Erie Indemnity Company, et al v. Keurig, Incorporated, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, Case No. 11-3888

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 22, 2016 at 4:11 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3385 - Property Damage: Product Liability
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011114755 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER filed DISMISSING sua sponte for lack of a final appealable order. The motion to stay trial proceedings [4467828-2] filed by Ms. Carolyn Michelle Cappel is denied as moot.. Alice M. Batchelder, Chief Circuit Judge; Deborah L. Cook, Circuit Judge and Joseph M. Hood, U.S. District Judge for the Eastern District of Kentucky, sitting by designation. (BPA)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011089596 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
    RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion stay district court proceeding, [4467828-2]; previously filed by Ms. Carolyn Michelle Cappel in 11-3888. Response from Attorney Mr. Jon Paul Yormick for Appellees Erie Indemnity Company, Milton Burns and Victoria Burns Certificate of Service:10/03/2011. (JPY)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011088443 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
      REPLY filed by Mr. Jon Paul Yormick for Erie Indemnity Company, Milton Burns and Victoria Burns regarding Appellant's Motion to Stay. Certificate of Service: 09/30/2011. ***Counsel directed to refile using correct entry: response filed***--[Edited 10/03/2011 by PJE] (JPY)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011085335 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
        MOTION filed by Mr. Shawn Wayne Maestle for Simatelex Manufactory Co. LTD. to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 09/28/2011. (SWM)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011085364 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
          LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief by 30 days [4471955-2] filed by Mr. Shawn Wayne Maestle, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 10/31/2011. appellee brief now due 12/01/2011. (LAJ)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011085422 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
            LETTER SENT to hold briefing in abeyance pending resolution of a possible jurisdictional issue. The current briefing schedule has been vacated. (LAJ)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011084736 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
              REPLY filed by Mr. Jon Paul Yormick for Erie Indemnity Company, Milton Burns and Victoria Burns regarding Appellant's Jurisdictional Memorandum. Certificate of Service: 09/27/2011. (JPY)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011081692 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Jon Paul Yormick for Erie Indemnity Company, Milton Burns and Victoria Burns regarding Change of Address. Certificate of Service: 09/23/2011. (JPY)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011079569 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                  MOTION filed by Ms. Carolyn Michelle Cappel for Simatelex Manufactory Co. LTD. to stay district court proceeding. Certificate of Service: 09/21/2011. (CMC)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011079625 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                    APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Milton Burns, Victoria Burns and Erie Indemnity Company by Nicholas A. Panagopoulos II. Certificate of Service: 09/21/2011. (NAP)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 87 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?