VOLK v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:12-cv-00440-ECH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2016 at 10:29 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491
Nature of Suit Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: 5/31/2013 Judgment*
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 17 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: 5/30/2013 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
    PUBLISHED OPINION granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss; denying 11 Cross Motion. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (mm3) Copy to parties.
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/11/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: 1/23/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: 1/23/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: 1/23/2013 Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: 12/31/2012 Cross Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: 11/1/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: 10/31/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: 10/1/2012 Motion to Dismiss
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: 10/1/2012 Administrative Record
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: 7/26/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: 7/11/2012 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: 7/11/2012 Notice Of Assignment
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 17 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    PUBLISHED OPINION granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss; denying 11 Cross Motion. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (mm3) Copy to parties.
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: 7/11/2012 Complaint
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 102 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?