited.(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 150 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited.(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 154 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Joint) Of Parties Meet And Confer Relating To Claim Construction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chen, Howard) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 154 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, of Defendants' Disclosure Relating to Indefinite Means-Plus-Function Terms (Chen, Howard) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited JOINT NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ORDER (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF REVISED AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER regarding 131 Motion to Construe More Than 10 Terms. Lead counsel shall meet and confer in an attempt to reach agreed constructions, narrow the issues, and otherwise resolve their differences regarding the disputed claim terms. Parties shall file a notice by 5-30-2014 informing the Court of any agreed constructions and identifying which terms still require construction by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/20/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER appointing David Keyzer to the position of technical advisor in this case, with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendants and timely paid as billed. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/16/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 140 Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited by Game Circus LLC.(Walsh, Thomas) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendants HTC Corporation., HTC America, Inc., and Exedea, Inc.'s ANSWER to 140 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation.(Chen, Howard) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Samsung's ANSWER to 140 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC.(Chen, Howard) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending "Covered Business Method" Review of US Patent Nos. '720, '317, '458, '598, '221 and '772 By the US Patent and Trademark Office by Exedea, Inc., Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of A. Holmes, # 2 Exhibit A - 042114 email from Mathews to Caldwell, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 141 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited.(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited Joint Notice Regarding Technical Advisor (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Keyzer CV)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part 89 Joint Notice of Dispute Regarding Agreed Protective Order. Parties shall submit to the Court a revised proposed protective order incorporating the rulings discussed above within 10 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/12/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 143 Motion for Extension of Time. The current deadline for proposing technical advisors is hereby extended to no later than 5-13-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/12/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 130 Motion for Leave to Amend. Defendants may amend their P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions to include the additional grounds of invalidity based on indefiniteness for failure to comply with the requirements identified in Defendants' P.R. 4-2 Disclosures. The parties are still expected to comply with the limits set out in the Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art 84 . Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/12/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Technical Advisors by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Howard) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 139 Motion for Extension of Time to Exchange Privilege Logs. Deadline is extended to 6/2/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 5/2/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER to 80 Amended Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited by Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Morin, Philip) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Exedea, Inc., Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC.(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File AGREED JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EXCHANGE PRIVILEGE LOGS by Exedea, Inc., Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Exedea, Inc., Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 137 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 119 Cross SEALED PATENT MOTION for a Protective Order filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason S. McManis, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 133 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 04/23/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 135 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 113 Opposed SEALED MOTION SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Hou Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Choe Declaration, # 3 Affidavit Pao Declaration, # 4 Affidavit Holmes Declaration, # 5 Exhibit A -- Smartflash P.R. 3-2 disclosures, # 6 Exhibit B -- 8,336,772 Patent, # 7 Exhibit C -- 2013.12.31 Smartflash's 30(b)(6) Notice to Samsung, # 8 Exhibit D -- 2013.12.31 Smartflash's 30(b)(6) Notice to HTC, # 9 Exhibit E -- 2014.1.13 Email to Smartflash re 30(b)(6), # 10 Exhibit F -- 2014.1.13 HTC Email to Smartflash re 30(b)(6), # 11 Exhibit G -- 2014.2.12 Email to Smartflash re 30(b)(6), # 12 Exhibit H -- 2014.02.21 Ltr to C. Stewart from D. Holmes re Smartflash's 30(b)(6) Notice on HTC & Exedea, # 13 Exhibit I -- 2014.02.25 Holmes Letter to Stewart re 30(b)(6) Notice on Samsung, # 14 Exhibit J -- 2014.02.21 Samsung's First Supp. Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants, # 15 Exhibit K -- 2014.03.06 HTC's First Supplemental Responses to Smartflash's First Set of Common Interrogatories, # 16 Exhibit L -- 2014.03.20 Stewart Ltr to Holmes re 30(b)(6), # 17 Exhibit M -- 2014.03.28 Ltr to C. Stewart from D. Holmes Re 30(b)(6) Witnesses, # 18 Exhibit N -- 2014.04.08 Stewart Ltr to Holmes re 30(b)(6), # 19 Exhibit O -- 2014.04.15 Holmes Ltr to Cassidy Stewart re 30(b)(6) Notice to HTC)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 134 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 119 Cross SEALED PATENT MOTION for a Protective Order filed by Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Hou Delcaration, # 2 Affidavit Choe Declaration, # 3 Affidavit Pao Declaration, # 4 Affidavit Holmes Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exh. A -- Smartflash P.R. 3-2 disclosures, # 6 Exhibit Exh. B -- 8,336,772 Patent, # 7 Exhibit Exh. C -- 2013.12.31 Smartflash's 30(b)(6) Notice to Samsung, # 8 Exhibit Exh. D -- 2013.12.31 Smartflash's 30(b)(6) Notice to HTC, # 9 Exhibit Exh. E -- 2014.1.13 Email to Smartflash re 30(b)(6), # 10 Exhibit Exh. F -- 2014.1.13 HTC Email to Smartflash re 30(b)(6), # 11 Exhibit Exh. G -- 2014.2.12 Email to Smartflash re 30(b)(6), # 12 Exhibit Exh. H -- 2014.02.21 Ltr to C. Stewart from D. Holmes re Smartflash's 30(b)(6) Notice on HTC & Exedea, # 13 Exhibit Exh. I -- 2014.02.25 Holmes Letter to Stewart re 30(b)(6) Notice on Samsung, # 14 Exhibit Exh. J -- 2014.02.21 Samsung's First Supp. Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants, # 15 Exhibit Exh. K -- 2014.03.06 HTC's First Supplemental Responses to Smartflash's First Set of Common Interrogatories, # 16 Exhibit Exh. L -- 2014.03.20 Stewart Ltr to Holmes re 30(b)(6), # 17 Exhibit Exh. M -- 2014.03.28 Ltr to C. Stewart from D. Holmes Re 30(b)(6) Witnesses, # 18 Exhibit Exh. N -- 2014.04.08 Stewart Ltr to Holmes re 30(b)(6), # 19 Exhibit Exh. O -- 2014.04.15 Holmes Ltr to Cassidy Stewart re 30(b)(6) Notice to HTC)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION Leave to File Under Seal by Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 117 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 04/16/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION of Submission Regarding Defendants' Opposed Request to Construe More Than 10 Terms by Exedea, Inc., Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A - Terms to be Construed, # 2 Ex. B - Personal Audio v. Apple EDTX, # 3 Ex. C - Ex Parte Lakkala PTAB, # 4 Ex. D - Ex Parte Erol PTAB, # 5 Ex E - Ex Parte Smith PTAB, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Their P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions by Exedea, Inc., Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 120 Motion for Extension of Time to File. ORDERED that: the deadline for the parties to exchange privilege logs is hereby extended from the current deadline of April 1, 2014 to up to and including May 1, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 4/8/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 128 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 119 Cross SEALED PATENT MOTION for a Protective Order filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason S. McManis, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 127 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 113 Opposed SEALED MOTION SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason S. McManis, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip A Morin on behalf of Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation (Morin, Philip) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yun Louise Lu on behalf of Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation (Lu, Yun) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Game Circus LLC of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Walsh, Thomas) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC regarding Compliance with PR 4-2 Disclosures (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PATENT RULE 4-2 DISCLOSURE (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File AGREED JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EXCHANGE PRIVILEGE LOGS by Exedea, Inc., Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Cross SEALED PATENT MOTION for a Protective Order by Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of A. Holmes, # 2 Exhibit A - 2013 12 31 Smartflash's 30(b)(6) Notice to HTC, # 3 Exhibit B - 2014-02-21 Ltr to C. Stewart from D. Holmes re Smartflash's 30(b)(6) Notice on HTC & Exedea, # 4 Exhibit C - 2013 12 31 Smartflash's 30(b)(6) Notice to Samsung, # 5 Exhibit D - 2014-02-25 Holmes Letter to Stewart re 30(b)(6) Notice on Samsung, # 6 Exhibit E - 2014 02 13 SF's Notice of Deposition & Subpoena Duces Tecum to SISA, # 7 Exhibit F - 032414 SISA Smartflash Production, # 8 Exhibit G - 012214 Smartflash Samsung Source Code Computers, # 9 Exhibit H - 012214 Smartflash HTC Sour Code Computers, # 10 Exhibit I - 2014-02-21 Samsung's First Supp. Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants, # 11 Exhibit J - 2014-03-06 HTC's First Supplemental Responses to Smartflash's First Set of Common Interrogatories, # 12 Exhibit K - 021114 email from Cooper, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 118 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 113 Opposed SEALED MOTION SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of A. Holmes, # 2 Exhibit A - 2013 12 31 Smartflash's 30(b)(6) Notice to HTC, # 3 Exhibit B - 2014-02-21 Ltr to C. Stewart from D. Holmes re Smartflash's 30(b)(6) Notice on HTC & Exedea, # 4 Exhibit C - 2013 12 31 Smartflash's 30(b)(6) Notice to Samsung, # 5 Exhibit D - 2014-02-25 Holmes Letter to Stewart re 30(b)(6) Notice on Samsung, # 6 Exhibit E - 2014 02 13 SF's Notice of Deposition & Subpoena Duces Tecum to SISA, # 7 Exhibit F - 032414 SISA Smartflash Production, # 8 Exhibit G - 012214 Smartflash Samsung Source Code Computers, # 9 Exhibit H - 012214 Smartflash HTC Sour Code Computers, # 10 Exhibit I - 2014-02-21 Samsung's First Supp. Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants, # 11 Exhibit J - 2014-03-06 HTC's First Supplemental Responses to Smartflash's First Set of Common Interrogatories, # 12 Exhibit K - 021114 email from Cooper, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Defendants' Cross Motion for a Protective Order by Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth on behalf of Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., Game Circus LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC of Compliance (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC regarding Amended Initial Disclosures (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposed SEALED MOTION SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit McManis Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Yun Louise Lu on behalf of HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4551777. (Lu, Yun) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Philip A Morin on behalf of HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4551741. (Morin, Philip) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Warren Joseph McCarty, III on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (McCarty, Warren) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Thomas Nemunaitis on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Nemunaitis, Justin) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 555 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?